Sarjeant et al v. City of Long Beach et al
Plaintiff: James Sarjeant and Lucretia Sarjeant
Defendant: ALLIED FLUID PRODUCTS CORP., formerly known as ALLIED PACKING & SUPPLY, INC., KM Industries Holding Co., Inc., formerly known as Kelly-Moore Paint Company, Inc., Owl Companies, individually and as parent, alter-ego-equitable trustee, joint venture, and as succesoor-in-interest to Smith-Amelco and Owl Constuctors, formerly known as HC. Smith Construction Co., Paramount Global, formerly known as ViacomCBS, Inc., formerly known as CBS Corporation, a Delaware Corportion, formerly known as Viacom, Inc., successor by merger to CBS Corporation, a Pennsylvania, Foster Wheeler LLC, City of Long Beach, ALLIED PACKING & SUPPLY, INC., Amelco Corporation, Amelco Industries, American President Lines, LLC, Basco Drywall & Painting Co., DAP, Inc., Diners Club International Ltd., Flacksgroup LLC, sued individually, as alter-ego of, and as successor-in-interest to Kelly-Moore Paint Company, Inc., General Electric Company, Grinnell LLC, Herrick Steel, Inc., sued individually and as alter-ego, parent, equitable trustee, and joint venture with Techni-Buliders, Inc., Hill Brothers Chemical Company, IMO Industries Inc., individually anda s successor-in-interest, parent, alter ego, and equitable trustee of DeLaval Steam Turbine Co., Kaiser Gypsum Company,, Inc., Kelly-Moore Pain Company, Inc., Kelly-Moore Paint Company, Inc., Metalclad Insulation LLC, individually and as successor-in-interest, parent, alter ego and equitable trustee of Metalclad Insulation Corporation, HC. Smith Construction Co., ViacomCBS, Inc., formerly known as CBS Corporation, a Delaware Corportion, formerly known as Viacom, Inc., successor by merger to CBS Corporation, a Pennsylvania, Pfizer Inc., Syd Carpenter, Marine Contractor, Inc., Vanderbilt Minerals, LLC, sued individually, as alter-ego of, and as successor-in-interest to R.T. Vanderbilt Company, Inc. and International Talc Company, Inc. and HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC., f/k/a AlliedSignal Inc., Successor-In-Interest to The Bendix Corporation, and HONEYWELL INC.
Case Number: 3:2024cv01216
Filed: February 28, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Vince Chhabria
Referring Judge: Donna M Ryu
2 Judge: Kandis A Westmore
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 26, 2024 Filing 134 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #119 MOTION to Dismiss Prayer for Loss of Consortium and Punitive Damages Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) ) PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT AMERICAN PRESIDENT LINES LLCS MOTION TO DISMISS PRAYER FOR LOSS OF CONSORTIUM AND PUNITIVE DAMAGES with Certificate of Service filed byJames Sarjeant, Lucretia Sarjeant. (Barrow, Brian) (Filed on 4/26/2024)
April 26, 2024 Filing 133 REPLY (re #105 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First, Second and Fifth Cause of Action ) filed byHONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC., f/k/a AlliedSignal Inc., Successor-In-Interest to The Bendix Corporation, and HONEYWELL INC.. (Hampton, Angela) (Filed on 4/26/2024)
April 25, 2024 Filing 132 ASSOCIATION of Counsel for Medical Discovery by HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC., f/k/a AlliedSignal Inc., Successor-In-Interest to The Bendix Corporation, and HONEYWELL INC.. (Hampton, Angela) (Filed on 4/25/2024)
April 24, 2024 Filing 131 ANSWER to Amended Complaint And Demand for Jury Trial by City of Long Beach. (Olson, Dean) (Filed on 4/24/2024)
April 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 130 Order by Judge Vince Chhabria granting #129 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to William Bickel. (bxs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2024)
April 23, 2024 Filing 129 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of William W. Bickel ( Filing fee $ 328, receipt number ACANDC-19346267.) Filing fee previously paid on 4/23/2024 filed by Herrick Steel, Inc., sued individually and as alter-ego, parent, equitable trustee, and joint venture with Techni-Buliders, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Bickel, William) (Filed on 4/23/2024)
April 23, 2024 Filing 128 NOTICE of Appearance by George H. Irwin (Irwin, George) (Filed on 4/23/2024)
April 23, 2024 Filing 127 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of William W. Bickel ( Filing fee $ 328, receipt number ACANDC-19346267.) filed by Herrick Steel, Inc., sued individually and as alter-ego, parent, equitable trustee, and joint venture with Techni-Buliders, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Bickel, William) (Filed on 4/23/2024)
April 19, 2024 Filing 126 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #105 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First, Second and Fifth Cause of Action ) PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC., F/K/A ALLIEDSIGNAL INC., SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO THE BENDIX CORPORATION, AND HONEYWELL INC.S MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS FIRST, SECOND, AND FIFTH CAUSES OF ACTION PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 12(b)(6), with Certificate of Service filed byJames Sarjeant, Lucretia Sarjeant. (Barrow, Brian) (Filed on 4/19/2024)
April 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 125 Order by Judge Vince Chhabria granting #104 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. (bxs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2024)
April 17, 2024 Filing 124 Answer to Amended Complaint #84 Amended Complaint by Herrick Steel, Inc., sued individually and as alter-ego, parent, equitable trustee, and joint venture with Techni-Buliders, Inc.. (Van, Adrian) (Filed on 4/17/2024)
April 17, 2024 Filing 123 CLERK'S NOTICE CONTINUING MOTION HEARING AND CLARIFYING BRIEFING SCHEDULE RE #119 . Replies due by 5/3/2024. #119 MOTION to Dismiss Prayer for Loss of Consortium and Punitive Damages Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) Hearing set for 5/9/2024 at 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 04, 17th Floor before Judge Vince Chhabria. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(bxs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2024)
