Mobile Data Technologies LLC v. Meta Platforms, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Mobile Data Technologies LLC
Defendant: Meta Platforms, Inc. and Meta Platforms Technologies, LLC
Case Number: 3:2024cv00896
Filed: February 14, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Referring Judge: Thomas S Hixson
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 12, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER by Judge William Alsup denying #105 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (afm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2024)
April 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER by Judge William Alsup denying #104 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (afm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2024)
April 11, 2024 Filing 105 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Brian T. Bear on behalf of Plaintiff Mobile Data Technologies LLC ( Filing fee $ 328, receipt number ACANDC-19312601.) filed by Mobile Data Technologies LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Bear, Brian) (Filed on 4/11/2024)
April 11, 2024 Filing 104 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Erick S. Robinson on behalf of Plaintiff Mobile Data Technologies LLC ( Filing fee $ 328, receipt number ACANDC-19312517.) filed by Mobile Data Technologies LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Robinson, Erick) (Filed on 4/11/2024)
April 11, 2024 Filing 103 NOTICE of Appearance by John V. Picone, III on behalf of Plaintiff Mobile Data Technologies LLC (Picone, John) (Filed on 4/11/2024)
March 4, 2024 Filing 102 CLERK'S NOTICE SCHEDULING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON REASSIGNMENT: Initial Case Management Conference reset for 6/13/2024 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 12, 19th Floor. Joint Case Management Statement due by 6/6/2024. Parties may download Judge Alsup's standing orders from the Court's webpage: https://cand.uscourts.gov/judges/alsup-william-wha/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (afm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2024)
February 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 101 NOTICE AND ORDER RE PROCEDURE FOR PATENT CASES. SIGNED BY JUDGE ALSUP. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/29/2024)
February 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge William Alsup for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Clerk on 02/29/2024. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(mbc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/29/2024)
February 28, 2024 Filing 99 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (rmm2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2024)
February 28, 2024 Filing 98 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Meta Platforms, Inc... (Keefe, Heidi) (Filed on 2/28/2024)
February 28, 2024 Filing 97 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Mobile Data Technologies LLC.. (Seitz, Michael) (Filed on 2/28/2024)
February 28, 2024 Filing 96 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Wayne Seitz (Seitz, Michael) (Filed on 2/28/2024)
February 14, 2024 Filing 95 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs/Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 2/28/2024. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: #http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (Party/parties were also notified via telephone or email.) (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tshlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2024)
February 14, 2024 Filing 94 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 5/9/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/16/2024 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom E, 15th Floor. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2024)
February 14, 2024 Filing 93 Case transferred in from District of Texas Western; Case Number 7:22-cv-00244. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
February 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER OVERRULING PLAINTIFF'S OBJECTIONS #84 Sealed Motion and ADOPTS #80 Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (je3)
January 23, 2024 Parties shall comply with Judge Albright's updated #Standing Order Governing Proceedings - Patent Cases available by clicking the hyperlink. (bot1)
January 17, 2024 Filing 91 Redacted Copy OF DEFENDANTS RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS OBJECTIONS TO AND MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF ORDER GRANTING METAS MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE of #87 Sealed Document, by Meta Platforms, Inc.. (Keefe, Heidi)
January 17, 2024 Filing 90 NOTICE of Filing Redacted Copy 88 by Mobile Data Technologies LLC (Robinson, Erick)
January 16, 2024 Filing 89 NOTICE TO SEAL [DKT 88] by Mobile Data Technologies LLC (Robinson, Erick)
January 9, 2024 Filing 87 Sealed Document: DEFENDANTS RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS OBJECTIONS TO AND MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF ORDER GRANTING METAS MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE of #84 Sealed Motion PLAINTIFFS OBJECTIONS TO AND MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF ORDER GRANTING METAS MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE [DKT. 80] by Mobile Data Technologies LLC by Meta Platforms, Inc. (Keefe, Heidi)
January 4, 2024 Filing 86 Proposed Order to #84 Sealed Motion PLAINTIFFS OBJECTIONS TO AND MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF ORDER GRANTING METAS MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE [DKT. 80] by Mobile Data Technologies LLC by Mobile Data Technologies LLC. (Robinson, Erick)
January 3, 2024 DEFICIENCY NOTICE: re #84 Sealed Motion. Please file a proposed order for the motion portion of this filing. (lad)
January 2, 2024 Filing 84 Sealed Motion PLAINTIFFS OBJECTIONS TO AND MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF #80 ORDER GRANTING METAS MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE by Mobile Data Technologies LLC. Referral Judge: Derek T. Gilliland. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Robinson, Erick) Modified to link on 1/3/2024 (lad).
