Hiller et al v. United States of America

Case Number: 4:2005cv01620
Filed: April 19, 2005
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
Presiding Judge: Saundra Brown Armstrong
Referring Judge: Elizabeth D. Laporte
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:2671 Federal Tort Claims Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 27, 2008 169 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 10/27/08. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2008)
October 20, 2008 167 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re: Attorney fees. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 10/20/08. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2008) Modified on 10/21/2008 (kk, COURT STAFF).
September 30, 2008 165 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG granting in part and denying in part 152 Motion FOR DETERMINATION OF LIEN OFFSET AMOUNT TO BE APPLIED TO JUDGMENT (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hiller et al v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.

Why Is My Information Online?