Gatx/Airlog Company, et al v. Evergreen Intl, et al

Plaintiff: Gatx/Airlog Company, GATX Capital Corp, The Bank of New York, Airlong Management Corp. and Kalitta Air L.L.C.
Defendant: Evergreen International Airlines, Inc., Pemco Aeroplex, Inc., Frederick L. Hatten, Sanford P. Burnstein, Central Texas Technologies Airborne Systems Inc, Elsinore, L.P., Elsinore Aerospace Services, Elsinore Engineering, GATX New Aircraft Corporation and Central Texas Airborne Systems Inc
Special_master: Paul Gordon and Paul M. Gordon
Case Number: 4:1996cv02494
Filed: August 28, 2009
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
Referring Judge: Joseph C. Spero
Presiding Judge: Claudia Wilken
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 6, 2014 2295 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting 2294 Motion for Release of Bond Obligation. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2014)
February 12, 2014 2291 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken REDUCING COSTS AWARDED TO DEFENDANTS ON REMAND. (denying as moot 2290 Motion to Expedite) (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2014)
May 17, 2013 2282 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 5/17/2013. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2013)
April 17, 2013 2279 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken GRANTING 2277 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2013)
April 1, 2013 2276 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Claudia WilkenRE: 2273 SUPERSEDEAS BOND (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2013)
January 29, 2013 2271 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: SUPERSEDEAS BOND. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 1/29/2013. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2013)
December 5, 2012 2264 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken GRANTING IN PART PLAINTIFF'S 2241 MOTION FOR REVIEW OF CLERK'S NOTICE OF TAXABLE COSTS AND GRANTING STAY. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2012)
March 20, 2012 2227 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken DENYING CTAS'S 2220 MOTION FOR RULING ON SPECIAL RELATIONSHIP AND GRANTING ITS REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2012)
November 29, 2011 2211 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO PAY ADDITIONAL ATTENDANCE FEE. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 11/29/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2011)
November 20, 2011 2202 Opinion or Order of the Court JURY INSTRUCTIONS. (cwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2011)
October 28, 2011 2159 Opinion or Order of the Court PRELIMINARY JURY INSTRUCTIONS [VERSION TWO]. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on October 28, 2011. (cwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2011)
October 26, 2011 2156 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 2155 Permission to Bring Equipment to the Courtroom for Use During Trial. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 10/26/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2011)
July 15, 2011 2083 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken DENYING PLAINTIFFS 2079 MOTION TO EXPEDITE AND 2078 MOTION TO PRECLUDE TESTIMONY. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2011)
July 6, 2011 2081 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Regarding Plaintiff's 2079 MOTION to Expedite. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 7/6/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2011)
April 5, 2011 2076 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE PLAINTIFFS 2073 MOTION IN LIMINE. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2011)
December 1, 2010 2071 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER ON DEFENDANTS 2066 MOTION TO EXTEND TRIAL TIME. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 12/1/2010. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2010)
July 28, 2010 2047 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Denying 2041 Plaintiff's Motion to Adjourn Trial (cwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2010)
July 21, 2010 2046 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 2044 Granting Stipulated Withdrawal of Stipulation. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 7/21/2010. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2010)
June 14, 2010 2039 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER on Stipulation Re Scheduling the Trial (cwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2010)
August 28, 2009 2037 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 2036 granting STIPULATION Extending Mediation Date. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 8/28/09. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2009)
June 11, 2009 2035 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER re 2034 Order Setting Trial, Set Hearings. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 6/10/09. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2009)
June 10, 2009 2034 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING TRIAL. Jury Trial set for 11/1/2010 08:30 AM. Pretrial Conference set for 10/12/2010 02:00 PM.. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 6/10/09. ***SEE AMENDED ORDER, DOCUMENT NO 2035***(scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2009) Modified on 6/12/2009 (cjl, COURT STAFF).
March 30, 2009 2022 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 2021 granting STIPULATION REGARDING HEARING ON CENTRAL TEXAS AIRBORNE SYSTEM, INC.'S RENEWED MOTION FOR JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW. Motion Hearing set for 4/30/2009 02:00 PM.. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 3/30/09. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2009)
January 5, 2009 2013 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE, DIRECTING FURTHER BRIEFING AND DIRECTING PARTIES TO ATTEND PRIVATE MEDIATION Motion. Hearing set for 3/12/2009 02:00 PM.. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 1/5/09. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2009)
November 17, 2008 2011 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 2010 GRANTING STIPULATION RE RESCHEDULING THE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Further Case Management Conference set for 1/6/2009 02:00 PM.. Signed by Judge CLAUDIA WILKEN on 11/17/08. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gatx/Airlog Company, et al v. Evergreen Intl, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gatx/Airlog Company
Represented By: Scott Devereaux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GATX Capital Corp
Represented By: Scott Devereaux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Bank of New York
Represented By: Aron M. Bookman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Airlong Management Corp.
Represented By: Christopher Paul Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kalitta Air L.L.C.
Represented By: Charles Nathan Freiberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Evergreen International Airlines, Inc.
Represented By: C. Dana Hobart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pemco Aeroplex, Inc.
Represented By: Stephen Craig Kenney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frederick L. Hatten
Represented By: Christopher Paul Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanford P. Burnstein
Represented By: Christopher Paul Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Central Texas Technologies Airborne Systems Inc
Represented By: Gregory Charles Read
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elsinore, L.P.
Represented By: Robert Alan Julian, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elsinore Aerospace Services
Represented By: Robert Alan Julian, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elsinore Engineering
Represented By: Scott Jay Spolin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GATX New Aircraft Corporation
Represented By: Scott Devereaux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Central Texas Airborne Systems Inc
Represented By: David Debusschere
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Special_master: Paul Gordon
Represented By: Paul M. Gordon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Special_master: Paul M. Gordon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?