Rodriguez v. Evans

Case Number: 4:2005cv05068
Filed: December 8, 2005
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
Presiding Judge: Saundra Brown Armstrong
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 3, 2009 89 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong DENYING 85 Motion for Certificate of Appealability (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2009) Modified on 9/11/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
May 14, 2009 76 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, GRANTING 72 Second Motion for Extension of Time to File Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment. Plaintiff's Opposition due 06/18/09. Defendant's optional reply brief due (15) fifteen-days after Plaintiff's Opposition. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG, on 5/12/09. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2009) Modified on 5/15/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
April 27, 2009 71 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE 68 Motion to Appoint Counsel (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2009) Modified on 4/28/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
April 6, 2009 65 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: That Plaintiff's Request for Extension of Time to File an Opposition to the Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED. Plaintiff's Opposition due no later than (45) forty-five days from the date of this Order. Defendants reply due (15) fifteen-days after Plaintiff's Opposition is filed re 62 , 64 Notice of Change of Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 4/3/09. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2009) Modified on 4/7/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
March 25, 2009 63 Opinion or Order of the Court Report of Pro Se Prisoner Early Settlement Proceeding; parties to meet for further settlement conference. Signed by Judge Nandor J. Vadas on 3/25/09. (glm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2009)
March 5, 2009 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE 57 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Defendants shall submit to the Court a copy of the videotape of the cell extraction within (3) three-days of this Order; within (7) seven-days, Defenda nts shall allow Plaintiff to view videotapes, and Defendants shall bring the videotape to the 03/09/09 Settlement Conference before Magistrate Vadas. Plaintiff's Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment due no later than 03/27/09; Defendants Reply Brief due 03/31/09.(lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2009) Modified on 3/6/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 3/6/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 3/6/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
February 11, 2009 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND WRIT of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum to transport issued. A Settlement Conference is set for 3/9/2009 at 01:00 PM., at the California State Prison, Solano. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nandor J. Vadas on 2/11/09. (glm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2009) Modified on 2/12/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 2/12/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
February 10, 2009 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND WRIT of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum to transport plaintiff issued. A Settlement Conference is set for 3/9/2009 at 01:00 PM., at the California State Prison, Solano. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nandor J. Vadas on 2/10/09. (glm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2009) Modified on 2/12/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
February 6, 2009 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, DENYING AS UNECESSARY 36 Motion to Strike, and GRANTING 36 Motion to Screen Amended Complaint. Defendants Walker, Lonero, Hood, Prewitt, Gantt, Lima, Lewis Elmore and Mata dispositive motions due 02/25/09. Plaintiff's Opposition due (30) thirty-days from the date Defendant's dispositive motion has been filed. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2009) Modified on 2/9/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
January 27, 2009 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF SERVICE - MATA. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 1/26/09. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2009)
December 11, 2008 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re: defendant's address. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 12/8/08. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2008) Modified on 12/12/2008 (kk, COURT STAFF).
November 3, 2008 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF SERVICE. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 10/30/08. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rodriguez v. Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?