April 15, 2024 Filing 122 CLERK'S NOTICE CONTINUING 4/18/2024 HEARING. #104 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Kelly-Moore Paint Company, Inc. Hearing reset to 5/2/2024 at 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 04, 17th Floor before Judge Vince Chhabria. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(bxs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2024)
April 15, 2024 Filing 121 Notice of Reference and Order re: Discovery Procedures. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 4/15/2024. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2024)
April 12, 2024 Filing 120 CLERK'S NOTICE RE #119 . #119 MOTION to Dismiss Prayer for Loss of Consortium and Punitive Damages Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) Hearing set for 5/2/2024 at 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 04, 17th Floor before Judge Vince Chhabria. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(bxs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2024)
April 12, 2024 Filing 119 MOTION to Dismiss Prayer for Loss of Consortium and Punitive Damages Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) filed by American President Lines, LLC. Motion to Dismiss Hearing set for 5/2/2024 10:00 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. Responses due by 4/26/2024. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of American President Lines LLC's Motion to Dismiss Prayer for Loss of Consortium and Punitive Damages Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6), #2 Declaration of Kimberly Solomon in Support of American President Lines LLC's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Prayer for Loss of Consortium and Punitive Damages, Pursuant to Federal Rule fo Civil Procedure 12(b)(6), #3 Proposed Order Granting American President Lines LLC's Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6), #4 Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit B, #6 Exhibit C)(Solomon, Kimberly) (Filed on 4/12/2024)
April 12, 2024 Filing 118 ANSWER to Amended Complaint by Paramount Global, formerly known as ViacomCBS, Inc., formerly known as CBS Corporation, a Delaware Corportion, formerly known as Viacom, Inc., successor by merger to CBS Corporation, a Pennsylvania. (Cronin, Justin) (Filed on 4/12/2024)
April 12, 2024 Filing 117 REPLY (re #83 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction ) filed byVanderbilt Minerals, LLC, sued individually, as alter-ego of, and as successor-in-interest to R.T. Vanderbilt Company, Inc. and International Talc Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Lodmer, Zachary) (Filed on 4/12/2024)
April 11, 2024 Filing 116 ANSWER to Amended Complaint by General Electric Company. (Johnson, Derek) (Filed on 4/11/2024)
April 11, 2024 Filing 115 ANSWER to Amended Complaint by IMO Industries Inc., individually anda s successor-in-interest, parent, alter ego, and equitable trustee of DeLaval Steam Turbine Co.. (Bailey, Bobbie) (Filed on 4/11/2024)
April 11, 2024 Filing 114 Defendant Foster Wheeler LLC's ANSWER to Amended Complaint for Personal Injuries and Loss of Consortium by Foster Wheeler LLC. (Bugatto, Robert) (Filed on 4/11/2024)
April 5, 2024 Filing 112 ANSWER to Amended Complaint (Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint For Personal Injuries and Loss of Consortium) by Metalclad Insulation LLC, individually and as successor-in-interest, parent, alter ego and equitable trustee of Metalclad Insulation Corporation. (Hoye, Daniel) (Filed on 4/5/2024)
April 5, 2024 Filing 111 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Amelco Corporation.. (Katerndahl, John) (Filed on 4/5/2024)
April 5, 2024 Filing 110 Answer to Amended Complaint DEFENDANT DINERS CLUB INTERNATIONAL LTDS ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR WRONGFUL DEATH AND SURVIVOR ACTION; NEGLIGENCE; BREACH OF EXPRESS AND IMPLIED WARRANTIES; STRICT LIABILITY; PREMISES OWNER/CONTRACTOR LIABILITY DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL by Diners Club International Ltd.. (Brosamle, Anthony) (Filed on 4/5/2024)
April 5, 2024 Filing 109 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #83 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction ) PLAINTIFFS MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT VANDERBILT MINERALS, LLCS MOTION TO DISMISS UNDER RULE 12(B)(2) FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION; DECLARATION OF JAMES SARJEANT IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT VANDERBILT MINERALS, LLCS MOTION TO DISMISS UNDER RULE 12(B)(2) FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION filed byJames Sarjeant, Lucretia Sarjeant. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of James Sarjeant)(Stewart, Michael) (Filed on 4/5/2024)
April 5, 2024 Filing 108 ANSWER to Amended Complaint by Hill Brothers Chemical Company. (West, Colin) (Filed on 4/5/2024)
April 5, 2024 Filing 107 ANSWER to Amended Complaint by Grinnell LLC. (Ulloa, Edward) (Filed on 4/5/2024)
April 5, 2024 Filing 106 ANSWER to Amended Complaint by Intervenors Hartford Accident and Indemnity Company et al., insurers of Defendant Syd Carpenter, Marine Contractor, Inc., a suspended California corporation by Syd Carpenter, Marine Contractor, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Galfayan, Arpi) (Filed on 4/5/2024)
April 5, 2024 Filing 105 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First, Second and Fifth Cause of Action filed by HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC., f/k/a AlliedSignal Inc., Successor-In-Interest to The Bendix Corporation, and HONEYWELL INC.. Motion to Dismiss Hearing set for 5/2/2024 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 04, 17th Floor. Responses due by 4/19/2024. Replies due by 4/26/2024. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration Declaration of Angela M. Hampton, #3 Exhibit Declaration Exhibit A - Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint (Part 1 of 2), #4 Exhibit Declaration Exhibit A - Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint (Part 2 of 2))(Ongaro, David) (Filed on 4/5/2024)
