FreecycleSunnyvale v. The Freecycle Network Featured Case

Plaintiff FreecycleSunnyvale sought a declaratory judgment that the use of freecycle, freecycling and its logo does not infringe the trademark rights of Defendant The Freecycle Network.

Plaintiff: FreecycleSunnyvale
Defendant: The Freecycle Network
Counter-claimant: The Freecycle Network
Counter-defendant: FreecycleSunnyvale and The Freecycle Network
Case Number: 4:2006cv00324
Filed: January 18, 2006
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Claudia Wilken
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act)
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 1, 2010. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2008 Filing 156 NOTICE of Change of Address by Paul J. Andre (Andre, Paul) (Filed on 11/7/2008)
September 17, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 155 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken granting 154 DEFENDANT AND COUNTERCLAIMANT'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW PERKINS COIE LLP AND ITS COUNSEL AS COUNSEL OF RECORD FOR THE FREECYCLE NETWORK, INC. Attorney Esha Bandyopadhyay and Brian Patrick Hennessy terminated (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2008)
September 10, 2008 Filing 154 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by The Freecycle Network. (Attachments: # 1 [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT AND COUNTERCLAIMANT'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW PERKINS COIE LLP AND ITS COUNSEL AS COUNSEL OF RECORD FOR THE FREECYCLE NETWORK, INC)(Hennessy, Brian) (Filed on 9/10/2008) Modified on 9/11/2008 (cp, COURT STAFF).
August 18, 2008 Filing 153 Certificate of Record Mailed to USCA re appeal 148 Notice of Appeal : (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2008)
August 13, 2008 Filing 152 Transcript of Proceedings held on 09/27/07, before Judge Claudia Wilken. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lee-Anne Shortridge, Telephone number 408-287-4580. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/10/2008. (las, ) (Filed on 8/13/2008)
June 16, 2008 Filing 151 USCA Case Number 08-16382 Ninth Circuit for 148 Notice of Appeal filed by The Freecycle Network. (Attachments: # 1 Time Schedule Order)(cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2008)
June 13, 2008 Filing 150 TRANSCRIPT DESIGNATION by The Freecycle Network for proceedings held on 9/27/07. (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2008)
June 4, 2008 Copy of Notice of Appeal and Docket sheet mailed to all counsel (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2008)
June 4, 2008 Filing 149 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re 148 Notice of Appeal (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2008) (cp, COURT STAFF).
June 3, 2008 Filing 148 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 141 Order on Motion to Strike, Order on Motion for Summary Judgment by The Freecycle Network. Filing fee $ 455.00, 4461102249. (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2008)
May 21, 2008 Filing 147 REPORT on the determination of an action regarding trademark (cc: form mailed to register). (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2008)
May 20, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 146 ORDER re 145 granting Stipulated Final Judgment. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 5/20/08. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2008)
May 15, 2008 Filing 145 [Proposed] Stipulated Final Judgment. (Evans, Eric) (Filed on 5/15/2008) Modified on 5/16/2008 (cp, COURT STAFF).
May 1, 2008 Filing 144 Minute Entry: Settlement Conference held. Case settled. (Date Filed: 5/1/2008). (Tape #SC 07-08.) (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/1/2008) Modified on 5/5/2008 (kc, COURT STAFF).
March 25, 2008 Set/Reset Hearings: Settlement Conference set for 5/1/2008 09:00 AM. (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2008)
March 25, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 143 ORDER SCHEDULING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 3/25/2008. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2008)
March 20, 2008 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman for Settlement (wh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2008)
March 19, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 142 MINUTE ORDER AND CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge for Settlement; Jury Trial set for 11/24/2008 08:30 AM. Pretrial Conference set for 11/4/2008 02:00 PM. Further Case Management Conference set for 8/21/2008 02:00 PM. Motion Hearing set for 8/21/2008 02:00 PM.. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 3/19/08. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2008)
March 13, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDER by Judge Wilken granting 101 Motion to Strike ; granting in part and denying in part 131 Motion for Summary Judgment (cwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2008)
February 28, 2008 Filing 140 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (SUPPLEMENTAL) filed by FreecycleSunnyvale, The Freecycle Network. (Feinberg, Ian) (Filed on 2/28/2008) Modified on 2/29/2008 (cp, COURT STAFF).
February 22, 2008 Filing 139 NOTICE of Change of Address by Lisa Kobialka and Change of Law Firm for Lisa Kobialka, Paul Andre & Sean Boyle as to The Freecyle Network (Kobialka, Lisa) (Filed on 2/22/2008) Modified on 2/25/2008 (cp, COURT STAFF).
January 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 138 SCHEDULING ORDER Further Case Management Conference set for 3/13/2008 02:00 PM.. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 1/22/08. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2008)
November 15, 2007 Filing 137 Declaration of Eric B. Evans in Support of 136 Reply Memorandum on Supplemental Motion for Summary Judgment filed byFreecycleSunnyvale. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 136 ) (Evans, Eric) (Filed on 11/15/2007)
November 15, 2007 Filing 136 Reply Memorandum re 131 Supplemental MOTION for Summary Judgment filed byFreecycleSunnyvale. (Evans, Eric) (Filed on 11/15/2007)
November 8, 2007 Filing 135 DECLARATION of Lisa Kobialka in Opposition to 131 Supplemental MOTION for Summary Judgment filed byThe Freecycle Network. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit 3# 4 Exhibit 4# 5 Exhibit 5# 6 Exhibit 6)(Related document(s) 131 ) (Kobialka, Lisa) (Filed on 11/8/2007)
November 8, 2007 Filing 134 Memorandum in Opposition re 131 Supplemental MOTION for Summary Judgment filed byThe Freecycle Network. (Kobialka, Lisa) (Filed on 11/8/2007)
October 25, 2007 Filing 133 Proposed Order re 131 Supplemental MOTION for Summary Judgment by FreecycleSunnyvale. (Evans, Eric) (Filed on 10/25/2007) Modified on 10/26/2007 (cp, COURT STAFF).
