Trevillion et al v. St. Joseph Health Northern California, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Kim Y. Trevillion and John W. Chaffin
Defendant: St. Joseph Health Northern California, LLC doing business as Providence St. Joseph Hospital-Eureka and Dr. Carlos Eduardo Rodriguez Castro
Case Number: 3:2024cv02221
Filed: April 15, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question: Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 10, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 10, 2024 Filing 17 MOTION to Continue filed by Kim Y. Trevillion. (Attachments: #1 Cover letter and envelope)(cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2024)
June 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 16 PRO SE NOTICE AND ORDER. Signed by Judge Laurel Beeler on 06/10/2024. (ejk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2024)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
June 9, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER There is a pending motion to dismiss, now set for July 18, 2024. The court sees from the docket that the remaining defendant (Carlos Rodriguez Castro) has been served and apparently the due date for a responsive pleading is June 18, 2024. (ECF No. 8.) The court flags the issue that all parties, even non-appearing parties, must consent to magistrate-judge jurisdiction before the court can rule on a dispositive motion. Williams v. King, 875 F.3d 500, 503-05 (9th Cir. 2017). A defendant's consent to magistrate-judge jurisdiction does not waive any defenses, including a defense of lack of service. See, e.g., Feng v. Cnty. of Santa Clara, No. 19-cv-06877-LB, 2019 WL 7194475, at *1 n.1 (N.D. Cal. Dec. 26, 2019); Harper v. City of Cortez, No. 14-cv-02984-KLM, 2015 WL 4113825, at *3 (D. Colo. July 8, 2015); Geiche v. City & Cnty. of San Francisco, No. C 08-3233 JL, 2009 WL 1948830, at *9 (N.D. Cal. July 2, 2009). Thus, even if defendants have not otherwise generally appeared, they can consent to magistrate-judge jurisdiction and the court can decide the pending motion. Cf. Williams, 875 F.3d at 503-05. This means that the non-appearing defendant must consent before the court can decide the pending motion. Given the timing (appearance later this month, hearing next month), the court asks the parties to confer either before or after the remaining defendant appears about the issue of consent and the timing of responsive pleadings. For example, the new defendant may want to file a motion or, alternatively, defer that until the pending motion is decided. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (Beeler, Laurel) (Filed on 6/9/2024)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
June 7, 2024 Filing 14 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by St. Joseph Health Northern California, LLC.. (Schoel, Brett) (Filed on 6/7/2024)
June 5, 2024 Filing 13 CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: Initial Case Management Conference previously set for 9/12/2024 is reset to 10/10/2024 at 11:00 AM in San Francisco - Videoconference Only. Case Management Statement due by 10/3/2024. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/lb General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (ejk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2024)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
June 4, 2024 Filing 12 CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: In light of the pending motion, the court resets the Initial Case Management Conference, previously set for 7/18/2024, to 9/12/2024 at 11:00 AM in San Francisco - Videoconference Only. Case Management Statement due by 9/5/2024. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/lb General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (ejk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2024)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
June 4, 2024 Filing 11 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Defendant St. Joseph Health Northern California, LLC shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: #http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 6/11/2024. (ejk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2024)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
June 4, 2024 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss filed by St. Joseph Health Northern California, LLC. Motion to Dismiss Hearing set for 7/18/2024 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor. Responses due by 6/18/2024. Replies due by 6/25/2024. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points & Authorities, #2 Proposed Order)(Schoel, Brett) (Filed on 6/4/2024)
May 31, 2024 Filing 9 NOTICE Confirming Address by Kim Y. Trevillion (kmm2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2024)
May 20, 2024 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Kim Y. Trevillion. (cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2024)
May 10, 2024 Filing 7 Mail sent to Kim Y. Trevillion returned as undeliverable re #4 Order. (cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2024)
April 18, 2024 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Carlos Eduardo Rodriguez Castro. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2024)
April 18, 2024 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to St. Joseph Health Northern California, LLC. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2024)
April 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE AND ORDER: The attached notice and order notifies the plaintiff of resources available, attaches the district's handbook for litigants who do not have a lawyer, includes a flyer for contacting the court's help desk and instructs the plaintiff about serving the defendants. Signed by Judge Laurel Beeler on 04/18/2024. (Attachments: #1 Self Help Flyer, #2 Pro Se Handbook)(ejk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2024)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
April 15, 2024 Filing 3 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 7/11/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/18/2024 11:00 AM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. (cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2024)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
April 15, 2024 Filing 2 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by John W. Chaffin, Kim Y. Trevillion. (cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2024)
April 15, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (no process) against Carlos Eduardo Rodriguez Castro, St. Joseph Health Northern California, LLC (Filing fee $ 405.00, 311168543). Filed by Kim Y. Trevillion, John W. Chaffin. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Receipt)(cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2024)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trevillion et al v. St. Joseph Health Northern California, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kim Y. Trevillion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John W. Chaffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Joseph Health Northern California, LLC doing business as Providence St. Joseph Hospital-Eureka
Represented By: Brett Schoel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Carlos Eduardo Rodriguez Castro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?