April 4, 2024 Filing 113 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Vince Chhabria: Initial Case Management Conference held via Zoom on 4/4/2024. CASE REFERRED to randomly assigned Magistrate Judge for Discovery purposes. Court granted #87 Ex Parte Application. Court ordered preservation deposition to begin no later than 4/25. Discovery can go forward as to all parties. Initial disclosures due by 5/1. #45 Motion to Dismiss; #74 Motion to Dismiss are terminated as moot pursuant to dkt. #84 . Court granted oral request to shorten time for pending Motions to Dismiss. 5/31/2024 Case Management Conference to remain as set. Stipulated or competing proposed schedules to be included in the CMS. Total Time in Court: 25 minutes. Court Reporter: Hearing recorded via Zoom: 2:08 - 2:33. Plaintiff Attorney: Jennifer Bartlett, Akinyemi Ajayi. Defendant Attorney: Dean Olson (City of Long Beach), Gayle Ketchie, Angela Hampton (Honeywell International Inc.), Tyler Hollingsworth (Allied Fluid Products), Charles Sheldon (General Electric Co.), Jeremy Milbrodt (Syd Carpenter, Marine Contractor, Inc.), Zack Lodmer (Vanderbilt Minerals, LLC), John Katerndhal (Amelco Corporation), Makala Furse (Basco Drywall & Painting, Co.), Adrian Van (The Herrick Corporation), Erin Empting (Paramount Global), Edward Ulloa (Grinnell LLC and Hill Brothers Chemical Company), Daniel Hoye (Metalclad Insulation LLC), Kimberly Solomon (American President Lines LLC), Rob Bugatto (Foster Wheeler), Bobbie Bailey (IMO Industries, Inc.), Anthony Brosamle (Diners Club International Ltd.; DAP, Inc.; Pfizer Inc.). (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (bxs, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/4/2024)
April 3, 2024 Filing 104 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Kelly-Moore Paint Company, Inc. filed by Kelly-Moore Pain Company, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 4/18/2024 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 04, 17th Floor before Judge Vince Chhabria. Responses due by 4/17/2024. Replies due by 4/24/2024. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Amy J. Talarico in support of Kelly-Moore Paint Company, Inc.'s Notice of Motion and Motion to Withdraw as Counsel for Kelly-Moore Paint Company, Inc., #2 Exhibit A to the Declaration of Amy J. Talarico, #3 Exhibit B to the Declaration of Amy J. Talarico, #4 Proposed Order)(Talarico, Amy) (Filed on 4/3/2024)
April 3, 2024 Filing 103 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Diners Club International Ltd... (Brosamle, Anthony) (Filed on 4/3/2024)
April 2, 2024 Filing 102 NOTICE of Appearance by Kimberly Solomon (Solomon, Kimberly) (Filed on 4/2/2024)
April 2, 2024 Filing 101 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by James Sarjeant, Lucretia Sarjeant.. (Ajayi, Akinyemi) (Filed on 4/2/2024)
April 1, 2024 Filing 100 NOTICE of Change of Address by Andrew Ira Port (Port, Andrew) (Filed on 4/1/2024)
April 1, 2024 Filing 99 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Kaiser Gypsum Company,, Inc... (Sharp, Andrew) (Filed on 4/1/2024)
April 1, 2024 Filing 98 Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Kaiser Gypsum Company,, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Hanson Permanente Cement, Inc. for Kaiser Gypsum Company,, Inc.. (Sharp, Andrew) (Filed on 4/1/2024)
April 1, 2024 Filing 97 NOTICE by Kaiser Gypsum Company,, Inc. NOTICE OF FILING STATE COURT ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT (Sharp, Andrew) (Filed on 4/1/2024)
March 29, 2024 Filing 96 NOTICE of Change of Address by Edward Martinovich (Martinovich, Edward) (Filed on 3/29/2024)
March 29, 2024 Filing 95 NOTICE of Change of Address by Edward R. Hugo for Hugo Parker, LLP (Hugo, Edward) (Filed on 3/29/2024)
March 28, 2024 Filing 94 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeremy David Milbrodt for Intervenors, Hartford Accident and Indemnity Company et al., insurers of Defendant Syd Carpenter, Marine Contractor, Inc., a suspended California corporation (Milbrodt, Jeremy) (Filed on 3/28/2024)
March 28, 2024 Filing 93 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer Lynne Bartlett COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFFS JAMES SARGEANT AND LUCRETIA SARJEANT (Bartlett, Jennifer) (Filed on 3/28/2024)
March 27, 2024 Filing 92 CLERK'S NOTICE PROVIDING ZOOM ACCESS AND REQUIRING ADVANCE REGISTRATION OF COUNSEL RE 4/4/2024 CMC. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/4/2024 at 02:00 PM by Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/vc Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. One list of names of all counsel appearing for all parties must be sent in one email to the CRD at vccrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than Monday, April 1, 2024, by no later than 12:00PM.General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(bxs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2024)
March 27, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER. A case management conference is scheduled in this case for April 4, 2024, at 2pm over Zoom. The parties do not need to file a case management statement, but all parties should be prepared to discuss the plaintiffs pending request for an expedited deposition and a coordinated briefing schedule for upcoming motions to dismiss. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 3/27/2024. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (vclc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2024)
March 26, 2024 Filing 90 NOTICE of Appearance by Valeria Golodnitska (Golodnitska, Valeria) (Filed on 3/26/2024)
March 26, 2024 Filing 89 NOTICE of Appearance by Kristen L. Chic (Chic, Kristen) (Filed on 3/26/2024)
March 26, 2024 Filing 88 NOTICE of Appearance by Dean A. Olson (Olson, Dean) (Filed on 3/26/2024)
