Ashker v. Alameida et al

Case Number: 4:2005cv03759
Filed: September 16, 2005
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
Referring Judge: Elizabeth D. Laporte
Presiding Judge: Claudia Wilken
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 18, 2014 576 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Ckaudia Wilken Granting 574 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney J. Randall Andrada terminated. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2014)
October 19, 2011 524 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT SAYRES REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO COMPLY WITH COURT ORDER. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 10/19/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2011)
October 11, 2011 522 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken DENYING DEFENDANTS 518 MOTION TO STAY COURT ORDER AND GRANTING PLAINTIFFS 519 MOTION TO COMPEL PAYMENT OF JUDGMENT. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2011)
March 7, 2011 516 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken GRANTING IN PART PLAINTIFFS 494 MOTION FOR REVIEW OF CLERKS TAXATION OF COSTS AND FOR OUT-OF-POCKET EXPENSES UNDER 42 U.S.C. § 1988 AND GRANTING PLAINTIFFS 499 MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE REPLY.(ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2011)
January 7, 2011 514 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken ORDER 508 GRANTING IN PART PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR FURTHER SPECIFIC PERFORMANCE RELIEF AND DENYING IT IN PART. 510 (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2011)
September 29, 2010 505 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 500 For Further Report from Defendant Cate. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on September 29, 2010. (cwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2010)
September 20, 2010 500 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER for Report from Defendant Cate in Accordance with re 434 Order for Specific Performance. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on September 20, 2010. (cwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2010)
July 29, 2010 489 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken granting 483 Motion for Extension of Time to File; granting in part and denying in part 487 Motion for Extension of Time to File and To Order Xeroxing of Motion (cwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2010)
June 15, 2010 485 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken denying 481 Motion to Appoint Counsel (cwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2010)
May 17, 2010 477 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken denying 443 Motion For Relief From Order; granting Motion For Enforcement of Order 446 ; denying 455 Motion for New Trial (cwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2010)
March 2, 2010 441 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 434 FOR REPORT FROM DEFENDANT CATE IN ACCORDANCE WITH FEBRUARY 2, 2010 ORDER (cwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2010)
February 4, 2010 434 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 425 Order For Specific Performance, Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on February 4, 2010. (cwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2010)
May 11, 2009 387 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER FOR UNITED STATES MARSHAL TO SERVE PLAINTIFFS WITNESS DR. GREGORY DUNCAN. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 5/11/09. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2009)
May 6, 2009 379 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER re 378 Order on Motions in Limine (CORRECTING SIGNATURE DATE). Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 5/6/09. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2009)
May 4, 2009 375 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO ISSUE WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM; WRIT of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum issued. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 5/4/09. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2009)
May 1, 2009 367 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO FILE OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS ARGUMENT THAT DEFENDANT MCLEAN SHOULD BE DISMISSED FROM THIS ACTION. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 5/1/09. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2009)
April 29, 2009 362 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 316 FOR PLAINTIFF TO FILE OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 4/29/09. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2009)
April 28, 2009 353 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER FOR PARTIES TO SUBMIT OPPOSITIONS TO MOTIONS IN LIMINE. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 4/28/09. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2009)
April 14, 2009 331 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO ISSUE WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 4/14/09. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2009)
February 27, 2009 290 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 277 278 granting STIPULATION AND VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF CLAIMS AND DEFENDANTS. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 2/27/09. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2009)
February 6, 2009 267 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 262 TAKING MOTION UNDER SUBMISSION. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 2/6/09. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2009)
January 14, 2009 260 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 256 granting Application to Dismiss Defendants Ted Lee Welton, Acel K. Thacker and Dwight Winslow. Dwight W. Winslow; A.K. Thacker and Welton terminated.. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 1/14/09. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2009)
December 18, 2008 254 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 253 granting STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEADLINE TO DISCLOSE EXPERT WITNESSES FROM DECEMBER 30, 2008 TO JANUARY 16, 2009. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 12/18/08. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2008)
November 25, 2008 242 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 233 GRANTING, IN PART, DEFENDANTS CROSS-MOTION REGARDING PLAINTIFFS DEPOSITION. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 11/25/08. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2008)
November 19, 2008 232 Opinion or Order of the Court Report of Pro Se Prisoner Early Settlement Proceeding; not settled. Signed by Judge Nandor J. Vadas on 11/19/08. (glm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2008)
November 7, 2008 230 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 226 RE EX PARTE APPLICATION AND APPLICATION FOR COURT TO SET DISCOVERY DEADLINE AND DISPOSITIVE MOTION FILING DEADLINE. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 11/7/08. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ashker v. Alameida et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?