Fisher v. City of Pittsburg California et al

Case Number: 4:2005cv02774
Filed: July 6, 2005
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
Referring Judge: Elizabeth D. Laporte
Presiding Judge: Claudia Wilken
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 10, 2009 112 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST TO RESCHEDULE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge CLAUDIA WILKEN on 3/10/09. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2009)
January 26, 2009 105 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 1/26/09. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2009)
January 14, 2009 97 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE FAILURE TO APPEAR. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 1/14/09. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2009)
January 7, 2009 96 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER for settlement conference 1/22/09 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 11. Signed by Judge Nandor J. Vadas on 1/7/09. (glm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2009)
December 18, 2008 92 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Further Case Management Conference set for 1/13/2009 02:00 PM.. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 12/18/08. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2008)
September 24, 2008 87 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken granting in part and denying in part 66 DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND REFERRING CASE TO PRO SE PRISONER SETTLEMENT PROGRAM (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fisher v. City of Pittsburg California et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?