March 25, 2024 Filing 87 Ex Parte Application filed by James Sarjeant, Lucretia Sarjeant. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Akinyemi Ajayi, #2 Exhibit 1 - Plaintiffs' Complaint, #3 Exhibit 2 - Plaintiffs' Responses to JD Rogs, #4 Exhibit 3 - James Sarjeant's SS Records, #5 Exhibit 4 - February 21, 2024 letter, #6 Exhibit 5 - Plaintiffs' Responses to DAP Inc.'s written discovery, #7 Exhibit 6 - February 26, 2024 letter, #8 Exhibit 7 - Foster Wheeler's Notice of Removal, #9 Exhibit 8 - meet and confer correspondence re James Sarjeant deposition, #10 Exhibit 9 - meet and confer correspondence re Rule 26(f) conference, #11 Exhibit 10 - Pathology report, #12 Exhibit 11 - Decl. of Judy Schmidt MD, #13 Proposed Order)(Ajayi, Akinyemi) (Filed on 3/25/2024)
March 22, 2024 Filing 86 NOTICE by James Sarjeant, Lucretia Sarjeant re #74 MOTION to Dismiss PLAINTIFFS FIRST, SECOND, AND FOURTH CAUSES OF ACTION PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 12(b)(6) NOTICE OF FILING FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT RENDERING DEFENDANT HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC.S MOTION TO DISMISS MOOT (Stewart, Michael) (Filed on 3/22/2024)
March 22, 2024 Filing 85 NOTICE by James Sarjeant, Lucretia Sarjeant re #45 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) NOTICE OF FILING FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT IN RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT AMERICAN PRESIDENT LINES LLCS MOTION TO DISMISS (Stewart, Michael) (Filed on 3/22/2024)
March 22, 2024 Filing 84 AMENDED COMPLAINT FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURIES AND LOSS OF CONSORTIUM; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against All Defendants. Filed by James Sarjeant, Lucretia Sarjeant. (Stewart, Michael) (Filed on 3/22/2024)
March 22, 2024 Filing 83 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Vanderbilt Minerals, LLC, sued individually, as alter-ego of, and as successor-in-interest to R.T. Vanderbilt Company, Inc. and International Talc Company, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 5/2/2024 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 04, 17th Floor before Judge Vince Chhabria. Responses due by 4/5/2024. Replies due by 4/12/2024. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order)(Lodmer, Zachary) (Filed on 3/22/2024)
March 22, 2024 Filing 82 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel James Kelly (Kelly, Daniel) (Filed on 3/22/2024)
March 22, 2024 Filing 81 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Amelco Corporation (Katerndahl, John) (Filed on 3/22/2024)
March 22, 2024 Filing 80 NOTICE by Amelco Corporation of Filing State Court Answer (Katerndahl, John) (Filed on 3/22/2024)
March 22, 2024 Filing 79 NOTICE of Appearance by John Paul Katerndahl on Behalf of Amelco Corporation (Katerndahl, John) (Filed on 3/22/2024)
March 21, 2024 Filing 78 NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony Dean Brosamle (Brosamle, Anthony) (Filed on 3/21/2024)
March 21, 2024 Filing 77 Certificate of Interested Entities by Diners Club International Ltd. (Brosamle, Anthony) (Filed on 3/21/2024)
March 21, 2024 Filing 76 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Diners Club International Ltd.. (Brosamle, Anthony) (Filed on 3/21/2024)
March 21, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 75 Order by Judge Vince Chhabria granting #61 Stipulation DISMISSING DEFENDANT OWL COMPANIES. (bxs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2024)
March 20, 2024 Filing 74 MOTION to Dismiss PLAINTIFFS FIRST, SECOND, AND FOURTH CAUSES OF ACTION PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 12(b)(6) filed by HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC., f/k/a AlliedSignal Inc., Successor-In-Interest to The Bendix Corporation, and HONEYWELL INC.. Motion to Dismiss Hearing set for 5/2/2024 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 04, 17th Floor. Responses due by 4/3/2024. Replies due by 4/10/2024. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support, #2 Declaration of Angela Hampton, #3 Exhibit A - Plaintiffs' Complaint, #4 Exhibit B - Plaintiffs' Doe Amendment, #5 Exhibit C - Honeywell's Meet and Confer Letter)(Hampton, Angela) (Filed on 3/20/2024)
March 19, 2024 Filing 73 Certificate of Interested Entities by Herrick Steel, Inc., sued individually and as alter-ego, parent, equitable trustee, and joint venture with Techni-Buliders, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate The Herrick Corporation for Herrick Steel, Inc., sued individually and as alter-ego, parent, equitable trustee, and joint venture with Techni-Buliders, Inc.. (Idemundia, Benedict) (Filed on 3/19/2024)
March 19, 2024 Filing 72 NOTICE by Herrick Steel, Inc., sued individually and as alter-ego, parent, equitable trustee, and joint venture with Techni-Buliders, Inc. of Refiling Its State Court Answer to Complaint for Damages (Idemundia, Benedict) (Filed on 3/19/2024)
March 19, 2024 Filing 71 NOTICE of Appearance by Benedict Ehigie Idemundia , Kevin R. SUtherland, and Adrian Van of Clyde & Co US LLP as counsel for defendant The Herrick Corporation (Idemundia, Benedict) (Filed on 3/19/2024)
March 18, 2024 Filing 70 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by Basco Drywall & Painting Co.. (Furse, Makala) (Filed on 3/18/2024)
March 18, 2024 Filing 69 NOTICE of Appearance by Makala Furse (Furse, Makala) (Filed on 3/18/2024)
March 18, 2024 Filing 68 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeremy D. Huie (Huie, Jeremy) (Filed on 3/18/2024)
March 18, 2024 Filing 67 NOTICE of Appearance by Akinyemi Ajayi for PLAINTIFFS JAMES SARJEANT AND LUCRETIA SARJEANT (Ajayi, Akinyemi) (Filed on 3/18/2024)
March 18, 2024 Filing 66 CLERK'S NOTICE RE #45 . #45 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) Hearing set for 4/18/2024 at 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 04, 17th Floor before Judge Vince Chhabria. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(bxs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2024)
