Pintos v. Pacific Creditors Association et al

Case Number: 4:2003cv05471
Filed: December 4, 2003
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
Referring Judge: Joseph C. Spero
Presiding Judge: Claudia Wilken
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 6, 2011 178 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 175 PLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR AN ORDER REQURING DEFENDANT AND DEFENDANTS INSURER TO APPEAR. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 12/6/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2011)
December 5, 2011 176 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART PLAINTIFFS 175 REQUEST FOR AN ORDER REQURING DEFENDANT AND DEFENDANTS INSURER TO APPEAR. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 12/5/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2011)
September 27, 2011 174 Opinion or Order of the Court CONDITIONAL ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 9/27/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2011)
September 2, 2011 169 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS 147 MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT, DENYING DEFENDANT PACIFIC CREDITORS ASSOCIATIONS 152 MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND DENYING AS MOOT PLAINTIFFS 158 MOTION TO STRIKE.ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge for Settlement. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 9/2/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2011)
August 19, 2011 164 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS 161 MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF 159 ORDER STRIKING 158 MOTION TO STRIKE DEFENDANT PACIFIC CREDITORS ASSOCIATIONS EXPERT DISCLOSURE. 158 MOTION to Strike PCA's Expert Disclosure set for 9/1/2011 02:00 PM before Hon. Claudia Wilken. Responses due by 8/24/2011. Replies due by 8/26/2011. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 8/19/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2011)
August 12, 2011 159 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SUA SPONTE STRIKING PLAINTIFF'S 155 , 156 , 157 , 158 MOTIONS TO STRIKE EVIDENCE SUBMITTED BY DEFENDANT PACIFIC CREDITORS ASSOCIATION. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 8/12/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2011)
August 2, 2011 151 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 149 Stipulation for Dismissal of Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. terminated. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 8/2/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2011)
April 13, 2011 142 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken GRANTING 129 Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc.'s Renewed Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. (cwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2011)
January 19, 2011 128 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 126 MOTION to Extend Briefing Schedule. Case Management Statement due by 3/24/2011. Further Case Management Conference set for 3/31/2011 02:00 PM. Motion Hearing set for 3/31/2011 02:00 PM before Hon. Claudia Wilken. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 1/19/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2011)
October 7, 2010 124 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 121 Stipulated Request to Extend Briefing Schedule. Further Case Management Conference set for 3/3/2011 02:00 PM. Motion Hearing set for 3/3/2011 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 10/7/2010. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2010)
June 24, 2010 119 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER 114 Granting MOTION to Stay, or in the alternative, to extend briefing schedule. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 6/24/2010. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2010)
June 14, 2010 109 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 6/14/2010. (cwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2010)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pintos v. Pacific Creditors Association et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?