Vedachalam v. Tata America International Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Gopi Vedachalam and Kangana Beri
Defendant: Tata America International Corporation, Tata Consultancy Services, Ltd and Tata Sons, Ltd
Case Number: 4:2006cv00963
Filed: February 14, 2006
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Los Angeles
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth D Laporte
Referring Judge: Claudia Wilken
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question: Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 9, 2015. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 361 Order by Hon. Claudia Wilken granting #360 Motion for Leave to Disburse Settlement Funds.(tmiS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2015)
May 29, 2015 Filing 360 MOTION Leave to Disburse Settlement Funds filed by Kangana Beri, Gopi Vedachalam. Responses due by 6/12/2015. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Shaver, Anne) (Filed on 5/29/2015)
July 18, 2013 Filing 359 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 7/18/2013 before Claudia Wilken (Date Filed: 7/18/2013), Further Case Management Conference NOT held on 7/18/2013 before Claudia Wilken (Date Filed: 7/18/2013). (Court Reporter Diane Skillman.) (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 7/18/2013)
July 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 358 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting #354 Motion for Settlement (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2013)
July 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 357 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting #345 Motion for Attorney Fees (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2013)
July 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 356 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting #340 Motion for Approval of Service Awards. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2013)
July 12, 2013 Filing 355 SUPPLEMENTAL STATUS REPORT REGARDING PLAINTIFFS MOTIONS FOR FINAL SETTLEMENT APPROVAL #354 AND ATTORNEYS FEES AND COSTS #345 filed byKangana Beri, Gopi Vedachalam. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Steven M. Tindall (Supplement), #2 Declaration of Bernella Osterlund re: Settlement Administration (Supplement), #3 Proposed Order Granting Motion for Attorney Fees and Costs, #4 Proposed Order Granting Final Approval of Class Action Settlement and Final Judgment)(Related document(s) #345 , #354 ) (Tindall, Steven) (Filed on 7/12/2013) Modified on 7/15/2013 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
May 31, 2013 Filing 354 MOTION for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement filed by Kangana Beri, Gopi Vedachalam. Motion Hearing set for 7/18/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Claudia Wilken. Responses due by 6/14/2013. Replies due by 6/21/2013. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Steven M. Tindall, #2 Declaration Daniel M. Hutchinson, #3 Proposed Order Granting Final Approval of Class Action Settlement and Final Judgment)(Tindall, Steven) (Filed on 5/31/2013) Modified on 6/3/2013 (kcS, COURT STAFF).
May 24, 2013 Filing 353 Proposed Order re #345 MOTION for Attorney Fees and costs by Kangana Beri, Gopi Vedachalam. (Tindall, Steven) (Filed on 5/24/2013) Modified on 5/28/2013 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
May 24, 2013 Filing 352 Declaration of Aaron Kaufmann in Support of #345 MOTION for Attorney Fees and costs filed byKangana Beri, Gopi Vedachalam. (Related document(s) #345 ) (Tindall, Steven) (Filed on 5/24/2013) Modified on 5/28/2013 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
May 24, 2013 Filing 351 DECLARATION OF BERNELLA RE: NOTICE PROCEDURES AND CLAIMS ADMINISTRATION filed byKangana Beri, Gopi Vedachalam. (Tindall, Steven) (Filed on 5/24/2013) Modified on 5/28/2013 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
May 24, 2013 Filing 350 Declaration of Michael Rubin in Support of #345 MOTION for Attorney Fees and costs filed byKangana Beri, Gopi Vedachalam. (Related document(s) #345 ) (Tindall, Steven) (Filed on 5/24/2013) Modified on 5/28/2013 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
May 24, 2013 Filing 349 Declaration of Daniel Feinberg in Support of #345 MOTION for Attorney Fees and costs filed byKangana Beri, Gopi Vedachalam. (Related document(s) #345 ) (Tindall, Steven) (Filed on 5/24/2013) Modified on 5/28/2013 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
May 24, 2013 Filing 348 Declaration of Kelly M. Dermody in Support of #345 MOTION for Attorney Fees and costs filed byKangana Beri, Gopi Vedachalam. (Related document(s) #345 ) (Tindall, Steven) (Filed on 5/24/2013) Modified on 5/28/2013 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
May 24, 2013 Filing 347 Declaration of BERNELLA OSTERLUND RE: DISSEMINATION OF NOTICE PURSUANT TO CLASS ACTION FAIRNESS ACT (CAFA) filed byTata America International Corporation, Tata Consultancy Services, Ltd, Tata Sons, Ltd. (LaMar, Michelle) (Filed on 5/24/2013)
May 24, 2013 Filing 346 Declaration of Steven M. Tindall in Support of #345 MOTION for Attorney Fees and costs filed byKangana Beri, Gopi Vedachalam. (Related document(s) #345 ) (Tindall, Steven) (Filed on 5/24/2013) Modified on 5/28/2013 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
May 24, 2013 Filing 345 MOTION for Attorney Fees and costs filed by Kangana Beri, Gopi Vedachalam. Motion Hearing set for 7/18/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Claudia Wilken. Responses due by 6/7/2013. Replies due by 6/14/2013. (Tindall, Steven) (Filed on 5/24/2013) Modified on 5/28/2013 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
May 24, 2013 Filing 344 Declaration of Bernella Osterlund Re: Notice Procedures and Claims Administration filed byKangana Beri, Gopi Vedachalam. (Shaver, Anne) (Filed on 5/24/2013)
May 24, 2013 Filing 343 Declaration of Kangana Beri in Support of #340 MOTION for Approval of Service Awards filed byKangana Beri, Gopi Vedachalam. (Related document(s) #340 ) (Shaver, Anne) (Filed on 5/24/2013) Modified on 5/28/2013 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
May 24, 2013 Filing 342 Declaration in Support of #340 MOTION for Approval of Service Awards filed byKangana Beri, Gopi Vedachalam. (Related document(s) #340 ) (Shaver, Anne) (Filed on 5/24/2013) Modified on 5/28/2013 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
May 24, 2013 Filing 341 Declaration of Anne B. Shaver in Support of #340 MOTION for Approval of Service Awards filed byKangana Beri, Gopi Vedachalam. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Related document(s) #340 ) (Shaver, Anne) (Filed on 5/24/2013) Modified on 5/28/2013 (cpS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 5/28/2013 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
May 24, 2013 Filing 340 MOTION for Approval of Service Awards filed by Kangana Beri, Gopi Vedachalam. Motion Hearing set for 7/18/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Claudia Wilken. Responses due by 6/7/2013. Replies due by 6/14/2013. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Shaver, Anne) (Filed on 5/24/2013) Modified on 5/28/2013 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
April 25, 2013 Filing 339 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Michelle M. LaMar (LaMar, Michelle) (Filed on 4/25/2013)
April 12, 2013 CLERKS NOTICE. Notice is hereby given that the Motion and Further Case Management Conference, previously set for Thursday, July 11, 2013, are continued to Thursday, July 18, 2013, at 2:00 p.m., in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, 1301 Clay Street, Oakland, CA 94612. Case Management Statement due by July 11, 2013. See Docket No. 338 Re Motion. (This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.) (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2013)
April 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 338 Order granting #337 Stipulation entered by Hon. Claudia Wilken. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
April 10, 2013 Filing 337 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER RE FINAL APPROVAL HEARING filed by Kangana Beri, Gopi Vedachalam, Tata Consultancy Services Ltd, Tata Sons, Ltd.. (Hutchinson, Daniel) (Filed on 4/10/2013) Modified on 4/11/2013 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
April 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 336 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken GRANTING #327 PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT. (Attachments: #1 Notice) (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2013)
April 3, 2013 Filing 335 NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL SUBMISSION IN SUPPORT OF re #327 MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT by Kangana Beri, Gopi Vedachalam (Attachments: #1 NOTICE OF PENDENCY OF CLASS ACTION, PROPOSED SETTLEMENT AND FINAL APPROVAL HEARING DATE, #2 NOTICE OF PENDENCY OF CLASS ACTION, PROPOSED SETTLEMENT AND FINAL APPROVAL HEARING DATE (Redline version), #3 Proposed Order, #4 Proposed Order (Redline version))(Jones, Rosha) (Filed on 4/3/2013) Modified on 4/4/2013 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
March 28, 2013 Filing 334 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 3/28/2013 before Claudia Wilken (Date Filed: 3/28/2013). (Court Reporter Raynee Mercado.) (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/28/2013)
February 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 333 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting #332 Stipulation to Shorten Time for Hearing re #327 Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Settlement Approval. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2013)
February 25, 2013 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #327 MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT. Motion Hearing set for 4/4/2013 02:00 PM before Hon. Claudia Wilken. (cpS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2013)
February 25, 2013 Reset Deadlines as to #327 MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT. Motion Hearing set for 3/28/2013 02:00 PM before Hon. Claudia Wilken. See Docket NO. 333. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2013)
February 25, 2013 Reset Hearing as to #327 MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT: Motion Hearing set for 4/4/2013 02:00 PM before Hon. Claudia Wilken. See Dicket No. 331. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2013)
