Rodrigues v. Calderon

Petitioner: Jose Arnaldo Rodrigues
Respondent: Arthur Calderon
Miscellaneous: Habeas Corpus Resource Center and California Appellate Project
Case Number: 4:1996cv01831
Filed: May 17, 1996
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Marin
Presiding Judge: Claudia Wilken
Nature of Suit: Death Penalty
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 6, 2016 397 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 9/6/16. (napS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/6/2016)
March 25, 2016 390 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER FOR ORAL ARGUMENT. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 3/25/16. Motion Hearing set for 4/26/2016 02:30 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Claudia Wilken.(jebS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2016)
January 5, 2015 369 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting 368 Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2015)
December 4, 2014 365 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting 364 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Replies due by 12/8/2014. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2014)
November 25, 2014 363 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting 362 Motion REQUESTING ENLARGING THE TIME TO FILE REPLY. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2014)
November 12, 2014 360 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting 359 Motion for Extension of Time to File. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2014)
October 16, 2014 358 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge 10/16/2014 Granting 357 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Replies due by 11/10/2014. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2014)
April 25, 2012 341 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting 340 Motion for Extension of Time to File (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2012)
January 3, 2012 337 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting 336 Motion for Extension of Time to File (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2012)
September 28, 2011 333 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting 332 Motion for Extension of Time to File. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2011)
August 11, 2011 328 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting 327 Motion for Extension of Time to File. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2011)
June 16, 2011 322 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting 320 Motion for Extension of Time to File (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2011)
April 12, 2011 316 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting 315 Motion for Extension of Time to File (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2011)
March 17, 2011 314 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting 313 Motion for Extension of Time to File(Order Enlarging the Time to File Traverse). (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2011)
January 24, 2011 311 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken granting 308 Motion for Extension of Time to File (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2011)
July 12, 2010 304 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING CLAIMS AS MOOT AND REQUIRING PETITIONER TO FILE TRAVERSE. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 7/12/2010. (cwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2010)
May 6, 2010 300 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 5/6/2010. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2010)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rodrigues v. Calderon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jose Arnaldo Rodrigues
Represented By: Miro Frank Cizin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Arthur Calderon
Represented By: Joan Killeen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Miscellaneous: Habeas Corpus Resource Center
Represented By: Cristina Borde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Miscellaneous: California Appellate Project
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?