Ervin v. Ayers

Petitioner: Curtis Lee Ervin
Respondent: Jeanne Woodford and Robert L. Ayers
Miscellaneous: Habeas Corpus Resource Center and California Appellate Project
Case Number: 4:2000cv01228
Filed: February 1, 2010
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
Presiding Judge: Claudia Wilken
Nature of Suit: Other
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Ptn for Writ of H/C - Stay of Execution

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 13, 2016 292 Opinion or Order of the Court Order Granting 213 Respondent's Motion for Summary Judgment as to Claims 34 and 37. Signed by Judge Lucy Koh. (lhklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2016)
September 8, 2016 291 Opinion or Order of the Court Order Granting Respondent's Motion for Summary Judgment as to Claim 25. Signed by Judge Lucy Koh on 09/08/2016. (lhklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2016)
September 7, 2016 290 Opinion or Order of the Court Order Granting Respondent's Motion for Summary Judgment as to Claims 26 and 27. Signed by Judge Lucy Koh on 09/07/2016. (lhklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/7/2016)
September 1, 2016 289 Opinion or Order of the Court Order Granting Respondent's Motion for Summary Judgment as to Claims 19, 20, and 30. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on September 1, 2016. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/1/2016)
August 17, 2016 288 Opinion or Order of the Court Order Granting Respondent's Motion for Summary Judgment on Claims 24 and 31. Signed by Judge Lucy Koh on 08/17/2016. (lhklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2016)
August 15, 2016 287 Opinion or Order of the Court Order Granting Respondent's Motion for Summary Judgment on Claims 28 and 29. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on August 15, 2016. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2016)
July 8, 2016 286 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING RESPONDENT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON CLAIMS 32 AND 33. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 07/08/2016. (lhklc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2016)
June 16, 2016 285 Opinion or Order of the Court Order Granting Respondent's Motion for Summary Judgment on Claims 22 and 23. Signed by Judge Lucy Koh on 06/16/2016. (lhklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2016)
June 15, 2016 284 Opinion or Order of the Court Order Granting Respondent's Motion for Summary Judgment on Claims 6 and 16. Signed by Judge Lucy Koh on 06/15/2016. (lhklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2016)
June 14, 2016 283 Opinion or Order of the Court Order Granting Respondent's Motion for Summary Judgment on Claims 21, 35, and 36. Signed by Judge Lucy Koh on 06/14/2016. (lhklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2016)
March 29, 2016 282 Opinion or Order of the Court Order Granting Respondent's Motion for Summary Judgment on Claims 7-13. Signed by Judge Lucy Koh on 03/29/2016. (lhklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2016)
March 28, 2016 281 Opinion or Order of the Court Order Granting Respondent's Motion for Summary Judgment on Claims 14-15 and 17-18. Signed by Judge Lucy Koh on 03/28/2016. (lhklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2016)
December 11, 2015 271 Opinion or Order of the Court Order Granting Respondent's Motion for Summary Judgment on Claims 1 Through 5 and Requesting Filing of Affidavits for Claim 6. Signed by Judge Lucy Koh on 12/11/2015. (lhklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2015)
March 16, 2015 269 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 3/16/2015. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2015)
August 12, 2013 265 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting 264 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Replies due by 8/16/2013. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2013)
July 11, 2013 263 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting 262 MOTION FOR 30-DAY EXTENSION OF TIME TO AUGUST 9, 2013, FOR FILING REPLY TO RESPONDENTS OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR EVIDENTIARY HEARING. Replies due by 8/9/2013. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2013)
June 11, 2013 261 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting 260 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 213 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Responses due by 7/10/2013. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2013)
January 14, 2013 252 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting 250 Motion to File 249 Amended Opposition to State's Motion for Summary Judgment and Motion for Evidentiary Hearing. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2013)
November 15, 2012 243 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting 240 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 213 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Responses due by 12/17/2012. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2012)
September 10, 2012 236 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting 235 Stipulation for Fifth 30-Day Extension of Time to File Response to Summary Judgment Motion. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2012)
July 17, 2012 232 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken 231 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER RESOLVING 222 SUPPLEMENTAL MOTION FOR ORDER THAT SAN QUENTIN STATE PRISON PERMIT PETITIONER'S COUNSEL TO CONDUCT IN-PERSON REVIEW OF RECORDED TELEPHONE CALLS AND FOR ACCESS TO RELATED MATERIAL, INCLUDING LOGS AND TRANSCRIPTIONS. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2012)
April 11, 2012 220 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting 217 PETITIONERS MOTION FOR DISCOVERY OF RECORDED TELEPHONE CALLS.(ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/11/2012)
February 27, 2012 216 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken DENYING PETITIONERS 214 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE PLEADING UNDER SEAL. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2012)
