Bradford et al v. Anschuetz et al
Plaintiff: Galen Bradford and Gary Brown
Defendant: Nathaniel Anschuetz, Jonathan Bram, Guthrie Dundas, Elizabeth Eby, Peter Faricy, Jonathan Fieldsend, Vinayak Hegde, Steven Louden, Thomas McDaniel, Nathalie Portes-Laville, Vincent Stoquart, Audrey Zibelman and SunPower Corporation
Case Number: 3:2024cv02799
Filed: May 9, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Peter H Kang
Referring Judge: Rita F Lin
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 21, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 21, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER by Judge Rita F. Lin granting #30 Stipulation Consolidating Actions. (mkl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2024)
June 21, 2024 Filing 30 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER CONSOLIDATING ACTIONS filed by Nathaniel Anschuetz, Jonathan Bram, Guthrie Dundas, Elizabeth Eby, Peter Faricy, Jonathan Fieldsend, Vinayak Hegde, Steven Louden, Thomas McDaniel, Nathalie Portes-Laville, Vincent Stoquart, SunPower Corporation, Audrey Zibelman. (Henderson, Katherine) (Filed on 6/21/2024)
June 21, 2024 Filing 29 Case Reassigned to Judge Rita F. Lin. Judge James Donato no longer assigned to the case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. (mbc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2024)
June 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER RELATING CASE to 24-cv-00247-RFL. Signed by Judge Rita F. Lin on 6/20/2024. (mkl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2024)
June 17, 2024 Filing 27 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Gary Brown, Galen Bradford. Service waived by Audrey Zibelman waiver sent on 6/14/2024, answer due 8/13/2024. (Fortunato, Melissa) (Filed on 6/17/2024)
June 17, 2024 Filing 26 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Gary Brown, Galen Bradford. Service waived by SunPower Corporation waiver sent on 6/14/2024, answer due 8/13/2024. (Fortunato, Melissa) (Filed on 6/17/2024)
June 17, 2024 Filing 25 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Gary Brown, Galen Bradford. Service waived by Vincent Stoquart waiver sent on 6/14/2024, answer due 8/13/2024. (Fortunato, Melissa) (Filed on 6/17/2024)
June 17, 2024 Filing 24 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Gary Brown, Galen Bradford. Service waived by Nathalie Portes-Laville waiver sent on 6/14/2024, answer due 8/13/2024. (Fortunato, Melissa) (Filed on 6/17/2024)
June 17, 2024 Filing 23 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Gary Brown, Galen Bradford. Service waived by Thomas McDaniel waiver sent on 6/14/2024, answer due 8/13/2024. (Fortunato, Melissa) (Filed on 6/17/2024)
June 17, 2024 Filing 22 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Gary Brown, Galen Bradford. Service waived by Steven Louden waiver sent on 6/14/2024, answer due 8/13/2024. (Fortunato, Melissa) (Filed on 6/17/2024)
June 17, 2024 Filing 21 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Gary Brown, Galen Bradford. Service waived by Vinayak Hegde waiver sent on 6/14/2024, answer due 8/13/2024. (Fortunato, Melissa) (Filed on 6/17/2024)
June 17, 2024 Filing 20 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Gary Brown, Galen Bradford. Service waived by Jonathan Fieldsend waiver sent on 6/14/2024, answer due 8/13/2024. (Fortunato, Melissa) (Filed on 6/17/2024)
June 17, 2024 Filing 19 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Gary Brown, Galen Bradford. Service waived by Peter Faricy waiver sent on 6/14/2024, answer due 8/13/2024. (Fortunato, Melissa) (Filed on 6/17/2024)
June 17, 2024 Filing 18 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Gary Brown, Galen Bradford. Service waived by Elizabeth Eby waiver sent on 6/14/2024, answer due 8/13/2024. (Fortunato, Melissa) (Filed on 6/17/2024)
June 17, 2024 Filing 17 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Gary Brown, Galen Bradford. Service waived by Guthrie Dundas waiver sent on 6/14/2024, answer due 8/13/2024. (Fortunato, Melissa) (Filed on 6/17/2024)
June 17, 2024 Filing 16 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Gary Brown, Galen Bradford. Service waived by Jonathan Bram waiver sent on 6/14/2024, answer due 8/13/2024. (Fortunato, Melissa) (Filed on 6/17/2024)
June 17, 2024 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Gary Brown, Galen Bradford. Service waived by Nathaniel Anschuetz waiver sent on 6/14/2024, answer due 8/13/2024. (Fortunato, Melissa) (Filed on 6/17/2024)
June 12, 2024 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Dylan Grace Savage for Defendants and Nominal Defendant (Savage, Dylan) (Filed on 6/12/2024)
June 12, 2024 Filing 13 NOTICE by Nathaniel Anschuetz, Jonathan Bram, Guthrie Dundas, Elizabeth Eby, Peter Faricy, Jonathan Fieldsend, Vinayak Hegde, Steven Louden, Thomas McDaniel, Nathalie Portes-Laville, Vincent Stoquart, SunPower Corporation, Audrey Zibelman NOTICE OF FILING OF ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO CONSIDER WHETHER CASES SHOULD BE RELATED (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Henderson, Katherine) (Filed on 6/12/2024) Modified on 6/13/2024 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