December 19, 2023 Filing 82 NOTICE of Intent to Object to and Move to Reconsider Transfer Order (Dkt 80) by Mobile Data Technologies LLC re #80 Sealed Order, (Robinson, Erick)
December 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER Cancelling Markman Hearing Via Zoom. Signed by Judge Derek T. Gilliland. (je3)
December 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Text Order MOOTING #66 Opposed Motion for Live Hearing on Defendant's Motion to Transfer Venue to the Northern District of California. The Court held a hearing on the transfer motion via Zoom on Tuesday, December 12, 2023, at 03:30 PM. ECF No. 77. Entered by Judge Derek T. Gilliland. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jplc)
December 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 83 PUBLIC VERSION of ECF No. 80, Order Granting Motion to Transfer Venue re 19. Signed by Judge Derek T. Gilliland. (kg)
December 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 80 Sealed Order Granting Motion to Transfer Venue re #85 (via motion for leave at #19 ) The Movant shall email a redacted PDF version of the Court's sealed order for publication within seven (7) days after the Court enters the sealed order to the Court's Law Clerks at txwdml_nojudge_chambers_wa_judgegilliland@txwd.uscourts.gov. If a redacted version is not received, the document will otherwise become public.. Signed by Judge Derek T. Gilliland. (je3) Modified on 12/19/2023 per Judge's chambers (je3). Modified to update link to sealed motion on 1/4/2024 (lad).
December 13, 2023 Filing 79 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Meta Platforms, Inc. for proceedings held on 12/12/2023. Proceedings Transcribed: Motion Hearing. Court Reporter: Lily Reznik. (Keefe, Heidi)
December 13, 2023 Filing 78 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST Written by Mobile Data Technologies LLC for proceedings held on 12/12/2023. Proceedings Transcribed: Motion Hearing. Court Reporter: Lily Reznik. (Robinson, Erick)
December 12, 2023 Filing 77 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Derek T. Gilliland: Sealed Motion Hearing held on 12/12/2023. Case called for a Sealed Motions Hearing via Zoom. Parties announced ready. Statements and arguments of counsel heard. Opposed Motion to Transfer Case to Northern District of California #85 sealed/ #20 redacted is TAKEN UNDER ADVISEMENT. Order to follow. Hearing concluded. (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.). (Court Reporter Lily Reznik.)(je3) Modified to add text on 1/3/2024 (lad).Modified to update link to sealed motion on 1/4/2024 (lad).
December 8, 2023 Filing 76 NOTICE OF INTER PARTES REVIEW FILINGS by Mobile Data Technologies LLC (Robinson, Erick)
November 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER RESETTING MOTIONS HEARING VIA ZOOM on #85 Opposed MOTION to Transfer Case to the Northern District of California : Motion Hearing set via zoom for 12/12/2023 03:30 PM before Judge Derek T. Gilliland. Signed by Judge Derek T. Gilliland. (je3) Modified to update link to sealed motion on 1/4/2024 (lad).
November 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER SETTING MOTIONS HEARING VIA ZOOM on #85 Opposed MOTION to Transfer Case to the Northern District of California : Motion Hearing set via zoom for 12/6/2023 03:30 PM before Judge Derek T. Gilliland. Signed by Judge Derek T. Gilliland. (je3) Modified to update link to sealed motion on 1/4/2024 (lad).