October 25, 2007 Filing 132 Declaration of Eric B. Evansi in Support of 131 Supplemental MOTION for Summary Judgment filed byFreecycleSunnyvale. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibits A-C)(Related document(s) 131 ) (Evans, Eric) (Filed on 10/25/2007) Modified on 10/26/2007 (cp, COURT STAFF).
October 25, 2007 Filing 131 Supplemental MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by FreecycleSunnyvale. (Evans, Eric) (Filed on 10/25/2007)
September 27, 2007 Filing 130 EXHIBITS 42 and 43 re 111 Declaration of Deron Beal filed byThe Freecycle Network. (Related document(s) 111 ) (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2007)***FILED UNDER SEAL***
September 27, 2007 Filing 129 EXHIBITS 88 and 89 re 113 Declaration of Lisa Kobialka filed byThe Freecycle Network. (Related document(s) 113 ) (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2007)***FILED UNDER SEAL***
September 27, 2007 Filing 128 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 9/27/2007 before Claudia Wilken (Date Filed: 9/27/2007). (Court Reporter Lee-Ann Shortridge.) (scc, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/27/2007)
September 26, 2007 Filing 127 Declaration of Lisa Kobialka in Support of 110 PUBLIC EXHIBITS PER COURT ORDER DATED 9-21-07 filed byThe Freecycle Network. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 3# 3 Exhibit 4# 4 Exhibit 5# 5 Exhibit 9# 6 Exhibit 10# 7 Exhibit 11# 8 Exhibit 12# 9 Exhibit 13# 10 Exhibit 14# 11 Exhibit 16# 12 Exhibit 18# 13 Exhibit 19# 14 Exhibit 20# 15 Exhibit 26# 16 Exhibit 28# 17 Exhibit 29# 18 Exhibit 30# 19 Exhibit 31# 20 Exhibit 33# 21 Exhibit 34# 22 Exhibit 35# 23 Exhibit 36# 24 Exhibit 37# 25 Exhibit 38# 26 Exhibit 39# 27 Exhibit 47# 28 Exhibit 50# 29 Exhibit 54# 30 Exhibit 56# 31 Exhibit 58# 32 Exhibit 59# 33 Exhibit 61# 34 Exhibit 66# 35 Exhibit 67# 36 Exhibit 68# 37 Exhibit 69# 38 Exhibit 71# 39 Exhibit 72# 40 Exhibit 74# 41 Exhibit 76# 42 Exhibit 77# 43 Exhibit 78# 44 Exhibit 79# 45 Exhibit 80# 46 Exhibit 81# 47 Exhibit 82# 48 Exhibit 83# 49 Exhibit 84# 50 Exhibit 85# 51 Exhibit 86# 52 Exhibit 87# 53 Exhibit 90# 54 Exhibit 91# 55 Exhibit 92# 56 Exhibit 93# 57 Exhibit 94# 58 Exhibit 97# 59 Exhibit 98# 60 Exhibit 99# 61 Exhibit 100# 62 Exhibit 101# 63 Exhibit 103# 64 Exhibit 105# 65 Exhibit 106# 66 Exhibit 107# 67 Exhibit 108# 68 Exhibit 109)(Related document(s) 110 ) (Kobialka, Lisa) (Filed on 9/26/2007) Modified on 9/27/2007 (cp, COURT STAFF).
September 26, 2007 Filing 126 Declaration of Deron Beal in Support of 110 PUBLIC EXHIBITS PER COURT ORDER DATED 9-21-07 filed byThe Freecycle Network. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 8# 2 Exhibit 9# 3 Exhibit 10# 4 Exhibit 11# 5 Exhibit 13# 6 Exhibit 15# 7 Exhibit 16# 8 Exhibit 20# 9 Exhibit 23# 10 Exhibit 24# 11 Exhibit 25# 12 Exhibit 26# 13 Exhibit 27# 14 Exhibit 28# 15 Exhibit 29# 16 Exhibit 30# 17 Exhibit 31# 18 Exhibit 32# 19 Exhibit 33# 20 Exhibit 34# 21 Exhibit 35# 22 Exhibit 36# 23 Exhibit 37# 24 Exhibit 38# 25 Exhibit 39# 26 Exhibit 40# 27 Exhibit 41)(Related document(s) 110 ) (Kobialka, Lisa) (Filed on 9/26/2007) Modified on 9/27/2007 (cp, COURT STAFF).