February 22, 2013 Filing 332 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Shorten Time for Hearing re #327 Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Settlement Approval filed by Kangana Beri, Tata America International Corporation, Tata Consultancy Services, Ltd, Tata Sons, Ltd, Gopi Vedachalam. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kelly M. Dermody in Support of Joint Stipulation to Shorten Time for Hearing on Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Settlement Approval)(Dermody, Kelly) (Filed on 2/22/2013) Modified on 2/25/2013 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
February 22, 2013 Filing 331 RE-NOTICE re #327 MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT by Gopi Vedachalam (Dermody, Kelly) (Filed on 2/22/2013) Modified on 2/25/2013 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
February 22, 2013 CLERKS NOTICE. Notice is hereby given that counsel must re-notice not re-file the #327 unopposed motion for preliminary approval of class settlement on an available Thursday, at 2:00 p.m. pursuant to L.R. 7-2 (a). Hearing date of Friday, March 1, 2013, at 9:00 a.m. is vacated. (This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.) (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2013)
February 21, 2013 Filing 330 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER (JOINT) TO SHORTEN TIME FOR HEARING ON PLAINTIFFS' #327 UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY SETTLEMENT APPROVAL filed by Kangana Beri, Gopi Vedachalam, Tata Consultancy Services Ltd, Tata Sons Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kelly M. Dermody in Support of Joint Stipulation)(Dermody, Kelly) (Filed on 2/21/2013) Modified on 2/22/2013 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
February 21, 2013 Filing 329 Declaration of Steven M. Tindall in Support of #327 MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT filed byKangana Beri, Gopi Vedachalam. (Related document(s) #327 ) (Dermody, Kelly) (Filed on 2/21/2013) Modified on 2/22/2013 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
February 21, 2013 Filing 328 Declaration of Anne B. Shaver in Support of #327 MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT filed byKangana Beri, Gopi Vedachalam. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Settlement Agreement, #2 Exhibit 2 - Class Notice, #3 Exhibit 3 - Address Verification Form, #4 Exhibit 4 - Gilardi Firm Resume, #5 Exhibit 5 - Haldeman Resume)(Related document(s) #327 ) (Dermody, Kelly) (Filed on 2/21/2013) Modified on 2/22/2013 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
February 21, 2013 Filing 327 MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF filed by Kangana Beri, Gopi Vedachalam. Motion Hearing set for 3/1/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Claudia Wilken. Responses due by 2/21/2013. Replies due by 2/21/2013. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement)(Dermody, Kelly) (Filed on 2/21/2013) Modified on 2/22/2013 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
February 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 326 ORDER TO CONTINUE STAY OF COURT DEADLINES #325 . Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 2/7/2013. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2013) Modified on 2/8/2013 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
February 6, 2013 Filing 325 STATUS REPORT - JOINT AND [PROPOSED] ORDER TO CONTINUE STAY OF COURT DEADLINES by Kangana Beri, Tata America International Corporation, Tata Consultancy Services, Ltd, Tata Sons, Ltd, Gopi Vedachalam. (Hutchinson, Daniel) (Filed on 2/6/2013)
January 9, 2013 Filing 324 STATUS REPORT JOINT STATUS REPORT by Kangana Beri, Tata Consultancy Services, Ltd, Tata Sons, Ltd, Gopi Vedachalam. (Shaver, Anne) (Filed on 1/9/2013)
December 26, 2012 Filing 323 STATUS REPORT (JOINT) by Kangana Beri, Tata America International Corporation, Tata Consultancy Services, Ltd, Tata Sons, Ltd, Gopi Vedachalam. (Hutchinson, Daniel) (Filed on 12/26/2012)
November 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 322 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting #321 Stipulation to Stay Court Deadlines. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2012)
November 6, 2012 Filing 321 JOINT STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Stay Court Deadlines filed by Gopi Vedachalam. (Tindall, Steven) (Filed on 11/6/2012) Modified on 11/7/2012 (kcS, ).
October 25, 2012 Filing 320 Transcript of Proceedings held on 9/19/2012, before Judge Claudia Wilken. Court Reporter/Transcriber Eric l. Throne, Telephone number 707-761-1322. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 11/15/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/26/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/23/2013. (oh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2012) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/26/2012: #1 Signature Page (Declarations/Stipulations)) (oh, COURT STAFF).
October 22, 2012 Filing 319 STIPULATION re #317 Discovery Hearing AS TO REDACTION PROCESS FOR ADP DISCS filed by Tata America International Corporation, Tata Consultancy Services, Ltd, Tata Sons, Ltd. (LaMar, Michelle) (Filed on 10/22/2012)
October 12, 2012 Filing 318 Transcript of Proceedings held on 10/12/2012, before Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lydia Zinn, Telephone number (415) 531-6587. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/10/2013. (Zinn, Lydia) (Filed on 10/12/2012)
October 12, 2012 Filing 317 Minute Entry: Discovery Hearing held on 10/12/2012 before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte (Date Filed: 10/12/2012). Parties ordered to meet and confer. (Court Reporter Lydia Zinn.) (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/12/2012)
October 10, 2012 Filing 316 REPLY re #309 MOTION to Compel PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS RESPONSIVE TO PLAINTIFFS REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION NOS. 4 AND 24 filed byKangana Beri, Gopi Vedachalam. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Compel Production of Documents Responsive to Plaintiffs' Requests for Production Nos. 4 and 24)(Related document(s) #309 ) (Hutchinson, Daniel) (Filed on 10/10/2012) Modified on 10/11/2012 (cp, COURT STAFF).
October 9, 2012 Filing 315 DECLARATION of Antonia F. Giuliana in Support of #312 Opposition to #309 MOTION to Compel PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS RESPONSIVE TO PLAINTIFFS REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION NOS. 4 AND 24 filed byTata America International Corporation, Tata Consultancy Services, Ltd, Tata Sons, Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15)(Related document(s) #309 ) (LaMar, Michelle) (Filed on 10/9/2012) Modified on 10/10/2012 (kc, COURT STAFF).
October 9, 2012 Filing 314 NOTICE by Tata America International Corporation, Tata Consultancy Services, Ltd, Tata Sons, Ltd re #313 Declaration in Support,, (WITHDRAWAL OF ERRONEOUSLY TITLED DOCUMENT) (LaMar, Michelle) (Filed on 10/9/2012)
October 9, 2012 Filing 313 DISREGARD, ENTERED IN ERRORDeclaration of Antonia F. Giuliana in Support of #309 MOTION to Compel PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS RESPONSIVE TO PLAINTIFFS REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION NOS. 4 AND 24 filed byTata America International Corporation, Tata Consultancy Services, Ltd, Tata Sons, Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15)(Related document(s) #309 ) (LaMar, Michelle) (Filed on 10/9/2012) Modified on 10/10/2012 (kc, COURT STAFF).
October 9, 2012 Filing 312 RESPONSE (re #309 MOTION to Compel PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS RESPONSIVE TO PLAINTIFFS REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION NOS. 4 AND 24 ) filed byTata America International Corporation, Tata Consultancy Services, Ltd, Tata Sons, Ltd. (LaMar, Michelle) (Filed on 10/9/2012)
October 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 311 Modified Order by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte granting #310 Motion to Shorten Time. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(kns, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2012)
October 4, 2012 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #309 MOTION to Compel PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS RESPONSIVE TO PLAINTIFFS REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION NOS. 4 AND 24. Responses due by 10/9/2012. Replies due by 10/10/2012. Motion Hearing set for 10/12/2012 11:00 AM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. (kns, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2012)
October 3, 2012 Filing 310 MOTION to Shorten Time FOR HEARING AND BRIEFING ON MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS RESPONSIVE TO PLAINTIFFS REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION NOS. 4 AND 24 filed by Kangana Beri, Gopi Vedachalam. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hutchinson, Daniel) (Filed on 10/3/2012)
October 3, 2012 Filing 309 MOTION to Compel PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS RESPONSIVE TO PLAINTIFFS REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION NOS. 4 AND 24 filed by Kangana Beri, Gopi Vedachalam. Motion Hearing set for 11/13/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Claudia Wilken. Responses due by 10/17/2012. Replies due by 10/24/2012. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Daniel M. Hutchinson, #2 Exhibit A to Hutchinson Decl., #3 Exhibit B to Hutchinson Decl., #4 Exhibit C to Hutchinson Decl., #5 Exhibit D to Hutchinson Decl., #6 Exhibit E to Hutchinson Decl., #7 Exhibit F to Hutchinson Decl., #8 Exhibit G to Hutchinson Decl., #9 Exhibit H to Hutchinson Decl., #10 Exhibit I to Hutchinson Decl., #11 Exhibit J to Hutchinson Decl., #12 Exhibit K to Hutchinson Decl., #13 Exhibit L to Hutchinson Decl., #14 Exhibit M to Hutchinson Decl., #15 Exhibit N to Hutchinson Decl., #16 Exhibit O to Hutchinson Decl., #17 Exhibit P to Hutchinson Decl., #18 Exhibit Q to Hutchinson Decl.)(Hutchinson, Daniel) (Filed on 10/3/2012)
September 19, 2012 Filing 308 Minute Entry and Case Management Order: Initial Case Management Conference held on 9/19/2012 before Claudia Wilken (Date Filed: 9/19/2012). Case referred to Private ADR.. Motions due by 2/21/2013. Responses/Cross Motions due by 3/7/2013. Replies due by 3/21/2013. Replies due by 3/28/2013. Case Management Statement due by 4/4/2013. Motion/Further Case Management Conference set for 4/11/2013 02:00 PM. Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/4/2013 02:00 PM. Jury Selection set for 9/16/2013 08:30 AM before Hon. Claudia Wilken. (Court Reporter Eric Throne.) (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/19/2012)
September 18, 2012 Filing 307 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF ANTONIA F. GIULIANA by Tata America International Corporation, Tata Consultancy Services, Ltd, Tata Sons, Ltd (LaMar, Michelle) (Filed on 9/18/2012) Modified on 9/19/2012 (cp, COURT STAFF).
