Sadhu v. Commissioner of Social Secuity
Plaintiff: Patti R Sadhu
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Secuity, Martin O'Malley and SSA (INTERESTED PARTY / NEF)
Case Number: 3:2024cv02115
Filed: April 8, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Sallie Kim
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 402 Social Security Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 12, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 6, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim for all further proceedings. Judge Judge Beth Labson Freeman no longer assigned to case, (smc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2024)
May 2, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE FOR ALL PURPOSES. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 5/2/24. (blflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2024)
May 2, 2024 Filing 11 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Martin O'Malley.. (Becia, Franco) (Filed on 5/2/2024)
May 2, 2024 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Franco Becia (Becia, Franco) (Filed on 5/2/2024)
April 22, 2024 Filing 9 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Patti R Sadhu.. (Pena-Mancinas, Jonathan) (Filed on 4/22/2024)
April 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SECOND ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO CONSENT TO OR DECLINE MAGISTRATE JUDGE JURISDICTION. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 4/19/24. (blflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2024)
April 11, 2024 Filing 7 SOCIAL SECURITY PROCEDURAL ORDER (ark, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/11/2024)
April 11, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO CONSENT OR DECLINE MAGISTRATE JUDGE JURISDICTION. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 4/11/24. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Form)(blflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/11/2024)
April 11, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER GRANTING #2 APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 4/11/24. (blflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/11/2024)
April 10, 2024 Filing 4 Case assigned to Judge Beth Labson Freeman. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 4/24/2024. (kmg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2024)
April 10, 2024 Filing 3 Civil Cover Sheet by Patti R Sadhu . (Pena-Mancinas, Jonathan) (Filed on 4/10/2024)
April 9, 2024 #Electronic filing error. Civil Cover Sheet lists plaintiff that is not on complaint. No judge assignment will be made until the document is correct and re-filed. Submit your document using Civil Events > Other Filings > Other Documents > Civil Cover SheetThis filing will not be processed by the clerks office.Please re-file civil cover sheet in its entirety. Re: #1 Complaint filed by Patti R Sadhu (ark, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2024)
April 9, 2024 #Electronic filing error. Defendant listed in this document does not match defendant on complaint. This filing will not be processed by the clerks office.Please re-file in its entirety. Re: #2 MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis filed by Patti R Sadhu (ark, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2024)
April 8, 2024 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis filed by Patti R Sadhu. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Pena-Mancinas, Jonathan) (Filed on 4/8/2024)
April 8, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Secuity. Filed by Patti R Sadhu. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Pena-Mancinas, Jonathan) (Filed on 4/8/2024)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sadhu v. Commissioner of Social Secuity
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patti R Sadhu
Represented By: Jonathan Omar Pena-Mancinas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Secuity
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martin O'Malley
Represented By: Franco Becia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SSA (INTERESTED PARTY / NEF)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?