Bess v. Barroso et al
Plaintiff: Daniel E. Bess
Defendant: J. Barroso, J. Martinez and R. Oviedo
Case Number: 3:2023cv06095
Filed: November 27, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Scott Corley
Referring Judge: PSLC JNE
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 27, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 27, 2023 Filing 5 CDCR Inmate Statement Report of Account (msr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/27/2023)
December 1, 2023 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Daniel E. Bess, CDCR # H27804.The California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation is directed to submit within 72 hours and in PDF form a certified Prison Trust Account statement for the plaintiff, reflecting the last six months activity, to cdcrfilings@cand.uscourts.gov. (msr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2023)
November 27, 2023 Remark: IFP Form and Docket sheet emailed to CDCR, (msr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/27/2023)
November 27, 2023 Filing 3 CLERK'S NOTICE re completion of In Forma Pauperis affidavit or payment of filing fee due within 28 days. IFP Form due by 1/4/2024. (msr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/27/2023)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
November 27, 2023 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Daniel E. Bess. (msr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/27/2023)
November 27, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against J. Barroso, J. Martinez, R. Oviedo. Filed by Daniel E. Bess. (msr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/27/2023)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bess v. Barroso et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel E. Bess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Barroso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Oviedo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?