Tessera, Inc. v. Advanced Micro Devices, Inc. et al

Case Number: 4:2005cv04063
Filed: October 7, 2005
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
Referring Judge: Elizabeth D. Laporte
Presiding Judge: Claudia Wilken
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 15, 2015 1523 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 1522 Special Master's Recommendation That District Judge Wilken Issue An Order Withdrawing Special Master's Improvidently Filed "Order Denying Motion For Relief From Section 11 Of Protective Order" (Docket 1521 ). Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 1/15/2015. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2015)
October 21, 2014 1509 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting Joint 1505 Stipulated Request for Order to Expedite Briefing and Hearing of Tessera's 1507 Emergency Motion to Enforce Settlement Agreement and ASE's Cross-Motion to Rescind the Term Sheet Agreement. Responses due by 10/25/2014; Replies due by 10/28/2014; Replies due by 10/31/2014. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 10/21/2014. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2014)
September 18, 2014 1504 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING REMAINING DEFENDANTS. Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/5/2014 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 9/18/2014. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2014)
September 5, 2014 1499 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting 1497 Stipulation OF FINAL DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF ST MICROELECTRONICS, INC. AND ST MICROELECTRONICS N.V. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2014)
June 30, 2014 1478 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken GRANTING DEFENDANTS 1473 MOTION TO FILE SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF AND PERMITTING PLAINTIFF TO FILE RESPONSE. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2014)
June 16, 2014 1471 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting 1469 Stipulation To Revise Claim Construction and Summary Judgment Hearing Date. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2014)
May 23, 2014 1465 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting 1462 Motion to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2014)
March 26, 2014 1419 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken REGARDING (367 in case 4:12-cv-00692-CW and 1415 in case 4:05-cv-04063-CW) MOTIONS TO ALTER CASE SCHEDULE. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2014)
March 20, 2014 1411 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Claudia WilkenREGARDING (352, 353 in case 4:12-cv-00692-CW; and 1377, 1379, 1380 in case 4:05-cv-04063-CW) MOTIONS TO ALTER CASE SCHEDULE. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2014)
February 12, 2014 1335 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken GRANTING AS MODIFIED TESSERAS (334 in case 4:12-cv-00692-CW and 1317 in case 4:05-cv-04063-CW ) MOTION TO PROVIDE SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING TO SPECIAL MASTER. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2014)
December 20, 2013 1304 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING SUBMISSIONS TO DR. DAUSKARDT. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 12/20/2013. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2013)
December 18, 2013 1301 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER APPOINTING THE HON. WAYNE D. BRAZIL (RET.) AS SPECIAL MASTER AND PROVIDING STANDARDS OF REVIEW. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 12/18/2013. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2013)
December 17, 2013 1299 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REQUESTING § 455 DECLARATION FROM PROPOSED SPECIAL MASTER PRIOR TO APPOINTMENT. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 12/17/2013. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2013)
December 6, 2013 1294 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING REPLACEMENT SPECIAL MASTER. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 12/6/2013. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2013)
December 3, 2013 1292 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting (312 in case 4:12-cv-00692-CW and (1291) in case 4:05-cv-04063-CW) Stipulation Modifying Case Management Schedule. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2013)
November 20, 2013 1290 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken ADOPTING SPECIAL MASTER'S OCTOBER 8, 2013RECOMMENDATIONS (granting 1257 , denying 1265 ) (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2013)
November 15, 2013 1279 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting 1271 Stipulation of Final Dismissal with Prejudice as to Defendants and Counterclaimants ChipMOS Technologies, Inc. and ChipMOS U.S.A. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2013)
November 13, 2013 1278 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken DENYING ( (290) in case 4:12-cv-00692-CW; (1223),(1226), (1227) in case 4:05-cv-04063-CW) MOTIONS FOR SEPARATE TRIAL AND/OR BIFURCATION (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2013)
September 12, 2013 1238 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Approving and Adopting re 1221 Special Masters Order filed by Charles A. Legge. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 9/12/2013. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2013)
July 31, 2013 1211 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER APPROVING AND ADOPTING SPECIAL MASTER'S REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS REGARDING MOTIONS TO SEAL re (74 in 4:10-cv-04954-CW) (238 in 4:10-cv-00945-CW) (1210 in 4:05-cv-04063-CW) (291 in 4:11-cv-06121-CW) (275 in 4:12-cv-00692-CW). Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on July 31, 2013. (cwlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2013)