November 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER GRANTING #69 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Jayme Partridge for Mobile Data Technologies LLC. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Registration is managed by the PACER Service Center. Signed by Judge Derek T. Gilliland. (ad3)
November 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER GRANTING #34 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Austin Ciuffo for Mobile Data Technologies LLC. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Registration is managed by the PACER Service Center. Signed by Judge Derek T. Gilliland. (ad3)
November 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER RESETTING Zoom Markman Hearing for 12/21/2023 09:30 AM before Judge Derek T. Gilliland. Signed by Judge Derek T. Gilliland. (bot1)
November 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER Setting Zoom Markman Hearing for 12/6/2023 02:30 PM before Judge Derek T. Gilliland. Signed by Judge Derek T. Gilliland. (bot2)
November 3, 2023 Filing 69 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Erick Scott Robinson (on behalf of Jayme Partridge) ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ATXWDC-18062385) by on behalf of Mobile Data Technologies LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Derek T. Gilliland. (Robinson, Erick)
November 2, 2023 Filing 68 Redacted Copy Plaintiff's Sur-Reply in Further Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Transfer Venue to the Northern District of California of #65 Sealed Document by Mobile Data Technologies LLC. (Robinson, Erick)
October 31, 2023 Filing 67 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Meta Platforms, Inc., re #66 Opposed MOTION for Hearing re #85 Opposed MOTION to Transfer Case to the Northern District of California [Motion for Live In-Person Hearing on Transfer Motion] filed by Plaintiff Mobile Data Technologies LLC (Stameshkin, Elizabeth) Modified to update link to sealed motion on 1/4/2024 (lad).
October 31, 2023 Filing 66 Opposed MOTION for Hearing re #85 Opposed MOTION to Transfer Case to the Northern District of California [Motion for Live In-Person Hearing on Transfer Motion] by Mobile Data Technologies LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Derek T. Gilliland. (Robinson, Erick) Modified to update link to sealed motion on 1/4/2024 (lad).
October 24, 2023 Reset Hearings per order #64 : Pretrial Conference set for 10/14/2024 before Judge Alan D Albright, Jury Selection set for 11/4/2024 08:00AM before Judge Derek T. Gilliland, Jury Trial set for 11/4/2024 08:00 AM before Judge Alan D Albright. (lad)
October 24, 2023 Filing 65 Sealed Document: Plaintiff's Sur-Reply in Opposition to Motion to Transfer of #52 Sealed Document,,,,,,,,,,, by Mobile Data Technologies LLC (Robinson, Erick)
October 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER GRANTING #63 Motion to Extend Scheduling Order Deadlines Amended Pleadings due by 2/20/2024, Joinder of Parties due by 12/12/2023, Motions due by 8/6/2024, Markman hearing by 11/14/2023. Signed by Judge Derek T. Gilliland. (je3)
October 23, 2023 Filing 63 Joint MOTION to Extend Scheduling Order Deadlines by Mobile Data Technologies LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Derek T. Gilliland. (Robinson, Erick)
October 19, 2023 Filing 62 Redacted Copy DEFENDANTS REPLY IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE TO THE NORTHERN DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA of #56 Sealed Document, by Meta Platforms, Inc.. (Keefe, Heidi)
October 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER GRANTING #60 Motion for Leave to File Signed by Judge Derek T. Gilliland. (je3)
October 17, 2023 Filing 60 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply in Opposition to Motion to Transfer by Mobile Data Technologies LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Derek T. Gilliland. (Robinson, Erick)
October 13, 2023 Filing 59 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brian Gregory Strand on behalf of Mobile Data Technologies LLC. Attorney Brian Gregory Strand added to party Mobile Data Technologies LLC(pty:pla) (Strand, Brian)
October 12, 2023 Filing 58 NOTICE OF ADDITIONAL UNSEALED EXHIBIT TO THE DECLARATION OF ELIZABETH L. STAMESHKIN IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS REPLY IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE TO THE NORTHERN DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA by Meta Platforms, Inc. re #57 Sealed Document,, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 86)(Keefe, Heidi)
October 12, 2023 Filing 57 Sealed Document: DECLARATION OF ELIZABETH L. STAMESHKIN IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS REPLY IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE TO THE NORTHERN DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA of #56 Sealed Document, by Meta Platforms, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 68, #2 Exhibit 69, #3 Exhibit 70, #4 Exhibit 71, #5 Exhibit 72, #6 Exhibit 73, #7 Exhibit 74, #8 Exhibit 75, #9 Exhibit 76, #10 Exhibit 77, #11 Exhibit 78, #12 Exhibit 79, #13 Exhibit 80, #14 Exhibit 81, #15 Exhibit 82, #16 Exhibit 83, #17 Exhibit 84, #18 Exhibit 85, #19 Exhibit 87, #20 Exhibit 88, #21 Exhibit 89, #22 Exhibit 90) (Keefe, Heidi)
October 12, 2023 Filing 56 Sealed Document: DEFENDANTS REPLY IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE TO THE NORTHERN DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA of #85 Opposed MOTION to Transfer Case to the Northern District of California by Meta Platforms, Inc. (Keefe, Heidi) Modified to update link to sealed motion on 1/4/2024 (lad).
