Cavellini, et al v. Harris, et al

Plaintiff: Roy T. Cavellini, Marlene Morehead and Kandy Rinard Wilson
Defendant: Michael F. Harris, Harris Realty Co Inc and Harris Realty Pension/Profit-Sharing Plan
Trustee: Walter Slater
Case Number: 4:1993cv00057
Filed: January 5, 1993
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Saundra Brown Armstrong
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 8, 2016 391 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 383 Claim of Exemption filed by Michael F. Harris. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 7/8/2016. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2016)
November 10, 2015 382 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting in part and denying in part Plaintiffs' 350 Motion to for Assignment Order Against Judgment Debtor. Judgment Debtor's request for leave to file a claim of exemption is granted, and he shall file a properly noticed motion for claim of exemption within 14 days. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2015)
April 27, 2015 371 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 370 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Extending Time to File Supplemental Briefs re 368 Order, filed by Roy T. Cavellini, Michael F. Harris. 350 Motion Hearing continued to 8/6/2015 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 4/27/2015. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2015)
April 17, 2015 368 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER requiring further briefing in light of Defendant's 367 Notice of death of Trustor Rita E. Harris. Plaintiffs' supplemental brief due by 5/1/2015. Defendant's brief due by 5/15/2015. Motion Hearing on 350 Motion for Assignment Order continued to 6/18/2015 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 4/17/2015. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2015)
November 4, 2014 359 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER vacating the November 6, 2014 hearing and requiring Supplemental Briefing regarding Plaintiffs' 350 MOTION for Assignment Order Against Judgment Debtor filed by Roy T. Cavellini. Plaintiffs' brief is due by 12/1/2014. Defendant's response is due by 12/12/2014. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 11/4/2014. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2014)
June 11, 2014 349 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER WITHDRAWING CROSS MOTIONS re 348 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 341 Opposition/Response to Motion, 332 MOTION for Protective Order/Alternatively to Quash Subpoena and for Stay filed by Roy T. Cavelli ni, Rita Harris, Motions terminated: 348 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 341 Opposition/Response to Motion, 332 MOTION for Protective Order/Alternatively to Quash Subpoena and for Stay filed by Roy T. Cavellini, Rita Harris, 332 MOTION for Protective Order/Alternatively to Quash Subpoena and for Stay filed by Rita Harris.. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 6/11/14. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2014)
May 21, 2014 345 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER requiring Plaintiff and third party Rita Harris to file a Joint Status Report by 5/28/2014 re 332 MOTION for Protective Order/Alternatively to Quash Subpoena and for Stay filed by Rita Harris. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 5/21/2014. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2014)
March 25, 2014 343 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 342 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 341 Opposition/Response to Motion, 332 MOTION for Protective Order/Alternatively to Quash Subpoena and for Stay filed by Kandy Rinard Wilson, Marlene Morehead, Roy T. Cavellini, Rita Harris. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 3/25/14. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2014)
March 10, 2014 340 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Plaintiffs' Show Cause Response due by 3/17/2014. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 3/10/2014. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2014)
January 10, 2013 305 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION FOR DISBURSEMENT OF FUNDS AND VACATING 1/17/2013 HEARING re 289 MOTION for Claim of Exemption filed by Patricia Ann Larson, 281 MOTION for Hearing Date On Judgment Debtor's Claim of Exemption filed by Roy T. Cavellini, 292 MOTION for Claim of Exemption of Michael F. Harris filed by Michael F. Harris. Signed by Judge 1/10/2013 on 1/10/2013. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cavellini, et al v. Harris, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roy T. Cavellini
Represented By: David J. Cook
Represented By: Geoffrey V. White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marlene Morehead
Represented By: David J. Cook
Represented By: Geoffrey V. White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kandy Rinard Wilson
Represented By: David J. Cook
Represented By: Geoffrey V. White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael F. Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harris Realty Co Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harris Realty Pension/Profit-Sharing Plan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: Walter Slater
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?