Liebb v. Daly

Case Number: 4:2004cv00950
Filed: March 9, 2004
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
Presiding Judge: Claudia Wilken
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 30, 2009 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken granting 44 Motion for Summary Judgment (kk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2009)
July 14, 2009 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 52 granting as modified Joint Stipulation to Set Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment for Hearing. Motion Hearing set for 8/27/2009 02:00 PM.. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 7/14/09. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2009)
March 17, 2009 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken denying 25 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2009)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Liebb v. Daly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.

Why Is My Information Online?