July 19, 2013 1208 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken GRANTING THE ASE DEFENDANTS 1200 MOTION TO ADOPT THE SPECIAL MASTERS JUNE 19, 2013 ORAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. 1202 Motion to Shorten Time and 1203 Stipulation are denied as moot. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2013)
May 9, 2013 1197 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 1196 Stipulation of Final Dismissal with Prejudice (as to SPIL). Siliconware USA Inc (a California corporation) and Siliconware Precision Industries Co., Ltd. (a Republic of China corporation) are terminated. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 5/9/2013. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2013)
April 12, 2013 1194 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM THE SPECIAL MASTERS MARCH 19, 2013 ORAL RULING. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 4/12/2013. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2013)
March 28, 2013 1192 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER APPROVING/ADOPTING ( 270 in 4:12-cv-00692-CW AND 1189 in 4:05-cv-04063-CW) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of Special Master. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 3/28/2013. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2013)
March 22, 2013 1188 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting 1187 Stipulation FINAL DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2013)
March 1, 2013 1183 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken ADOPTING SPECIAL MASTERS 1164 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION REGARDING ST DEFENDANTS MOTION TO SEVER AND GRANTING ST DEFENDANTS 1167 MOTION TO ADOPT THE REPORT RECOMMENDATION (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2013)
January 31, 2013 1160 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER PROVISIONALLY SEALING ORDERS RESOLVING LICENSE BASED DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS AND DIRECTING TESSERA TO FILE REDACTED VERSIONS OF THE ORDERS IN THE PUBLIC RECORD. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 1/31/2013. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2013)
January 2, 2013 1143 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ( 1142 in 4:05-cv-04063-CW and 72 in 4:10-cv-04954-CW) Stipulation of Final Dismissal with Prejudice (as to Spansion). Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 1/2/2013. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/2/2013)
November 21, 2012 1109 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OVERRULING (228 in 4:12-cv-00692-CW) (1098 in 4:05-cv-04063-CW) DEFENDANTS' OBJECTIONS TO NONDISPOSITIVE ORDER OF THE SPECIAL MASTER. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on November 21, 2012. (cwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2012)
November 20, 2012 1106 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting Commission to Take Deposition in Japan. See 1104 Special Masters Order. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 11/20/2012. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2012)
November 16, 2012 1103 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TAKING UNDER SUBMISSION (228 in 4:12-cv-00692-CW) (1098 in 4:05-cv-04063-CW) DEFENDANTS' OBJECTIONS TO NONDISPOSITIVE ORDER OF THE SPECIAL MASTER. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on November 16, 2012. (cwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2012)
October 15, 2012 1093 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REFERRING CERTAIN DEFENDANTS MOTION TO SEAL (Docket No. 220 in 12-692), AND ALL FUTURE MOTIONS TO SEAL, TO THE SPECIAL MASTER. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 10/15/2012. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2012)
October 3, 2012 1090 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting 1083 Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice of the 12th Cause of Action Against Stats. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2012)
September 21, 2012 1086 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting Stiplation (Exhibit B) to (88 in 4:08-cv-03667-CW), (82 in 4:08-cv-03827-CW), (216 in 4:12-cv-00692-CW), (1079 in 4:05-cv-04063-CW), (68 in 4:10-cv-04954-CW) Case Management Statement. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 9/21/2012. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2012)
August 31, 2012 1075 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REFERRING PENDING MOTIONS TO SEAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTIONS TO SPECIAL MASTER. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 8/31/2012. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2012)
August 20, 2012 1061 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken GRANTING 1041 JOINT MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM THE COURTS AUGUST 10, 2012 ORDER TO ALLOW PARTIES TO FILE UNDER SEAL. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2012)
August 10, 2012 1036 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken GRANTING 1006 MOTION TO SEAL. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2012)
June 15, 2012 1003 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER MODIFYING BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR LICENSE-BASED SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTIONS, ( 104 MOTION for Clarification of the Court's Jan. 4, 2012 Amended Case Management Order in 4:11-cv-06121-CW granted/denied in part) Motions due by 7/19/2012. Responses/Cross Motions due by 8/9/2012. Replies due by 8/23/2012. Replies due by 8/30/2012. Motion Hearing set for 9/20/2012 02:00 PM before Hon. Claudia Wilken. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 6/15/2012. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2012)