September 21, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken granting in part and denying in part 119 Amended Motion to File Documents Under Seal (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2007)
September 19, 2007 Filing 124 Declaration of Lisa Kobialka in Support of 123 Reply to Opposition filed byThe Freecycle Network. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 123 ) (Kobialka, Lisa) (Filed on 9/19/2007)
September 19, 2007 Filing 123 Reply to Opposition re 101 MOTION to Strike filed byThe Freecycle Network. (Kobialka, Lisa) (Filed on 9/19/2007)
September 18, 2007 Filing 122 Proposed Order re 119 Amended MOTION for Leave to File Documents Under Seal by The Freecycle Network. (Kobialka, Lisa) (Filed on 9/18/2007)
September 18, 2007 Filing 121 Declaration of Deron Beal in Support of 119 Amended MOTION for Leave to File Documents Under Seal filed byThe Freecycle Network. (Related document(s) 119 ) (Kobialka, Lisa) (Filed on 9/18/2007)
September 18, 2007 Filing 120 Declaration of Lisa Kobialka in Support of 119 Amended MOTION for Leave to File Documents Under Seal filed byThe Freecycle Network. (Related document(s) 119 ) (Kobialka, Lisa) (Filed on 9/18/2007)
September 18, 2007 Filing 119 Amended MOTION for Leave to File Documents Under Seal filed by The Freecycle Network. (Kobialka, Lisa) (Filed on 9/18/2007)
September 14, 2007 Filing 118 Memorandum in Opposition re 101 MOTION to Strike filed byFreecycleSunnyvale. (Feinberg, Ian) (Filed on 9/14/2007)
September 13, 2007 Filing 117 Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion for Summary Adjudication under Fed. R. Civ. P. 56 filed byFreecycleSunnyvale. (Feinberg, Ian) (Filed on 9/13/2007)
September 12, 2007 Filing 116 NOTICE by FreecycleSunnyvale OF WITHDRAWAL OF INDIVIDUAL ATTORNEY DENNIS S. CORGILL (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Evans, Eric) (Filed on 9/12/2007)
September 11, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken denying 107 Motion to File Document Under Seal (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2007)
September 10, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken granting in part 97 Motion to Shorten Time (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2007)
September 6, 2007 Filing 113 Declaration of Lisa Kobialka in Support of 110 Memorandum in Opposition, filed byThe Freecycle Network. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit 3# 4 Exhibit 4# 5 Exhibit 5# 6 Exhibit 6# 7 Exhibit 7# 8 Exhibit 8# 9 Exhibit 9# 10 Exhibit 10# 11 Exhibit 11# 12 Exhibit 12# 13 Exhibit 13# 14 Exhibit 14# 15 Exhibit 15# 16 Exhibit 16# 17 Exhibit 17# 18 Exhibit 18# 19 Exhibit 19# 20 Exhibit 20# 21 Exhibit 21# 22 Exhibit 22# 23 Exhibit 23# 24 Exhibit 24# 25 Exhibit 25# 26 Exhibit 26# 27 Exhibit 27# 28 Exhibit 28# 29 Exhibit 29# 30 Exhibit 30# 31 Exhibit 31# 32 Exhibit 32# 33 Exhibit 33# 34 Exhibit 34# 35 Exhibit 35# 36 Exhibit 36# 37 Exhibit 37# 38 Exhibit 38# 39 Exhibit 39# 40 Exhibit 40# 41 Exhibit 41# 42 Exhibit 42# 43 Exhibit 43# 44 Exhibit 44# 45 Exhibit 45# 46 Exhibit 46# 47 Exhibit 47# 48 Exhibit 48# 49 Exhibit 49# 50 Exhibit 50# 51 Exhibit 51# 52 Exhibit 52# 53 Exhibit 53# 54 Exhibit 54# 55 Exhibit 55# 56 Exhibit 56# 57 Exhibit 57# 58 Exhibit 58# 59 Exhibit 59# 60 Exhibit 60# 61 Exhibit 61# 62 Exhibit 62# 63 Exhibit 63# 64 Exhibit 64# 65 Exhibit 65# 66 Exhibit 66# 67 Exhibit 67# 68 Exhibit 68# 69 Exhibit 69# 70 Exhibit 70# 71 Exhibit 71# 72 Exhibit 72# 73 Exhibit 73# 74 Exhibit 74# 75 Exhibit 75# 76 Exhibit 76# 77 Exhibit 77# 78 Exhibit 78# 79 Exhibit 79# 80 Exhibit 80# 81 Exhibit 81# 82 Exhibit 82# 83 Exhibit 83# 84 Exhibit 84# 85 Exhibit 85# 86 Exhibit 86# 87 Exhibit 87# 88 Exhibit 88# 89 Exhibit 89# 90 Exhibit 90# 91 Exhibit 91# 92 Exhibit 92# 93 Exhibit 93# 94 Exhibit 94# 95 Exhibit 95# 96 Exhibit 96# 97 Exhibit 97# 98 Exhibit 98# 99 Exhibit 99# 100 Exhibit 100# 101 Exhibit 101# 102 Exhibit 102# 103 Exhibit 103# 104 Exhibit 104# 105 Exhibit 105# 106 Exhibit 106# 107 Exhibit 107# 108 Exhibit 108# 109 Exhibit 109# 110 Exhibit 110# 111 Exhibit 111)(Related document(s) 110 ) (Kobialka, Lisa) (Filed on 9/6/2007) Modified on 9/7/2007 (cp, COURT STAFF).
September 6, 2007 Filing 112 Proposed Order Denying Freecyclesunnyvale's Motion for Summary Adjudication Under FED.R.CIV.P.56 by The Freecycle Network. (Andre, Paul) (Filed on 9/6/2007)
September 6, 2007 Filing 111 Declaration of Deron Beal in Support of 110 Memorandum in Opposition, filed byThe Freecycle Network. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit 3# 4 Exhibit 4# 5 Exhibit 5# 6 Exhibit 6# 7 Exhibit 7# 8 Exhibit 8# 9 Exhibit 9# 10 Exhibit 10# 11 Exhibit 11# 12 Exhibit 12# 13 Exhibit 13# 14 Exhibit 14# 15 Exhibit 15# 16 Exhibit 16# 17 Exhibit 17# 18 Exhibit 18# 19 Exhibit 19# 20 Exhibit 20# 21 Exhibit 21# 22 Exhibit 22# 23 Exhibit 23# 24 Exhibit 24# 25 Exhibit 25# 26 Exhibit 26# 27 Exhibit 27# 28 Exhibit 28# 29 Exhibit 29# 30 Exhibit 30# 31 Exhibit 31# 32 Exhibit 32# 33 Exhibit 33# 34 Exhibit 34# 35 Exhibit 35# 36 Exhibit 36# 37 Exhibit 37# 38 Exhibit 38# 39 Exhibit 39# 40 Exhibit 40# 41 Exhibit 41# 42 Exhibit 42# 43 Exhibit 43# 44 Exhibit 44# 45 Exhibit 45# 46 Exhibit 46)(Related document(s) 110 ) (Andre, Paul) (Filed on 9/6/2007)
September 6, 2007 Filing 110 Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Adjudication under Fed.R.Civ.P.56 filed byThe Freecycle Network. (Kobialka, Lisa) (Filed on 9/6/2007) Modified on 9/7/2007 (cp, COURT STAFF).