September 12, 2012 Filing 306 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Kangana Beri, Tata America International Corporation, Tata Consultancy Services, Ltd, Tata Sons, Ltd, Gopi Vedachalam. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Hutchinson, Daniel) (Filed on 9/12/2012)
August 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 305 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken GRANTING #302 STIPULATION AND APPROVING CLASS NOTICE. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2012)
August 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 304 Order granting #303 Stipulation entered by Hon. Claudia Wilken. CMC continued to Sept 19 at 3 pm. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
August 10, 2012 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Case Management Statement due by 9/12/2012. Case Management Conference set for 9/19/2012 03:00 PM. **See Docket No. 304.** (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2012)
August 9, 2012 Filing 303 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER RE: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by Kangana Beri, Gopi Vedachalam, Tat Sons Ltd, Tata Consultancy Services Ltd. (Shaver, Anne) (Filed on 8/9/2012) Modified on 8/10/2012 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
August 6, 2012 Filing 302 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Approving Class Notice filed by Kangana Beri, Gopi Vedachalam, Tat Sons Ltd, Tata Consultancy Services Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Shaver, Anne) (Filed on 8/6/2012) Modified on 8/7/2012 (cp, COURT STAFF).
August 6, 2012 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Case Management Statement due by 8/22/2012. Case Management Conference set for 8/29/2012 02:00 PM. **See Docket No. 301.** (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2012)
August 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 301 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken denying without prejudice #281 Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment, granting Defendants' #288 Motion pursuant to Rule 56(d) and setting further case management conference (cwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2012)
August 1, 2012 CLERKS NOTICE. Notice is hereby given that the Court, on its own motion, shall take the #281 motion for summary judgment, and the #288 motion for an order denying or staying Plaintiff's motion for summary judgment under submission on the papers. The hearings and the case management conference previously scheduled for Thursday, August 9, 2012, are vacated. (This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.) (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2012)
July 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 300 Order granting #299 Motion for Pro Hac Vice entered by Hon. Claudia Wilken. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
July 30, 2012 Filing 299 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice as to Antonia F. Giuliana ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 44611009185.) Filing fee previously paid on 7/30/2012 filed by Tata Consultancy Services, Ltd, Tata Sons, Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(cpS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2012)
July 19, 2012 Reset Hearings/Deadlines as to: #288 MOTION PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 56(D) FOR AN ORDER DENYING OR STAYING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT re #281 MOTION for Summary Judgment and #281 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Motion Hearing set for 8/9/2012 02:00 PM before Hon. Claudia Wilken. Case Management Statement due by 8/2/2012. Case Management Conference set for 8/9/2012 02:00 PM. See Text Order, Docket No. 298. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2012)
July 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 298 Order granting #295 Motion to Continue to August 9, entered by Hon. Claudia Wilken. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
July 17, 2012 Filing 297 Proposed Order re #295 MOTION to Continue SUMMARY JUDGMENT HEARING AND CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE by Tata America International Corporation, Tata Consultancy Services, Ltd, Tata Sons, Ltd. (LaMar, Michelle) (Filed on 7/17/2012)
July 17, 2012 Filing 296 Declaration of KEVIN J. SMITH in Support of #295 MOTION to Continue SUMMARY JUDGMENT HEARING AND CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed byTata America International Corporation, Tata Consultancy Services, Ltd, Tata Sons, Ltd. (Related document(s) #295 ) (LaMar, Michelle) (Filed on 7/17/2012)
July 17, 2012 Filing 295 MOTION to Continue SUMMARY JUDGMENT HEARING AND CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by Tata America International Corporation, Tata Consultancy Services, Ltd, Tata Sons, Ltd. (LaMar, Michelle) (Filed on 7/17/2012)
July 10, 2012 Filing 294 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Michelle M. LaMar (LaMar, Michelle) (Filed on 7/10/2012)
June 27, 2012 Filing 293 Declaration of Anne B. Shaver in Support of #292 Reply to Opposition/Response, filed byKangana Beri, Gopi Vedachalam. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Related document(s) #292 ) (Shaver, Anne) (Filed on 6/27/2012)
June 27, 2012 Filing 292 REPLY (re #281 MOTION for Summary Judgment ) IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 56(d) filed byKangana Beri, Gopi Vedachalam. (Shaver, Anne) (Filed on 6/27/2012)
June 13, 2012 Filing 291 Proposed Order re #288 MOTION PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 56(D) FOR AN ORDER DENYING OR STAYING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT re #281 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Tata Consultancy Services, Ltd, Tata Sons, Ltd. (LaMar, Michelle) (Filed on 6/13/2012)
June 13, 2012 Filing 290 Declaration of ASHOK MUKHERJEE in Support of #288 MOTION PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 56(D) FOR AN ORDER DENYING OR STAYING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT re #281 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed byTata Consultancy Services, Ltd, Tata Sons, Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K)(Related document(s) #288 ) (LaMar, Michelle) (Filed on 6/13/2012)
June 13, 2012 Filing 289 Declaration of ROBERT I. STEINER in Support of #288 MOTION PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 56(D) FOR AN ORDER DENYING OR STAYING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT re #281 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed byTata Consultancy Services, Ltd, Tata Sons, Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Related document(s) #288 ) (LaMar, Michelle) (Filed on 6/13/2012)
June 13, 2012 Filing 288 MOTION PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 56(D) FOR AN ORDER DENYING OR STAYING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT re #281 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Tata Consultancy Services, Ltd, Tata Sons, Ltd. Motion Hearing set for 8/2/2012 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Claudia Wilken. Responses due by 6/27/2012. Replies due by 7/5/2012. (LaMar, Michelle) (Filed on 6/13/2012)
June 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 287 ORDER of USCA (12-80092) denying petition for permission to appeal the district court's April 2, 2012 order granting class action certification (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2012)
June 8, 2012 Filing 286 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Steven M. Tindall (Tindall, Steven) (Filed on 6/8/2012)
June 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 285 ORDER Granting #284 STIPULATION TO EXTEND SUMMARY JUDGMENT BRIEFING SCHEDULE [JOINT WITH PLAINTIFFS]. Responses due by 6/13/2012. Replies due by 6/27/2012. Motion Hearing set for 8/2/2012 02:00 PM before Hon. Claudia Wilken. Case Management Statement due by 7/26/2012. Case Management Conference set for 8/2/2012 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 6/1/2012. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2012) Modified on 6/4/2012 (cp, COURT STAFF).
May 30, 2012 Filing 284 JOINT STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO EXTEND SUMMARY JUDGMENT BRIEFING SCHEDULE filed by Tata America International Corporation, Tata Consultancy Services, Ltd, Tata Sons, Ltd< Gopi Vedachalam, Kangana Beri. (LaMar, Michelle) (Filed on 5/30/2012) Modified on 5/31/2012 (cp, COURT STAFF).
May 18, 2012 Filing 283 Proposed Order re #281 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Kangana Beri, Gopi Vedachalam. (Shaver, Anne) (Filed on 5/18/2012) Modified on 5/21/2012 (cp, COURT STAFF).
May 18, 2012 Filing 282 Declaration of Anne B. Shaver in Support of #281 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed byKangana Beri, Gopi Vedachalam. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2 Part 1, #3 Exhibit 2 Part 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9)(Related document(s) #281 ) (Shaver, Anne) (Filed on 5/18/2012) Modified on 5/21/2012 (cp, COURT STAFF).
May 18, 2012 Filing 281 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Kangana Beri, Gopi Vedachalam. Motion Hearing set for 6/28/2012 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Claudia Wilken. Responses due by 6/1/2012. Replies due by 6/8/2012. (Shaver, Anne) (Filed on 5/18/2012) Modified on 5/21/2012 (cp, COURT STAFF).
