J. et al v. City and County of San Francisco et al
Plaintiff: Eriberto Jimenez, Lucy Rios, Carmen Lopez, Jolina Tawasha, E. J., L. R., C. L. and J. T.
Defendant: CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO, William Scott, Thomas Harvey and Matt Sullivan
Case Number: 3:2023cv06524
Filed: December 19, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Lisa J Cisneros
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 14, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 16, 2024 Filing 38 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Consider Whether Cases Should Be Related filed by CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO, Thomas Harvey, William Scott, Matt Sullivan. Responses due by 2/20/2024. (Ikels, Zuzana) (Filed on 2/16/2024)
February 6, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 37 Order by Magistrate Judge Lisa J. Cisneros granting #32 Motion to Appoint Guardian ad Litem for minor E.J.(bns, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2024)
February 5, 2024 Filing 36 REDACTED ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND ADR DEADLINES. Case Management Statement due by 3/14/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/21/2024 at 01:30 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/lisa-j-cisneros/General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (bns, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2024)
February 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 35 Order by Magistrate Judge Lisa J. Cisneros granting #29 Motion to Appoint Guardian ad Litem for minor J.T.(bns, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2024)
February 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 34 Order by Magistrate Judge Lisa J. Cisneros granting #28 Motion to Appoint Guardian ad Litem for minor L.R.(bns, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2024)
February 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 33 Order by Magistrate Judge Lisa J. Cisneros granting #27 Motion to Appoint Guardian ad Litem for minor C.L.(bns, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2024)
February 5, 2024 Filing 32 MOTION to Appoint Guardian ad Litem Corrected filed by E. J.. (Lederman, Rachel) (Filed on 2/5/2024)
February 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER by Judge Lisa J. Cisneros: To complete the public record of this action, and to avoid any potential question of the validity of Plaintiff E.J.'s original complaint and subsequent voluntary dismissal without prejudice, E.J. is directed to file a corrected version of ECF No. #6 in compliance with Rule 5.2 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Civil Local Rule 5-1(i)(3), no later than February 12, 2024. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ljclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2024)
February 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 30 Order by Magistrate Judge Lisa J. Cisneros granting #26 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Mara Verheyden-Hilliard.(bns, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2024)
February 2, 2024 Filing 29 MOTION to Appoint Guardian ad Litem CORRECTED filed by J. T.. (Lederman, Rachel) (Filed on 2/2/2024)
February 2, 2024 Filing 28 MOTION to Appoint Guardian ad Litem CORRECTED filed by L. R.. (Lederman, Rachel) (Filed on 2/2/2024)
February 2, 2024 Filing 27 MOTION to Appoint Guardian ad Litem CORRECTED filed by C. L.. (Lederman, Rachel) (Filed on 2/2/2024)
February 2, 2024 Filing 26 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice CORRECTED ( Filing fee $ 328, receipt number ACANDC-1895438.) Filing fee previously paid on 12/19/2023 filed by C. L., L. R., J. T.. (Verheyden-Hilliard, Mara) (Filed on 2/2/2024)
February 1, 2024 Filing 25 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by C. L., L. R., J. T... (Lederman, Rachel) (Filed on 2/1/2024)
February 1, 2024 Filing 24 AMENDED COMPLAINT CORRECTED VERSION OF FIRST AMENDED against All Defendants. Filed by C. L., L. R., J. T.. (Lederman, Rachel) (Filed on 2/1/2024)
February 1, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER denying without prejudice #5 MOTION to Appoint Guardian ad Litem filed by C. L., #6 MOTION to Appoint Guardian ad Litem filed by E. J., #3 MOTION to Appoint Guardian Ad Litem ad Litem filed by L. R., #4 MOTION to Appoint Guardian ad Litem filed by J. T. Plaintiffs used the "motion" filing event, although the caption of the filing says "petition," and the body of the document presents a declaration under penalty of perjury. The declaration does not contain a wet signature of the declarant or an attestation pursuant to Civil Local Rule 5-1(i)(3). Plaintiffs shall ensure that the redacted or corrected versions of the applications to appoint guardians ad litem, which the Court previously ordered Plaintiffs file (see ECF No. 21), comply with all applicable Civil Local Rules. Signed by Judge Lisa J. Cisneros on 02/01/2024. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ljclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2024)
January 31, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER by Judge Lisa J. Cisneros: Plaintiffs' #14 First Amended Complaint includes the full names of minor plaintiffs in violation of Rule 5.2(a) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedures. That document is hereby SEALED sua sponte. Plaintiffs shall file a redacted or corrected version of their First Amended Complaint no later than February 7, 2024, which must be identical to the First Amended Complaint except to use only initials to identify any minors as required by Rule 5.2(a). That filing shall not change the deadline for Defendants' response as set by the parties' #19 Stipulation. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ljclc2, COURT STAFF).
