Biederman et al v. FCA US LLC et al
Plaintiff: Frank Biederman, Carl Anders Troedsson, James Farinet, Brian Hocker, Brian Carrillo, Deepa Hayre and Fred Chapman
Defendant: FCA US LLC and Cummins, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2023cv06640
Filed: December 27, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Scott Corley
Referring Judge: Robert M Illman
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 16, 2024 Filing 39 MOTION to Relate Case filed by Brian Hocker, Brian Carrillo, Deepa Hayre, Fred Chapman. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Rosanne l. Mah in Support of Plaintiffs Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should be Related Pursuant to Civil Local Rules 3-12(b) AND 7-11, #2 Exhibit 1 - Hocker Complaint, #3 Exhibit 2 - Biederman Complaint, #4 Proposed Order)(Mah, Rosanne) (Filed on 2/16/2024) Modified on 2/20/2024 (slh, COURT STAFF).
February 15, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER by Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting #37 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Donald Ecklund. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/15/2024)
February 15, 2024 Filing 37 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice DONALD A. ECKLUND ( Filing fee $ 328, receipt number ACANDC-19129040.) filed by Frank Biederman, James Farinet, Carl Anders Troedsson. (Ecklund, Donald) (Filed on 2/15/2024)
February 15, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER by Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting #34 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Thomas Louis Azar, Jr. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/15/2024)
February 15, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER by Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting #33 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Stephen A. D'Aunoy. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/15/2024)
February 13, 2024 Filing 34 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 328, receipt number ACANDC-19122347.) filed by FCA US LLC. (Azar, Thomas) (Filed on 2/13/2024)
February 13, 2024 Filing 33 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 328, receipt number ACANDC-19122024.) filed by FCA US LLC. (D'Aunoy, Stephen) (Filed on 2/13/2024)
January 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER by Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting #31 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to James Cecchi. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2024)
January 29, 2024 Filing 31 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of JAMES E. CECCHI ( Filing fee $ 328, receipt number ACANDC-19068893.) filed by Frank Biederman, James Farinet, Carl Anders Troedsson. (Cecchi, James) (Filed on 1/29/2024)
January 26, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER by Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting #29 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Zachary A. Jacobs. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2024)
January 26, 2024 Filing 29 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Zachary A. Jacobs ( Filing fee $ 328, receipt number ACANDC-19061735.) filed by Frank Biederman, James Farinet, Carl Anders Troedsson. (Jacobs, Zachary) (Filed on 1/26/2024)
January 23, 2024 Filing 28 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint Pursuant to Civil L.R. 6-1 filed by Cummins, Inc.. (Lerner, Joshua) (Filed on 1/23/2024)
January 23, 2024 Filing 27 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Cummins, Inc. and Certification of Interested Entities or Persons (Lerner, Joshua) (Filed on 1/23/2024)
January 23, 2024 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua H. Lerner (Lerner, Joshua) (Filed on 1/23/2024)
January 18, 2024 Filing 25 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Frank Biederman, James Farinet, Carl Anders Troedsson. Cummins, Inc. served on 1/3/2024, answer due 1/24/2024. (Tellis, Roland) (Filed on 1/18/2024)
January 18, 2024 Filing 24 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Frank Biederman, James Farinet, Carl Anders Troedsson. FCA US LLC served on 1/3/2024, answer due 1/24/2024. (Tellis, Roland) (Filed on 1/18/2024)
January 18, 2024 Filing 23 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, filed by FCA US LLC. (Gilmer, Gregory) (Filed on 1/18/2024)
January 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER by Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting #20 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Dennis A. Lienhardt. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2024)
January 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER by Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting #19 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to E. Powell Miller. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2024)
January 12, 2024 Filing 20 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 328, receipt number ACANDC-19016324.) filed by Frank Biederman, James Farinet, Carl Anders Troedsson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Lienhardt, Dennis) (Filed on 1/12/2024)
January 12, 2024 Filing 19 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 328, receipt number ACANDC-19016304.) filed by Frank Biederman, James Farinet, Carl Anders Troedsson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Miller, E.) (Filed on 1/12/2024)
January 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER by Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting #17 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Hannah R. Lazarz. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2024)
January 11, 2024 Filing 17 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 328, receipt number ACANDC-19012739.) Filing fee previously paid on 1/11/2024 filed by Frank Biederman, James Farinet, Carl Anders Troedsson. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Lazarz, Hannah) (Filed on 1/11/2024)
January 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER by Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting #12 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to David Stellings. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2024)