September 6, 2007 Filing 109 Proposed Order re 107 MOTION for Leave to File Documents Under Seal by The Freecycle Network. (Kobialka, Lisa) (Filed on 9/6/2007)
September 6, 2007 Filing 108 Declaration of Lisa Kobialka in Support of 107 MOTION for Leave to File Documents Under Seal filed byThe Freecycle Network. (Related document(s) 107 ) (Kobialka, Lisa) (Filed on 9/6/2007)
September 6, 2007 Filing 107 MOTION for Leave to File Documents Under Seal filed by The Freecycle Network. Motion Hearing set for 9/27/2007 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (Kobialka, Lisa) (Filed on 9/6/2007)
September 6, 2007 Filing 106 Declaration of Dennis S. Corgill in Support of 105 Memorandum in Opposition to the Freecycle Network, Inc.'s Motion to Shorten Time Pursuant to Civil L.R. 6-3 filed byFreecycleSunnyvale. (Related document(s) 105 ) (Corgill, Dennis) (Filed on 9/6/2007)
September 6, 2007 Filing 105 Memorandum in Opposition to the Freecycle Network, Inc.'s Motion to Shorten Time Pursuant to Civil L.R. 6-3 filed byFreecycleSunnyvale. (Corgill, Dennis) (Filed on 9/6/2007)
September 4, 2007 Filing 104 Declaration of Lisa Kobialka in Support of 101 MOTION to Strike filed byThe Freecycle Network, FreecycleSunnyvale. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2)(Related document(s) 101 ) (Kobialka, Lisa) (Filed on 9/4/2007)
September 4, 2007 Filing 103 MEMORANDUM in Support re 101 MOTION to Strike filed byThe Freecycle Network, FreecycleSunnyvale. (Related document(s) 101 ) (Kobialka, Lisa) (Filed on 9/4/2007)
September 4, 2007 Filing 102 Proposed Order re 101 MOTION to Strike by The Freecycle Network, FreecycleSunnyvale. (Kobialka, Lisa) (Filed on 9/4/2007)
September 4, 2007 Filing 101 MOTION to Strike filed by The Freecycle Network, FreecycleSunnyvale. Motion Hearing set for 9/27/2007 02:00 PM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland. (Kobialka, Lisa) (Filed on 9/4/2007)
September 4, 2007 Filing 100 Declaration of Lisa Kobialka in Support of 97 MOTION to Shorten Time filed byThe Freecycle Network, FreecycleSunnyvale. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit 3# 4 Exhibit 4)(Related document(s) 97 ) (Kobialka, Lisa) (Filed on 9/4/2007)
September 4, 2007 Filing 99 MEMORANDUM in Support re 97 MOTION to Shorten Time filed byThe Freecycle Network, FreecycleSunnyvale. (Related document(s) 97 ) (Kobialka, Lisa) (Filed on 9/4/2007)
September 4, 2007 Filing 98 Proposed Order re 97 MOTION to Shorten Time In Support of by The Freecycle Network, FreecycleSunnyvale. (Kobialka, Lisa) (Filed on 9/4/2007)
September 4, 2007 Filing 97 MOTION to Shorten Time filed by The Freecycle Network, FreecycleSunnyvale. Motion Hearing set for 9/27/2007 02:00 PM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland. (Kobialka, Lisa) (Filed on 9/4/2007)
August 24, 2007 Set/Reset Hearings: Motion Hearing set for 9/27/2007 02:00 PM. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2007)
August 24, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken granting 86 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION AND GRANTING THE MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2007)
August 22, 2007 Filing 95 NOTICE by FreecycleSunnyvale OF FIRM NAME CHANGE (Feinberg, Ian) (Filed on 8/22/2007)
August 22, 2007 Filing 94 Declaration of Dennis S. Corgill in Support of Plaintiff and Counterdefendant Freecyclesunnyvale's Reply in Support of Administrative Motion for Reconsideration filed byFreecycleSunnyvale. (Corgill, Dennis) (Filed on 8/22/2007)
August 22, 2007 Filing 93 REPLY in Support of Plaintiff and Counterdefendant Freecyclesunnyvale's Notice of Administrative Motion and Administrative Motion for Reconsideration of this Court's August 10, 2007 Order Denying Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment without Prejudice filed byFreecycleSunnyvale. (Corgill, Dennis) (Filed on 8/22/2007) Modified on 8/23/2007 (cp, COURT STAFF).
August 16, 2007 Filing 92 Proposed Order re 86 MOTION for Reconsideration of Court's August 10, 2007 Order Denying Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment Without Prejudice by The Freecycle Network. (Bandyopadhyay, Esha) (Filed on 8/16/2007)
August 16, 2007 Filing 91 DECLARATION of ESHA BANDYOPADHYAY in Opposition to 86 MOTION for Reconsideration of Court's August 10, 2007 Order Denying Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment Without Prejudice filed byThe Freecycle Network. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit E# 6 Exhibit F# 7 Exhibit G# 8 Exhibit H)(Related document(s) 86 ) (Bandyopadhyay, Esha) (Filed on 8/16/2007)
August 16, 2007 Filing 90 Memorandum in Opposition re 86 MOTION for Reconsideration of Court's August 10, 2007 Order Denying Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment Without Prejudice filed byThe Freecycle Network. (Bandyopadhyay, Esha) (Filed on 8/16/2007)
August 14, 2007 Filing 89 Corrected Proposed Order re 86 MOTION for Reconsideration of Court's August 10, 2007 Order Denying Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment Without Prejudice by FreecycleSunnyvale. (Corgill, Dennis) (Filed on 8/14/2007) Modified on 8/15/2007 (cp, COURT STAFF).
August 13, 2007 Filing 88 Proposed Order scheduling hearing re 86 MOTION for Reconsideration of Court's August 10, 2007 Order Denying Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment Without Prejudice [Proposed] Order Scheduling Hearing on Plaintiff and Counterdefendant FreecycleSunnyvale's Motion for Summary Judgment or, in the Alternative, for Summary Adjudication by FreecycleSunnyvale. (Corgill, Dennis) (Filed on 8/13/2007) Modified on 8/14/2007 (cp, COURT STAFF).
