Genmark Automation, Inc. v. Innovative Robotics Systems, Inc.

Case Number: 4:2005cv04707
Filed: November 16, 2005
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
Presiding Judge: Phyllis J. Hamilton
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28:1338 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 11, 2011 139 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING BANKRUPTCY STAY AND SCHEDULING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 138 Notice (Other) filed by Genmark Automation, Inc. Joint Case Management Statement due by 5/26/2011. Case Management Conference set for 6/2/2011 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 5/11/11. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2011)
February 16, 2011 137 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE BANKRUPTCY STAY re 136 Notice (Other) filed by Innovative Robotics Systems, Inc. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 2/16/11. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2011)
January 10, 2011 132 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 130 Stipulation, filed by Genmark Automation, Inc., Innovative Robotics Systems, Inc. Joint Case Management Statement due by 1/27/2011. Case Management Conference set for 2/3/2011 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 1/10/11. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2011)
November 29, 2010 128 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 127 Stipulation, filed by Genmark Automation, Inc., Innovative Robotics Systems, Inc. Joint Case Management Statement due by 12/30/2010. Further Case Management Conference set for 1/6/2011 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 11/29/10. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2010)
October 19, 2010 126 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 125 Stipulation filed by Innovative Robotics Systems, Inc. Joint Case Management Statement due by 11/24/2010. Case Management Conference set for 12/2/2010 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 10/19/10. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2010)
September 9, 2010 124 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 123 Stipulation filed by Genmark Automation, Inc., Innovative Robotics Systems, Inc. Joint Case Management Statement due by 10/14/2010. Further Case Management Conference set for 10/21/2010 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 9/9/10. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2010)
September 1, 2010 120 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL ROBERT E. CAMORS, JR. AND FOLEY & LARDNER LLP re 119 Notice (Other) filed by Genmark Automation, Inc. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 9/1/10. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/1/2010)
July 6, 2010 117 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 116 Stipulation filed by Genmark Automation, Inc. Joint Case Management Statement due by 9/9/2010. Further Case Management Conference set for 9/16/2010 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 7/6/10. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2010)
April 8, 2010 115 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER MODIFYING STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER re 113 Stipulation filed by Genmark Automation, Inc. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 4/8/10. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2010)
October 15, 2009 110 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL re 109 Notice of Substitution of Counsel filed by Innovative Robotics Systems, Inc. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 10/15/09. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2009)
November 23, 2005 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/23/2006 02:30 PM.. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 11/23/05. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/23/2005)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Genmark Automation, Inc. v. Innovative Robotics Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?