Whiteway v. Fedex Kinko's Office and Print Services, Inc.

Case Number: 4:2005cv02320
Filed: June 8, 2005
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Labor: Other Office
Presiding Judge: Saundra Brown Armstrong
Referring Judge: Joseph C. Spero
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Petition for Removal

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 15, 2010 267 Opinion or Order of the Court CONDITIONAL ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 6/15/10. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2010)
May 17, 2010 266 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG denying 253 Motion in Limine (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2010)
February 17, 2010 259 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong Setting Case Management Conference to 3/18/2010 at 03:15 PM., via Telephone. The Pretrial Conference and Trial dates are VACATED. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 2/17/10. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2010) Modified on 2/18/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
February 1, 2010 237 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re Motions in Limine: Motions in Limine due by 12:00 PM on 02/09/10; Oppositions due by 4:00 PM on 02/12/10; Replies due by 12:00 PM on 02/16/10. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 1/29/10. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2010) Modified on 2/2/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
October 8, 2009 228 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SCHEDULING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Settlement Conference set for 11/17/09 at 9:00 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 10/8/2009. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2009) Modified on 10/9/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
October 2, 2009 227 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong GRANTING 214 Motion to Decertify Class. A Case Management Conference is set for 12/2/2009 at 03:15 PM., via telephone. Case referred to Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman for MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE wh ich shall be held prior to 12/02/09. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 9/29/09. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2009) Modified on 10/5/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 10/5/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 10/5/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Whiteway v. Fedex Kinko's Office and Print Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?