August 13, 2007 Filing 87 Declaration of Dennis S. Corgill in Support of 86 MOTION for Reconsideration of Court's August 10, 2007 Order Denying Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment Without Prejudice filed byFreecycleSunnyvale. (Related document(s) 86 ) (Corgill, Dennis) (Filed on 8/13/2007)
August 13, 2007 Filing 86 MOTION for Reconsideration of Court's August 10, 2007 Order Denying Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment Without Prejudice filed by FreecycleSunnyvale. (Corgill, Dennis) (Filed on 8/13/2007)
August 10, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken denying without prejudice 76 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying as moot 82 MOTION To Change Time Of Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Adjudication (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2007)
August 9, 2007 Filing 84 Proposed Order re 82 MOTION To Change Time Of Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Adjudication by The Freecycle Network. (Andre, Paul) (Filed on 8/9/2007)
August 9, 2007 Filing 83 Declaration of Esha Bandyopadhyay in Support of 82 MOTION To Change Time Of Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Adjudication filed byThe Freecycle Network. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) 82 ) (Andre, Paul) (Filed on 8/9/2007)
August 9, 2007 Filing 82 MOTION To Change Time Of Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Adjudication filed by The Freecycle Network. (Andre, Paul) (Filed on 8/9/2007)
July 30, 2007 Set/Reset Hearings: Motion Hearing set for 9/6/2007 02:00 PM. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2007)
July 30, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER re 79 GRANTING AS MODIFIED Parties Stipulated Request for Order Changing Time under Civil L.R. 6-2. Signed by Judge CLAUDIA WILKEN on 7/30/07. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2007)
July 27, 2007 Filing 80 Proposed Order re 79 - Stipulated Request for Order Changing Time Under Civil L.R. 6-2 by The Freecycle Network. (Bandyopadhyay, Esha) (Filed on 7/27/2007) Modified on 7/30/2007 (cp, COURT STAFF).
July 27, 2007 Filing 79 - Stipulated Request for Order Changing Time under Civil L.R. 6-2 by The Freecycle Network. (Bandyopadhyay, Esha) (Filed on 7/27/2007) Modified on 7/30/2007 (cp, COURT STAFF).
July 26, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER re 66 granting Stipulated Request for Order Changing Time Under Civil L.R. 6-2. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 7/26/07. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2007)
July 19, 2007 Filing 77 Proposed Order re 76 Corrected Notice of Motion and Motion for Summary Judgment, or in the Alternative, Summary Adjucation, on FreecycleSunnyvale's First Claim for Relief and the Freecyle Network's Counterclaims Corrected [Proposed] Order by FreecycleSunnyvale. (Corgill, Dennis) (Filed on 7/19/2007) Modified on 7/20/2007 (cp, COURT STAFF).
July 19, 2007 Filing 76 Corrected Notice of Motion and Motion for Summary Judgment, or in the Alternative, Summary Adjucation, on FreecycleSunnyvale's First Claim for Relief and the Freecyle Network's Counterclaims filed by FreecycleSunnyvale. Motion Hearing set for 8/23/2007 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland. (Corgill, Dennis) (Filed on 7/19/2007) Modified on 7/20/2007 (cp, COURT STAFF).
July 18, 2007 Filing 75 CLERK'S NOTICE re deficiency (document #68) (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2007)
July 18, 2007 Filing 74 Proposed Order GRANTING SUMMARY ADJUDICATION IN FAVOR OF PLAINTIFF FREECYCLESUNNYVALE'S REQUEST FOR DECLARATION OF NON-INFRINGEMENT AND AGAINST COUNTERCLAIMANT THE FREECYCLE NETWORK'S CLAIMS FOR TRADEMARK INFRINGEMENT AND UNFAIR COMPETITION UNDER FED.R.CIV.P. 56 by FreecycleSunnyvale. (Corgill, Dennis) (Filed on 7/18/2007)
July 18, 2007 Filing 73 Declaration of Timothy Oey IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF FREECYCLESUNNYVALE'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION filed byFreecycleSunnyvale. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit Exhibit E# 6 Exhibit Exhibit F# 7 Exhibit Exhibit G# 8 Exhibit Exhibit H# 9 Exhibit Exhibit I# 10 Exhibit Exhibit J# 11 Exhibit Exhibits K-U# 12 Exhibit Exhibits V-EE# 13 Exhibit Exhibits FF-JJ# 14 Exhibit Exhibits KK-OO# 15 Exhibit Exhibits PP-XX)(Corgill, Dennis) (Filed on 7/18/2007)
July 18, 2007 Filing 72 Declaration of Lisanne Abraham IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF FREECYCLESUNNYVALE'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION filed byFreecycleSunnyvale. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibits A-I# 2 Exhibit Exhibits J-R)(Corgill, Dennis) (Filed on 7/18/2007)
July 17, 2007 Filing 71 Declaration of Kenneth A. Hedden, Sr., IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF AND COUNTERDEFENDANT FREECYCLESUNNYVALE'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION filed byFreecycleSunnyvale. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit Exhibit E# 6 Exhibit Exhibit F# 7 Exhibit Exhibit G# 8 Exhibit Exhibit H# 9 Exhibit Exhibit I# 10 Exhibit Exhibit J# 11 Exhibit Exhibit K)(Corgill, Dennis) (Filed on 7/17/2007)
July 17, 2007 Filing 70 Declaration of Miles Dennis Robertson, Jr. IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF AND COUNTERDEFENDANT FREECYCLESUNNYVALE'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION filed byFreecycleSunnyvale. (Corgill, Dennis) (Filed on 7/17/2007)
July 17, 2007 Filing 69 Declaration of Dennis S. Corgill IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF AND COUNTERDEFENDANT FREECYCLESUNNYVALE'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION filed byFreecycleSunnyvale. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Corgill, Dennis) (Filed on 7/17/2007)
July 17, 2007 Filing 68 NOTICE by FreecycleSunnyvale AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION UNDER FED.R.CIV.P. 56 (Corgill, Dennis) (Filed on 7/17/2007)
July 17, 2007 Filing 67 Proposed Order re 66 Stipulation by The Freecycle Network. (Andre, Paul) (Filed on 7/17/2007)
July 17, 2007 Filing 66 Stipulated Request for Order Changing Time Under Civil L.R. 6-2 by The Freecycle Network. (Andre, Paul) (Filed on 7/17/2007) Modified on 7/18/2007 (cp, COURT STAFF).
