Cruz et al v. PBF Energy, Inc., et al
Plaintiff: Alena Cruz and Shannon Payne
Defendant: PBF Energy, Inc., PBF Energy Western Region LLC, a Delaware Company, Martinez Refining Company LLC, a Delaware Company, PBF Energy Western Region LLC and Martinez Refining Company LLC
Case Number: 3:2023cv06142
Filed: November 28, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: James Donato
Referring Judge: Thomas S Hixson
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 16, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 16, 2024 Filing 15 CLERK'S NOTICE RE DOCKET NO. 40 in case no. 4:23-cv-4184-HSG and docket no. #11 in case no. 3:23-cv-06142-JD. The court has reviewed the motion and determined that no cases are related and no reassignments shall occur. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/16/2024)
January 4, 2024 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Alena Cruz, Shannon Payne. PBF Energy Western Region LLC served on 12/29/2023, answer due 1/19/2024. (Murphy, Anne Marie) (Filed on 1/4/2024)
January 4, 2024 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Alena Cruz, Shannon Payne. PBF Energy, Inc. served on 12/15/2023, answer due 1/5/2024. (Murphy, Anne Marie) (Filed on 1/4/2024)
January 4, 2024 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Alena Cruz, Shannon Payne. Martinez Refining Company LLC served on 12/28/2023, answer due 1/18/2024. (Murphy, Anne Marie) (Filed on 1/4/2024)
January 2, 2024 Filing 11 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION To Consider Whether Cases Should Be Related Pursuant to Civil Local Rules 3-12 and 7-11 filed by Alena Cruz, Shannon Payne. Responses due by 1/8/2024. (Kittle, Blair) (Filed on 1/2/2024) Modified on 1/2/2024 (anj, COURT STAFF).
December 13, 2023 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Alena Cruz, Shannon Payne. Martinez Refining Company LLC served on 12/6/2023, answer due 12/27/2023. , CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Alena Cruz; Shannon Payne (Murphy, Anne Marie) (Filed on 12/13/2023)
December 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/29/2024 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor. Case Management Statement due by 2/22/2024. Signed by Judge James Donato on 12/12/2023. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2023)
December 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge James Donato for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 12/11/2023. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(ark, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2023)
December 11, 2023 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (rmm2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2023)
December 8, 2023 Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Alena Cruz, Shannon Payne.. (Murphy, Anne Marie) (Filed on 12/8/2023)
November 29, 2023 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 2/22/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/29/2024 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom E, 15th Floor. (anj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2023)
November 29, 2023 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Martinez Refining Company LLC, PBF Energy Western Region LLC, PBF Energy, Inc.. (anj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2023)
November 28, 2023 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 12/12/2023. (cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/28/2023)
November 28, 2023 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Murphy, Anne Marie) (Filed on 11/28/2023)
November 28, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Martinez Refining Company LLC, a Delaware Company, PBF Energy Western Region LLC, a Delaware Company, PBF Energy, Inc., a Delaware Corporation ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-18874319.). Filed by Alena Cruz, Shannon Payne. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Murphy, Anne Marie) (Filed on 11/28/2023) Modified on 11/29/2023 (anj, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cruz et al v. PBF Energy, Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alena Cruz
Represented By: Anne Marie Murphy
Represented By: Blair V. Kittle
Represented By: Joseph W. Cotchett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shannon Payne
Represented By: Anne Marie Murphy
Represented By: Blair V. Kittle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PBF Energy, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PBF Energy Western Region LLC, a Delaware Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martinez Refining Company LLC, a Delaware Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PBF Energy Western Region LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martinez Refining Company LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?