March 18, 2024 Filing 65 Certificate of Interested Entities by Vanderbilt Minerals, LLC, sued individually, as alter-ego of, and as successor-in-interest to R.T. Vanderbilt Company, Inc. and International Talc Company, Inc. (Lodmer, Zachary) (Filed on 3/18/2024)
March 18, 2024 Filing 64 NOTICE by Vanderbilt Minerals, LLC, sued individually, as alter-ego of, and as successor-in-interest to R.T. Vanderbilt Company, Inc. and International Talc Company, Inc. of Filing State Court Motion to Quash Service of Summons and Complaint (Lodmer, Zachary) (Filed on 3/18/2024)
March 18, 2024 Filing 63 NOTICE of Appearance by Zachary Harris Lodmer (Lodmer, Zachary) (Filed on 3/18/2024)
March 18, 2024 Filing 62 NOTICE of Appearance by Heather Lynn Weakley (Weakley, Heather) (Filed on 3/18/2024)
March 15, 2024 Filing 61 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER DISMISSING DEFENDANT OWL COMPANIES filed by Owl Companies, individually and as parent, alter-ego-equitable trustee, joint venture, and as succesoor-in-interest to Smith-Amelco and Owl Constuctors, formerly known as HC. Smith Construction Co.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order [PROPOSED] ORDER DISMISSING ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO DEFENDANT OWL COMPANIES)(Berkes, Robert) (Filed on 3/15/2024)
March 15, 2024 Filing 60 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Harvey Berkes for Defendant Owl Companies (Berkes, Robert) (Filed on 3/15/2024)
March 14, 2024 Filing 59 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by ALLIED FLUID PRODUCTS CORP., formerly known as ALLIED PACKING & SUPPLY, INC... (Cordery, Theodore) (Filed on 3/14/2024)
March 14, 2024 Filing 58 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicolas Peter Martin HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC., F/K/A ALLIEDSIGNAL INC., SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO THE BENDIX CORPORATION, AND HONEYWELL INC.S NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF KENDRA L. TIETJEN (Martin, Nicolas) (Filed on 3/14/2024)
March 14, 2024 Filing 57 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicolas Peter Martin HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC., F/K/A ALLIEDSIGNAL INC., SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO THE BENDIX CORPORATION, AND HONEYWELL INC.S NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF NICOLAS P. MARTIN (Martin, Nicolas) (Filed on 3/14/2024)
March 13, 2024 Filing 56 Certificate of Interested Entities by Syd Carpenter, Marine Contractor, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Fireman's Fund Insurance Company, Corporate Parent Argonaut Insurance Company, Corporate Parent Zurich American Insurance Company, Corporate Parent Hartford Accident and Indemnity Compnay, Corporate Parent Hartford Casualty Insurance Company for Syd Carpenter, Marine Contractor, Inc.. Intervenors Hartford Accident and Indemnity Company et al., insurers of Defendant Syd Carpenter, Marine Contractor, Inc., a suspended California corporation (Galfayan, Arpi) (Filed on 3/13/2024)
March 13, 2024 Filing 55 NOTICE by Syd Carpenter, Marine Contractor, Inc. Intervenors Hartford Accident and Indemnity Company et al., insurers of Defendant Syd Carpenter, Marine Contractor, Inc., a suspended California corporation, of Filing State Court Answer (Galfayan, Arpi) (Filed on 3/13/2024)
March 13, 2024 Filing 54 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC., f/k/a AlliedSignal Inc., Successor-In-Interest to The Bendix Corporation, and HONEYWELL INC.. (Ongaro, David) (Filed on 3/13/2024)
March 13, 2024 Filing 53 Corporate Disclosure Statement by HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC., f/k/a AlliedSignal Inc., Successor-In-Interest to The Bendix Corporation, and HONEYWELL INC. (Ongaro, David) (Filed on 3/13/2024)
March 13, 2024 Filing 52 NOTICE of Appearance by David Raymond Ongaro , Angela M. Hampton (Ongaro, David) (Filed on 3/13/2024)
March 13, 2024 Filing 51 NOTICE of Appearance by David Raymond Ongaro , Kirsten McNelly Bibbes (Ongaro, David) (Filed on 3/13/2024)
March 13, 2024 Filing 50 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC., f/k/a AlliedSignal Inc., Successor-In-Interest to The Bendix Corporation, and HONEYWELL INC... (Ongaro, David) (Filed on 3/13/2024)
March 13, 2024 Filing 49 NOTICE of Appearance by David Raymond Ongaro (Ongaro, David) (Filed on 3/13/2024)
March 11, 2024 Filing 48 NOTICE by ALLIED FLUID PRODUCTS CORP., formerly known as ALLIED PACKING & SUPPLY, INC. 'S FILING STATE COURT ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES (Cordery, Theodore) (Filed on 3/11/2024)
March 11, 2024 Filing 47 Certificate of Interested Entities by ALLIED FLUID PRODUCTS CORP., formerly known as ALLIED PACKING & SUPPLY, INC. (Cordery, Theodore) (Filed on 3/11/2024)
March 11, 2024 Filing 46 NOTICE of Appearance by Theodore Thomas Cordery (Cordery, Theodore) (Filed on 3/11/2024)
March 8, 2024 Filing 45 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) filed by American President Lines, LLC. Motion to Dismiss Hearing set for 4/18/2024 01:30 PM in Oakland, - To be determined. Responses due by 3/22/2024. Replies due by 3/29/2024. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Declaration of Andrew I. Port in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #3 Exhibit A to Declaration of Andrew I. Port, #4 Exhibit B to Declaration of Andrew I. Port, #5 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Dismiss)(Port, Andrew) (Filed on 3/8/2024)
March 8, 2024 Filing 44 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by General Electric Company.. (Johnson, Derek) (Filed on 3/8/2024)
March 7, 2024 Filing 43 NOTICE of Appearance by Bobbie Rae Bailey (Bailey, Bobbie) (Filed on 3/7/2024)
March 7, 2024 Filing 42 Certificate of Interested Entities by IMO Industries Inc., individually anda s successor-in-interest, parent, alter ego, and equitable trustee of DeLaval Steam Turbine Co. identifying Corporate Parent Imo Holdings, Inc, Corporate Parent ESAB Corporation for IMO Industries Inc., individually anda s successor-in-interest, parent, alter ego, and equitable trustee of DeLaval Steam Turbine Co.. (Bailey, Bobbie) (Filed on 3/7/2024)