April 3, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER re 63 granting as modified STIPULATED REQUEST FOR ORDER CHANGING TIME UNDER CIVIL L.R. 6-2. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 4/3/07. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2007)
March 29, 2007 Filing 64 Proposed Order re 63 Stipulated request for order CHANGING TIME FOR FACT DISCOVERY CUTOFF AND OTHER DEADLINES by FreecycleSunnyvale. (Corgill, Dennis) (Filed on 3/29/2007) Modified on 3/30/2007 (cp, COURT STAFF).
March 29, 2007 Filing 63 STIPULATED REQUEST FOR ORDER CHANGING TIME UNDER CIVIL L.R. 6-2 by FreecycleSunnyvale. (Corgill, Dennis) (Filed on 3/29/2007) Modified on 3/30/2007 (cp, COURT STAFF).
December 22, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER re 60 granting Stipulated Request for Order Changing time Under Civil L.R. 6-2. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 12/22/06. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2006)
December 19, 2006 Filing 61 Proposed Order re 60 Stipulation Proposed Order Changing Time For Fact Discovery Cutoff and Other Deadlines by FreecycleSunnyvale. (Corgill, Dennis) (Filed on 12/19/2006)
December 19, 2006 Filing 60 Stipulated Request for Order Changing time Under Civil L.R. 6-2 by FreecycleSunnyvale. (Corgill, Dennis) (Filed on 12/19/2006) Modified on 12/20/2006 (cp, COURT STAFF).
October 16, 2006 Filing 59 Plaintiff and Counterdefendant FreecycleSunnyvale's Answer to Defendant and Counterclaimant The Freecycle Network, Inc.'s Counterclaims ANSWER to Complaint byFreecycleSunnyvale. (Corgill, Dennis) (Filed on 10/16/2006)
October 3, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken granting in part and denying in part 48 Motion to Dismiss (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2006)
October 3, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER re 55 granting as modified STIPULATION Request for Order Changing Time Under Civil L.R. 6-2. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 10/3/06. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2006)
October 2, 2006 Filing 56 Proposed Order Changing Time for Fact Discovery Cutoff and Other Deadlines by FreecycleSunnyvale. (Corgill, Dennis) (Filed on 10/2/2006)
October 2, 2006 Filing 55 STIPULATION Request for Order Changing Time Under Civil L.R. 6-2 by FreecycleSunnyvale. (Corgill, Dennis) (Filed on 10/2/2006)
September 21, 2006 Filing 54 Reply Memorandum In Support of Motions to Dismiss Amended Counterclaims Under Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(b)(6), to Strike State-Law Counterclaim Under Cal.Civ.Proc.Section 425.16, and to Strike Immaterial Allegations Under Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(f) filed byFreecycleSunnyvale. (Corgill, Dennis) (Filed on 9/21/2006) Modified on 9/22/2006 (cp, COURT STAFF).
September 18, 2006 Filing 53 ERRATA re 51 Memorandum in Opposition, to Freecyclesunnyvale's Motion to Dismiss Amended Counterclaims Under Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(b)(6) and to Strike State-Law Counterclaims Under Cal. Code Civ. Proc sec. 425.16 by The Freecycle Network, The Freecycle Network. (Kobialka, Lisa) (Filed on 9/18/2006) Modified on 9/19/2006 (cp, COURT STAFF).
September 15, 2006 Filing 52 Request for Judicial Notice re 51 Memorandum in Opposition to Freecyclesunnyvale's Motions to Dismiss Counterclaims Under Fed.R.Ci.P. 12(b)(6) and to Strike State-Law Counterclaim Under Cal.Code.Civ.Proc. Sec. 425.16 filed byThe Freecycle Network, The Freecycle Network. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 part 1# 2 Exhibit 1 part 2)(Related document(s) 51 ) (Kobialka, Lisa) (Filed on 9/15/2006) Modified on 9/18/2006 (cp, COURT STAFF).
September 15, 2006 Filing 51 Memorandum in Opposition re 48 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Counterclaims Under Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(b)(6) and to Strike State-Law Counterclaim Under Cal. Cod Civ. Proc Sec. 425.16 filed byThe Freecycle Network, The Freecycle Network. (Kobialka, Lisa) (Filed on 9/15/2006) Modified on 9/18/2006 (cp, COURT STAFF).
August 28, 2006 Filing 50 Proposed Order re 48 MOTION to Dismiss COUNTERCLAIMS by FreecycleSunnyvale. (Corgill, Dennis) (Filed on 8/28/2006)
August 28, 2006 Filing 49 Request for Judicial Notice re 48 MOTION to Dismiss COUNTERCLAIMS filed byFreecycleSunnyvale. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit E# 6 Exhibit F# 7 Exhibit G)(Related document(s) 48 ) (Corgill, Dennis) (Filed on 8/28/2006) Modified on 8/29/2006 (cp, COURT STAFF).
August 28, 2006 Filing 48 MOTION to Dismiss COUNTERCLAIMS filed by FreecycleSunnyvale. Motion Hearing set for 10/6/2006 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland. (Corgill, Dennis) (Filed on 8/28/2006)
August 10, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER re 45 granting STIPULATION (JOINT) FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 8/10/06. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2006)
August 8, 2006 Filing 46 Answer to Amended Complaint AND AMENDED, COUNTERCLAIM; jury trial against The Freecycle Network byThe Freecycle Network. (Bandyopadhyay, Esha) (Filed on 8/8/2006) Modified on 8/9/2006 (cp, COURT STAFF).