September 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER GRANTING #54 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #54 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Reply Brief re Motion to Transfer Venue Signed by Judge Derek T. Gilliland. (je3)
September 26, 2023 Filing 54 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Reply Brief re Motion to Transfer Venue by Meta Platforms, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Derek T. Gilliland. (Morton, Phillip)
September 22, 2023 Filing 53 Redacted Copy PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE TO THE NORTHERN DISTRICT OF CALIFONRIA of #52 Sealed Document,,,,,,,,,,, by Mobile Data Technologies LLC. (Robinson, Erick)
September 14, 2023 Filing 52 Sealed Document: PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE TO THE NORTHERN DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA by Mobile Data Technologies LLC (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Brian Bear, #2 Affidavit Declaration of Erick Robinson, #3 Affidavit Declaration of Patrick Dunn, #4 Exhibit 1, #5 Exhibit 2, #6 Exhibit 3, #7 Exhibit 4, #8 Exhibit 5, #9 Exhibit 6, #10 Exhibit 7, #11 Exhibit 8, #12 Exhibit 9, #13 Exhibit 10, #14 Exhibit 11, #15 Exhibit 12, #16 Exhibit 13, #17 Exhibit 14, #18 Exhibit 15, #19 Exhibit 16, #20 Exhibit 17, #21 Exhibit 18, #22 Exhibit 19, #23 Exhibit 20, #24 Exhibit 21, #25 Exhibit 22, #26 Exhibit 23, #27 Exhibit 24, #28 Exhibit 25, #29 Exhibit 26, #30 Exhibit 27, #31 Exhibit 28, #32 Exhibit 29, #33 Exhibit 30, #34 Exhibit 31, #35 Exhibit 32, #36 Exhibit 33, #37 Exhibit 34, #38 Exhibit 35, #39 Exhibit 36, #40 Exhibit 37, #41 Exhibit 38, #42 Exhibit 39, #43 Exhibit 40, #44 Exhibit 41, #45 Exhibit 42, #46 Exhibit 43, #47 Exhibit 44, #48 Exhibit 45, #49 Exhibit 46, #50 Exhibit 47, #51 Exhibit 48, #52 Exhibit 49, #53 Exhibit 50, #54 Exhibit 51, #55 Exhibit 52, #56 Exhibit 53, #57 Exhibit 54, #58 Exhibit 55, #59 Exhibit 56, #60 Exhibit 57, #61 Exhibit 58, #62 Exhibit 59, #63 Exhibit 60, #64 Exhibit 61, #65 Exhibit 62, #66 Exhibit 63, #67 Exhibit 64, #68 Exhibit 65, #69 Exhibit 66, #70 Exhibit 67, #71 Exhibit 68, #72 Exhibit 69, #73 Exhibit 70, #74 Exhibit 71, #75 Exhibit 72, #76 Exhibit 73, #77 Exhibit 74, #78 Exhibit 75, #79 Exhibit 76, #80 Exhibit 77, #81 Exhibit 78, #82 Exhibit 79, #83 Exhibit 80, #84 Exhibit 81, #85 Exhibit 82, #86 Exhibit 83, #87 Exhibit 84, #88 Exhibit 85, #89 Exhibit 86, #90 Exhibit 87, #91 Exhibit 88, #92 Exhibit 89, #93 Exhibit 90, #94 Exhibit 91, #95 Exhibit 92, #96 Exhibit 93, #97 Exhibit 94, #98 Exhibit 95, #99 Exhibit 96, #100 Exhibit 97, #101 Exhibit 98, #102 Exhibit 99, #103 Exhibit 100, #104 Exhibit 101, #105 Exhibit 102, #106 Exhibit 103, #107 Exhibit 104, #108 Exhibit 105, #109 Exhibit 106, #110 Exhibit 107, #111 Exhibit 108, #112 Exhibit 109, #113 Exhibit 110, #114 Exhibit 111, #115 Exhibit 112, #116 Exhibit 113, #117 Exhibit 114, #118 Exhibit 115, #119 Exhibit 116, #120 Exhibit 117, #121 Exhibit 118, #122 Exhibit 119, #123 Exhibit 120, #124 Exhibit 121, #125 Exhibit 122, #126 Exhibit 123, #127 Exhibit 124, #128 Exhibit 125, #129 Exhibit 126) (Robinson, Erick)
September 13, 2023 Filing 51 Joint Claim Construction Brief or Statement by Mobile Data Technologies LLC. (Robinson, Erick)
September 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER GRANTING #49 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Derek T. Gilliland. (je3)
September 13, 2023 Filing 49 Agreed MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation for Venue Briefing by Mobile Data Technologies LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Derek T. Gilliland. (Robinson, Erick)
September 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER GRANTING #47 Motion to Extend Scheduling Order Deadlines. Signed by Judge Derek T. Gilliland. (je3)
September 11, 2023 Filing 47 Unopposed MOTION to Extend Scheduling Order Deadlines Related to Venue Briefing (1-Day) by Mobile Data Technologies LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Derek T. Gilliland. (Robinson, Erick)
