Tennison v. City & County of San Francisco et al

Case Number: 4:2004cv00574
Filed: February 11, 2004
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
Presiding Judge: Claudia Wilken
Referring Judge: Edward M. Chen
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 19, 2012 611 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Denying 608 Motion to Relate Case. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2012)
September 25, 2009 607 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re (605 in 4:04-cv-00574-CW) granting STIPULATED CONSENT JUDGMENT AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL UNDER FRCP 41(a)(2). Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 9/25/09. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2009)
September 22, 2009 606 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATED CONSENT JUDGMENT AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL as to John Tennison, City and County of San Francisco, Prentice Earl Sanders and Napoelon Hendriz re 604 . Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 9/22/2009. (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2009)
May 20, 2009 577 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND EXPERT AND PUNITIVE DAMAGES DISCOVERY CUTOFF DATE. Further Case Management Conference set for 7/14/2009 02:00 PM.. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 5/20/09. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2009)
January 20, 2009 565 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING re 564 Letter filed by City & County of San Francisco for extension of time to submit confidential settlement conference statement. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 1/20/09. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2009)
January 8, 2009 563 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE AND SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER. Settlement Conference set for 2/5/2009 at 09:30 AM. Confidential settlement statements to be lodged with Judge Spero's chambers 14 days prior to the conference. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 01/08/09. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2009)
January 7, 2009 562 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 561 granting STIPULATION JOINTLY REQUESTING REFERRAL OF MATTER FOR MEDIATION BEFORE THE HONORABLE JOSEPH C. SPERO. ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Joseph S. Spero for Settlement. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 1/7/09. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2009)
October 20, 2008 557 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 556 granting STIPULATION AND JUDGMENT FOR GEORGE BUTTERWORTH AND AGAINST JOHN TENNISON. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 10/20/08. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2008)
October 15, 2008 553 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 552 GRANTING STIPULATION CONTINUING FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Further Case Management Conference set for 12/16/2008 02:00 PM.. Signed by Judge CLAUDIA WILKEN on 10/15/08. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2008)
February 4, 2008 541 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 540 GRANTING STIPULATION Continuing Further Case Management Conference. Further Case Management Conference set for 3/25/2008 02:00 PM.. Signed by Judge CLAUDIA WILKEN on 2/4/08. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tennison v. City & County of San Francisco et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?