April 25, 2012 Filing 280 Minute Entry: Further Case Management Conference held on 4/25/2012 before Claudia Wilken (Date Filed: 4/25/2012). Case Management Statement due by 7/18/2012. Case Management Conference set for 7/25/2012 02:00 PM. (Court Reporter Raynee Mercado.) (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/25/2012)
April 18, 2012 Filing 279 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Kangana Beri, Tata Consultancy Services, Ltd, Tata Sons, Ltd, Gopi Vedachalam. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Dermody, Kelly) (Filed on 4/18/2012)
April 16, 2012 Filing 278 USCA Case Number 12-80092 Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals re: petition for permission to appeal (kk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2012)
April 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 277 ORDER GRANTING IN PART PLAINTIFFS #185 MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION, GRANTING PLAINTIFFS #181 MOTION TO APPOINT CLASS COUNSEL AND GRANTING DEFENDANTS #272 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A SECOND SUR-REPLY. Case Management Statement due by 4/18/2012. Case Management Conference set for 4/25/2012 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 4/2/2012. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2012)
March 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 276 Order granting #275 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Katherine M Lehe terminated as counsel, entered by Hon. Claudia Wilken. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
March 27, 2012 Filing 275 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Kangana Beri, Gopi Vedachalam. Responses due by 4/10/2012. Replies due by 4/17/2012. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lehe, Katherine) (Filed on 3/27/2012)
December 5, 2011 Filing 274 RESPONSE (re #272 MOTION FOR ADMINSTRATIVE RELIEF TO FILE A SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION TO CLASS CERTIFICATION ) filed byKangana Beri, Gopi Vedachalam. (Dermody, Kelly) (Filed on 12/5/2011)
December 2, 2011 Filing 273 Proposed Order re #272 MOTION FOR ADMINSTRATIVE RELIEF TO FILE A SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION TO CLASS CERTIFICATION by Tata America International Corporation, Tata Consultancy Services, Ltd, Tata Sons, Ltd. (LaMar, Michelle) (Filed on 12/2/2011)
December 2, 2011 Filing 272 MOTION FOR ADMINSTRATIVE RELIEF TO FILE A SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION TO CLASS CERTIFICATION filed by Tata America International Corporation, Tata Consultancy Services, Ltd, Tata Sons, Ltd. Responses due by 12/6/2011. (LaMar, Michelle) (Filed on 12/2/2011)
November 28, 2011 Filing 271 Transcript of Proceedings held on November 17, 2011, before Judge Wilken. Court Reporter/Transcriber Sarah Goekler, Telephone number (530)941-2621; sgoekler.csr@gmail.com. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/27/2012. (slg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/28/2011)
November 17, 2011 Filing 270 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 11/17/2011 before Claudia Wilken (Date Filed: 11/17/2011). Further Case Management Conference held on 11/17/2011 before Claudia Wilken (Date Filed: 11/17/2011). (Court Reporter Sarah Goeckler.) (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/17/2011)
November 10, 2011 Filing 269 Declaration of Robert I. Steiner in Support of #268 Sur-reply in Response to Plaintiffs' [Revised] Reply in Support of Motion for Class Certification filed by Tata America International Corporation, Tata Consultancy Services, Ltd, Tata Sons, Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Related document(s) #268 ) (LaMar, Michelle) (Filed on 11/10/2011) Modified on 11/14/2011 (kc, COURT STAFF).
November 10, 2011 Filing 268 SUR-REPLY in Response to Plaintiffs' [Revised] Reply in Support of Motion for Class Certification (re #185 MOTION to Certify Class) filed by Tata America International Corporation, Tata Consultancy Services, Ltd, Tata Sons, Ltd. (LaMar, Michelle) (Filed on 11/10/2011) Modified on 11/14/2011 (kc, COURT STAFF).
November 10, 2011 Filing 267 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (Joint) filed by Kangana Beri, Gopi Vedachalam. (Perone, Angela) (Filed on 11/10/2011)
November 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 266 Order granting #264 Motion to file surreply entered by Hon. Claudia Wilken. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
November 4, 2011 Filing 265 Proposed Order re #264 MOTION For Adminstrative Relief to File a Surreply to Plaintiffs' [Revised] Reply in Support of Motion for Class Certification MOTION For Adminstrative Relief to File a Surreply to Plaintiffs' [Revised] Reply in Support of Motion for Class Certification by Tata America International Corporation, Tata Consultancy Services, Ltd, Tata Sons, Ltd. (LaMar, Michelle) (Filed on 11/4/2011)
November 4, 2011 Filing 264 MOTION For Adminstrative Relief to File a Surreply to Plaintiffs' [Revised] Reply in Support of Motion for Class Certification filed by Tata America International Corporation, Tata Consultancy Services, Ltd, Tata Sons, Ltd. Responses due by 11/8/2011. (LaMar, Michelle) (Filed on 11/4/2011)
November 3, 2011 Filing 263 [Revised] Reply in Support of #185 Motion for Class Certification filed byKangana Beri, Gopi Vedachalam. (Related document(s) #185 ) (Lehe, Katherine) (Filed on 11/3/2011) Modified on 11/4/2011 (cp, COURT STAFF).
November 3, 2011 Filing 262 NOTICE Of Errata Re #255 Hutchinson Declaration In Support Of Plaintiffs' Motion To Strike by Kangana Beri, Gopi Vedachalam (Lehe, Katherine) (Filed on 11/3/2011) Modified on 11/4/2011 (cp, COURT STAFF).
November 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 261 ORDER STRIKING PLAINTIFFS #254 MOTION TO STRIKE DEFENDANTS EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 11/2/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2011)
October 31, 2011 Filing 260 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Shortening Time for Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike by Kangana Beri, Gopi Vedachalam. (Shaver, Anne) (Filed on 10/31/2011)
October 28, 2011 Filing 259 Plaintiffs' Proposed Trial Plan filed byKangana Beri, Gopi Vedachalam. (Related document(s) #185 ) (Shaver, Anne) (Filed on 10/28/2011) Modified on 10/31/2011 (cp, COURT STAFF).
October 28, 2011 Filing 258 Declaration of Anne B. Shaver in Support of #257 Opposition/Response to Motion filed byKangana Beri, Gopi Vedachalam. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 4A, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 12A, #15 Exhibit 13, #16 Exhibit 14, #17 Exhibit 15, #18 Exhibit 16, #19 Exhibit 17, #20 Exhibit 18, #21 Exhibit 19, #22 Exhibit 20, #23 Exhibit 21, #24 Exhibit 22, #25 Exhibit 23, #26 Exhibit 24, #27 Exhibit 25, #28 Exhibit 26, #29 Exhibit 27, #30 Exhibit 28, #31 Exhibit 29, #32 Exhibit 30, #33 Exhibit 31, #34 Exhibit 32, #35 Exhibit 33, #36 Exhibit 34, #37 Exhibit 35, #38 Exhibit 36, #39 Exhibit 37, #40 Exhibit 38, #41 Exhibit 39, #42 Exhibit 40)(Related document(s) #257 ) (Shaver, Anne) (Filed on 10/28/2011) Modified on 10/31/2011 (cp, COURT STAFF).
October 28, 2011 Filing 257 REPLY (re #185 MOTION to Certify Class ) filed byKangana Beri, Gopi Vedachalam. (Shaver, Anne) (Filed on 10/28/2011) Modified on 10/31/2011 (cp, COURT STAFF).
October 28, 2011 Filing 256 Proposed Order re #254 MOTION to Strike #244 Declaration in Support, #252 Declaration in Support, #245 Declaration in Support, by Kangana Beri, Gopi Vedachalam. (Hutchinson, Daniel) (Filed on 10/28/2011) Modified on 10/31/2011 (cp, COURT STAFF).
October 28, 2011 Filing 255 Declaration of Daniel M. Hutchinson in Support of #254 MOTION to Strike #244 Declaration in Support, #252 Declaration in Support, #245 Declaration in Support filed byKangana Beri, Gopi Vedachalam. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit S, #20 Exhibit T, #21 Exhibit U)(Related document(s) #254 ) (Hutchinson, Daniel) (Filed on 10/28/2011) Modified on 10/31/2011 (cp, COURT STAFF).
October 28, 2011 Filing 254 MOTION to Strike #244 Declaration in Support, #252 Declaration in Support, #245 Declaration in Support filed by Kangana Beri, Gopi Vedachalam. Motion Hearing set for 12/8/2011 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Claudia Wilken. Responses due by 11/14/2011. Replies due by 11/21/2011. (Hutchinson, Daniel) (Filed on 10/28/2011) Modified on 10/31/2011 (cp, COURT STAFF).
October 27, 2011 Filing 253 AMENDED ANSWER TO SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT; Jury Demand byTata America International Corporation, Tata Consultancy Services, Ltd, Tata Sons, Ltd. (LaMar, Michelle) (Filed on 10/27/2011) Modified on 10/28/2011 (cp, COURT STAFF).
October 26, 2011 Filing 252 Supplemental Declaration of BERNARD R. SISKIN in Support of #243 Opposition/Response to Motion for Class Certification filed byTata America International Corporation, Tata Consultancy Services, Ltd, Tata Sons, Ltd. (Related document(s) #243 ) (LaMar, Michelle) (Filed on 10/26/2011) Modified on 10/27/2011 (cp, COURT STAFF).
October 7, 2011 Filing 251 ANSWER to Amended Complaint [SECOND]; Jury Demand byTata America International Corporation, Tata Consultancy Services, Ltd, Tata Sons, Ltd. (LaMar, Michelle) (Filed on 10/7/2011) Modified on 10/11/2011 (cp, COURT STAFF).