August 3, 2006 Filing 45 STIPULATION (JOINT) FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER by The Freecycle Network. (Bandyopadhyay, Esha) (Filed on 8/3/2006)
August 1, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER re 41 Granting REVISED STIPULATED REQUEST FOR ORDER CHANGING TIME UNDER CIVIL L.R. 6-2. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 8/1/06. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2006)
July 26, 2006 Filing 43 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by FreecycleSunnyvale PROOF OF SERVICE (Corgill, Dennis) (Filed on 7/26/2006)
July 26, 2006 Filing 42 Proposed Order CHANGING TIME FOR FACT DISCOVERY CUTOFF AND OTHER DEADLINES by FreecycleSunnyvale. (Corgill, Dennis) (Filed on 7/26/2006)
July 26, 2006 Filing 41 REVISED STIPULATED REQUEST FOR ORDER CHANGING TIME UNDER CIVIL L.R. 6-2 by FreecycleSunnyvale. (Corgill, Dennis) (Filed on 7/26/2006) Modified on 7/27/2006 (cp, COURT STAFF).
July 25, 2006 Filing 40 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by FreecycleSunnyvale PROOF OF SERVICE (Corgill, Dennis) (Filed on 7/25/2006)
July 25, 2006 Filing 39 Proposed Order CHANGING TIME FOR FACT DISCOVERY CUTOFF AND OTHER DEADLINES by FreecycleSunnyvale. (Corgill, Dennis) (Filed on 7/25/2006)
July 25, 2006 Filing 38 STIPULATED REQUEST FOR ORDER CHANGING TIME UNDER CIVIL L.R. 6-2 by FreecycleSunnyvale. (Corgill, Dennis) (Filed on 7/25/2006) Modified on 7/26/2006 (cp, COURT STAFF).
July 25, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken granting in part and denying in part 24 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO DISMISS AND DENYING MOTION TO STRIKE (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2006)
June 15, 2006 Filing 36 CERTIFICATION OF MEDIATION Session on 6/13/2006, case not settled, phone discussions expected by 6/30/06, mediation complete. Filed by Mediator, William N. Hebert, dated 6/13/2006. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2006)
June 15, 2006 Set/Reset Hearings: Mediation Hearing conducted on 6/13/2006. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2006)
June 9, 2006 ADR Remark: The mediation deadline has been extended to 6/30/2006. See # 34 . (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2006)
June 2, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER re 34 Granting STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME TO COMPLETE MEDIATION. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 6/2/06. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2006)
May 31, 2006 Filing 34 STIPULATION AND (PROPOSED) ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO COMPLETE MEDIATION by The Freecycle Network. (Bandyopadhyay, Esha) (Filed on 5/31/2006)
May 26, 2006 Filing 33 Declaration of Timothy Oey in Support of 32 Reply In Support Of Motion To Strike State-Law Counterclaim Under Cal. Code. Civ. Proc. Section 425.16 filed byFreecycleSunnyvale. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C)(Related document(s) 32 ) (Feinberg, Ian) (Filed on 5/26/2006) Modified on 5/30/2006 (cp, COURT STAFF).
May 26, 2006 Filing 32 Reply in support re 24 MOTION to Strike 23 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim filed byFreecycleSunnyvale. (Feinberg, Ian) (Filed on 5/26/2006) Modified on 5/30/2006 (cp, COURT STAFF).
May 19, 2006 Filing 31 Request for Judicial Notice re 29 Memorandum in Opposition to Freecyclesunnyvale's Motion to Dismiss Counterclaim and to Strike filed byThe Freecycle Network. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit 3# 4 Exhibit 4)(Related document(s) 29 ) (Bandyopadhyay, Esha) (Filed on 5/19/2006)
May 19, 2006 Filing 30 Declaration of Esha Bandyopadhyay in Support of 29 Memorandum in Opposition to Freecyclesunnyvale's Motion to Dismiss Counterclaims and to Strike State-Law Counterclaim filed byThe Freecycle Network. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit 3# 4 Exhibit 4# 5 Exhibit 5# 6 Exhibit 6# 7 Exhibit 7)(Related document(s) 29 ) (Bandyopadhyay, Esha) (Filed on 5/19/2006)
May 19, 2006 Filing 29 Memorandum in Opposition re 24 MOTION to Strike 23 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim filed byThe Freecycle Network. (Bandyopadhyay, Esha) (Filed on 5/19/2006)
May 10, 2006 Filing 28 CLERK'S NOTICE TAKING MOTION UNDER SUBMISSION. 6/9/06 hearing vacated. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2006)
May 4, 2006 Filing 27 Request for Judicial Notice re 24 MOTION to Strike 23 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim filed byFreecycleSunnyvale, FreecycleSunnyvale. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-H)(Related document(s) 24 ) (Feinberg, Ian) (Filed on 5/4/2006)
May 4, 2006 Filing 26 Proposed Order re 24 MOTION to Strike 23 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by FreecycleSunnyvale, FreecycleSunnyvale. (Feinberg, Ian) (Filed on 5/4/2006)
May 4, 2006 Filing 25 Declaration of Timothy Oey in Support of 24 MOTION to Strike 23 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim filed byFreecycleSunnyvale, FreecycleSunnyvale. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-Q)(Related document(s) 24 ) (Feinberg, Ian) (Filed on 5/4/2006)
May 4, 2006 Filing 24 MOTION to Strike 23 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim filed by FreecycleSunnyvale, FreecycleSunnyvale. Motion Hearing set for 6/9/2006 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland. (Feinberg, Ian) (Filed on 5/4/2006)
May 3, 2006 Set/Reset Hearings: Mediation Hearing set for 6/15/2006 09:00 AM., in the offices of Kirkpatrick & Lockhart Nicholson Graham LLP, 630 Hansen Way, Palo Alto, CA. Mediation statements exchanged and due no later than noon on Thursday, 6/13/2006. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2006)
April 18, 2006 Pre MED phone conference rescheduled to Monday, May 1, 2006 at 11:00 a.m. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2006)
April 17, 2006 Pre MED phone conference scheduled on Thursday, April 27, 2006 at 11:00 a.m. Counsel to confirm they can participate in the call. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2006)
April 14, 2006 Filing 23 THE FREECYCLE NETWORK, INC.'S ANSWER to Amended Complaint and, COUNTERCLAIM against FreecycleSunnyvale byThe Freecycle Network. (Bandyopadhyay, Esha) (Filed on 4/14/2006)
April 13, 2006 Filing 22 ADR Clerk's Notice Appointing William N. Hebert as Mediator. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2006) Modified on 4/13/2006 (cmf, COURT STAFF).