September 8, 2023 Filing 46 Reply Claim Construction Brief by Mobile Data Technologies LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16)(Robinson, Erick)
August 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER ON DISCOVERY DISPUTE. Signed by Judge Derek T. Gilliland. (je3)
August 28, 2023 Filing 44 BRIEF Reply Claim Construction Brief regarding #33 Claim Construction Brief,, by Meta Platforms, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Elizabeth L. Stameshkin, #2 Exhibit 25, #3 Exhibit 26)(Keefe, Heidi)
August 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER GRANTING #42 Motion to Extend Scheduling Order Deadlines Signed by Judge Derek T. Gilliland. (je3)
August 23, 2023 Filing 42 Agreed MOTION to Extend Scheduling Order Deadlines RELATED TO VENUE DISCOVERY AND RELATED DEADLINES by Mobile Data Technologies LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Derek T. Gilliland. (Robinson, Erick)
August 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER ON DISCOVERY DISPUTE. Signed by Judge Derek T. Gilliland. (je3)
August 14, 2023 Filing 40 Reply Claim Construction Brief by Mobile Data Technologies LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20)(Robinson, Erick)
August 14, 2023 Filing 39 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Danielle Joy Healey on behalf of Mobile Data Technologies LLC. Attorney Danielle Joy Healey added to party Mobile Data Technologies LLC(pty:pla) (Healey, Danielle)
August 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER GRANTING #37 Motion to Extend Scheduling Order Deadlines Signed by Judge Derek T. Gilliland. (je3)
August 11, 2023 Filing 37 Unopposed MOTION to Extend Scheduling Order Deadlines RELATED TO CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEFING SCHEDULE by Mobile Data Technologies LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Derek T. Gilliland. (Robinson, Erick)
August 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER GRANTING #35 AGREED MOTIONFOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO THE END OF VENUE DISCOVERY AND RELATED DEADLINES. Signed by Judge Derek T. Gilliland. (je3)
August 7, 2023 Filing 35 Agreed MOTION to Extend Scheduling Order Deadlines RELATED TO VENUE DISCOVERY AND RELATED DEADLINES by Mobile Data Technologies LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Derek T. Gilliland. (Robinson, Erick)
August 2, 2023 Filing 34 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Erick Scott Robinson of AUSTIN CIUFFO ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ATXWDC-17729291) by on behalf of Mobile Data Technologies LLC.. Motions referred to Judge Derek T. Gilliland. (Robinson, Erick)
July 21, 2023 Filing 33 Opening Claim Construction Brief by Meta Platforms, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Elizabeth L. Stameshkin, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit 18, #20 Exhibit 19, #21 Exhibit 20, #22 Exhibit 21, #23 Exhibit 22, #24 Exhibit 23, #25 Exhibit 24)(Keefe, Heidi)
June 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER GRANTING #30 Motion for Extension of Time to Amend #30 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend Venue Discovery and Related Deadlines. Signed by Judge Derek T. Gilliland. (kg)
June 29, 2023 Filing 31 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brian Medich on behalf of Mobile Data Technologies LLC. Attorney Brian Medich added to party Mobile Data Technologies LLC(pty:pla) (Medich, Brian)
June 29, 2023 Filing 30 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend Venue Discovery and Related Deadlines by Mobile Data Technologies LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Derek T. Gilliland. (Robinson, Erick)
June 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Alan D Albright for all proceedings. Judge David Counts no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge David Counts. (je3)
May 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER GRANTING #27 Motion to Extend Scheduling Order Deadlines Signed by Judge Derek T. Gilliland. (je3)
