Ashker et al v. Schwarzenegger et al

Case Number: 4:2005cv03286
Filed: August 11, 2005
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
Referring Judge: James Larson
Presiding Judge: Claudia Wilken
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 1, 2010 391 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken denying without prejudice 387 Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis Re: Todd Ashker. (cwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2010) Modified on 6/2/2010 (cjl, COURT STAFF).
May 28, 2010 389 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken denying 382 Motion for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration(cwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2010)
March 18, 2010 380 Opinion or Order of the Court FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW REGARDING DELAYED MAIL CLAIM AND ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken granting 378 Motion for Leave to File supplemental filing (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2010)
March 25, 2009 336 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken granting in part 204 DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND DENYING PLAINTIFFS CROSS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2009)
January 6, 2009 334 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 332 Granting Defendants' Request for Leave to File Separate Objections.. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 1/6/09. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2009)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ashker et al v. Schwarzenegger et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?