Rowland v. Ayers, et al

Petitioner: Guy Kevin Rowland
Respondent: John N. Maddock and Robert L. Ayers
Miscellaneous: Habeas Corpus Resource Center and California Appellate Project
Case Number: 4:1994cv03037
Filed: September 9, 2009
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
Presiding Judge: Saundra Brown Armstrong
Nature of Suit: Death Penalty - Habeas Corpus
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Ptn for Writ of H/C - Stay of Execution

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 21, 2011 257 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG granting 256 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2011)
September 14, 2010 252 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING CAUSE AND PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 9/13/10. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2010)
August 10, 2010 250 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re Submission of Reply to Brief on Cause and Prejudice. Petitioner to File Reply no later than August 19, 2010. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 8/10/10. (kc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2010)
September 9, 2009 244 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong GRANTING 243 Motion for Leave to File Corrected Traverse. A Corrected Traverse is due by 09/16/09 (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2009) Modified on 9/10/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rowland v. Ayers, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Guy Kevin Rowland
Represented By: Joel Levine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: John N. Maddock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Robert L. Ayers
Represented By: Gerald August Engler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Miscellaneous: Habeas Corpus Resource Center
Represented By: Michael David Laurence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Miscellaneous: California Appellate Project
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?