The Louis D. Brandeis Center, Inc. et al v. Regents of the University of California et al
Plaintiff: The Louis D. Brandeis Center, Inc. and Jewish Americans for Fairness in Education (JAFE)
Defendant: Regents of the University of California, University of California at Berkeley, Berkeley Law School, Michael V. Drake, Carol T. Christ and Benjamin E. Hermalin
Case Number: 3:2023cv06133
Filed: November 28, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: James Donato
Referring Judge: Sallie Kim
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 24, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 24, 2024 Filing 42 NOTICE by Jewish Americans for Fairness in Education (JAFE), The Louis D. Brandeis Center, Inc. Notice of Change of Firm Name and Contact Information (Carroll, David) (Filed on 1/24/2024)
January 19, 2024 #Electronic filing error. Notice to Attorney Tara Helfman. Counsel must update personal profile for change of contact information including email address to be in effect. Re: 123 Re: #41 Notice of Change of Address filed by Jewish Americans for Fairness in Education (JAFE), The Louis D. Brandeis Center, Inc. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2024)
January 18, 2024 Filing 41 NOTICE of Change of Address by Tara Helfman (Helfman, Tara) (Filed on 1/18/2024)
January 18, 2024 Filing 40 NOTICE of Change of Address by John V Coghlan (Coghlan, John) (Filed on 1/18/2024)
January 17, 2024 Filing 39 STIPULATION Second Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint filed by Berkeley Law School, Carol T. Christ, Michael V. Drake, Benjamin E. Hermalin, Regents of the University of California, University of California at Berkeley. (Heckenlively, Bryan) (Filed on 1/17/2024)
January 11, 2024 Filing 38 NOTICE of Appearance by Hailyn Jennifer Chen Counsel for Defendants The Regents of the University of CA, University of CA at Berkeley, Berkeley Law School, Michael Drake, Carol Christ, and Ben Hermalin (Chen, Hailyn) (Filed on 1/11/2024)
January 11, 2024 Filing 37 NOTICE of Appearance by Bryan H. Heckenlively Appearance of Counsel (Heckenlively, Bryan) (Filed on 1/11/2024)
December 20, 2023 Filing 36 STIPULATION JOINT STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT filed by Regents of the University of California. (Thompson, Carol) (Filed on 12/20/2023)
December 20, 2023 Filing 35 NOTICE of Appearance by Carol Lynn Thompson (Thompson, Carol) (Filed on 12/20/2023)
December 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 34 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/29/2024 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor. Case Management Statement due by 2/22/2024. Signed by Judge James Donato on 12/14/2023. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2023)
December 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge James Donato for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Clerk on 12/13/2023. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(mbc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2023)
December 13, 2023 Filing 32 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (bxl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2023)
December 12, 2023 Filing 31 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Jewish Americans for Fairness in Education (JAFE), The Louis D. Brandeis Center, Inc... (Carroll, David) (Filed on 12/12/2023)
December 8, 2023 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by L. Rachel Lerman (Lerman, L. Rachel) (Filed on 12/8/2023)
December 4, 2023 Filing 29 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jewish Americans for Fairness in Education (JAFE), The Louis D. Brandeis Center, Inc. Berkeley Law School served on 11/29/2023, answer due 12/20/2023. (Carroll, David) (Filed on 12/4/2023) Modified on 12/4/2023 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
December 4, 2023 Filing 28 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jewish Americans for Fairness in Education (JAFE), The Louis D. Brandeis Center, Inc.. Michael V. Drake served on 11/29/2023, answer due 12/20/2023. (Carroll, David) (Filed on 12/4/2023)
December 4, 2023 Filing 27 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jewish Americans for Fairness in Education (JAFE), The Louis D. Brandeis Center, Inc.. Carol T. Christ served on 11/29/2023, answer due 12/20/2023. (Carroll, David) (Filed on 12/4/2023)
December 4, 2023 Filing 26 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jewish Americans for Fairness in Education (JAFE), The Louis D. Brandeis Center, Inc.. Regents of the University of California served on 11/29/2023, answer due 12/20/2023. (Carroll, David) (Filed on 12/4/2023)
December 4, 2023 Filing 25 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jewish Americans for Fairness in Education (JAFE), The Louis D. Brandeis Center, Inc.. University of California at Berkeley served on 11/29/2023, answer due 12/20/2023. (Carroll, David) (Filed on 12/4/2023)
December 4, 2023 Filing 24 ***POSTED IN ERROR. PLEASE SEE DOCUMENT #29*** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jewish Americans for Fairness in Education (JAFE), The Louis D. Brandeis Center, Inc.. Berkeley Law School served on 11/29/2023, answer due 12/20/2023. (Carroll, David) (Filed on 12/4/2023) Modified on 12/4/2023 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
December 4, 2023 Filing 23 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jewish Americans for Fairness in Education (JAFE), The Louis D. Brandeis Center, Inc.. Benjamin E. Hermalin served on 11/30/2023, answer due 12/21/2023. (Carroll, David) (Filed on 12/4/2023)
December 4, 2023 #Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. [err101]Please re-file in its entirety "Summons Returned Executed" Re: #22 Certificate of Service, filed by Jewish Americans for Fairness in Education (JAFE), The Louis D. Brandeis Center, Inc., #18 Certificate of Service, filed by Jewish Americans for Fairness in Education (JAFE), The Louis D. Brandeis Center, Inc., #21 Certificate of Service, filed by Jewish Americans for Fairness in Education (JAFE), The Louis D. Brandeis Center, Inc., #20 Certificate of Service, filed by Jewish Americans for Fairness in Education (JAFE), The Louis D. Brandeis Center, Inc., #17 Certificate of Service, filed by Jewish Americans for Fairness in Education (JAFE), The Louis D. Brandeis Center, Inc. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2023)
December 1, 2023 Filing 22 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Jewish Americans for Fairness in Education (JAFE), The Louis D. Brandeis Center, Inc. re 10 Case Assigned by Intake,, #8 Certificate of Interested Entities, #13 Summons Issued, #11 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines, #1 Complaint, #9 Notice of Appearance of David Carroll (Carroll, David) (Filed on 12/1/2023)