March 7, 2024 Filing 41 NOTICE by IMO Industries Inc., individually anda s successor-in-interest, parent, alter ego, and equitable trustee of DeLaval Steam Turbine Co. of filing of State Court Answer to Complaint (Bailey, Bobbie) (Filed on 3/7/2024)
March 6, 2024 Filing 40 NOTICE of Appearance by Justin Finnell Cronin on behalf of Defendant Paramount Global (Cronin, Justin) (Filed on 3/6/2024)
March 6, 2024 Filing 39 NOTICE of Appearance by Erin Nicole Empting on behalf of Defendant Paramount Global (Empting, Erin) (Filed on 3/6/2024)
March 6, 2024 Filing 38 Certificate of Interested Entities by Paramount Global, formerly known as ViacomCBS, Inc., formerly known as CBS Corporation, a Delaware Corportion, formerly known as Viacom, Inc., successor by merger to CBS Corporation, a Pennsylvania identifying Corporate Parent Paramount Global, formerly known as ViacomCBS, Inc., formerly known as CBS Corporation, a Delaware Corportion, formerly known as Viacom, Inc., successor by merger to CBS Corporation, a Pennsylvania, Other Affiliate National Amusements, Inc., Other Affiliate Berkshire Hathaway,Inc. for Paramount Global, formerly known as ViacomCBS, Inc., formerly known as CBS Corporation, a Delaware Corportion, formerly known as Viacom, Inc., successor by merger to CBS Corporation, a Pennsylvania. (Jamison, Kevin) (Filed on 3/6/2024)
March 6, 2024 Filing 37 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin Douglas Jamison on behalf of Defendant Paramount Global (Jamison, Kevin) (Filed on 3/6/2024)
March 6, 2024 Filing 36 NOTICE by Paramount Global, formerly known as ViacomCBS, Inc., formerly known as CBS Corporation, a Delaware Corportion, formerly known as Viacom, Inc., successor by merger to CBS Corporation, a Pennsylvania of Filing State Court Answer and Demand for Jury Trial (Jamison, Kevin) (Filed on 3/6/2024)
March 6, 2024 Filing 35 NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine Paige Gardiner on behalf of Defendant General Electric Company (Gardiner, Katherine) (Filed on 3/6/2024)
March 6, 2024 Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles T. Sheldon on behalf of Defendant General Electric Company (Sheldon, Charles) (Filed on 3/6/2024)
March 6, 2024 Filing 33 Certificate of Interested Entities by General Electric Company identifying Other Affiliate T. Rowe Price Group, Inc., Other Affiliate T. Rowe Price Associates, Inc. for General Electric Company. (Johnson, Derek) (Filed on 3/6/2024)
March 6, 2024 Filing 32 NOTICE by General Electric Company of Refilling of its State Answer (Johnson, Derek) (Filed on 3/6/2024)
March 6, 2024 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by Derek S. Johnson on behalf of Defendant General Electric Company (Johnson, Derek) (Filed on 3/6/2024)
March 6, 2024 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by Colin C. West as counsel for Hill Brothers Chemical Company (West, Colin) (Filed on 3/6/2024)
March 6, 2024 Filing 29 Certificate of Interested Entities by Hill Brothers Chemical Company (Talarico, Amy) (Filed on 3/6/2024)
March 6, 2024 Filing 28 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Hill Brothers Chemical Company (Talarico, Amy) (Filed on 3/6/2024)
March 6, 2024 Filing 27 NOTICE by Hill Brothers Chemical Company of filing of State Court Answer to Complaint (Talarico, Amy) (Filed on 3/6/2024)
March 6, 2024 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Amy Jo Talarico as counsel for Hill Brothers Chemical Company (Talarico, Amy) (Filed on 3/6/2024)
March 6, 2024 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Duffy as counsel for Hill Brothers Chemical Company (Duffy, Joseph) (Filed on 3/6/2024)
March 6, 2024 Filing 24 Certificate of Interested Entities by Grinnell LLC identifying Corporate Parent Johnson Controls plc, Other Affiliate Tyco International plc for Grinnell LLC. (Talarico, Amy) (Filed on 3/6/2024)
March 6, 2024 Filing 23 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Grinnell LLC identifying Corporate Parent Johnson Controls plc, Other Affiliate Tyco International plc for Grinnell LLC. (Talarico, Amy) (Filed on 3/6/2024)
March 6, 2024 Filing 22 NOTICE by Grinnell LLC of filing of State Court Answer to Complaint (Talarico, Amy) (Filed on 3/6/2024)
March 6, 2024 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Amy Jo Talarico as counsel for Grinnell LLC (Talarico, Amy) (Filed on 3/6/2024)
March 6, 2024 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Edward Richard Ulloa as counsel for Grinnell LLC (Ulloa, Edward) (Filed on 3/6/2024)
March 6, 2024 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Duffy as counsel for Grinnell LLC (Duffy, Joseph) (Filed on 3/6/2024)
March 5, 2024 Filing 18 REASSIGNED CASE - NOTICE OF NEW HEARING DATE: You are notified that the Court has scheduled an Initial Case Management Conference before Judge Vince Chhabria upon reassignment. For a copy of Judge Chhabria's Standing Order and other information, please refer to the Court's website at www.cand.uscourts.gov. Joint Case Management Statement due by 5/24/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/31/2024 at 10:00 AM by Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/vc Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. One list of names of all counsel appearing for all parties must be sent in one email to the CRD at vccrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than Friday, May 24th, 2024, by no later than 12:00PM.General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(bxs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2024)
March 4, 2024 Filing 17 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Metalclad Insulation LLC, individually and as successor-in-interest, parent, alter ego and equitable trustee of Metalclad Insulation Corporation.. (Hoye, Daniel) (Filed on 3/4/2024)
