Madriaga et al v. United Airlines, Inc.
Plaintiff: Joel Madriaga and Melinda Madriaga
Defendant: United Airlines, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2023cv06184
Filed: November 29, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: James Donato
Referring Judge: Donna M Ryu
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1396 - Tort Negligence
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 23, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER re #13 Stipulation. Under Civil Local Rule 7-3, defendant's response to the motion to remand was due by January 12, 2024 (14 days after the motion was filed), and plaintiffs' reply was due by January 19, 2024 (7 days after opposition was due). In any event, defendant may file its response by January 31, 2024, and plaintiffs may file any reply by February 7, 2024. The hearing on the motion is re-set for March 7, 2024, at 10:00 a.m. to coincide with the case management conference. Signed by Judge James Donato on 1/23/2024. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2024)
January 18, 2024 Filing 13 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #11 First MOTION to Remand filed by Joel Madriaga. (Oparowski, Ember) (Filed on 1/18/2024)
January 18, 2024 Filing 12 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion (Oparowski, Ember) (Filed on 1/18/2024)
December 29, 2023 Filing 11 First MOTION to Remand filed by Joel Madriaga. Motion Hearing set for 2/8/2024 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Responses due by 1/31/2024. Replies due by 2/5/2024. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand, #2 Declaration Declaration of Ember Oparowski in support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand)(Oparowski, Ember) (Filed on 12/29/2023)
December 28, 2023 Filing 10 Certificate of Interested Entities by Joel Madriaga (Oparowski, Ember) (Filed on 12/28/2023)
December 28, 2023 Filing 9 MOTION to Remand filed by Joel Madriaga. Motion Hearing set for 2/8/2024 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Responses due by 1/11/2024. Replies due by 1/18/2024. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Certificate of Conflicts and Interested Parties)(Oparowski, Ember) (Filed on 12/28/2023)
December 28, 2023 #Electronic filing error. ***Certificate(s) of Interested Entities/Parties need to be filed separately using the appropriate event, and not as an attachment. Please re-file this document in its entirety and when prompted, enter all affiliates or corporate parents.*** Re: #9 MOTION to Remand filed by Joel Madriaga (krp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/28/2023)
December 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/7/2024 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor. Case Management Statement due by 2/29/2024. Signed by Judge James Donato on 12/4/2023. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2023)
December 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge James Donato for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu no longer assigned to case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Clerk on 12/1/2023. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(jml, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2023)
November 30, 2023 Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (kc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2023)
November 30, 2023 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 2/28/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/6/2024 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (krp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2023)
November 30, 2023 Filing 4 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by United Airlines, Inc... (Foellmer, Mackenzie) (Filed on 11/30/2023)
November 30, 2023 #Electronic filing error. ***Filer did not add all interested parties when prompted. Re-file this document in its entirety and when prompted, enter all affiliates or corporate parents.*** Re: #2 Certificate of Interested Entities filed by United Airlines, Inc. (krp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2023)
November 29, 2023 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 12/13/2023. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2023)
November 29, 2023 Filing 1 Answer to Removal Complaint is attached as Exhibit B within Notice of Removal 1 by United Airlines, Inc. (krp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2023)
November 29, 2023 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by United Airlines, Inc. (Foellmer, Mackenzie) (Filed on 11/29/2023)
November 29, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from San Mateo Superior Court. Their case number is 23-CIV-04130. (Filing fee $402 receipt number ACANDC-18884118). Filed by United Airlines, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A Complaint, #3 Exhibit B Answer, #4 Exhibit C Request for Statement of Damages, #5 Exhibit D Response to Requests for Statement of Damages)(Foellmer, Mackenzie) (Filed on 11/29/2023)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Madriaga et al v. United Airlines, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joel Madriaga
Represented By: Brian Mark Fong
Represented By: Ember J. Oparowski
Represented By: Ember Oparowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melinda Madriaga
Represented By: Brian Mark Fong
Represented By: Ember J. Oparowski
Represented By: Ember Oparowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Airlines, Inc.
Represented By: Mackenzie Cass Foellmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?