January 4, 2024 Filing 15 CLERK'S NOTICE RESCHEDULING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Initial Case Management Conference is reset for 3/28/2024 at 1:30 p.m. before Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley by a Zoom webinar. Case Management Statement is due by 3/21/2024. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/jsc Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names must be sent to the CRD at JSCcrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than noon on 3/27/2024.General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2024)
January 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Robert M. Illman no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 1/4/2024. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(ark, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2024)
January 4, 2024 Filing 13 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (glm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2024)
January 3, 2024 Filing 12 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 328, receipt number ACANDC-18984957.) Filing fee previously paid on 1/3/2024 filed by Frank Biederman, James Farinet, Carl Anders Troedsson. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing - David Stellings)(Stellings, David) (Filed on 1/3/2024)
January 3, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Order by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Illman granting #8 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (rmilc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2024)
January 3, 2024 Filing 10 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Frank Biederman, James Farinet, Carl Anders Troedsson.. (Budner, Kevin) (Filed on 1/3/2024)
January 2, 2024 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Garth D Wojtanowicz (Wojtanowicz, Garth) (Filed on 1/2/2024)
January 2, 2024 Filing 8 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 328, receipt number ACANDC-18984251.) filed by Frank Biederman, James Farinet, Carl Anders Troedsson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Certificate of Good Standing))(Patterson, Jerrod) (Filed on 1/2/2024)
January 2, 2024 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Cummins, Inc. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/2/2024)
January 2, 2024 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to FCA US LLC. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/2/2024)
December 29, 2023 Filing 5 Proposed Summons. (Tellis, Roland) (Filed on 12/29/2023)
December 29, 2023 Filing 4 Proposed Summons. (Tellis, Roland) (Filed on 12/29/2023)
December 28, 2023 Filing 3 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 3/19/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/26/2024 02:00 PM in Federal Court Building, McKinleyville, CA 95519. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/28/2023)
December 28, 2023 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Robert M. Illman. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 1/11/2024. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/28/2023)
December 27, 2023 Filing 1 CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT AND JURY TRIAL DEMANDED against Inc. Cummins, FCA US LLC, (Filing Fee: $405.00, receipt number ACANDC-18974163). Filed by Frank Biederman, James Farinet, Carl Anders Troedsson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Tellis, Roland) (Filed on 12/27/2023) Modified on 12/28/2023 (tn, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Biederman et al v. FCA US LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank Biederman
Represented By: Roland Tellis
Represented By: Adam Tamburelli
Represented By: Christopher A. Seeger
Represented By: David Brian Fernandes
Represented By: David S Stellings
Represented By: Elizabeth J. Cabraser
Represented By: James E. Cecchi
Represented By: Kevin R. Budner
Represented By: Phong-Chau Gia Nguyen
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Dennis A. Lienhardt
Represented By: Donald A. Ecklund
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Represented By: Garth D Wojtanowicz
Represented By: Hannah Lazarz
Represented By: Jerrod C. Patterson
Represented By: Zachary Allen Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carl Anders Troedsson
Represented By: Roland Tellis
Represented By: Adam Tamburelli
Represented By: Christopher A. Seeger
Represented By: David Brian Fernandes
Represented By: David S Stellings
Represented By: Elizabeth J. Cabraser
Represented By: James E. Cecchi
Represented By: Kevin R. Budner
Represented By: Phong-Chau Gia Nguyen
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Dennis A. Lienhardt
Represented By: Donald A. Ecklund
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Represented By: Garth D Wojtanowicz
Represented By: Hannah Lazarz
Represented By: Jerrod C. Patterson
Represented By: Zachary Allen Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Farinet
Represented By: Elizabeth J. Cabraser
Represented By: James E. Cecchi
Represented By: Kevin R. Budner
Represented By: Phong-Chau Gia Nguyen
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Roland Tellis
Represented By: Adam Tamburelli
Represented By: Christopher A. Seeger
Represented By: David Brian Fernandes
Represented By: David S Stellings
Represented By: Dennis A. Lienhardt
Represented By: Donald A. Ecklund
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Represented By: Garth D Wojtanowicz
Represented By: Hannah Lazarz
Represented By: Jerrod C. Patterson
Represented By: Zachary Allen Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Hocker
Represented By: Rosanne L. Mah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Carrillo
Represented By: Rosanne L. Mah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deepa Hayre
Represented By: Rosanne L. Mah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fred Chapman
Represented By: Rosanne L. Mah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FCA US LLC
Represented By: Stephen A D'Aunoy
Represented By: Thomas Louis Azar, Jr.
Represented By: Gregory Paul Gilmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cummins, Inc.
Represented By: Joshua H. Lerner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?