McCaffrey v. Republic Services, Inc.
Plaintiff: Stephen McCaffrey
Defendant: Republic Services, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2023cv06224
Filed: December 1, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Susan Illston
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 5, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 5, 2023 Filing 10 INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT GUIDELINE AND CLERK'S NOTICE ON REASSIGNMENT. (ec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2023)
December 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Susan Illston for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 12/5/2023. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(ark, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2023)
December 5, 2023 Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ejk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2023)
December 5, 2023 #Electronic filing error. Document not properly linked. [err102]Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. Re: #6 Certificate of Service filed by Republic Services, Inc. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2023)
December 4, 2023 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Republic Services, Inc... (DiMario, Alec) (Filed on 12/4/2023)
December 4, 2023 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Republic Services, Inc. re #5 (DiMario, Alec) (Filed on 12/4/2023) Modified on 12/5/2023 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
December 4, 2023 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: This case may fall within the Initial Discovery Protocols for Employment Cases Alleging Adverse Action. See #General Order 71. Parties and Counsel are directed to review General Order 71 to determine whether it applies to this case, and to comply with that General Order if applicable. Case Management Statement due by 2/22/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/29/2024 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2023)
December 1, 2023 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 12/15/2023. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2023)
December 1, 2023 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by Republic Services, Inc. (DiMario, Alec) (Filed on 12/1/2023)
December 1, 2023 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Republic Services, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate ALLIED WASTE SERVICES OF NORTH AMERICA, LLC for Republic Services, Inc.. (DiMario, Alec) (Filed on 12/1/2023)
December 1, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of Montery County. Their case number is 23CV003238. (Filing fee $405 receipt number ACANDC-18896678). Filed by Republic Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of ALEC S. DIMARIO ISO Notice of Removal of Civil Action to Federal Court by Defendant ALLIED WASTE SERVICES OF NORTH AMERICA, LLC, erroneously named as REPUBLIC SERVICES, INC., #2 Exhibit A to Declaration of ALEC DIMARIO, #3 Exhibit B to Declaration of ALEC DIMARIO, #4 Declaration of LAUREN MCKEON ISO Notice of Removal of Civil Action to Federal Court by Defendant ALLIED WASTE SERVICES OF NORTH AMERICA, LLC, erroneously named as REPUBLIC SERVICES, INC., #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(DiMario, Alec) (Filed on 12/1/2023)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McCaffrey v. Republic Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen McCaffrey
Represented By: Bryan Joseph Lazarski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Republic Services, Inc.
Represented By: Alec Scott DiMario
Represented By: Heather M. Vigil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?