Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 73.222.177.8
Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Defendant: John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 73.222.177.8
Case Number: 3:2024cv02495
Filed: April 25, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Joseph C Spero
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 101 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 3, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER by Judge Joseph C. Spero granting #7 Ex Parte Application for Leave to Serve a Third Party Subpoena Prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference. (jcslc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2024)
May 9, 2024 Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC.. (Bandlow, Lincoln) (Filed on 5/9/2024)
May 8, 2024 Filing 7 Ex Parte Application for Leave to Serve a Third Party Subpoena Prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-D, #2 Proposed Order)(Bandlow, Lincoln) (Filed on 5/8/2024)
April 26, 2024 Filing 6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 7/26/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/2/2024 02:00 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. (msr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2024)
April 26, 2024 Filing 5 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 5/10/2024. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2024)
April 26, 2024 Remark: Copyright Report #4 emailed to Copyright Office. (msr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2024)
April 25, 2024 Filing 4 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding Copyright (cc: form mailed to register). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Bandlow, Lincoln) (Filed on 4/25/2024)
April 25, 2024 Filing 3 Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC identifying Corporate Parent General Media Systems, LLC for Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Bandlow, Lincoln) (Filed on 4/25/2024)
April 25, 2024 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC identifying Corporate Parent General Media Systems, LLC, Other Affiliate John Doe, Defendant for Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Bandlow, Lincoln) (Filed on 4/25/2024)
April 25, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Copyright Infringement against John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 73.222.177.8 ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACANDC-19358117.). Filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Bandlow, Lincoln) (Filed on 4/25/2024)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 73.222.177.8
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Lincoln Dee Bandlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 73.222.177.8
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?