Shum v. Intel Corporation et al

Case Number: 4:2002cv03262
Filed: July 9, 2002
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
Referring Judge: Edward M. Chen
Presiding Judge: D. Lowell Jensen
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 7, 2011 1030 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 1029 Stipulation filed by Jean-Marc Verdiell, Intel Corporation, Lightlogic, Inc. REGARDING WITHDRAWAL AND RELEASE OF FUNDS HELD BY THE COURT. The $134,368.28 deposited by Plaintiff Shum in the District Court on 4/16/10 shall be withdrawn and delivered to Defendants, together with all interest thereon pursuant to Fed R. Civ Proc. 67(b) within five business days of the date of this Order.. Signed by Judge D. Lowell Jensen on 3/7/2011. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2011)
April 8, 2010 1023 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER TO DEPOSIT TAXED COSTS WITH CLERK re 1021 Stipulation filed by Frank T. Shum. Plaintiff Frank T. Shum to deposit the full amount of costs judgment against him, $134,368.28 with the Clerk of this Court. Such deposit shall be made within 5 business days of issuance of this Order, or April 16, 2010, whichever is later.. Signed by Judge D. Lowell Jensen on 4/8/2010. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2010)
October 23, 2009 1014 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: TAXATION OF COSTS by Judge D. Lowell Jensen granting in part and denying in part 1004 Plaintiff's Motion Challenging the Clerk's Taxation of Costs. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2009)
April 29, 2009 980 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT AS TO STATE LAW CLAIMS AND PARTIAL JUDGMENT AS TO INVENTORSHIP CLAIMS. Signed by Judge D. Lowell Jensen on 4/29/09. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2009)
December 23, 2008 934 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER following jury trial. Status Conference set for 2/13/2009 01:30 PM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland.. Signed by Judge D. Lowell Jensen on 12/23/08. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2008)
October 6, 2008 681 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re In Camera Submission for 659 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel. Defendants shall produce to the Court for an in camera review the documents identified as Nos. 698-703 on the privilege log. The documents shall be lodged with chambers no later than 12:00 p.m. on October 7, 2008. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 10/6/2008. (emclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2008)
September 26, 2008 663 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge D. Lowell Jensen granting in part and denying in part 533 Motion for Summary Judgment. As to each cause of action the Court finds as follows: Breach of Fiduciary Duty- Summary Judgment is GRANTED. Fraudulent Concealment- Summary Judgment is GRANTED. Inventorship- Summary Judgment is DENIED. Unjust Enrichment- Summary Judgment is DENIED. Fraud- Summary Judgment is DENIED. Breach of Contract- Summary Judgment is DENIED. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2008)
September 23, 2008 662 Opinion or Order of the Court (scanned version w/modification) STIPULATION AND ORDER re 661 Order, Stipulation and Order. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 9/23/08. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2008)
September 8, 2008 648 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER (following 9/8/08 Status Conference). Signed by Judge D. Lowell Jensen on 9/8/08. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2008)
September 4, 2008 643 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Re 640 Parties' Joint Letter of August 29, 2008. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward M. Chen on 9/4/2008. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2008)
February 6, 2008 519 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Substitution of Attorney for Plaintiff Frank T. Shum:, Attorney Paul F. Kirsch for Frank T. Shum, Mark T. Jansen for Frank T. Shum, Tali Leah N. Alban for Frank T. Shum added. Attorney Gregory S. Cavallo, Esq and Jeffrey William Shopoff terminated.. Signed by Judge D. Lowell Jensen on 2/6/08. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shum v. Intel Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?