March 4, 2024 Filing 16 Certificate of Interested Entities by Metalclad Insulation LLC, individually and as successor-in-interest, parent, alter ego and equitable trustee of Metalclad Insulation Corporation identifying Other Affiliate ENTRX LLC (Holding Company), Other Affiliate Central National Insurance Company (ACE Group), Other Affiliate Industrial Underwriters (ACE Group), Other Affiliate Motor Vehicle Insurance Company (ACE Group), Other Affiliate Hartford Fire Insurance Company (Hartford Group), Other Affiliate Hartford Accident and Indemnity Company (Hartford Group), Other Affiliate First State Insurance Company (Hartford Group), Other Affiliate Continental Casualty Company (CNA Group), Other Affiliate Harbor Insurance Company (CNA Group), Other Affiliate Northbrook Insurance Company (Allstate), Other Affiliate Granite State Insurance Company (AIG Group), Other Affiliate National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA (AIG Group), Other Affiliate American Home Insurance Company (AIG Group), Other Affiliate Transport Case Insurance Company, Other Affiliate American Motorist Insurance Company, in liquidation (Chubb Group). for Metalclad Insulation LLC, individually and as successor-in-interest, parent, alter ego and equitable trustee of Metalclad Insulation Corporation. (Hoye, Daniel) (Filed on 3/4/2024)
March 4, 2024 Filing 15 NOTICE by Metalclad Insulation LLC, individually and as successor-in-interest, parent, alter ego and equitable trustee of Metalclad Insulation Corporation Of Re-Filing State Court Answer To Complaint (Hoye, Daniel) (Filed on 3/4/2024)
March 4, 2024 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel B. Hoye Lisa L. Oberg and Paul D. Smith (Hoye, Daniel) (Filed on 3/4/2024)
March 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Vince Chhabria for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore no longer assigned to case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by The Clerk on 03/4/2024. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(wsm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2024)
March 1, 2024 Filing 12 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (wft, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2024)
February 29, 2024 Filing 11 NOTICE by Foster Wheeler LLC NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER (Hugo, Edward) (Filed on 2/29/2024)
February 29, 2024 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Foster Wheeler LLC re #8 Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge, #7 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), #6 Notice of Appearance, #9 Certificate of Interested Entities (Hugo, Edward) (Filed on 2/29/2024)
February 29, 2024 Filing 9 Certificate of Interested Entities by Foster Wheeler LLC identifying Corporate Parent FOSTER WHEELER LLC for Foster Wheeler LLC. (Hugo, Edward) (Filed on 2/29/2024)
February 29, 2024 Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Foster Wheeler LLC.. (Hugo, Edward) (Filed on 2/29/2024)
February 29, 2024 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) FOR PERSONAL INJURIES AND LOSS OF CONSORTIUM by Foster Wheeler LLC. (Hugo, Edward) (Filed on 2/29/2024)
February 29, 2024 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Edward R. Hugo DEFENDANT FOSTER WHEELER (Hugo, Edward) (Filed on 2/29/2024)
February 29, 2024 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Thomas Stewart with proof of service (Stewart, Michael) (Filed on 2/29/2024)
February 29, 2024 Filing 4 Notice of Additional Parties: the following parties are listed on #1 Notice of Removal, and have been added to this case: City of Long Beach, ALLIED FLUID PRODUCTS CORP., formerly known as ALLIED PACKING & SUPPLY, INC., Amelco Corporation, Amelco Industries, American President Lines, LLC, Basco Drywall & Painting Co., DAP, Inc., Diners Club International Ltd., Flacksgroup LLC, sued individually, as alter-ego of, and as successor-in-interest to Kelly-Moore Paint Company, Inc., General Electric Company, Grinnell LLC, Herrick Steel, Inc., sued individually and as alter-ego, parent, equitable trustee, and joint venture with Techni-Buliders, Inc., Hill Brothers Chemical Company, IMO Industries Inc., individually anda s successor-in-interest, parent, alter ego, and equitable trustee of DeLaval Steam Turbine Co., Kaiser Gypsum Company,, Inc., Kelly-Moore Pain Company, Inc., KM Industries Holding Co., Inc., formerly known as Kelly-Moore Paint Company, Inc., Metalclad Insulation LLC, individually and as successor-in-interest, parent, alter ego and equitable trustee of Metalclad Insulation Corporation, Owl Companies, individually and as parent, alter-ego-equitable trustee, joint venture, and as succesoor-in-interest to Smith-Amelco and Owl Constuctors, formerly known as HC. Smith Construction Co., Paramount Global, formerly known as ViacomCBS, Inc., formerly known as CBS Corporation, a Delaware Corportion, formerly known as Viacom, Inc., successor by merger to CBS Corporation, a Pennsylvania, Pfizer Inc., Syd Carpenter, Marine Contractor, Inc. and Vanderbilt Minerals, LLC, sued individually, as alter-ego of, and as successor-in-interest to R.T. Vanderbilt Company, Inc. and International Talc Company, Inc.. (This is a text-only entry.) (Hugo, Edward) (Filed on 2/29/2024)
February 29, 2024 Filing 3 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 5/21/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/28/2024 01:30 PM in Oakland, - To be determined. (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/29/2024)
February 29, 2024 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 3/14/2024. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/29/2024)
February 29, 2024 #Electronic filing error. ADD ALL DEFENDANTS TO THE DOCKET LISTED IN THE COMPLAINT [err201] Re: #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Foster Wheeler LLC (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/29/2024)
February 28, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Alameda County Superior Court. Their case number is 23CV052439. (Filing fee $405 receipt number ACANDC-19170770). Filed by Foster Wheeler LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Hugo, Edward) (Filed on 2/28/2024)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sarjeant et al v. City of Long Beach et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALLIED FLUID PRODUCTS CORP., formerly known as ALLIED PACKING & SUPPLY, INC.
