United States of America v. Vella et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Tony G. Vella, Gloria Monroy de Vella, JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., California Franchise Tax Board, San Francisco Department of Public Health and Jose Cisneros
Case Number: 3:2024cv01094
Filed: February 23, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Vince Chhabria
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26 U.S.C. ยง 7401 IRS: Tax Liability
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 19, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Order by Judge Vince Chhabria granting AS MODIFIED #19 Motion to Continue Case Management Conference and Related Deadlines. Joint Case Management Statement due by 6/21/2024. Initial Case Management Conference reset to 6/28/2024 at 10:00 AM by Videoconference Only. (bxs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2024)
April 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Order by Judge Vince Chhabria granting #18 Stipulation TO DISMISS THE CALIFORNIA FRANCHISE TAX BOARD WITH PREJUDICE. (bxs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2024)
April 18, 2024 Filing 19 MOTION to Continue Case Management Conference and Related Deadlines filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kelark Azer Habashi, #2 Proposed Order)(Azer Habashi, Kelark) (Filed on 4/18/2024)
April 8, 2024 Filing 18 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO DISMISS THE CALIFORNIA FRANCHISE TAX BOARD WITH PREJUDICE filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order APPROVING STIPULATION TO DISMISS THE CALIFORNIA FRANCHISE TAX BOARD WITH PREJUDICE BETWEEN THE UNITED STATES AND THE CLAIFORNIA FRANCHISE TAX BOARD)(Azer Habashi, Kelark) (Filed on 4/8/2024)
April 2, 2024 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of DOJ Trial Attorney Kelark Azer Habashi, #2 Exhibit Proof of Service and Jeff Lancaster's Declaration of Mailing)(Azer Habashi, Kelark) (Filed on 4/2/2024)
April 2, 2024 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of DOJ Trial Attorney Kelark Azer Habashi, #2 Exhibit Proof of Service and Jeff Lancaster's Declaration of Mailing)(Azer Habashi, Kelark) (Filed on 4/2/2024)
April 1, 2024 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. California Franchise Tax Board served on 3/8/2024, answer due 3/29/2024. (Azer Habashi, Kelark) (Filed on 4/1/2024)
March 29, 2024 Filing 14 ANSWER to Complaint and Disclaimer of Rights, Title, or Interest in the Subject Property Described in the Complaint by California Franchise Tax Board. (Le, Donny) (Filed on 3/29/2024)
March 28, 2024 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. San Francisco Department of Public Health served on 3/28/2024, answer due 4/18/2024. (Azer Habashi, Kelark) (Filed on 3/28/2024)
March 28, 2024 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Jose Cisneros served on 3/28/2024, answer due 4/18/2024. (Azer Habashi, Kelark) (Filed on 3/28/2024)
March 28, 2024 #Electronic filing error. ***For the Summons(es) Returned Executed, the dates of service provided on the filings/documents do not match the dates entered onto the docket. Please re-file in its entirety and ensure the dates of service match.*** Re: #12 Summons Returned Executed filed by United States of America, #13 Summons Returned Executed filed by United States of America (krp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2024)
March 27, 2024 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by United States of America. Service waived by Gloria Monroy de Vella waiver sent on 3/6/2024, answer due 5/6/2024. (Azer Habashi, Kelark) (Filed on 3/27/2024)
March 27, 2024 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by United States of America. Service waived by Tony G. Vella waiver sent on 3/6/2024, answer due 5/6/2024. (Azer Habashi, Kelark) (Filed on 3/27/2024)
March 22, 2024 Filing 9 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Ammons, David) (Filed on 3/22/2024)
March 11, 2024 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. served on 3/7/2024, answer due 3/28/2024. (Azer Habashi, Kelark) (Filed on 3/11/2024)
March 11, 2024 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States of America For JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A. (Azer Habashi, Kelark) (Filed on 3/11/2024)
March 11, 2024 #Electronic filing error. ***Incorrect event used. [err101] Please re-file in its entirety, using the event: Summons Returned Executed.*** Re: #7 Certificate of Service filed by United States of America (krp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2024)
February 26, 2024 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to California Franchise Tax Board, Jose Cisneros, JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., Gloria Monroy de Vella, San Francisco Department of Public Health, Tony G. Vella. (krp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2024)
February 23, 2024 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order: Case Management Statement due by 5/17/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/24/2024 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 04, 17th Floor. (krp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2024)
February 23, 2024 Filing 4 Proposed Summons. (Azer Habashi, Kelark) (Filed on 2/23/2024)
February 23, 2024 Filing 3 Case assigned to Judge Vince Chhabria. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2024)
February 23, 2024 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Azer Habashi, Kelark) (Filed on 2/23/2024)
February 23, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Azer Habashi, Kelark) (Filed on 2/23/2024)
February 23, 2024 #Electronic filing error. ***For the Proposed Summons, two summons have been filed/requested for the same defendant. Only a single summons can be issued for a defendant. Please correct and re-file the Proposed Summons in its entirety.*** Re: #2 Proposed Summons filed by United States of America (krp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2024)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Vella et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Kelark Azer Habashi
Represented By: Alexander Stevko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tony G. Vella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gloria Monroy de Vella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Represented By: David W. Ammons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Franchise Tax Board
Represented By: Donny P Le
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: San Francisco Department of Public Health
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jose Cisneros
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?