Fresenius USA, Inc. et al v. Baxter International Inc. et al

Case Number: 4:2003cv01431
Filed: April 4, 2003
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
Presiding Judge: Phyllis J. Hamilton
Referring Judge: Elizabeth D. Laporte
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 8, 2012 1134 Opinion or Order of the Court FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW; ORDER by Judge Hamilton granting in part and denying in part 1100 Motion for Decision on Limited Remand Issues. (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2012)
January 27, 2012 1132 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING FRESENIUS' REQUEST FOR LEAVE TO FILE CORRECTED DOCUMENT re 1131 Letter filed by Fresenius USA, Inc., Fresenius Medical Care Holding, Inc. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 1/27/12. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2012)
December 13, 2011 1126 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER RE DATE FOR SUBMISSION OF FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW re 1125 Stipulation filed by Fresenius USA, Inc., Fresenius Medical Care Holding, Inc. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 12/13/11. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2011)
November 29, 2011 1121 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING TEMPORARY RELEASE OF TRIAL EXHIBIT re 1120 Letter filed by Fresenius USA, Inc., Fresenius Medical Care Holding, Inc. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 11/29/11. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2011)
July 28, 2011 1110 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Hamilton denying 1109 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2011)
June 30, 2011 1102 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE-SETTING HEARING DATE re 1099 Stipulation filed by Fresenius USA, Inc., Fresenius Medical Care Holding, Inc. Evidentiary Hearing set for 12/2/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 3rd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 6/30/11. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2011)
June 3, 2011 1098 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 1048 MOTION for Decision on Limited Remand Issues filed by Baxter International Inc., Baxter Healthcare Corporation. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 6/3/2011. (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2011)
May 26, 2011 1095 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Hamilton denying 1042 Motion for New Trial; denying 1044 Motion to Stay; deferring ruling on 1048 Motion for Decision on Limited Remand Issues (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2011)
January 26, 2011 1089 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE STATEMENT OF RECENT DECISION AND REQUEST TO SUBMIT ADDITIONAL MATERIALS re 1088 Statement, filed by Fresenius USA, Inc., Fresenius Medical Care Holding, Inc. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 1/26/11. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2011)
February 16, 2010 1077 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF RECUSAL. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 2/16/10. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2010) Modified on 2/17/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
December 4, 2009 1051 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE OF REFERENCE AND ORDER RE DISCOVERY PROCEDURES. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 12/4/09. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2009)
September 21, 2009 1039 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Allowing Withdrawal of Keker & Van Nest, LLP as Counsel for Plaintiffs/Counterdefendants Fresenius Medical Care Holding, Inc. and Fresenius USA, Inc.. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 09/21/09. (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2009)
February 13, 2007 875 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REOPENING CASE Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/26/2007 03:00 PM. VIA TELEPHONE. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 2/13/07. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2007)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fresenius USA, Inc. et al v. Baxter International Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?