Represented By: Theodore Thomas Cordery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KM Industries Holding Co., Inc., formerly known as Kelly-Moore Paint Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Owl Companies, individually and as parent, alter-ego-equitable trustee, joint venture, and as succesoor-in-interest to Smith-Amelco and Owl Constuctors, formerly known as HC. Smith Construction Co.
Represented By: Robert Harvey Berkes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paramount Global, formerly known as ViacomCBS, Inc., formerly known as CBS Corporation, a Delaware Corportion, formerly known as Viacom, Inc., successor by merger to CBS Corporation, a Pennsylvania
Represented By: Erin Nicole Empting
Represented By: Justin Finnell Cronin
Represented By: Kevin Douglas Jamison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foster Wheeler LLC
Represented By: Edward R. Hugo
Represented By: Bina Ghanaat
Represented By: Robert J Bugatto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Long Beach
Represented By: Dean A. Olson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALLIED PACKING & SUPPLY, INC.
Represented By: Theodore Thomas Cordery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amelco Corporation
Represented By: John Paul Katerndahl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amelco Industries
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American President Lines, LLC
Represented By: Andrew Ira Port
Represented By: Kimberly Solomon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Basco Drywall & Painting Co.
Represented By: Jeremy D. Huie
Represented By: Makala Furse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAP, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diners Club International Ltd.
Represented By: Anthony Dean Brosamle
Represented By: Valeria Golodnitska
Represented By: Daniel James Kelly
Represented By: Kristen L. Chic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flacksgroup LLC, sued individually, as alter-ego of, and as successor-in-interest to Kelly-Moore Paint Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electric Company
Represented By: Derek S. Johnson
Represented By: Charles T. Sheldon
Represented By: Katherine Paige Gardiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grinnell LLC
Represented By: Amy Jo Talarico
Represented By: Edward Richard Ulloa
Represented By: Joseph Duffy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Herrick Steel, Inc., sued individually and as alter-ego, parent, equitable trustee, and joint venture with Techni-Buliders, Inc.
Represented By: Benedict Ehigie Idemundia
Represented By: Adrian Van
Represented By: Kevin Richard Sutherland
Represented By: William W Bickel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hill Brothers Chemical Company
Represented By: Amy Jo Talarico
Represented By: Colin C. West
Represented By: Joseph Duffy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IMO Industries Inc., individually anda s successor-in-interest, parent, alter ego, and equitable trustee of DeLaval Steam Turbine Co.
Represented By: Bobbie Rae Bailey
Represented By: Edward Martinovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kaiser Gypsum Company,, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew Livingston Sharp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelly-Moore Pain Company, Inc.
Represented By: Amy Jo Talarico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelly-Moore Paint Company, Inc.
Represented By: Amy Jo Talarico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metalclad Insulation LLC, individually and as successor-in-interest, parent, alter ego and equitable trustee of Metalclad Insulation Corporation
Represented By: Daniel B. Hoye
Represented By: Lisa Lurline Oberg
Represented By: Paul David Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HC. Smith Construction Co.
Represented By: Robert Harvey Berkes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ViacomCBS, Inc., formerly known as CBS Corporation, a Delaware Corportion, formerly known as Viacom, Inc., successor by merger to CBS Corporation, a Pennsylvania
Represented By: Erin Nicole Empting
Represented By: Justin Finnell Cronin
Represented By: Kevin Douglas Jamison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pfizer Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Syd Carpenter, Marine Contractor, Inc.
Represented By: Arpi Galfayan
Represented By: Jeremy David Milbrodt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vanderbilt Minerals, LLC, sued individually, as alter-ego of, and as successor-in-interest to R.T. Vanderbilt Company, Inc. and International Talc Company, Inc.
Represented By: George H. Irwin
Represented By: Zachary Harris Lodmer
Represented By: Heather Lynn Weakley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC., f/k/a AlliedSignal Inc., Successor-In-Interest to The Bendix Corporation, and HONEYWELL INC.
Represented By: Hillary H. Huth
Represented By: David Raymond Ongaro
Represented By: Nicolas Peter Martin
Represented By: Angela M. Hampton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Sarjeant
Represented By: Henry A Steinberg
Represented By: John L. Langdoc
Represented By: Michael Thomas Stewart
Represented By: Akinyemi Ajayi
Represented By: Brian Patrick Barrow
Represented By: Jennifer Lynne Bartlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lucretia Sarjeant
Represented By: Henry A Steinberg
Represented By: John L. Langdoc
Represented By: Michael Thomas Stewart
Represented By: Akinyemi Ajayi
Represented By: Brian Patrick Barrow
Represented By: Jennifer Lynne Bartlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?