Jacobs et al v. Julianna's Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Bruce I. Jacobs and Rosalind S. Jacobs
Defendant: Juliana's Inc., Commerce & Industry Insurance Company and Julianna's Inc.
Case Number: 3:2024cv00897
Filed: February 14, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Thomas S Hixson
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 9, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 10, 2024 Filing 18 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Julianna's Inc.. (Slater, Mark) (Filed on 4/10/2024)
April 3, 2024 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Bruce I. Jacobs, Rosalind S. Jacobs re #15 Order - Notice Re: Default Judgment Procedure - (Bailey, Daniel) (Filed on 4/3/2024)
April 3, 2024 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Bruce I. Jacobs, Rosalind S. Jacobs re #15 Order - Notice Re: Default Judgment Procedure - (Bailey, Daniel) (Filed on 4/3/2024)
April 1, 2024 Filing 15 NOTICE RE: DEFAULT JUDGMENT PROCEDURE. Signed by Judge Thomas S. Hixson on 4/1/2024. (tshlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2024)
April 1, 2024 Filing 14 Clerk's Notice: DEFAULT ENTERED as to defendants Julianna's Inc., and Commerce & Industry Insurance Company. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (Related documents(s) #13 )(slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2024)
March 22, 2024 Filing 13 MOTION for Entry of Default - Application for Entry of Default Against Defendants Julianna's Inc., and Commerce & Industry Insurance Company, pursuant to Rule 55(a) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure - filed by Bruce I. Jacobs, Rosalind S. Jacobs. (Bailey, Daniel) (Filed on 3/22/2024)
February 22, 2024 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Bruce I. Jacobs, Rosalind S. Jacobs re #1 Complaint - Proof of Service on Julianna's Inc. - (Bailey, Daniel) (Filed on 2/22/2024)
February 22, 2024 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Bruce I. Jacobs, Rosalind S. Jacobs re #1 Complaint - Proof of Service on Commerce & Industry Insurance Company - (Bailey, Daniel) (Filed on 2/22/2024)
February 16, 2024 Filing 10 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Bruce I. Jacobs, Rosalind S. Jacobs.. (Bailey, Daniel) (Filed on 2/16/2024)
February 16, 2024 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE re: ECF No. #8 . The consent/declination form is signed by counsel but does not indicate the party/parties in the space under counsel's signature - COUNSEL FOR (OR "PRO SE"). Counsel is directed to file a revised consent/declination form by 2/23/2024 that includes the name(s) of the party/parties counsel represents. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tshlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2024)
February 16, 2024 Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Bruce I. Jacobs, Rosalind S. Jacobs.. (Bailey, Daniel) (Filed on 2/16/2024)
February 16, 2024 Filing 7 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 5/9/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/16/2024 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom E, 15th Floor. (kmg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2024)
February 16, 2024 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Commerce & Industry Insurance Company, Julianna's Inc.. (kmg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2024)
February 15, 2024 Filing 5 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 2/29/2024. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/15/2024)
February 14, 2024 Filing 4 Proposed Summons. (Bailey, Daniel) (Filed on 2/14/2024)
February 14, 2024 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. (Bailey, Daniel) (Filed on 2/14/2024)
February 14, 2024 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet by Bruce I. Jacobs, Rosalind S. Jacobs . (Bailey, Daniel) (Filed on 2/14/2024)
February 14, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filed by Bruce I. Jacobs, Rosalind S. Jacobs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Bailey, Daniel) (Filed on 2/14/2024)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jacobs et al v. Julianna's Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bruce I. Jacobs
Represented By: Daniel Frederick Bailey
Represented By: Jonathan M. Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosalind S. Jacobs
Represented By: Daniel Frederick Bailey
Represented By: Jonathan M. Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Juliana's Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commerce & Industry Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julianna's Inc.
Represented By: Mark K Slater
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?