October 3, 2011 CLERKS NOTICE. Notice is hereby given that the motion to appoint counsel and the further case management conference, previously set for Thursday, October 20, 2011, are continued to Thursday, November 17, 2011, at 2:00 p.m., to be heard along with the motion to certify class, in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, 1301 Clay Street, Oakland, CA 94612. Further Case Management Statement due by November 10, 2011. (This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.) (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2011)
September 21, 2011 Filing 250 STATEMENT OF RECENT DECISION pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-3.d in Support of Opposition to Motion for Class Certification filed byTata America International Corporation, Tata Consultancy Services, Ltd, Tata Sons, Ltd. (Related document(s) #243 ) (LaMar, Michelle) (Filed on 9/21/2011)
September 20, 2011 Filing 249 AMENDED COMPLAINT Second against Tata Consultancy Services, Ltd, Tata Sons, Ltd. Filed byKangana Beri, Gopi Vedachalam. (Shaver, Anne) (Filed on 9/20/2011)
September 16, 2011 Filing 248 EXHIBITS re #246 Declaration in Support,, of Opposition to Motion for Class Certification filed byTata America International Corporation, Tata Consultancy Services, Ltd, Tata Sons, Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit BB, #2 Exhibit BC, #3 Exhibit BD, #4 Exhibit BE, #5 Exhibit BF, #6 Exhibit BG, #7 Exhibit BH, #8 Exhibit BI, #9 Exhibit BJ, #10 Exhibit BK, #11 Exhibit BL, #12 Exhibit BM, #13 Exhibit BN, #14 Exhibit BO, #15 Exhibit BP, #16 Exhibit BQ, #17 Exhibit BR, #18 Exhibit BS, #19 Exhibit BT, #20 Exhibit BU, #21 Exhibit BV, #22 Exhibit BW, #23 Exhibit BX, #24 Exhibit BY, #25 Exhibit BZ, #26 Exhibit CA, #27 Exhibit CB, #28 Exhibit CC, #29 Exhibit CD, #30 Exhibit CE)(Related document(s) #246 ) (LaMar, Michelle) (Filed on 9/16/2011)
September 16, 2011 Filing 247 EXHIBITS re #246 Declaration in Support,, Opposition to Motion for Class Certification filed byTata America International Corporation, Tata Consultancy Services, Ltd, Tata Sons, Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit AB, #2 Exhibit AC, #3 Exhibit AD, #4 Exhibit AE, #5 Exhibit AF, #6 Exhibit AG, #7 Exhibit AH, #8 Exhibit AI, #9 Exhibit AJ, #10 Exhibit AK, #11 Exhibit AL, #12 Exhibit AM, #13 Exhibit AN, #14 Exhibit AO, #15 Exhibit AP, #16 Exhibit AQ, #17 Exhibit AR, #18 Exhibit AS, #19 Exhibit AT, #20 Exhibit AU, #21 Exhibit AV, #22 Exhibit AW, #23 Exhibit AX, #24 Exhibit AY, #25 Exhibit AZ)(Related document(s) #246 ) (LaMar, Michelle) (Filed on 9/16/2011)
September 16, 2011 Filing 246 Declaration of KEVIN J. SMITH in Support of #243 Opposition/Response to Motion for Class Certification filed byTata America International Corporation, Tata Consultancy Services, Ltd, Tata Sons, Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit S, #20 Exhibit T, #21 Exhibit U, #22 Exhibit V, #23 Exhibit W, #24 Exhibit X, #25 Exhibit Y, #26 Exhibit Z)(Related document(s) #243 ) (LaMar, Michelle) (Filed on 9/16/2011)
September 16, 2011 Filing 245 Declaration of ASHOK MUKHERJEE in Support of #243 Opposition/Response to Motion for Class Certification filed byTata America International Corporation, Tata Consultancy Services, Ltd, Tata Sons, Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) #243 ) (LaMar, Michelle) (Filed on 9/16/2011)
September 16, 2011 Filing 244 Declaration in Support of #243 Opposition/Response to Motion for Class Certification filed byTata America International Corporation, Tata Consultancy Services, Ltd, Tata Sons, Ltd. (Related document(s) #243 ) (LaMar, Michelle) (Filed on 9/16/2011)
September 16, 2011 Filing 243 RESPONSE (re #185 MOTION to Certify Class ) DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION filed byTata America International Corporation, Tata Consultancy Services, Ltd, Tata Sons, Ltd. (LaMar, Michelle) (Filed on 9/16/2011)
September 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 242 Order granting in part and denying in part #239 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages entered by Hon. Claudia Wilken. Defendant may have 10 additional pages and Plaintiffs may have 10 additional for reply. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
September 9, 2011 Filing 241 RESPONSE (re #239 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages ) Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Administrative Motion to File Excess Pages filed byKangana Beri, Gopi Vedachalam. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Denying Defendants' Administrative Motion To Exceed Page Limits)(Perone, Angela) (Filed on 9/9/2011)
September 7, 2011 Filing 240 Proposed Order re #239 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Tata America International Corporation, Tata Consultancy Services, Ltd, Tata Sons, Ltd. (LaMar, Michelle) (Filed on 9/7/2011)
September 7, 2011 Filing 239 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages filed by Tata America International Corporation, Tata Consultancy Services, Ltd, Tata Sons, Ltd. (LaMar, Michelle) (Filed on 9/7/2011)
August 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 238 ORDER granting #222 Motion to Quash; signed by Judge Elizabeth D Laporte on 8/11/2011. (kns, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2011)
August 10, 2011 Filing 237 CLERKS NOTICE VACATING MOTION HEARING SET FOR 8/11/11. Motion will be decided on the pleadings.(kns, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2011)
August 8, 2011 Filing 236 Declaration of Katherine M. Lehe in Support of #235 Reply to Opposition/Response MOTION TO QUASH DEPOSITION SUBPOENAS filed byKangana Beri, Gopi Vedachalam. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Related document(s) #235 ) (Lehe, Katherine) (Filed on 8/8/2011)
August 8, 2011 Filing 235 REPLY (re #222 MOTION to Quash Deposition Subpoenas ) IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO QUASH DEPOSITION SUBPOENAS filed byKangana Beri, Gopi Vedachalam. (Lehe, Katherine) (Filed on 8/8/2011)
August 8, 2011 Filing 234 Declaration of KEVIN J. SMITH in Support of #233 Opposition/Response to Motion filed byTata America International Corporation, Tata Consultancy Services, Ltd, Tata Sons, Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit S, #20 Exhibit T)(Related document(s) #233 ) (LaMar, Michelle) (Filed on 8/8/2011) Modified on 8/9/2011 (cp, COURT STAFF).
August 8, 2011 Filing 233 RESPONSE (re #222 MOTION to Quash Deposition Subpoenas ) filed byTata America International Corporation, Tata Consultancy Services, Ltd, Tata Sons, Ltd. (LaMar, Michelle) (Filed on 8/8/2011) Modified on 8/9/2011 (cp, COURT STAFF).
August 5, 2011 Filing 232 *** FILED IN ERROR. REFER TO DOCUMENT #234 . *** Declaration of Kevin J. Smith in Support of #231 Defendants' Opposition to Motion to Quash Deposition Subpoenas filed byTata America International Corporation, Tata Consultancy Services, Ltd, Tata Sons, Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit S, #20 Exhibit T)(Related document(s) #231 ) (LaMar, Michelle) (Filed on 8/5/2011) Modified on 8/8/2011 (cp, COURT STAFF). Modified on 8/8/2011 (feriab, COURT STAFF).
August 5, 2011 Filing 231 *** FILED IN ERROR. REFER TO DOCUMENT #233 . *** Defendants' Opposition to Motion to Quash Deposition Subpoenas filed by Tata America International Corporation, Tata Consultancy Services, Ltd, Tata Sons, Ltd. Motion Hearing set for 8/11/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. Responses due by 8/5/2011. Replies due by 8/8/2011. (LaMar, Michelle) (Filed on 8/5/2011) Modified on 8/8/2011 (cp, COURT STAFF). Modified on 8/8/2011 (feriab, COURT STAFF).
August 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 230 ORDER GRANTING IN PART; re #225 Unopposed MOTION to Shorten Time for Hearing and Briefing on Plaintiffs' Motion to Quash Deposition Subpoenas filed by Kangana Beri, Gopi Vedachalam. Motion Hearing set for 8/11/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D Laporte on 07/29/2011. (kns, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2011)
August 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 229 *** FILED IN ERROR, PLEASE DISREGARD THIS ORDER *** ORDER GRANTING IN PART PLAINTIFF'S UNOPPOSED MOTION #225 TO SHORTEN TIME FOR HEARING AND BRIEFING ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO QUASH DEPOSITION SUBPOENAS by Judge Elizabeth D Laporte. (kns, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2011) Modified on 8/3/2011 (kns, COURT STAFF).
July 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 228 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting #219 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Colleen Karoll. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2011)
July 28, 2011 Filing 227 Proposed Order re #225 Unopposed Motion to Shorten Time for Hearing and Briefing on Plaintiffs' Motion to Quash Deposition Subpoenas by Kangana Beri, Gopi Vedachalam. (Lehe, Katherine) (Filed on 7/28/2011) Modified on 7/29/2011 (cp, COURT STAFF).
July 28, 2011 Filing 226 Declaration of Katherine M. Lehe in Support of #225 Unopposed Motion to Shorten Time for Hearing and Briefing on Plaintiffs' Motion to Quash Deposition Subpoenas filed byKangana Beri, Gopi Vedachalam. (Related document(s) #225 ) (Lehe, Katherine) (Filed on 7/28/2011) Modified on 7/29/2011 (cp, COURT STAFF).
