Taylor v. U.S. Department of Health and Human Services et al
Plaintiff: Tama Taylor
Defendant: U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, Del Norte Community Health Center and Clint Pearson, M.D.
Case Number: 3:2023cv06164
Filed: November 29, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
Referring Judge: Rita F Lin
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1402 Medical Malpractice
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 12, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 12, 2024 Filing 15 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE UPON REASSIGNMENT: Notice is hereby given that an Initial Case Management Conference is set before Judge Rita F. Lin upon reassignment. For a copy of Judge Lin's Standing Order and other information, please refer to the Court's website at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges/lin-rita-f-rfl/. Case Management Statement due by 4/10/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/17/2024 10:00 AM in San Francisco - Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges/lin-rita-f-rfl/General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (mkl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2024)
January 11, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Rita F. Lin for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Clerk on 01/11/2024. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(mbc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2024)
January 11, 2024 Filing 13 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Tama Taylor.. (Shahrokh, Koorosh) (Filed on 1/11/2024)
January 11, 2024 Filing 12 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ejk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2024)
January 11, 2024 Filing 11 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Clint Pearson, M.D... (Burroughs, Amelia) (Filed on 1/11/2024)
January 11, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER re: #8 Stipulation re Extension of Time for Responsive Pleading. Deadline for Defendant to respond to the Complaint is extended to 3/18/2024. Initial Case Management Conference previously set for 2/29/2024 is reset to 4/11/2024 at 11:00 AM in San Francisco - Videoconference Only. Case Management Statement due by 4/4/2024. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/lb General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. Signed by Judge Laurel Beeler on 01/11/2024. (ejk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2024)
January 10, 2024 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Defendant Clint Pearson, M.D. shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: #http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 1/24/2024. (ejk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2024)
January 10, 2024 Filing 8 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER RE EXTENSION OF TIME FOR RESPONSIVE PLEADING, ETC. filed by Clint Pearson, M.D.. (Burroughs, Amelia) (Filed on 1/10/2024)
November 30, 2023 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Del Norte Community Health Center, Clint Pearson, M.D., U.S. Department of Health and Human Services. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2023)
November 29, 2023 Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Tama Taylor.. (Shahrokh, Koorosh) (Filed on 11/29/2023)
November 29, 2023 Filing 5 Proposed Summons. (Shahrokh, Koorosh) (Filed on 11/29/2023)
November 29, 2023 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 2/22/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/29/2024 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor. (krp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2023)
November 29, 2023 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 12/13/2023. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2023)
November 29, 2023 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Shahrokh, Koorosh) (Filed on 11/29/2023)
November 29, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-18879095.). Filed by Tama Taylor. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Shahrokh, Koorosh) (Filed on 11/29/2023)
November 29, 2023 #Electronic filing error. ***Party information (for a Defendant and the Plaintiff) is incorrect/misspelled within the Proposed Summons. Please correct and then re-file in its entirety.*** Re: #2 Proposed Summons filed by Tama Taylor (krp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2023)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Taylor v. U.S. Department of Health and Human Services et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tama Taylor
Represented By: Koorosh Kaikhosrow Shahrokh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Health and Human Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Del Norte Community Health Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clint Pearson, M.D.
Represented By: Amelia Fairbank Burroughs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?