Hill v. Ayers

Petitioner: Michael S. Hill
Respondent: Robert L. Ayers, Jr.
Miscellaneous: Habeas Corpus Resource Center, California Appellate Project and Geo. O. Kolombatovich
Case Number: 4:1994cv00641
Filed: December 21, 2009
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
Presiding Judge: Claudia Wilken
Nature of Suit: Death Penalty - Habeas Corpus
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Ptn for Writ of H/C - Stay of Execution

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 12, 2016 392 Opinion or Order of the Court SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 2/12/2016. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2016)
February 3, 2015 370 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Hon. Vince Chhabria granting 365 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. This entry is a correction of dkt 369 . The same order is posted in both entries.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2015)
February 2, 2015 369 Opinion or Order of the Court ***PLEASE DISREGARD THIS ENTRY, MOTIONS TERMINATED ERRONEOUSLY*** ORDER by Judge Vince Chhabria granting 359 Motion for counsel Lynne Coffin to be relieved as counsel of record and appointing counsel; granting 365 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (knmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2015) Modified on 2/3/2015 (knm, COURT STAFF).
August 29, 2014 354 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON DISCOVERY ISSUE. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 8/29/2014. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2014)
May 23, 2014 352 Opinion or Order of the Court SCHEDULING ORDER. Status Report due by 8/8/2014. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 5/23/2014. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2014)
March 5, 2014 350 Opinion or Order of the Court SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 3/5/2014. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2014)
February 25, 2014 347 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 2/25/2014. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2014)
July 3, 2013 342 Opinion or Order of the Court SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 7/3/2013. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/3/2013)
May 10, 2013 340 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING PETITIONERS REQUEST REGARDING DISCOVERY. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 5/10/2013. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2013)
April 4, 2013 338 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY. Status Report due by 5/6/2013. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 4/4/2013. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2013)
February 27, 2013 336 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING PETITIONERS REQUEST FOR EVIDENTIARY HEARING AND FUNDING re 335 . Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 2/27/2013. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2013)
July 31, 2012 334 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting 332 Motion for Permission To Issue And Serve Supoenas Duces Tecum. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2012)
May 29, 2012 331 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken GRANTING PETITIONERS 327 MOTION FOR DISCOVERY. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2012)
February 24, 2012 325 Opinion or Order of the Court SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 2/24/2012. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2012)
January 6, 2012 323 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER FINDING RESTORATION OF PETITIONERS COMPETENCY. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 1/6/2012. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2012)
December 14, 2011 318 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING FILING OF UPDATED STATUS REPORT BY PETITIONER. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 12/14/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2011)
September 13, 2011 316 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING FILING OF STATUS REPORT BY PETITIONER. Status Report due by 9/27/2011.. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 9/13/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2011)
April 21, 2011 312 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING COMPETENCY EVALUATIONS. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 4/21/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2011)
December 1, 2010 304 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER FOR BRIEFING REGARDING PETITIONER'S COMPETENCE. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 12/1/2010. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2010)
May 10, 2010 295 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING PROCEDURES FOR COMPETENCY EXAMINATION. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 5/10/10. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2010)
December 21, 2009 289 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SCHEDULING FILING OF MOTION FOR COMPETENCY EXAMINATION. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 12/21/09. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2009)
July 20, 2009 287 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER FOR STATUS REPORTS IN CAPITAL CASE. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 7/20/09. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2009)
December 15, 2008 282 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING FILING OF STATUS REPORT. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 12/15/08. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hill v. Ayers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Michael S. Hill
Represented By: Lynne S. Coffin(Designation CJA Appointment)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Miscellaneous: Habeas Corpus Resource Center
Represented By: Michael David Laurence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Miscellaneous: California Appellate Project
Represented By: Michael G. Millman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Miscellaneous: Geo. O. Kolombatovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Robert L. Ayers, Jr.
Represented By: Juliet B. Haley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?