Keep America Safe and Beautiful v. Taylor Made Group, LLC et al
Plaintiff: KEEP AMERICA SAFE AND BEAUTIFUL
Defendant: TAYLOR MADE GROUP, LLC, LIPPERT COMPONENTS, INC. and DOES 1 to 10
Case Number: 3:2024cv00537
Filed: January 29, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Rita F Lin
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 22, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 22, 2024 Filing 16 REPLY (re #14 MOTION to Remand ACTION TO THE SUPERIOR COURT OF CALIFORNIA FOR THE COUNTY OF ALAMEDA; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF ) filed byKeep America Safe and Beautiful. (Manning, Joseph) (Filed on 3/22/2024)
March 15, 2024 Filing 15 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand (re #14 MOTION to Remand ACTION TO THE SUPERIOR COURT OF CALIFORNIA FOR THE COUNTY OF ALAMEDA; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF ) filed by Lippert Components, Inc., Taylor Made Group, LLC. (Fisher, Eric) (Filed on 3/15/2024)
March 1, 2024 Filing 14 MOTION to Remand ACTION TO THE SUPERIOR COURT OF CALIFORNIA FOR THE COUNTY OF ALAMEDA; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF filed by Keep America Safe and Beautiful. Motion Hearing set for 4/16/2024 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 15, 18th Floor before Judge Rita F. Lin. Responses due by 3/15/2024. Replies due by 3/22/2024. (Manning, Joseph) (Filed on 3/1/2024)
February 13, 2024 Filing 13 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE UPON REASSIGNMENT: Notice is hereby given that an Initial Case Management Conference is set before Judge Rita F. Lin upon reassignment. For a copy of Judge Lin's Standing Order and other information, please refer to the Court's website at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges/lin-rita-f-rfl/. Case Management Statement due by 5/1/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/8/2024 10:00 AM in San Francisco - Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges/lin-rita-f-rfl/General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(mkl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2024)
February 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Rita F. Lin for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Peter H Kang no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 2/12/2024. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(ark, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2024)
February 12, 2024 Filing 11 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (jaf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2024)
February 12, 2024 Filing 10 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Lippert Components, Inc., Taylor Made Group, LLC.. (Fisher, Eric) (Filed on 2/12/2024)
February 2, 2024 Filing 9 Answer to Removal Complaint by Lippert Components, Inc., Taylor Made Group, LLC. (Fisher, Eric) (Filed on 2/2/2024)
February 2, 2024 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Lippert Components, Inc., Taylor Made Group, LLC re #1 Notice of Removal, (Fisher, Eric) (Filed on 2/2/2024)
January 31, 2024 Filing 7 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 4/25/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/2/2024 10:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2024)
January 31, 2024 Filing 6 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Peter H Kang. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 2/14/2024. (kmg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2024)
January 30, 2024 Filing 5 Civil Cover Sheet by LIPPERT COMPONENTS, INC., TAYLOR MADE GROUP, LLC . (Fisher, Eric) (Filed on 1/30/2024)
January 30, 2024 #Electronic filing error. Resubmit Civil Cover Sheet. Use October 2020 form which can be downloaded from https://cand.uscourts.gov/. Submit your document using Civil Events > Other Filings > Other Documents > Civil Cover Sheet. No judge assignment will be made until the document is e-filed. This filing will not be processed by the clerks office.Please re-file in its entirety. Re: #1 Notice of Removal, filed by TAYLOR MADE GROUP, LLC, LIPPERT COMPONENTS, INC. (kmg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2024)
January 29, 2024 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Kristin Leigh Froehle (Froehle, Kristin) (Filed on 1/29/2024)
January 29, 2024 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by LIPPERT COMPONENTS, INC., TAYLOR MADE GROUP, LLC (Fisher, Eric) (Filed on 1/29/2024)
January 29, 2024 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric Seth Fisher (Fisher, Eric) (Filed on 1/29/2024)
January 29, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Alameda County Superior Court. Their case number is 23CV056349. (Filing fee $405 receipt number ACANDC-19069791). Filed by LIPPERT COMPONENTS, INC., TAYLOR MADE GROUP, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Fisher, Eric) (Filed on 1/29/2024)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Keep America Safe and Beautiful v. Taylor Made Group, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KEEP AMERICA SAFE AND BEAUTIFUL
Represented By: Joseph Richard Manning, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TAYLOR MADE GROUP, LLC
Represented By: Kristin Leigh Froehle
Represented By: Eric Seth Fisher
Represented By: Apryl Elizabeth Underwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LIPPERT COMPONENTS, INC.
Represented By: Kristin Leigh Froehle
Represented By: Eric Seth Fisher
Represented By: Apryl Elizabeth Underwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 to 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?