Branner v. Ayers, et al

Petitioner: Willie Branner
Respondent: Robert L. Ayers
Miscellaneous: California Appellate Project and Habeas Corpus Resource Center
Case Number: 4:1990cv03219
Filed: November 9, 1990
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: D. Lowell Jensen
Nature of Suit: Death Penalty
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 2, 2014 356 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge D. Lowell Jensen Granting 355 Motion for Second Enlargement of Time Relating to Petitioner's Brief Addressing Exceptions to Procedural Default for First Group of Defaulted Claims. (jgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2014)
February 13, 2014 350 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part Respondent's Motion to Reconsider Findings on Procedural Default. Signed by Judge D. Lowell Jensen on 2/13/14. (jgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2014)
January 15, 2014 347 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying Respondent's Updated Motion to Dismiss Claims Based on Statute of Limitations. Signed by Judge D. Lowell Jensen on 1/14/14. (jgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2014)
January 14, 2014 346 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge D. Lowell Jensen Granting in Part and Denying in Part 329 Motion to Reconsider Findings on Procedural Default. (jgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2014)
July 21, 2011 331 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge D. Lowell Jensen granting 330 Petitioner's Ex parte Application/Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Relating to Opposition to Respondent's 329 MOTION TO RECONSIDER FINDINGS ON PROCEDURAL DEFAULT. Time enlar ged by 45 days. Petitioner to file and serve Opposition to Respondent's Motion to Reconsider Findings on Procedural Default by 9/8/2011. Respondent shall file and serve his Reply brief in Support of Respondent's Motion to Dismss 30 days thereafter, on or before 10/10/2011. Court shall set a hearing date if necessary. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2011)
May 26, 2011 327 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Respondent's Motion for Leave to Move for Reconsideration of Order re Adequacy of State Procedural Bars re 326 . Respondent shall file his motion within 45 days of the date of this Order. Petitioner shall file an opposition within 45 days of the date of service of respondent's brief. Respondent shall file a reply within 30 days of serve of petitioner's brief. Signed by Judge D. Lowell Jensen on 5/26/2011. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2011)
September 2, 2008 275 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge D. Lowell Jensen granting 274 Respondent's Ex Parte Application/Motion for Extension of Time to File an updated Motion to Dismiss based on the AEDPA Statute of Limitations. Time enlarged by 60 days. Respondent has to 10/28/08 to file and serve Updated Motion. Petitioner's opposition filed within 45 days of date of service of motion. Respondent's reply filed within 30 days of date of service of opposition. Court shall set a hearing date if necessary. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Branner v. Ayers, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Willie Branner
Represented By: David Eiseman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Miscellaneous: California Appellate Project
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Miscellaneous: Habeas Corpus Resource Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Robert L. Ayers
Represented By: Mark S. Howell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?