May 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #26 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Brian T. Bear. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. It is further ORDERED that if Mr. Bear has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Court Rule AT-1(f)(2). Registration is managed by the PACER Service Center entered by Judge Derek T. Gilliland. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mslc)
May 26, 2023 Filing 27 Joint MOTION to Extend Scheduling Order Deadlines by Mobile Data Technologies LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Amended Scheduling Order). Motions referred to Judge Derek T. Gilliland. (Robinson, Erick)
May 24, 2023 Filing 26 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Erick Scott Robinson of BRIAN T. BEAR ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ATXWDC-17476895) by on behalf of Mobile Data Technologies LLC.. Motions referred to Judge Derek T. Gilliland. (Robinson, Erick)
May 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Text Order DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE #22 Motion for Discovery entered by Judge Derek T. Gilliland. After careful consideration, the Motion is DENIED without prejudice and the Parties are ORDERED to meet and confer regarding expansion of discovery limits.(This is a text-only entry generated by the court. If a dispute still exists, the parties may submit a dispute char to the law clerk. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mslc)
May 2, 2023 Filing 25 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Meta Platforms, Inc., re #22 MOTION for Discovery Motion to Enlarge Venue Discovery filed by Plaintiff Mobile Data Technologies LLC (Keefe, Heidi)
April 26, 2023 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Derek T. Gilliland. Referral Judge: Derek T. Gilliland. (je3)
April 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER and ADVISORY. Signed by Judge David Counts. (je3)
April 25, 2023 Filing 23 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Deron R Dacus on behalf of Meta Platforms, Inc.. Attorney Deron R Dacus added to party Meta Platforms, Inc.(pty:dft) (Dacus, Deron)
April 25, 2023 Filing 22 MOTION for Discovery Motion to Enlarge Venue Discovery by Mobile Data Technologies LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Estes, Andrew)
April 17, 2023 Filing 21 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Elizabeth L. Stameshkin on behalf of Meta Platforms, Inc.. Attorney Elizabeth L. Stameshkin added to party Meta Platforms, Inc.(pty:dft) (Stameshkin, Elizabeth)
April 14, 2023 Filing 85 Sealed Motion filed: DEFENDANTS OPPOSED MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE TO THE NORTHERN DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA (Attachments: #1 DECLARATION OF NICHOLAS WONG with sealed exhibits, #2 DECLARATION OF ELIZABETH L. STAMESHKIN with sealed exhibits). Redacted copy and public exhibits filed at #20 . Referral Judge: Derek T. Gilliland. (lad)
April 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #19 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document. It is ORDERED that the Transfer Motion, the Declaration of Nicholas Wong and Exhibits A-K thereto, and the Declaration of Elizabeth L. Stameshkin and Exhibits 2-4, 24-29, 32, 34, 36, 55, 66, and 67 thereto should remain under seaL. entered by Judge David Counts. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (db)