December 1, 2023 Filing 21 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Jewish Americans for Fairness in Education (JAFE), The Louis D. Brandeis Center, Inc. re 10 Case Assigned by Intake,, #8 Certificate of Interested Entities, #13 Summons Issued, #11 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines, #1 Complaint, #9 Notice of Appearance of David Carroll (Carroll, David) (Filed on 12/1/2023)
December 1, 2023 Filing 20 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Jewish Americans for Fairness in Education (JAFE), The Louis D. Brandeis Center, Inc. re 10 Case Assigned by Intake,, #8 Certificate of Interested Entities, #13 Summons Issued, #11 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines, #1 Complaint, #9 Notice of Appearance of David Carroll (Carroll, David) (Filed on 12/1/2023)
December 1, 2023 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Jewish Americans for Fairness in Education (JAFE), The Louis D. Brandeis Center, Inc. re #8 Certificate of Interested Entities, #13 Summons Issued, #11 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines, #1 Complaint, #9 Notice of Appearance of David Carroll (Carroll, David) (Filed on 12/1/2023)
December 1, 2023 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Jewish Americans for Fairness in Education (JAFE), The Louis D. Brandeis Center, Inc. re #8 Certificate of Interested Entities, #13 Summons Issued, #11 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines, #1 Complaint, #9 Notice of Appearance of David Carroll (Carroll, David) (Filed on 12/1/2023)
December 1, 2023 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Jewish Americans for Fairness in Education (JAFE), The Louis D. Brandeis Center, Inc. re 10 Case Assigned by Intake,, #8 Certificate of Interested Entities, #13 Summons Issued, #11 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines, #1 Complaint, #9 Notice of Appearance of David Carroll (Carroll, David) (Filed on 12/1/2023)
November 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Order by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim granting #15 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(sklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2023)
November 29, 2023 Filing 15 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-18880721.) filed by The Louis D. Brandeis Center, Inc.. (Helfman, Tara) (Filed on 11/29/2023)
November 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Order by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim granting #12 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(sklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/28/2023)
November 28, 2023 Filing 13 Summons Issued as to Berkeley Law School, Carol T. Christ, Michael V. Drake, Benjamin E. Hermalin, Regents of the University of California, University of California at Berkeley. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/28/2023)
November 28, 2023 Filing 12 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-18874792.) filed by Jewish Americans for Fairness in Education (JAFE), The Louis D. Brandeis Center, Inc.. (Coghlan, John) (Filed on 11/28/2023)
November 28, 2023 Filing 11 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 2/19/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/26/2024 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/28/2023)
November 28, 2023 Filing 10 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 12/12/2023. (sfb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/28/2023)
November 28, 2023 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric Marc George Notice of Appearance of David J. Carroll (George, Eric) (Filed on 11/28/2023)
November 28, 2023 Filing 8 Certificate of Interested Entities by Jewish Americans for Fairness in Education (JAFE), The Louis D. Brandeis Center, Inc. (George, Eric) (Filed on 11/28/2023)
November 28, 2023 Filing 7 Proposed Summons. (George, Eric) (Filed on 11/28/2023)
November 28, 2023 Filing 6 Proposed Summons. (George, Eric) (Filed on 11/28/2023)
November 28, 2023 Filing 5 Proposed Summons. (George, Eric) (Filed on 11/28/2023)
November 28, 2023 Filing 4 Proposed Summons. (George, Eric) (Filed on 11/28/2023)
November 28, 2023 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. (George, Eric) (Filed on 11/28/2023)
November 28, 2023 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (George, Eric) (Filed on 11/28/2023)
November 28, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Complaint for Injunctive and Declaratory Relief against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number BCANDC-18871888.). Filed by Jewish Americans for Fairness in Education (JAFE), The Louis D. Brandeis Center, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Complaint, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B to Complaint, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet and Attachment)(George, Eric) (Filed on 11/28/2023)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Louis D. Brandeis Center, Inc. et al v. Regents of the University of California et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Louis D. Brandeis Center, Inc.
Represented By: Eric Marc George
Represented By: David Junxiong Carroll
Represented By: John V Coghlan
Represented By: L. Rachel Lerman
Represented By: Tara Helfman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jewish Americans for Fairness in Education (JAFE)
Represented By: Eric Marc George
Represented By: David Junxiong Carroll
Represented By: John V Coghlan
Represented By: L. Rachel Lerman
Represented By: Tara Helfman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Regents of the University of California
Represented By: Bryan H. Heckenlively
Represented By: Carol Lynn Thompson
Represented By: Hailyn Jennifer Chen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: University of California at Berkeley
Represented By: Bryan H. Heckenlively
Represented By: Hailyn Jennifer Chen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Berkeley Law School
Represented By: Bryan H. Heckenlively
Represented By: Hailyn Jennifer Chen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael V. Drake
Represented By: Bryan H. Heckenlively
Represented By: Hailyn Jennifer Chen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carol T. Christ
Represented By: Bryan H. Heckenlively
Represented By: Hailyn Jennifer Chen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benjamin E. Hermalin
Represented By: Bryan H. Heckenlively
Represented By: Hailyn Jennifer Chen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?