January 31, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER by Judge Lisa J. Cisneros: Several filings early in this case (ECF Nos. 2 through 6 and 8 through 10) erroneously included full names of minors in violation of Rule 5.2(a) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. All are hereby SEALED. To complete the public record, Plaintiffs shall file redacted or corrected versions of all applications to appoint guardians ad litem and Mara Verheyden-Hilliard's pro hac vice application, no later than February 7, 2024. The original proposed summons has been superseded and need not be refiled. The Court will file redacted versions of ECF Nos. 9 and 10. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ljclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2024)
January 31, 2024 Filing 20 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO, Thomas Harvey, William Scott, Matt Sullivan.. (Schroeder, Margaret) (Filed on 1/31/2024)
January 31, 2024 Filing 19 STIPULATION Extending Deadline to File Responsive Pleading filed by CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO, Thomas Harvey, William Scott, Matt Sullivan. (Berdux, Sabrina) (Filed on 1/31/2024)
January 5, 2024 Filing 18 Summons Issued as to CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO, Thomas Harvey, William Scott, Matt Sullivan. (sfb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2024)
January 4, 2024 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Bobbie Fay Stein (Stein, Bobbie) (Filed on 1/4/2024)
January 3, 2024 Filing 16 Proposed Summons. (Lederman, Rachel) (Filed on 1/3/2024)
January 3, 2024 Filing 15 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by C. L., L. R., J. T... (Lederman, Rachel) (Filed on 1/3/2024)
January 3, 2024 Filing 14 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filed by C. L., L. R., J. T.. (Lederman, Rachel) (Filed on 1/3/2024) SEALED pursuant to Court order on 1/31/2024 (ljclc2, COURT STAFF).
January 3, 2024 Filing 13 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Plaintiff E.J., only by E. J. (Lederman, Rachel) (Filed on 1/3/2024)
January 3, 2024 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Gabriela M Lopez Arcos (Lopez Arcos, Gabriela) (Filed on 1/3/2024)
January 3, 2024 Filing 11 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: #http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 1/17/2024. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (bns, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2024)
December 20, 2023 #Electronic filing error.***NOTICE OT ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Rachel Lederman. The party information for plaintiffs have been modified for the following reason: plaintiffs are minors and only initial should appear on the docket.*** Re: #1 Complaint, filed by E. J., C. L., L. R., J. T. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2023)
December 20, 2023 #Electronic filing error. The proposed summons submitted does not list defendants to be served. This filing will not be processed by the clerks office. Please re-file the completed form in its entirety. Re: #2 Proposed Summons filed by L. R., E. J., J. T., C. L. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2023)
December 19, 2023 Filing 10 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 3/14/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/21/2024 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2023)
December 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order by Magistrate Judge Lisa J. Cisneros granting #8 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Mara Verheyden-Hilliard.(bns, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2023)
December 19, 2023 Filing 8 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 328, receipt number ACANDC-18954383.) filed by Eriberto Jimenez, Carmen Lopez, Lucy Rios, Jolina Tawasha. (Verheyden-Hilliard, Mara) (Filed on 12/19/2023)
December 19, 2023 Filing 7 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Lisa J. Cisneros. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 1/2/2024. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2023)
December 19, 2023 Filing 6 MOTION to Appoint Guardian ad Litem filed by E. J. (Lederman, Rachel) (Filed on 12/19/2023) Modified text on 12/20/2023 (dhm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 2/1/2024 (bns, COURT STAFF).
December 19, 2023 Filing 5 MOTION to Appoint Guardian ad Litem filed by C. L. (Lederman, Rachel) (Filed on 12/19/2023) Modified text on 12/20/2023 (dhm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 2/1/2024 (bns, COURT STAFF).
December 19, 2023 Filing 4 MOTION to Appoint Guardian ad Litem filed by J. T. (Lederman, Rachel) (Filed on 12/19/2023) Modified text on 12/20/2023 (dhm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 2/1/2024 (bns, COURT STAFF).
December 19, 2023 Filing 3 MOTION to Appoint Guardian Ad Litem ad Litem filed by L. R. (Lederman, Rachel) (Filed on 12/19/2023) Modified text on 12/20/2023 (dhm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 2/1/2024 (bns, COURT STAFF).
December 19, 2023 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Lederman, Rachel) (Filed on 12/19/2023)
December 19, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACANDC-18952594.). Filed by C. L., L. R., J. T., E. J. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lederman, Rachel) (Filed on 12/19/2023) Modified on 12/20/2023 (dhm, COURT STAFF). ***DOCUMENT LOCKED. PLAINTIFFS NAMED IN THE COMPLAINT ARE MINORS.***

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: J. et al v. City and County of San Francisco et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eriberto Jimenez
Represented By: Mara E Verheyden-Hilliard
Represented By: Rachel Lederman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lucy Rios
Represented By: Mara E Verheyden-Hilliard
Represented By: Rachel Lederman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carmen Lopez
Represented By: Mara E Verheyden-Hilliard
Represented By: Rachel Lederman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jolina Tawasha
Represented By: Mara E Verheyden-Hilliard
Represented By: Rachel Lederman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: E. J.
Represented By: Mara E Verheyden-Hilliard
Represented By: Rachel Lederman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: L. R.
Represented By: Gabriela M Lopez Arcos
Represented By: Mara E Verheyden-Hilliard
Represented By: Rachel Lederman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: C. L.
Represented By: Gabriela M Lopez Arcos
Represented By: Bobbie Fay Stein
Represented By: Mara E Verheyden-Hilliard
Represented By: Rachel Lederman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J. T.
Represented By: Gabriela M Lopez Arcos
Represented By: Mara E Verheyden-Hilliard
Represented By: Rachel Lederman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO
Represented By: Sabrina Michelle Berdux
Represented By: Margaret Strain Schroeder
Represented By: Zuzana S. Ikels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Scott
Represented By: Sabrina Michelle Berdux
Represented By: Margaret Strain Schroeder
Represented By: Zuzana S. Ikels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Harvey
Represented By: Margaret Strain Schroeder
Represented By: Zuzana S. Ikels
Represented By: Sabrina Michelle Berdux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matt Sullivan
Represented By: Sabrina Michelle Berdux
Represented By: Margaret Strain Schroeder
Represented By: Zuzana S. Ikels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?