Alexander v. Hilton Hotels Worldwide
Plaintiff: Liam Alexander
Defendant: Hilton Hotels Worldwide
Case Number: 3:2024cv00830
Filed: February 12, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Thomas S Hixson
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question: Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 1, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2024 Filing 10 Mail Sent to Liam Alexander Returned as Undeliverable re #8 Clerk's Notice re: Consent or Declination. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2024)
April 1, 2024 Filing 9 SECOND CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 4/15/2024. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: #http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (Party/parties were also notified via telephone or email.) (Attachments: #1 Supplement Consent/Declination Form) (tshlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2024)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
March 5, 2024 Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 3/26/2024. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: #http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (Party/parties were also notified via telephone or email.) (tshlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2024)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
February 28, 2024 Filing 7 Acknowledgment of Receipt by U.S. Marshal re #6 Summons Issued (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2024)
February 23, 2024 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Hilton Hotels Worldwide. (Attachments: #1 USM-285 form)(slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2024)
February 23, 2024 Service packet delivered to the U.S. Marshals Post Box in the Clerks Office mailroom. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2024)
February 16, 2024 Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE RE: ECF REGISTRATION (tshlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2024)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
February 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER by Judge Thomas S. Hixson granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (tshlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2024)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
February 12, 2024 Filing 3 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 5/8/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/16/2024 at 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom E, 15th Floor. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order)(wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2024)
February 12, 2024 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Liam Alexander. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2024)
February 12, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Hilton Hotels Worldwide. IFPP. No process. Filed by Liam Alexander. Consent/Declination due by 2/26/2024. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Envelope)(wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2024)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alexander v. Hilton Hotels Worldwide
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Liam Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hilton Hotels Worldwide
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?