Motive Technologies, Inc. v. Samsara, Inc.
Plaintiff: Motive Technologies, Inc.
Defendant: Samsara, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2024cv00902
Filed: February 15, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: James Donato
Referring Judge: Alex G Tse
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1126 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 14, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 14, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 33 Order by Judge James Donato granting #25 Stipulation. Samsara's time to respond to Motive's complaint is extended to April 22, 2024. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2024)
March 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 32 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/30/2024 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor. Case Management Statement due by 5/24/2024. Signed by Judge James Donato on 3/13/2024. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2024)
March 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge James Donato for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Clerk on 03/12/2024. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(mbc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2024)
March 11, 2024 Filing 30 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now reassign this case to a District Judge because a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (shy, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2024)
March 4, 2024 Filing 29 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Joshua L. Simmons ( Filing fee $ 328, receipt number ACANDC-19180676.) filed by Samsara, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Simmons, Joshua) (Filed on 3/4/2024)
March 1, 2024 Filing 28 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Joseph A. Loy ( Filing fee $ 328, receipt number ACANDC-19179881.) filed by Samsara, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Loy, Joseph) (Filed on 3/1/2024)
March 1, 2024 Filing 27 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Karthik Ravishankar ( Filing fee $ 328, receipt number ACANDC-19179840.) filed by Samsara, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Ravishankar, Karthik) (Filed on 3/1/2024)
February 29, 2024 Filing 26 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 328, receipt number ACANDC-19174468.) filed by Samsara, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Heffernan, Jeanne) (Filed on 2/29/2024)
February 29, 2024 #Electronic filing error. [err102] NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Ali-Reza Boloori- The docket shows a different address from what is appearing on the document. Please update your personal profile on ECF. Re: #24 Notice of Appearance filed by Samsara, Inc. (anj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/29/2024)
February 28, 2024 Filing 25 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Extending Time to Respond to the Complaint Pursuant to Local Rule 6-1(a) filed by Samsara, Inc. and Motive Technologies, Inc.. (Boloori, Ali-Reza) (Filed on 2/28/2024) Modified on 2/29/2024 (anj, COURT STAFF).
February 28, 2024 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Ali-Reza Boloori (Boloori, Ali-Reza) (Filed on 2/28/2024)
February 28, 2024 Filing 23 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Samsara, Inc... (Turner, Ellisen) (Filed on 2/28/2024)
February 28, 2024 Filing 22 Certificate of Interested Entities by Samsara, Inc. and Corporate Disclosure Statement (Turner, Ellisen) (Filed on 2/28/2024)
February 28, 2024 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Ellisen Shelton Turner (Turner, Ellisen) (Filed on 2/28/2024)
February 28, 2024 Filing 20 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Motive Technologies, Inc... (Bloch, David) (Filed on 2/28/2024)
February 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER GRANTING #18 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Jack Henry Danon. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse on 2/22/2024. (jlg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2024)
February 22, 2024 Filing 18 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Jack H. Danon ( Filing fee $ 328, receipt number ACANDC-19147510.) filed by Motive Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service Certificate of Good Standing)(Danon, Jack) (Filed on 2/22/2024)
February 21, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER GRANTING #16 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Cecil Bryan Wilson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse on 2/21/2024. (jlg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/21/2024)
February 21, 2024 Filing 16 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 328, receipt number ACANDC-19146095.) Filing fee previously paid on 02/21/2024 filed by Motive Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Wilson, Cecil) (Filed on 2/21/2024)
February 21, 2024 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Angela Pyo (Pyo, Angela) (Filed on 2/21/2024)
February 21, 2024 Filing 14 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 328, receipt number ACANDC-19146095.) filed by Motive Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Wilson, Cecil) (Filed on 2/21/2024)
February 21, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER GRANTING #12 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to James DeCarlo. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse on 2/21/2024. (jlg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/21/2024)
February 21, 2024 Filing 12 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice James DeCarlo ( Filing fee $ 328, receipt number ACANDC-19144423.) filed by Motive Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service Certificate of Good Standing)(DeCarlo, James) (Filed on 2/21/2024)
February 21, 2024 #Electronic filing error. Counsels name and email on application does not match the information on the case docket. Please update your profile re: #14 Motion for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice. This filing will not be processed by the clerks office. Please re-file in its entirety. (Filing fee $328, receipt number ACANDC-19146095.) filed by Motive Technologies, Inc. (jlg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/21/2024)
February 20, 2024 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Motive Technologies, Inc. Proof of Service Summons and Complaint on Samsara Inc. (Bloch, David) (Filed on 2/20/2024)
February 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER GRANTING #9 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Joseph G. Petrosinelli. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse on 2/20/2024. (jlg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/20/2024)
February 17, 2024 Filing 9 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Joseph Petrosinelli ( Filing fee $ 328, receipt number BCANDC-19136711.) filed by Motive Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service Certificate of Good Standing)(Petrosinelli, Joseph) (Filed on 2/17/2024)
February 16, 2024 Filing 8 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 5/10/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/17/2024 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom A, 15th Floor. (anj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2024)
February 15, 2024 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Samsara, Inc.. (anj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/15/2024)
February 15, 2024 Filing 6 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 2/29/2024. (wsm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/15/2024)
February 15, 2024 Filing 5 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding patent infringement (cc: form mailed to register). (Bloch, David) (Filed on 2/15/2024)
February 15, 2024 Filing 4 NOTICE of Related Case (LR 3-5) by Motive Technologies, Inc. (Bloch, David) (Filed on 2/15/2024) Modified on 2/15/2024 (anj, COURT STAFF).
February 15, 2024 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by Motive Technologies, Inc. and FRCP 7.1 and LR 3-15 disclosures (Bloch, David) (Filed on 2/15/2024)
February 15, 2024 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Bloch, David) (Filed on 2/15/2024)
February 15, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Samsara, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACANDC-19127861.). Filed by Motive Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - patent, #2 Exhibit B - claim chart, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Bloch, David) (Filed on 2/15/2024) Modified on 2/15/2024 (anj, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Motive Technologies, Inc. v. Samsara, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Motive Technologies, Inc.
Represented By: Yang Liu
Represented By: David Spencer Bloch
Represented By: Jack Henry Danon
Represented By: James J DeCarlo
Represented By: Joseph G. Petrosinelli
Represented By: Angela Pyo
Represented By: Cecil Bryan Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samsara, Inc.
Represented By: Ellisen Shelton Turner
Represented By: Ali-Reza Boloori
Represented By: Jeanne M. Heffernan
Represented By: Joseph Allen Loy
Represented By: Joshua L Simmons
Represented By: Karthik Ravishankar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?