July 28, 2011 Filing 225 Unopposed MOTION to Shorten Time for Hearing and Briefing on Plaintiffs' Motion to Quash Deposition Subpoenas filed by Kangana Beri, Gopi Vedachalam. (Lehe, Katherine) (Filed on 7/28/2011) Modified on 7/29/2011 (cp, COURT STAFF).
July 28, 2011 Filing 224 Proposed Order re #222 MOTION to Quash Deposition Subpoenas by Kangana Beri, Gopi Vedachalam. (Lehe, Katherine) (Filed on 7/28/2011) Modified on 7/29/2011 (cp, COURT STAFF).
July 28, 2011 Filing 223 Declaration of Katherine M. Lehe in Support of #222 MOTION to Quash Deposition Subpoenas filed byKangana Beri, Gopi Vedachalam. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K)(Related document(s) #222 ) (Lehe, Katherine) (Filed on 7/28/2011) Modified on 7/29/2011 (cp, COURT STAFF).
July 28, 2011 Filing 222 MOTION to Quash Deposition Subpoenas filed by Kangana Beri, Gopi Vedachalam. Motion Hearing set for 8/9/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. Responses due by 8/5/2011. Replies due by 8/8/2011. (Lehe, Katherine) (Filed on 7/28/2011) Modified on 7/29/2011 (cp, COURT STAFF).
July 26, 2011 Filing 221 NOTICE by Kangana Beri, Gopi Vedachalam Of Withdrawal Of Class Member Declaration Number 8 (Lehe, Katherine) (Filed on 7/26/2011)
July 26, 2011 Filing 220 NOTICE by Kangana Beri, Gopi Vedachalam Of Withdrawal Of Class Member Declaration Number 6 (Lehe, Katherine) (Filed on 7/26/2011)
July 25, 2011 Filing 219 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Colleen Karoll ( Filing fee $ 275, receipt number 44611007333.) filed by Tata America International Corporation, Tata Consultancy Services, Ltd, Tata Sons, Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2011)
July 22, 2011 Filing 218 NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine M Lehe (Lehe, Katherine) (Filed on 7/22/2011)
July 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 217 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken granting #195 Motion to Withdraw #184 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2011)
July 18, 2011 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #185 MOTION to Certify Class. Responses due by 9/16/2011. Replies due by 10/28/2011. Motion Hearing set for 11/17/2011 02:00 PM before Hon. Claudia Wilken. (cpS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2011)
July 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 216 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken granting in part and denying in part #206 Motion Extend Deadline for Class Certification (cwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2011)
July 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 215 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANTS #150 MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2011)
July 12, 2011 Filing 214 CLERKS NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing. Set/Reset Deadlines as to #181 MOTION to Appoint Counsel. Motion Hearing set for 10/20/2011 02:00 PM before Hon. Claudia Wilken. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2011)
July 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 213 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting #212 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Anjna R. Kapoor. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2011)
July 7, 2011 Filing 212 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice as to Anjna R. Kapoor ( Filing fee $ 275, receipt number 44611007250.) filed by Tata America International Corporation, Tata Consultancy Services, Ltd, Tata Sons, Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2011)
July 5, 2011 Filing 211 Proposed Order Denying re #206 Defendants Motion To Extend Class Certification Discovery And Related Briefing Schedule by Kangana Beri, Gopi Vedachalam. (Shaver, Anne) (Filed on 7/5/2011) Modified on 7/6/2011 (cp, COURT STAFF).
July 5, 2011 Filing 210 Declaration in Support of #209 Opposition/Response to Motion, of Anne B. Shaver In Support Of Plaintiffs Opposition To Defendants Motion To Extend Class Certification Discovery And Related Briefing Schedule filed byKangana Beri, Gopi Vedachalam. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Related document(s) #209 ) (Shaver, Anne) (Filed on 7/5/2011)
July 5, 2011 Filing 209 RESPONSE (re #206 MOTION to extend class certification discovery deadline of July 15th and related briefing schedule ) Plaintiffs Opposition To Defendants Motion To Extend Class Certification Discovery And Related Briefing Schedule filed byKangana Beri, Gopi Vedachalam. (Shaver, Anne) (Filed on 7/5/2011)
July 1, 2011 Filing 208 Proposed Order re #206 MOTION to extend class certification discovery deadline of July 15th and related briefing schedule by Tata America International Corporation, Tata Consultancy Services, Ltd, Tata Sons, Ltd. (LaMar, Michelle) (Filed on 7/1/2011) Modified on 7/5/2011 (cp, COURT STAFF).
July 1, 2011 Filing 207 Declaration of Kevin J. Smith in Support of #206 MOTION to extend class certification discovery deadline of July 15th and related briefing schedule filed byTata America International Corporation, Tata Consultancy Services, Ltd, Tata Sons, Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M)(Related document(s) #206 ) (LaMar, Michelle) (Filed on 7/1/2011) Modified on 7/5/2011 (cp, COURT STAFF).
July 1, 2011 Filing 206 MOTION to extend class certification discovery deadline of July 15th and related briefing schedule filed by Tata America International Corporation, Tata Consultancy Services, Ltd, Tata Sons, Ltd. (LaMar, Michelle) (Filed on 7/1/2011) Modified on 7/5/2011 (cp, COURT STAFF).
June 16, 2011 Filing 205 NOTICE by Kangana Beri, Gopi Vedachalam Notice Of Withdrawal Of Class Member Declaration Number 22 (Shaver, Anne) (Filed on 6/16/2011)
June 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 204 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting #203 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Re: Seulgey Suh (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2011)
June 9, 2011 Filing 203 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Re: Seulgey Suh (Filing fee $275, receipt number 44611007124) filed by Tata America International Corporation, Tata Consultancy Services, Ltd, Tata Sons, Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2011)
May 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 202 ORDER Granting #201 Stipulation CLASS CERTIFICATION DISCOVERY AND BRIEFING SCHEDULE as to #185 MOTION to Certify Class. Case Management Statement due by 10/13/2011. Further Case Management Conference set for 10/20/2011 02:00 PM. Motion Hearing set for 10/20/2011 02:00 PM before Hon. Claudia Wilken. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 5/10/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2011)
May 9, 2011 Filing 201 STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER RE: CLASS CERTIFICATION DISCOVERY AND BRIEFING SCHEDULE by Tata America International Corporation, Tata Consultancy Services, Ltd, Tata Sons, Ltd, Gopi Vedachalam, Kangana Beri. (LaMar, Michelle) (Filed on 5/9/2011) Modified on 5/10/2011 (cp, COURT STAFF).
May 5, 2011 Filing 200 Transcript of Proceedings held on April 28, 2011, before Judge Wilken. Court Reporter/Transcriber Sarah Goekler, Telephone number (530)941-2621; sgoekler25@yahoo.com. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/3/2011. (slg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2011)
April 28, 2011 Filing 199 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 4/28/2011 before Claudia Wilken (Date Filed: 4/28/2011). (Court Reporter Sarah Goekler.) (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/28/2011)
April 28, 2011 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #150 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment. Motion Hearing set for 4/28/2011 03:00 PM before Hon. Claudia Wilken. (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2011)
April 28, 2011 ***Deadlines terminated. 4/28/2011 2:00pm re [150 Motion for partial summary judgment (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2011)
April 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 198 ORDER Granting #194 Stipulation HEARING ON DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT. #150 Motion to be heard at 3:00 p.m. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 4/27/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2011)
April 26, 2011 Filing 197 Proposed Order re #195 MOTION to Withdraw #184 Motion File Under Seal by Kangana Beri, Gopi Vedachalam. (Shaver, Anne) (Filed on 4/26/2011) Modified on 4/27/2011 (cp, COURT STAFF).
April 26, 2011 Filing 196 Declaration of Daniel M. Hutchinson in Support of #195 MOTION to Withdraw #184 Motion File Under Seal filed byKangana Beri, Gopi Vedachalam. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Related document(s) #195 ) (Shaver, Anne) (Filed on 4/26/2011) Modified on 4/27/2011 (cp, COURT STAFF).
April 26, 2011 Filing 195 MOTION to Withdraw #184 Motion File Under Seal filed by Kangana Beri, Gopi Vedachalam. (Shaver, Anne) (Filed on 4/26/2011) Modified on 4/27/2011 (cp, COURT STAFF).
April 26, 2011 Filing 194 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order re: HEARING ON DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Kangana Beri, Gopi Vedachalam, Tata America International Corporation, Tata Consultancy Services Ltd, Tata Sons, Ltd.. (Hutchinson, Daniel) (Filed on 4/26/2011) Modified on 4/27/2011 (cp, COURT STAFF).
April 26, 2011 Filing 193 NOTICE OF ERRATA Class Member Declarations 31-34 re #188 by Kangana Beri, Gopi Vedachalam. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit)(Shaver, Anne) (Filed on 4/26/2011) Modified on 4/27/2011 (cp, COURT STAFF).
April 26, 2011 Set Hearing Date as to #185 MOTION to Certify Class. Motion Hearing set for 7/14/2011 02:00 PM before Hon. Claudia Wilken. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2011)
April 25, 2011 Filing 192 Proposed Order re #185 MOTION to Certify Class by Kangana Beri, Gopi Vedachalam. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Class Notice)(Shaver, Anne) (Filed on 4/25/2011) Modified on 4/26/2011 (kc, COURT STAFF).
