San Francisco Baykeeper v. United States Fish And Wildlife Service et al
Plaintiff: San Francisco Baykeeper
Defendant: United States Fish And Wildlife Service, Martha Williams and Deb Haaland
Case Number: 3:2023cv06601
Filed: December 22, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 16 U.S.C. ยง 1538 Endangered Species Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 5, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 9, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER re #21 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION For Extension Of Time To Respond To Plaintiff's Motion For Summary Judgment And Vacate Other Deadlines re #11 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Motion Hearing #11 MOTION for Summary Judgment set for 4/4/2024 at 9:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Responses due by 3/15/2024. Replies due by 3/22/2024. Initial Case Management Conference previously set for 3/21/2024 is reset to 5/23/2024 at 11:00 AM in San Francisco - Videoconference Only. Case Management Statement due by 5/16/2024. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/lb General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. Signed by Judge Laurel Beeler on 02/09/2024. (ejk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2024) Modified on 2/11/2024 (ejk, COURT STAFF).
February 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 23 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Deb Haaland, United States Fish And Wildlife Service, Martha Williams.. (Jose, Jacob) (Filed on 2/8/2024)
February 6, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 22 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #21 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION For Extension Of Time To Respond To Plaintiff's Motion For Summary Judgment And Vacate Other Deadlines re #11 MOTION for Summary Judgment ) filed bySan Francisco Baykeeper. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael R. Lozeau, #2 Proposed Order)(Lozeau, Michael) (Filed on 2/6/2024)
February 2, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION For Extension Of Time To Respond To Plaintiff's Motion For Summary Judgment And Vacate Other Deadlines re #11 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Deb Haaland, United States Fish And Wildlife Service, Martha Williams. Responses due by 2/6/2024. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order)(Jose, Jacob) (Filed on 2/2/2024)
February 2, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 20 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: #http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 2/9/2024. (ejk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2024)
February 2, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Jacob Jose (Jose, Jacob) (Filed on 2/2/2024)
February 1, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Proposed Order re #11 MOTION for Summary Judgment by San Francisco Baykeeper. (Lozeau, Michael) (Filed on 2/1/2024)
February 1, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Declaration of Jonathan A. Rosenfield in Support of #11 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed bySan Francisco Baykeeper. (Related document(s) #11 ) (Lozeau, Michael) (Filed on 2/1/2024)
February 1, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Declaration of Christina Swanson in Support of #11 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed bySan Francisco Baykeeper. (Related document(s) #11 ) (Lozeau, Michael) (Filed on 2/1/2024)
February 1, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Declaration of Robert Fairbank in Support of #11 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed bySan Francisco Baykeeper. (Related document(s) #11 ) (Lozeau, Michael) (Filed on 2/1/2024)
February 1, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Declaration of Sejal Choksi-Chugh in Support of #11 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed bySan Francisco Baykeeper. (Related document(s) #11 ) (Lozeau, Michael) (Filed on 2/1/2024)
February 1, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Request for Judicial Notice re #12 Declaration in Support, #11 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed bySan Francisco Baykeeper. (Related document(s) #12 , #11 ) (Lozeau, Michael) (Filed on 2/1/2024)
February 1, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Declaration of Michael R. Lozeau in Support of #11 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed bySan Francisco Baykeeper. (Related document(s) #11 ) (Lozeau, Michael) (Filed on 2/1/2024)
February 1, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by San Francisco Baykeeper. Motion for Summary Judgment Hearing set for 3/7/2024 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Responses due by 2/15/2024. Replies due by 2/22/2024. (Lozeau, Michael) (Filed on 2/1/2024)
January 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by San Francisco Baykeeper.. (Lozeau, Michael) (Filed on 1/5/2024)
January 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by San Francisco Baykeeper. Deb Haaland served on 1/3/2023, answer due 3/5/2023; United States Fish And Wildlife Service served on 1/3/2023, answer due 3/5/2023; Martha Williams served on 1/3/2023, answer due 3/5/2023. (Flynn, Brian) (Filed on 1/4/2024)
January 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by San Francisco Baykeeper. Deb Haaland served on 1/4/2023, answer due 3/5/2023; United States Fish And Wildlife Service served on 1/4/2023, answer due 3/5/2023; Martha Williams served on 1/4/2023, answer due 3/5/2023. (Flynn, Brian) (Filed on 1/4/2024)
January 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by San Francisco Baykeeper (Flynn, Brian) (Filed on 1/4/2024)
January 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by San Francisco Baykeeper (Flynn, Brian) (Filed on 1/4/2024)
January 4, 2024 Opinion or Order #Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. [err101]Please re-file in its entirety as Summons Returned Executed as to USA. Re: #6 Certificate of Service filed by San Francisco Baykeeper, #7 Certificate of Service filed by San Francisco Baykeeper (sfb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2024)
December 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Deb Haaland, United States Fish And Wildlife Service, Martha Williams, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (sfb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/26/2023)
December 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 3/14/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/21/2024 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor. (sfb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/26/2023)
December 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 1/5/2024. (cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2023)
December 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Lozeau, Michael) (Filed on 12/22/2023)
December 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against Deb Haaland, United States Fish And Wildlife Service, Martha Williams ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACANDC-18967539.). Filed by San Francisco Baykeeper. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lozeau, Michael) (Filed on 12/22/2023)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: San Francisco Baykeeper v. United States Fish And Wildlife Service et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: San Francisco Baykeeper
Represented By: Michael Robert Lozeau
Represented By: Brian Bamford Flynn
Represented By: Eric James Buescher
Represented By: Marcus Benjamin Eichenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Fish And Wildlife Service
Represented By: Jacob Jose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martha Williams
Represented By: Jacob Jose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deb Haaland
Represented By: Jacob Jose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?