King v. General Motors LLC
Plaintiff: Jacqueline King
Defendant: General Motors LLC
Case Number: 3:2024cv00040
Filed: January 3, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Susan Illston
Referring Judge: Sallie Kim
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Account Receivable
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 20, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS, WITH LEAVE TO AMEND granting #10 Motion to Dismiss. (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 2/20/2024)
February 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 18 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 2/5/2024. TRIAL ESTIMATE 7 DAYS (ec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2024)
February 5, 2024 Filing 17 Minute Entry for proceedings held via Zoom webinar before Judge Susan Illston: Initial Case Management Conference held on 2/2/2024. Joint Case Management Statement due by 5/3/2024. Courtesy Copy of Statement due by 5/6/2024. Further Case Management Conference set for 5/10/2024 at 03:00 PM - Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Public Hearing Zoom webinar.Mandatory Zoom registration: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names and emails must be sent to the CRD at sicrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than 5/1/2024 at 2 pm.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/si General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. Case Management Statement due by 5/3/2024. Further Case Management Conference set for 5/10/2024 03:00 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only.Total Time in Court: 10 Minutes. Court Reporter: Zoom Recording. Plaintiff Attorney: Ryan Marden. Defendant Attorney: Steven Park. (ec, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/5/2024)
January 30, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER TO APPEAR AT 2/2/2024 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/si Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names and emails must be sent to the CRD at sicrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than 1/31/2024 at 12 pm.General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. Status Conference set for 2/2/2024 11:30 AM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only before Judge Susan Illston.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 1/30/2024. (ec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2024)
January 24, 2024 Filing 15 REPLY (re #10 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint for Failure to State a Claim ) filed byGeneral Motors LLC. (Park, Steven) (Filed on 1/24/2024)
January 23, 2024 Filing 14 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #10 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint for Failure to State a Claim ) filed byJacqueline King. (Marden, Ryan) (Filed on 1/23/2024)
January 10, 2024 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by General Motors LLC (Park, Steven) (Filed on 1/10/2024)
January 10, 2024 Set/Reset Hearing re #10 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint for Failure to State a Claim Motion Hearing set for 2/23/2024 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 01, 17th Floor before Judge Susan Illston. (ec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2024)
January 9, 2024 Filing 12 Renotice motion hearing re #10 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint for Failure to State a Claim filed byGeneral Motors LLC. (Related document(s) #10 ) (Park, Steven) (Filed on 1/9/2024)
January 9, 2024 Filing 11 CLERK'S NOTICE TERMINATING MOTION HEARING DATE: The Motion to Dismiss #10 hearing set for 1/16/2024 is TERMINATED. Counsel are instructed to review the Judge's Scheduling Notes and Civil L.R. 7-2 and renotice the hearing for an appropriate date. The Briefing Schedule REMAINS UNCHANGED. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2024)
January 9, 2024 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint for Failure to State a Claim filed by General Motors LLC. Motion to Dismiss Hearing set for 1/16/2024 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 01, 17th Floor. Responses due by 1/23/2024. Replies due by 1/30/2024. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint, #2 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint, #3 Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint, #4 Proposed Order Granting Request for Judicial Notice)(Park, Steven) (Filed on 1/9/2024)
January 5, 2024 Filing 9 INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT GUIDELINE AND CLERK'S NOTICE ON REASSIGNMENT: Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/5/2024 02:30 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. Joint Case Management Statement due by 3/29/2024. (afm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2024)
January 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Susan Illston for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 1/5/2024. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(ark, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2024)
January 5, 2024 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (bxl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2024)
January 4, 2024 Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by General Motors LLC.. (Park, Steven) (Filed on 1/4/2024)
January 4, 2024 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 4/1/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/8/2024 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor. (mbc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2024)
January 3, 2024 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 1/17/2024. (ark, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2024)
January 3, 2024 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by General Motors LLC (Park, Steven) (Filed on 1/3/2024)
January 3, 2024 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by General Motors LLC identifying Corporate Parent General Motors Company, Corporate Parent General Motors Holdings LLC for General Motors LLC. (Park, Steven) (Filed on 1/3/2024)
January 3, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL of Entire Case from Sonoma County Superior Court. Their case number is 23CV01652. (Filing fee $405 receipt number ACANDC-18987144). Filed by General Motors LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Notice of Removal of Entire Case, #2 Exhibit B to Notice of Removal of Entire Case, #3 Declaration of Eric Mitchell in Support of Defendant General Motors LLC's Notice of Removal of Entire Case, #4 Exhibit A to Declaration of Eric Mitchell, #5 Exhibit B to Declaration of Eric Mitchell, #6 Exhibit C to Declaration of Eric Mitchell, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(Park, Steven) (Filed on 1/3/2024)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: King v. General Motors LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacqueline King
Represented By: Neal F. Morrow, III
Represented By: Ryan K. Marden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Motors LLC
Represented By: Steven D. Park
Represented By: John Robert Lawless, Jr.
Represented By: Vincent Frank Tremonti, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?