April 25, 2011 Filing 191 Declaration of Alice Tran in Support of #185 MOTION to Certify Class filed by Kangana Beri, Gopi Vedachalam. (Related document(s) #185 ) (Shaver, Anne) (Filed on 4/25/2011) Modified on 4/26/2011 (kc, COURT STAFF).
April 25, 2011 Filing 190 Declaration of Anne B. Shaver in Support of #185 MOTION to Certify Class filed by Kangana Beri, Gopi Vedachalam. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) #185 ) (Shaver, Anne) (Filed on 4/25/2011) Modified on 4/26/2011 (kc, COURT STAFF).
April 25, 2011 Filing 189 EXHIBITS re #186 Declaration in Support, Exhibits EX1 to EX19 filed byKangana Beri, Gopi Vedachalam. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EX2, #2 Exhibit EX3, #3 Exhibit EX4, #4 Exhibit EX5, #5 Exhibit EX6, #6 Exhibit EX7, #7 Exhibit EX8, #8 Exhibit EX9, #9 Exhibit EX10, #10 Exhibit EX11, #11 Exhibit EX12, #12 Exhibit EX13, #13 Exhibit EX14, #14 Exhibit EX15, #15 Exhibit EX16, #16 Exhibit EX17, #17 Exhibit EX18, #18 Exhibit EX19)(Related document(s) #186 ) (Shaver, Anne) (Filed on 4/25/2011)
April 25, 2011 Filing 188 EXHIBITS re #186 Declaration in Support, Exhibits P1 to D46 filed byKangana Beri, Gopi Vedachalam. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit P2, #2 Exhibit D1a, #3 Exhibit D1b, #4 Exhibit D1c, #5 Exhibit D1d, #6 Exhibit D1e, #7 Exhibit D1f, #8 Exhibit D1g, #9 Exhibit D2a, #10 Exhibit D3a, #11 Exhibit D4a, #12 Exhibit D5a, #13 Exhibit D6a, #14 Exhibit D7a, #15 Exhibit D8a, #16 Exhibit D9a, #17 Exhibit D10a, #18 Exhibit D11a, #19 Exhibit D12a, #20 Exhibit D13a, #21 Exhibit D14a, #22 Exhibit D15a, #23 Exhibit D16a, #24 Exhibit D17a, #25 Exhibit D18a, #26 Exhibit D19a, #27 Exhibit D20a, #28 Exhibit D21a, #29 Exhibit D21b, #30 Exhibit D21c, #31 Exhibit D22a, #32 Exhibit D23a, #33 Exhibit D24a, #34 Exhibit D25a, #35 Exhibit D26a, #36 Exhibit D27a, #37 Exhibit D28a, #38 Exhibit D29a, #39 Exhibit D30a, #40 Exhibit D30b, #41 Exhibit D30c, #42 Exhibit D30d, #43 Exhibit D30e, #44 Exhibit D31a, #45 Exhibit D31b, #46 Exhibit D31c, #47 Exhibit D32a, #48 Exhibit D33a, #49 Exhibit D34a, #50 Exhibit D35a, #51 Exhibit D36a, #52 Exhibit D37a, #53 Exhibit D38a, #54 Exhibit D39a, #55 Exhibit D40a, #56 Exhibit D41a, #57 Exhibit D42a, #58 Exhibit D43a, #59 Exhibit D44a, #60 Exhibit D45a, #61 Exhibit D46a)(Related document(s) #186 ) (Shaver, Anne) (Filed on 4/25/2011)
April 25, 2011 Filing 187 EXHIBITS re #186 Declaration in Support, Exhibit A-E filed byKangana Beri, Gopi Vedachalam. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B, #2 Exhibit C, #3 Exhibit D, #4 Exhibit E)(Related document(s) #186 ) (Shaver, Anne) (Filed on 4/25/2011)
April 25, 2011 Filing 186 Declaration of Daniel M. Hutchinson in Support of #185 MOTION to Certify Class filed by Kangana Beri, Gopi Vedachalam. (Related document(s) #185 ) (Shaver, Anne) (Filed on 4/25/2011) Modified on 4/26/2011 (kc, COURT STAFF).
April 25, 2011 Filing 185 MOTION to Certify Class and Notice of Motion; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support filed by Kangana Beri, Gopi Vedachalam. Motion Hearing set for 7/14/2011 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Claudia Wilken. (Shaver, Anne) (Filed on 4/25/2011) Modified on 4/26/2011 (kc, COURT STAFF).
April 25, 2011 Filing 184 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Kangana Beri, Gopi Vedachalam. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order)(Shaver, Anne) (Filed on 4/25/2011)
April 25, 2011 Filing 183 Declaration of Kelly M. Dermody in support of #181 Motion to Appoint Class Counsel under F.R.C.P. 23(g) filed by Kangana Beri, Gopi Vedachalam. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (part 1), #2 Exhibit A (part 2))(Perone, Angela) (Filed on 4/25/2011) Modified on 4/26/2011 (kc, COURT STAFF).
April 25, 2011 Filing 182 Declaration of Steven M. Tindall in support of #181 Motion to Appoint Class Counsel under F.R.C.P. 23(g) filed by Kangana Beri, Gopi Vedachalam. (Perone, Angela) (Filed on 4/25/2011) Modified on 4/26/2011 (kc, COURT STAFF).
April 25, 2011 Filing 181 MOTION to Appoint Class Counsel under F.R.C.P. 23(g) filed by Kangana Beri, Gopi Vedachalam. Motion Hearing set for 7/14/2011 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Claudia Wilken. (Perone, Angela) (Filed on 4/25/2011) Modified on 4/26/2011 (kc, COURT STAFF).
March 31, 2011 Filing 180 DECLARATION OF KEVIN J. SMITH IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS #179 MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT filed byTata America International Corporation, Tata Consultancy Services, Ltd, Tata Sons, Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(LaMar, Michelle) (Filed on 3/31/2011) Modified on 4/1/2011 (cp, COURT STAFF).
March 31, 2011 Filing 179 REPLY (re #150 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment ) DEFENDANTS MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT filed byTata America International Corporation, Tata Consultancy Services, Ltd, Tata Sons, Ltd. (LaMar, Michelle) (Filed on 3/31/2011)
March 28, 2011 Filing 178 CLERKS NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing. Motion Hearing set for 4/28/2011 02:00 PM before Hon. Claudia Wilken. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2011)
March 10, 2011 Filing 177 Proposed Order DENYING re #150 MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Kangana Beri, Gopi Vedachalam. (Dermody, Kelly) (Filed on 3/10/2011) Modified on 3/11/2011 (cp, COURT STAFF).
March 10, 2011 Filing 176 Declaration of DANIEL M. HUTCHINSON in Support of #175 Opposition/Response to Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed byKangana Beri, Gopi Vedachalam. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28, #29 Exhibit 29, #30 Exhibit 30, #31 Exhibit 31, #32 Exhibit 32, #33 Exhibit 33, #34 Exhibit 34, #35 Exhibit 35, #36 Exhibit 36, #37 Exhibit 37, #38 Exhibit 38, #39 Exhibit 39, #40 Exhibit 40, #41 Exhibit 41, #42 Exhibit 42, #43 Exhibit 43, #44 Exhibit 44, #45 Exhibit 45, #46 Exhibit 46, #47 Exhibit 47, #48 Exhibit 48, #49 Exhibit 49, #50 Exhibit 50, #51 Exhibit 51, #52 Exhibit 52, #53 Exhibit A, #54 Exhibit B, #55 Exhibit C, #56 Exhibit D, #57 Exhibit E)(Related document(s) #175 ) (Hutchinson, Daniel) (Filed on 3/10/2011)
March 10, 2011 Filing 175 RESPONSE (re #150 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment ) filed byKangana Beri, Gopi Vedachalam. (Dermody, Kelly) (Filed on 3/10/2011) Modified on 3/11/2011 (cp, COURT STAFF).