June 12, 2024 Filing 12 Rule 7.1 Disclosures by SunPower Corporation identifying Corporate Parent BlackRock Inc., Corporate Parent TotalEnergies SE, Corporate Parent Sol Holding, LLC, Corporate Parent Global Infrastructure Management, LLC, Other Affiliate XL Specialty Insurance Company for SunPower Corporation. (Henderson, Katherine) (Filed on 6/12/2024) Modified on 6/13/2024 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
June 12, 2024 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine Leigh Henderson for Defendants and Nominal Defendant (Henderson, Katherine) (Filed on 6/12/2024)
May 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/8/2024 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor. Case Management Statement due by 8/1/2024. Signed by Judge James Donato on 5/29/2024. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2024)
May 28, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge James Donato for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Peter H Kang no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Clerk on 05/28/2024. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(mbc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2024)
May 24, 2024 Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (jaf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2024)
May 24, 2024 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Galen Bradford, Gary Brown.. (Fortunato, Melissa) (Filed on 5/24/2024)
May 10, 2024 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Nathaniel Anschuetz, Jonathan Bram, Guthrie Dundas, Elizabeth Eby, Peter Faricy, Jonathan Fieldsend, Vinayak Hegde, Steven Louden, Thomas McDaniel, Nathalie Portes-Laville, Vincent Stoquart, SunPower Corporation. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2024)
May 10, 2024 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 8/1/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/8/2024 10:30 AM. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2024)
May 10, 2024 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Peter H Kang. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 5/24/2024. (kmg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2024)
May 9, 2024 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by Galen Bradford, Gary Brown (Passmore, Marion) (Filed on 5/9/2024)
May 9, 2024 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Passmore, Marion) (Filed on 5/9/2024)
May 9, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Nathaniel Anschuetz, Jonathan Bram, Guthrie Dundas, Elizabeth Eby, Peter Faricy, Jonathan Fieldsend, Vinayak Hegde, Steven Louden, Thomas McDaniel, Nathalie Portes-Laville, Vincent Stoquart, SunPower Corporation, Audrey Zibelman ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACANDC-19402043.). Filed by Gary Brown, Galen Bradford. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Passmore, Marion) (Filed on 5/9/2024)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bradford et al v. Anschuetz et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Galen Bradford
Represented By: Marion Curry Passmore
Represented By: Melissa Ann Fortunato
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Brown
Represented By: Marion Curry Passmore
Represented By: Melissa Ann Fortunato
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nathaniel Anschuetz
Represented By: Katherine Leigh Henderson
Represented By: Dylan Grace Savage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan Bram
Represented By: Katherine Leigh Henderson
Represented By: Dylan Grace Savage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guthrie Dundas
Represented By: Katherine Leigh Henderson
Represented By: Dylan Grace Savage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizabeth Eby
Represented By: Katherine Leigh Henderson
Represented By: Dylan Grace Savage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter Faricy
Represented By: Katherine Leigh Henderson
Represented By: Dylan Grace Savage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan Fieldsend
Represented By: Katherine Leigh Henderson
Represented By: Dylan Grace Savage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vinayak Hegde
Represented By: Katherine Leigh Henderson
Represented By: Dylan Grace Savage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Louden
Represented By: Katherine Leigh Henderson
Represented By: Dylan Grace Savage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas McDaniel
Represented By: Katherine Leigh Henderson
Represented By: Dylan Grace Savage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nathalie Portes-Laville
Represented By: Katherine Leigh Henderson
Represented By: Dylan Grace Savage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vincent Stoquart
Represented By: Katherine Leigh Henderson
Represented By: Dylan Grace Savage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Audrey Zibelman
Represented By: Katherine Leigh Henderson
Represented By: Dylan Grace Savage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SunPower Corporation
Represented By: Katherine Leigh Henderson
Represented By: Dylan Grace Savage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?