April 13, 2023 Filing 20 Redacted copy and public exhibits to #85 Opposed MOTION to Transfer Case to the Northern District of California by Meta Platforms, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Elizabeth L. Stameshkin, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 5, #4 Exhibit 6, #5 Exhibit 7, #6 Exhibit 8, #7 Exhibit 9, #8 Exhibit 10, #9 Exhibit 11, #10 Exhibit 12, #11 Exhibit 13, #12 Exhibit 14, #13 Exhibit 15, #14 Exhibit 16, #15 Exhibit 17, #16 Exhibit 18, #17 Exhibit 19, #18 Exhibit 20, #19 Exhibit 21, #20 Exhibit 22, #21 Exhibit 23, #22 Exhibit 30, #23 Exhibit 31, #24 Exhibit 33, #25 Exhibit 35, #26 Exhibit 37, #27 Exhibit 38, #28 Exhibit 39, #29 Exhibit 40, #30 Exhibit 41, #31 Exhibit 42, #32 Exhibit 43, #33 Exhibit 44, #34 Exhibit 45, #35 Exhibit 46, #36 Exhibit 47, #37 Exhibit 48, #38 Exhibit 49, #39 Exhibit 50, #40 Exhibit 51, #41 Exhibit 52, #42 Exhibit 53, #43 Exhibit 54, #44 Exhibit 56, #45 Exhibit 57, #46 Exhibit 58, #47 Exhibit 59, #48 Exhibit 60, #49 Exhibit 61, #50 Exhibit 62, #51 Exhibit 63, #52 Exhibit 64, #53 Exhibit 65, #54 Proposed Order)(Keefe, Heidi) Modified to add redaction info on 1/4/2024 (lad).
April 13, 2023 Filing 19 Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: #1 Sealed Exhibit 1, #2 Sealed Exhibit 2, #3 Sealed Exhibit 3, #4 Proposed Order) (Keefe, Heidi)
April 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #18 Elizabeth L. Stameshkin's Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice Pro Hac Vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our Court within 10 days of this Order. Registration is managed by the PACER Service Center. It is further ORDERED that if Ms. Stameshkin has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Court Rule AT-1(f)(2). Entered by Judge David Counts. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (db)
April 12, 2023 Filing 18 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Elizabeth L. Stameshkin ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ATXWDC-17308959) by on behalf of Meta Platforms, Inc.. (Stameshkin, Elizabeth)
March 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 FINAL ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO DEFENDANT META PLATFORMS TECHNOLOGIES, LLC. Signed by Judge David Counts. (je3)
March 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 SCHEDULING ORDER: Pretrial Conference set for 10/4/2024 01:30 PM in Midland before Judge David Counts, Jury Selection/Jury Trial set for 11/4/2024 08:00 AM in Midland before Judge David Counts, Markman Hearing set for 8/31/2023 01:30 PM in Midland before Judge David Counts, Amended Pleadings due by 12/20/2023, Joinder of Parties due by 10/11/2023. Signed by Judge David Counts. (je3)
March 14, 2023 Filing 15 STIPULATION of Dismissal WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF META PLATFORMS TECHNOLOGIES, LLC by Mobile Data Technologies LLC. (Robinson, Erick)
March 14, 2023 Filing 14 Proposed Scheduling Order by Mobile Data Technologies LLC. (Robinson, Erick)
February 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Order for Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order. Scheduling recommendations/proposed scheduling order due to the Court within sixty (60) days after the appearance of any defendant. Signed by Judge David Counts. (je3)
February 10, 2023 Filing 12 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Andrew Harper Estes on behalf of Mobile Data Technologies LLC. Attorney Andrew Harper Estes added to party Mobile Data Technologies LLC(pty:pla) (Estes, Andrew)
February 10, 2023 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Meta Platforms Technologies, LLC, Meta Platforms, Inc..(Keefe, Heidi)
February 9, 2023 Filing 10 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Heidi L. Keefe on behalf of Phillip E. Morton ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ATXWDC-17065751) by on behalf of Meta Platforms Technologies, LLC, Meta Platforms, Inc.. (Keefe, Heidi)
February 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #10 Phillip E. Morton's Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our Court within 10 days of this Order. Registration is managed by the PACER Service Center. It is further ORDERED that if Mr. Morton has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Court Rule AT-1(f)(2). Entered by Judge David Counts. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (db)
