Garner v. Mayle

Petitioner: Arthur Grady Garner
Respondent: B. A. Mayle
Case Number: 4:1999cv02863
Filed: December 2, 2009
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
Referring Judge: James Larson
Presiding Judge: Claudia Wilken
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 22, 2009 124 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 123 Granting Certificate of Appealability. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 12/22/2009. (cwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2009)
December 2, 2009 119 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 118 VACATING HEARING AND SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 12/2/09. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2009)
September 30, 2009 116 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying Petition for Writ of Habeas CorpusSigned by Judge Claudia Wilken on September 30, 2009. (cwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2009)
February 19, 2009 111 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 110 REGARDING PETITIONERS MOTION FOR STATUS OF CASE. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 2/19/09. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2009)
September 24, 2008 105 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE. Status Conference set for 10/14/2008 02:00 PM.. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 9/24/08. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garner v. Mayle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Arthur Grady Garner
Represented By: Erik G. Babcock(Designation CJA Appointment)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: B. A. Mayle
Represented By: Peggy S. Ruffra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?