May 31, 2012 1000 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING COURT EXPERT WITH SIGNED ACKNOWLEDGMENT. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2012)
May 16, 2012 998 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING COURT EXPERT. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 5/16/2012. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2012)
May 10, 2012 995 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER APPOINTING COURT EXPERT. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 5/10/2012. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2012)
April 23, 2012 993 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting (991 in 4:05-cv-04063-CW) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO SELECT A SINGLE ATTORNEY AS DEFENDANTS' LIAISON TO DR. DAUSKARDT AND THE COURT - CORRECTION OF DOCKET #(990). Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 4/23/2012. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2012)
April 9, 2012 987 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONCERNING DUTIES AND INSTRUCTIONS FOR COURT-APPOINTED EXPERT DR. REINHOLD DAUSKARDT AND GRANTING STIPULATION OF PARTIES TO CHANGE DEADLINE FOR SUBMISSION OF EXPERT REPORT. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 4/9/2012. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2012)
March 26, 2012 984 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OPPORTUNITY TO SHOW CAUSE WHY A COURT-APPOINTED EXPERT SHOULD NOT BE APPOINTED. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 3/26/2012. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2012)
March 7, 2012 974 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING SELECTION OF COURT-APPOINTED EXPERT. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 3/7/2012. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2012)
January 24, 2012 955 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken DENYING (29) in case 4:10-cv-04954-CW; (939) 4:05-cv-04063-CW MOTION TO STAY. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2012)
January 17, 2012 946 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting (43 in 4:08-cv-03726-CW), (32 in 4:10-cv-04954-CW),(55 in 4:08-cv-03667-CW), (51 in 4:08-cv-03827-CW), (943 in 4:05-cv-04063-CW) Stipulation FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO MEET AND CONFER AND SUBMIT NAMES OF PROPOSED CANDIDATES FOR COURT-APPOINTED EXPERT. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 1/17/2012. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2012)
November 10, 2011 931 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken denying (41) in case 4:08-cv-03827-CW; (45) in case 4:08-cv-03667-CW; (32) in case 4:08-cv-03726-CW; (21) in case 4:10-cv-04954-CW; (925) in case 4:05-cv-04063-CW Motion To Re-Set Case Management Conference. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2011)
May 24, 2011 909 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 908 Stipulation CHANGING THE DATE OF UPCOMING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND RELATED DATES. Case Management Statement due by 11/1/2011. Case Management Conference set for 11/8/2011 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 5/24/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2011)
December 7, 2010 907 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting re 906 Stipulation (JOINT) CHANGING THE DATE OF UPCOMING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND RELATED DATES. Case Management Statement due by 5/31/2011. Case Management Conference set for 6/7/2011 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 12/7/2010. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2010)
November 4, 2010 904 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF REFERRAL. In re Spansion, Inc. (Spansion, Inc. v. Tessera, Inc.), 10-4954 MMC, is referred, pursuant to Civil Local Rule 3-12(c), to the Honorable Claudia Wilken for consideration of whether the case is related to Tessera, Inc. v. Advanced Micro Devices, Inc., 05-4063 CW. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on November 4, 2010. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2010)
August 24, 2010 902 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 901 Permitting Withdrawal. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 8/24/2010. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2010)
June 11, 2010 899 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 898 Granting Stipulation ORDER CHANGING THE DATE OF UPCOMING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND RELATED DATES. Case Management Conference set for 12/14/2010 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 6/11/2010. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2010)
December 16, 2009 896 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 895 granting JOINT STIPULATION CHANGING THE DATE OF UPCOMING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND RELATED DATES. Case Management Conference set for 6/22/2010 02:00 PM.. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 12/16/09. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2009)
April 27, 2009 879 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 877 GRANTING Withdrawal of Stephen Larson as Counsel of Record. Signed by Judge CLAUDIA WILKEN on 4/27/09. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2009)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tessera, Inc. v. Advanced Micro Devices, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?