April 7, 2006 Filing 21 EXHIBITS re 20 Amended Complaint (Exhibits 1-10) filed byFreecycleSunnyvale. (Related document(s) 20 ) (Feinberg, Ian) (Filed on 4/7/2006)
April 6, 2006 Filing 20 AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT OF TRADEMARK NON-INFRINGEMENT AND TORTIOUS INTERFERENCE WITH BUSINESS RELATIONS against The Freecycle Network. Filed byFreecycleSunnyvale. (Feinberg, Ian) (Filed on 4/6/2006)
April 4, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken granting in part and denying in part 10 Motion to Dismiss (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2006)
April 4, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MINUTE ORDER AND CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Case referred to mediation. Case Management Conference set for 12/8/2006 10:00 AM. Motion Hearing set for 12/8/2006 10:00 AM.. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 4/4/06. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2006)
March 31, 2006 Filing 17 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 3/31/2006 before Claudia Wilken (Date Filed: 3/31/2006), Initial Case Management Conference held on 3/31/2006 before Claudia Wilken (Date Filed: 3/31/2006). (Court Reporter Raynee Mercado.) (scc, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/31/2006) Modified on 4/5/2006 (cp, COURT STAFF).
March 29, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken granting 14 Motion for Leave to Appear Re: Shane Glynn Pursuant to Local Rule 11-9 (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2006)
March 28, 2006 Filing 15 Proposed Order re 14 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pursuant to Local Rule 11-9 by Shane Glynn by The Freecycle Network. (Boyle, Sean) (Filed on 3/28/2006)
March 27, 2006 Filing 14 MOTION for Leave to Appear Re: Shane Glynn Pursuant to Local Rule 11-9 filed by The Freecycle Network. Motion Hearing set for 3/31/2006 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland. (Boyle, Sean) (Filed on 3/27/2006) Modified on 3/28/2006 (cjl, COURT STAFF).
March 27, 2006 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Sean Michael Boyle (Boyle, Sean) (Filed on 3/27/2006)
March 16, 2006 Filing 12 Reply to Opposition to Motion to Dismiss Under Rule 12(b)(6) filed byThe Freecycle Network. (Bandyopadhyay, Esha) (Filed on 3/16/2006)
March 9, 2006 Filing 11 Memorandum in Opposition re 10 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint Under Rule 12(b)(6) filed by FreecycleSunnyvale. (Feinberg, Ian) (Filed on 3/9/2006) Modified on 3/10/2006 (kc, COURT STAFF).
February 24, 2006 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint Under Rule 12(b)(6) CORRECTION OF DOCKET # 5 filed by The Freecycle Network. Motion Hearing set for 3/31/2006 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland. (Boyle, Sean) (Filed on 2/24/2006) Modified on 3/10/2006 (kc, COURT STAFF).
February 22, 2006 Filing 9 Proposed Order re 5 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint Under Rule 12(b)(6) by The Freecycle Network. (Kobialka, Lisa) (Filed on 2/22/2006) Modified on 2/23/2006 (cjl, COURT STAFF).
February 22, 2006 Filing 8 Notice of Lodging of Authority in Support of The Freecycle Network, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Complaint Under Rule 12(b)(6). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2)(Kobialka, Lisa) (Filed on 2/22/2006) Modified on 2/23/2006 (cjl, COURT STAFF).
February 22, 2006 Filing 7 Request for Judicial Notice re 5 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint Under Rule 12(b)(6) filed by The Freecycle Network. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2)(Related document 5 ) (Kobialka, Lisa) (Filed on 2/22/2006) Modified on 2/23/2006 (cjl, COURT STAFF).
February 22, 2006 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM in Support re 5 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint Under Rule 12(b)(6) filed byThe Freecycle Network. (Related document(s) 5 ) (Kobialka, Lisa) (Filed on 2/22/2006)
February 22, 2006 Filing 5 *** FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE SEE DOCKET # 10 . *** MOTION to Dismiss Complaint Under Rule 12(b)(6) filed by The Freecycle Network. Motion Hearing set for 3/31/2006 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland. (Kobialka, Lisa) (Filed on 2/22/2006) Modified on 2/24/2006 (ewn, COURT STAFF).
February 7, 2006 Filing 4 STIPULATION Joint Stipulation Extending Time for Defendant The Freecycle Network to Respond to Complaint by FreecycleSunnyvale, The Freecycle Network. (Kobialka, Lisa) (Filed on 2/7/2006)
January 24, 2006 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by FreecycleSunnyvale. The Freecycle Network served on 1/19/2006, answer due 2/8/2006. (Feinberg, Ian) (Filed on 1/24/2006)
January 23, 2006 REPORT on the filing an action regarding trademark (cc: form mailed to register). (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2006)
January 18, 2006 CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/18/2006)
January 18, 2006 Filing 2 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 4/14/2006. Case Management Conference set for 4/21/2006 01:30 PM. (Attachments: # 1 Standing order)(cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/18/2006)
January 18, 2006 Summons Issued as to Freecycle Network. (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/18/2006)
January 18, 2006 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Freecycle Network ( Filing fee $ 250, receipt number 5513795.). Filed byFreecycleSunnyvale; certification of interested parties (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/18/2006) Additional attachment(s) added on 1/25/2006 (cp, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FreecycleSunnyvale v. The Freecycle Network
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FreecycleSunnyvale
Represented By: Lisa Kobialka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Freecycle Network
Represented By: Lisa Kobialka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter-claimant: The Freecycle Network
Represented By: Lisa Kobialka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter-defendant: FreecycleSunnyvale
Represented By: Lisa Kobialka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter-defendant: The Freecycle Network
Represented By: Lisa Kobialka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?