Knight v. Evans

Case Number: 4:2006cv00887
Filed: February 9, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
Presiding Judge: Saundra Brown Armstrong
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 1, 2009 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong GRANTING 37 Motion for Summary Judgment. JUDGMENT entered in favor of Defendants Celaya and Hedgpeth. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2009) Modified on 7/2/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
March 25, 2009 41 Opinion or Order of the Court Report of Pro Se Prisoner Early Settlement Proceeding; case not settled. Signed by Judge Nandor J. Vadas on 3/25/09. (glm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2009)
February 23, 2009 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER to transport plaintiff to Solano State Prison for settlement conference March 12, 2009 at 11:00 a.m.. Signed by Judge Nandor J. Vadas on 2/23/09. (glm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2009)
February 20, 2009 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 32 Motion for Extension of Time to File Dispositive Motion. Defendants dispositive motion extended to 02/27/09; Plaintiff's opposition to be filed/served by 03/30/09. If Defendants wish to file a reply brief, they may do so no later than ten (10) days after the date Plaintiff's opposition is filed. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/20/2009) Modified on 2/23/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
February 12, 2009 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, DENYING 21 Motion for Reconsideration of Dismissal; GRANTING 28 Motion to Screen Amendment to Complaint Under 28 U.S.C. Sect. 1915A. Plaintiff's supervisory claims against Defendant Evans are DISMISSED WITHOUT FURTHER LEAVE TO AMEND. The only remaining Defendants in this action are SVSP Associate Warden A. Hedgpeth and SVSP Correctional. Lieutenant J. Celaya. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2009) Modified on 2/13/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
December 12, 2008 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re Dismissal of Claims and Service: The U.S. Marshal is directed to attempt personally service upon Defendants: J.Celaya, Correctional Lieutenant at SVSP and A. Hedgpeth, Warden at Kern Valley State Prison with Summons, Complaint 1 , Amended C omplaint 8 and a copy of this Order. Plaintiff's claims are dismissed with leave to amend, within (30) thirty-days of the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 12/10/08. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2008) Modified on 12/16/2008 (jlm, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Knight v. Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.

Why Is My Information Online?