Leuzinger v. County of Lake

Case Number: 4:2006cv00398
Filed: January 20, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
Presiding Judge: Saundra Brown Armstrong
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2003 Job Discrimination
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 17, 2010 262 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER: That the Judgment entered on 10/31/07 has been fully satisfied, re 117 Judgment. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 2/16/10. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2010) Modified on 2/18/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
September 10, 2009 259 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re Distributions to be made from the Leuzinger Section 468B Trust re 257 Stipulation. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 9/9/09. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2009) Modified on 9/11/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
March 30, 2009 253 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG granting in part and denying in part 173 Motion for Attorney Fees (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2009)
January 28, 2009 251 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG granting 241 Motion to Deposit Funds; granting 248 Motion for Writ (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2009)
February 5, 2008 171 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG granting in part and denying in part 150 Motion for Taxation of Costs. Costs taxed in the amount of $ $24,324.54 against DEFENDANT. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Leuzinger v. County of Lake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?