February 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #9 Andrew W. Lester's Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice Pro Hac Vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our Court within 10 days of this Order. Registration is managed by the PACER Service Center. It is further ORDERED that if Mr. Lester has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Court Rule AT-1(f)(2). Entered by Judge David Counts. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (db)
February 3, 2023 Filing 9 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Erick Scott Robinson of Andrew Lester ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ATXWDC-17044566) by on behalf of Mobile Data Technologies LLC. (Robinson, Erick)
December 27, 2022 Reset Deadlines: Meta Platforms Technologies, LLC answer due 2/10/2023; Meta Platforms, Inc. answer due 2/10/2023. (sg)
December 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #6 Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File an Answer or Otherwise Plead to Plaintiff's Original Complaint. It is ORDERED that Defendants Meta Platforms, Inc., and Meta Platforms Technologies, LLC shall have until February 10, 2023, to respond to Plaintiffs Original Complaint. It is so ORDERED. Entered by Judge David Counts. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (db)
December 21, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Heidi L. Keefe on behalf of Meta Platforms Technologies, LLC, Meta Platforms, Inc.. Attorney Heidi L. Keefe added to party Meta Platforms Technologies, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Heidi L. Keefe added to party Meta Platforms, Inc.(pty:dft) (Keefe, Heidi)
December 21, 2022 Filing 7 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Meta Platforms Technologies, LLC, Meta Platforms, Inc.. (Keefe, Heidi)
December 21, 2022 Filing 6 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer And/Or Respond to the Complaint by Meta Platforms Technologies, LLC, Meta Platforms, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Keefe, Heidi)
December 7, 2022 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mobile Data Technologies LLC. All Defendants. (Robinson, Erick)
November 30, 2022 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Meta Platforms Technologies, LLC, Meta Platforms, Inc. (sg)
November 23, 2022 Case assigned to Judge David Counts to the Order Assigning Business of the Court as it Relates to Patent Cases, filed 7/25/2022. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (sg) Modified on 12/2/2022 (sg).
November 23, 2022 Filing 3 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Robinson, Erick)
November 23, 2022 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Mobile Data Technologies LLC. (Robinson, Erick)
November 23, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXWDC-16785806), filed by Mobile Data Technologies LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L)(Robinson, Erick)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mobile Data Technologies LLC v. Meta Platforms, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mobile Data Technologies LLC
Represented By: Brian Medich
Represented By: Brian Gregory Strand
Represented By: Danielle Joy Healey
Represented By: Andrew W. Lester
Represented By: Billy Blue Hyatt
Represented By: Brian T. Bear
Represented By: Kevin S. Tuttle
Represented By: Kyle L. Elliott
Represented By: Lisa K. Hooper
Represented By: Patrick M. Dunn
Represented By: Andrew Harper Estes
Represented By: Austin Ciuffo
Represented By: Jayme Partridge
Represented By: Erick Scott Robinson
Represented By: John V. Picone, III
Represented By: Michael Wayne Seitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meta Platforms, Inc.
Represented By: Heidi L. Keefe
Represented By: Phillip E. Morton
Represented By: Deron R Dacus
Represented By: Elizabeth L. Stameshkin
Represented By: Heidi Lyn Keefe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meta Platforms Technologies, LLC
Represented By: Heidi L. Keefe
Represented By: Phillip E. Morton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?