October 25, 2011 199 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken granting 198 Motion AMENDING POST-DISCOVERY CASE SCHE-DULE. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2011)
October 17, 2011 197 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 193 , 196 Sealing Declaration of Ted C. Radosevich in Support of Response of East Bay Regional Park District Police Department to Court's Order Re: Document Submitted for in Camera Review. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 10/17/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2011)
September 30, 2011 193 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING DOCUMENT SUBMITTED FOR IN CAMERA REVIEW. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 9/30/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2011)
September 8, 2011 189 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken GRANTING PETITIONERS 178 MOTION TO DEPOSE GARY HINES, AND GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART PETITIONERS 179 MOTION FOR SUPPLEMENTAL DISCOVERY. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2011)
December 22, 2010 177 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken granting 176 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2010)
August 6, 2010 172 Opinion or Order of the Court SCHEDULING ORDER re 171 . Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 8/6/2010. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2010)
June 15, 2010 170 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 169 Granting Stipulation Extending Time to File Joint Statement of Discovery Schedule. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 6/15/2010. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2010)
May 27, 2010 168 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 164 Granting Stipulation Extending Time to File Joint Statement of Discovery Schedule. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 5/27/2010. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2010)
April 16, 2010 163 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 162 Granting Stipulation Extending Time For Filing Joint Statement Of Proposed Schedule For Completion Of Discovery.Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 04/16/2010. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2010)
February 1, 2010 160 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING E-FILING OF PREVIOUSLY FILED DOCUMENTS. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 2/1/10. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2010)
November 18, 2009 159 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 157 GRANTING STIPULATION Extending Time For Reply to Opposition to Motion for Discovery. Signed by Judge CLAUDIA WILKEN on 11/18/09. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2009)
October 14, 2009 156 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 155 granting STIPULATION Extending Time For Reply to Opposition to Motion for Discovery.. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 10/14/09. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2009)
September 15, 2009 154 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting re 153 Stipulation Extending Time for Reply to Opposition to Motion For Discovery filed by Curtis Lee Ervin (due: 10/12/09). Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 9/14/09. (fj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2009)
May 29, 2009 142 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting re 141 Stipulation Extending Time to File Motion For Discovery filed by Curtis Lee Ervin, Robert L. Ayers. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 5/29/09. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2009)
April 23, 2009 139 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 138 granting STIPULATION Extending Time To File Motion for Discovery. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 4/23/09. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2009)
March 20, 2009 137 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 136 granting STIPULATION Extending Time To File Motion for Discovery. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 3/20/09. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2009)
October 7, 2008 130 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 129 GRANTING STIPULATION for 30-Day Extension of Time To File Petitioner's Traverse, and Case Management Schedule. Signed by Judge CLAUDIA WILKEN on 10/7/08. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2008)
September 30, 2008 128 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 127 granting STIPULATION for 3-Day Extension of Time To File Petitioner's Traverse, and Case Management Schedule. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 9/30/08. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2008)
September 23, 2008 126 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 125 granting STIPULATION To Extend Time for Filing Petitioner's Traverse and Case Management Schedule. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 9/23/08. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2008)
September 16, 2008 124 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 123 GRANTING STIPULATION To Extend Time for Filing Petitioner's Traverse. Signed by Judge CLAUDIA WILKEN on 9/16/08. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ervin v. Ayers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Curtis Lee Ervin
Represented By: Robert Russell Bryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jeanne Woodford
Represented By: Allan Irwin Yannow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Robert L. Ayers
Represented By: Allan Irwin Yannow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Miscellaneous: Habeas Corpus Resource Center
Represented By: Michael David Laurence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Miscellaneous: California Appellate Project
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?