Shaw et al v. Q&D Construction, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Bergit Shaw and Dockum Shaw
Defendant: Q&D Construction, LLC and County of Sonoma
Case Number: 3:2024cv01786
Filed: March 22, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 8, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 8, 2024 Filing 20 CLERK'S NOTICE re remand. (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2024)
April 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Order by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler granting #7 Stipulation Remanding Case to Sonoma County Superior Court. (ejk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2024)
April 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Order re #10 Motion to Remand entered by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. The court will separately grant the stipulation to remand at ECF No. 7, with the County's consent at ECF No. 10. This docket entry terminates the hearing that was set on the County's consent motion. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
April 5, 2024 Filing 17 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by County of Sonoma.. (Willner, Arthur) (Filed on 4/5/2024)
April 3, 2024 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Q&D Construction, LLC re #7 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER (Henderson, Kevin) (Filed on 4/3/2024)
April 3, 2024 Filing 15 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Q&D Construction, LLC.. (Trachtman, Benjamin) (Filed on 4/3/2024)
April 3, 2024 Filing 14 CLERK'S NOTICE: As the earlier docket entries reflect, all parties agree to remand, an issue that requires the consent of all parties because it is a merits issue. There is a stipulation and a motion. One party has consented. If all parties consent, then the court can grant the pending stipulation. If a statement of non-opposition is filed to the pending motion, the court can grant the motion. Having a filed motion on the docket is a five-week process that is inefficient. The court directs the parties to confer within two business days and if appropriate, finalize any consents and statements of non-opposition by then. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ejk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2024)
April 2, 2024 Filing 13 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Bergit Shaw.. (Shapiro, Tad) (Filed on 4/2/2024)
April 2, 2024 Filing 12 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING MOTION HEARING: Motion Hearing #10 Consent MOTION to Remand County of Sonoma Consent to Remand set for 5/9/2024 at 9:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Responses due by 4/15/2024. Replies due by 4/22/2024. (ejk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2024)
April 2, 2024 Filing 11 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs/Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: #http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 4/9/2024. (ejk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2024)
April 1, 2024 Filing 10 Consent MOTION to Remand County of Sonoma Consent to Remand filed by County of Sonoma. Responses due by 4/15/2024. Replies due by 4/22/2024. (Willner, Arthur) (Filed on 4/1/2024)
March 30, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER The court adds that the parties can address the jurisdictional issue by adding a line to their stipulation along the lines of the following: The parties consent to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler's entering this stipulation for remand. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (Beeler, Laurel) (Filed on 3/30/2024)
March 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER. Technically a remand motion is a substantive matter that requires the consent of the parties, including the County which has not appeared yet. The court can issue the remand order as soon as the parties file their consent. Alternatively, the case could be reassigned to a district judge. Signed by Judge Laurel Beeler on March 29, 2024. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2024)
March 29, 2024 Filing 7 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Q&D Construction, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Remanding Case to Sonoma County Superior Court)(Trachtman, Benjamin) (Filed on 3/29/2024)
March 27, 2024 Filing 6 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Bergit Shaw. (Shapiro, Tad) (Filed on 3/27/2024)
March 26, 2024 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Q&D Construction, LLC OF (1) ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND ADR DEADLINES; AND (2) STANDING ORDER FOR MAGISTRATE JUDGE LAUREL BEELER (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Trachtman, Benjamin) (Filed on 3/26/2024)
March 22, 2024 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Joint Case Management Statement due by 6/13/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/20/2024 at 11:00 AM in San Francisco - Videoconference Only. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2024)
March 22, 2024 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 4/5/2024. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2024)
March 22, 2024 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by Q&D Construction, LLC and Disclosure Statement Pursuant to FRCP 7.1(A)(2) (Trachtman, Benjamin) (Filed on 3/22/2024)
March 22, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Sonoma County Superior Court. Their case number is 24CV00050 (Filing Fee: $405.00, receipt number ACANDC-19250318). Filed by Q&D Construction, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Trachtman, Benjamin) (Filed on 3/22/2024) Modified on 3/22/2024 (tn, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shaw et al v. Q&D Construction, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bergit Shaw
Represented By: Tad S. Shapiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dockum Shaw
Represented By: Tad S. Shapiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Q&D Construction, LLC
Represented By: Benjamin Ross Trachtman
Represented By: Kevin Lloyd Henderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Sonoma
Represented By: Arthur Irwin Willner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?