T.H. v. Uber Technologies Inc. et al
Plaintiff: T. H.
Defendant: Uber Technologies Inc., Raiser L.L.C., Uber Health, LLC, ModivCare Inc., Raiser, LLC and ModivCare Solutions, LLC
Case Number: 3:2023cv06533
Filed: December 19, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Charles R Breyer
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Libel,Assault,Slander
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 13, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 13, 2024 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by T. H. re #12 Amended Complaint (London, Sarah) (Filed on 2/13/2024)
February 12, 2024 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by T. H. re #12 Amended Complaint (London, Sarah) (Filed on 2/12/2024)
February 7, 2024 Filing 16 Summons Issued as to ModivCare Solutions, LLC. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2024)
February 7, 2024 #Electronic filing error. A summons was issued on 12/07/2023 for defendant ModivCare Inc. The 12/07/2023 summons is still outstanding. This filing will not be processed by the clerks office. Re: #13 Proposed Summons filed by T. H. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2024)
February 6, 2024 Filing 15 Certificate of Interested Entities by T. H. (London, Sarah) (Filed on 2/6/2024)
February 6, 2024 Filing 14 Proposed Summons. (London, Sarah) (Filed on 2/6/2024)
February 6, 2024 Filing 13 Proposed Summons. (London, Sarah) (Filed on 2/6/2024)
February 6, 2024 Filing 12 AMENDED COMPLAINT against ModivCare Inc., Uber Health, LLC, Uber Technologies Inc., Rasier LLC, ModivCare Solutions, LLC. Filed by T. H.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Redlined Amended Complaint)(London, Sarah) (Filed on 2/6/2024)
December 19, 2023 Filing 11 Case transferred in from District of Illinois Northern; Case Number 1:23-cv-16502. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
December 19, 2023 Filing 10 TRANSFERRED to the Northern District of California the electronic record. (gcy, )
December 19, 2023 MDL 3084 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Illinois Northern, 1:23-cv-16502, T.H. v. Uber Technologies Inc. et al, Opened in California Northern District as 3:23-cv-06533-CRB pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order 6 cc: JPMDL (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2023)
December 18, 2023 Filing 9 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER from MDL Panel Transferring case to Northern District of California.(gcy, ) Modified on 12/19/2023 (gcy, ).
December 18, 2023 ***Civil Case Terminated. pursuant to MDL 3084 Conditional Transfer Order filed 12/18/23. (gcy, )
December 14, 2023 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of Service by Plaintiff T. H. regarding complaint #1 on Uber Technologies Inc. (Kaufman, Andrew)
December 14, 2023 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of Service by Plaintiff T. H. regarding complaint #1 on Uber Health, LLC (Kaufman, Andrew)
December 14, 2023 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of Service by Plaintiff T. H. regarding complaint #1 on Raiser, LLC (Kaufman, Andrew)
December 13, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE by T. H. of the filing of a Conditional Transfer Order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Conditional Transfer Order)(Kaufman, Andrew)
December 12, 2023 Filing 4 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Telephonic initial status hearing set for 2/1/2024 at 10:15 AM. To ensure public access to court proceedings, members of the public and media may call in to listen to telephonic hearings. The call-in number is (888) 557-8511 and the access code is 3547847. Counsel of record will receive an email 30 minutes prior to the start of the telephonic hearing with instructions to join the call. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court-issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. The parties are directed to meet and conduct a planning conference pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f). At least seven days before the initial status hearing, the parties shall file a joint written status report, not to exceed five pages in length. The initial status report shall provide the information described on the Court's website at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under District Judges, Judge Andrea R. Wood, Initial Status Conference. Mailed notice (lma, )
December 7, 2023 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants ModivCare Inc., Raiser, LLC, Uber Health, LLC, Uber Technologies Inc. (smb, )
December 5, 2023 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff T. H. by Andrew Richard Kaufman (Kaufman, Andrew)
December 5, 2023 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Kaufman, Andrew)
December 5, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by T. H.; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 405, receipt number AILNDC-21392175.(Kaufman, Andrew)
December 5, 2023 CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (lw, )
December 5, 2023 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Andrea R. Wood. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sheila M. Finnegan. Case assignment: Random assignment. (Civil Category Three). (lw, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: T.H. v. Uber Technologies Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: T. H.
Represented By: Andrew Richard Kaufman
Represented By: Sarah Robin London
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Uber Technologies Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raiser L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Uber Health, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ModivCare Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raiser, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ModivCare Solutions, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?