February 10, 2011 Filing 174 NOTICE by Tata America International Corporation, Tata Consultancy Services, Ltd, Tata Sons, Ltd re #172 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal [RE-FILING OF EXHIBITS TO THE DECLARATION OF KEVIN J, SMITH IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO THE COURT'S FEBRUARY 7, 2011 ORDER] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E.1, #6 Exhibit E.2, #7 Exhibit E.3, #8 Exhibit E.4, #9 Exhibit E.5, #10 Exhibit F, #11 Exhibit G, #12 Exhibit H, #13 Exhibit I, #14 Exhibit J, #15 Exhibit K, #16 Exhibit L, #17 Exhibit M, #18 Exhibit N, #19 Exhibit O, #20 Exhibit P, #21 Exhibit Q, #22 Exhibit R, #23 Exhibit S, #24 Exhibit T, #25 Exhibit U, #26 Exhibit V, #27 Exhibit W, #28 Exhibit X, #29 Exhibit Y, #30 Exhibit Z, #31 Exhibit AA, #32 Exhibit BB, #33 Exhibit CC, #34 Exhibit DD, #35 Exhibit EE, #36 Exhibit FF, #37 Exhibit GG, #38 Exhibit HH, #39 Exhibit II, #40 Exhibit JJ, #41 Exhibit KK, #42 Exhibit LL, #43 Exhibit MM, #44 Exhibit NN, #45 Exhibit OO, #46 Exhibit PP, #47 Exhibit QQ, #48 Exhibit RR, #49 Exhibit SS, #50 Exhibit TT, #51 Exhibit UU, #52 Exhibit VV, #53 Exhibit WW, #54 Exhibit XX)(LaMar, Michelle) (Filed on 2/10/2011)
February 10, 2011 Filing 173 NOTICE by Tata America International Corporation, Tata Consultancy Services, Ltd, Tata Sons, Ltd re #172 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal [RE-FILING OF EXHIBITS TO THE DECLARATION OF ASHOK MUKHERJEE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO THE COURT'S FEBRUARY 7, 2011 ORDER] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(LaMar, Michelle) (Filed on 2/10/2011)
February 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 172 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE DEFENDANTS #148 MOTION TO SEAL. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2011)
February 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 171 ORDER Granting #169 Stipulation re: Class Certification Motion Deadlines. Case Management Statement due by 7/7/2011. Case Management Conference set for 7/14/2011 02:00 PM. (to be filed) Class Certification Motion Hearing set for 7/14/2011 02:00 PM before Hon. Claudia Wilken. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 2/2/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2011)
February 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 170 ORDER RE DISCOVERY PROCEDURES. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 2/1/2011. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2011)
January 31, 2011 Filing 169 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order re: Class Certification Motion Deadlines by Kangana Beri, Gopi Vedachalam, Tata America International Corporation, Tata Consultancy Services, Ltd., Tata Sons, Ltd. (Perone, Angela) (Filed on 1/31/2011) Modified on 2/1/2011 (cp, COURT STAFF).
January 28, 2011 Filing 168 Minute Entry: Hearing held on 1/28/2011 before Elizabeth D. Laporte re Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel #157 . (Court Reporter Kathy Wyatt) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/28/2011)
January 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 167 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken granting #147 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2011)
January 27, 2011 Filing 166 NOTICE OF ERRATA RE ANTHONY DECLARATION #165 by Tata America International Corporation, Tata Consultancy Services, Ltd, Tata Sons, Ltd (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Amalathas Anthony)(LaMar, Michelle) (Filed on 1/27/2011) Modified on 1/28/2011 (cp, COURT STAFF).
January 27, 2011 Filing 165 Memorandum in Opposition re #157 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents Responsive to Plaintiffs' Requests for Production Nos. 6, 27, and 28 filed byTata America International Corporation, Tata Consultancy Services, Ltd, Tata Sons, Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Robert Steiner, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Declaration of Amalthas Anthony)(LaMar, Michelle) (Filed on 1/27/2011)
January 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 164 ORDER by Judge Laporte granting #159 Motion to Shorten Time. Hearing on Motion to Compel set for January 28, 2011 at 10:45 am. (edllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2011)
January 25, 2011 Set/Reset Deadlines as to Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel #157 . Hearing set for 1/28/2011 10:45 AM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2011)
January 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 163 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge for Discovery purposes. #159 MOTION to Shorten Time for Hearing and Briefing on Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel #157 and/or Modify the Order Setting Briefing Schedules #157 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents Responsive to Plaintiffs' Requests for Production Nos. 6, 27, and 28. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 1/24/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2011)
January 24, 2011 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte for Discovery (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2011)
January 24, 2011 *** Hearing Date Terminated as to #157 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents Responsive to Plaintiffs' Requests for Production Nos. 6, 27, and 28 Pursuant to #163 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge for Discovery. *** (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2011)
January 21, 2011 Filing 162 Memorandum in Opposition re #159 MOTION to Shorten Time for Hearing and Briefing on Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel #157 and/or Modify the Order Setting Briefing Schedules filed byTata America International Corporation, Tata Consultancy Services, Ltd, Tata Sons, Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Robert Steiner, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(LaMar, Michelle) (Filed on 1/21/2011) Modified on 1/24/2011 (cp, COURT STAFF).
January 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 161 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 1/21/2011. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2011)
January 19, 2011 Filing 160 Declaration of Anne B. Shaver in Support of #159 MOTION to Shorten Time for Hearing and Briefing on Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel #157 and/or Modify the Order Setting Briefing Schedules filed byKangana Beri, Gopi Vedachalam. (Related document(s) #159 ) (Shaver, Anne) (Filed on 1/19/2011) Modified on 1/21/2011 (cp, COURT STAFF).
January 19, 2011 Filing 159 MOTION to Shorten Time for Hearing and Briefing on Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel #157 and/or Modify the Order Setting Briefing Schedules filed by Kangana Beri, Gopi Vedachalam. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiffs' Motion to Shorten Time)(Shaver, Anne) (Filed on 1/19/2011)
January 19, 2011 Filing 158 Declaration of Anne B. Shaver in Support of #157 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents Responsive to Plaintiffs' Requests for Production Nos. 6, 27, and 28 filed byKangana Beri, Gopi Vedachalam. (Related document(s) #157 ) (Shaver, Anne) (Filed on 1/19/2011)
January 19, 2011 Filing 157 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents Responsive to Plaintiffs' Requests for Production Nos. 6, 27, and 28 filed by Kangana Beri, Gopi Vedachalam. Motion Hearing set for 2/24/2011 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Claudia Wilken. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel)(Shaver, Anne) (Filed on 1/19/2011)
January 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 156 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge for Discovery purposes. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 1/19/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2011)
January 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 155 ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULES AND CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Set/Reset Deadlines as to #150 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment. Motion Hearing set for 4/14/2011 02:00 PM before Hon. Claudia Wilken. Case Management Statement due by 4/7/2011. Case Management Conference set for 4/14/2011 02:00 PM.. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 1/14/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2011)
January 14, 2011 Filing 154 STIPULATION And [Proposed] Order Re Expedited Case Management Conference by Kangana Beri, Tata America International Corporation, Tata Consultancy Services, Ltd, Tata Sons, Ltd, Gopi Vedachalam. (Dermody, Kelly) (Filed on 1/14/2011) Modified on 1/18/2011 (cp, COURT STAFF).
January 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 153 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Hon. Claudia Wilken for all further proceedings. Judge Hon. Vaughn R. Walker no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 1/10/11. (mab, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2011)
December 29, 2010 Filing 152 Declaration of Ashok Mukherjee in Support of #150 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed byTata America International Corporation, Tata Consultancy Services, Ltd, Tata Sons, Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Related document(s) #150 ) (LaMar, Michelle) (Filed on 12/29/2010)
December 29, 2010 Filing 151 Declaration of Kevin J. Smith in Support of #150 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed byTata America International Corporation, Tata Consultancy Services, Ltd, Tata Sons, Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E.1, #6 Exhibit E.2, #7 Exhibit E.3, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H, #11 Exhibit I, #12 Exhibit J, #13 Exhibit K, #14 Exhibit L, #15 Exhibit M, #16 Exhibit N, #17 Exhibit O, #18 Exhibit P, #19 Exhibit Q, #20 Exhibit R, #21 Exhibit S, #22 Exhibit T, #23 Exhibit U, #24 Exhibit V, #25 Exhibit W, #26 Exhibit X, #27 Exhibit Y, #28 Exhibit Z, #29 Exhibit AA, #30 Exhibit BB, #31 Exhibit CC, #32 Exhibit DD, #33 Exhibit EE, #34 Exhibit FF, #35 Exhibit GG, #36 Exhibit HH, #37 Exhibit II, #38 Exhibit JJ, #39 Exhibit KK, #40 Exhibit LL, #41 Exhibit MM, #42 Exhibit NN, #43 Exhibit OO, #44 Exhibit PP, #45 Exhibit QQ, #46 Exhibit RR, #47 Exhibit SS, #48 Exhibit TT, #49 Exhibit UU, #50 Exhibit VV, #51 Exhibit WW, #52 Exhibit XX)(Related document(s) #150 ) (LaMar, Michelle) (Filed on 12/29/2010)
December 29, 2010 Filing 150 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Tata America International Corporation, Tata Consultancy Services, Ltd, Tata Sons, Ltd. Motion Hearing set for 3/3/2011 10:00 AM before Hon. Vaughn R. Walker. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(LaMar, Michelle) (Filed on 12/29/2010)
December 29, 2010 Filing 149 NOTICE by Tata America International Corporation, Tata Consultancy Services, Ltd, Tata Sons, Ltd re #148 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Notice of Lodging of Exhibits Under Seal in Support of Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (LaMar, Michelle) (Filed on 12/29/2010)
December 29, 2010 Filing 148 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Tata America International Corporation, Tata Consultancy Services, Ltd, Tata Sons, Ltd. Motion Hearing set for 3/2/2011 10:00 AM before Hon. Vaughn R. Walker. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(LaMar, Michelle) (Filed on 12/29/2010)
December 29, 2010 Filing 147 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages filed by Tata America International Corporation, Tata Consultancy Services, Ltd, Tata Sons, Ltd. Motion Hearing set for 3/2/2011 10:00 AM before Hon. Vaughn R. Walker. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Proposed Order)(LaMar, Michelle) (Filed on 12/29/2010)
December 23, 2010 Filing 146 Letter from Defendants to Judge Walker in response to Plaintiffs' letter dated December 21, 2010. (Smith, Kevin) (Filed on 12/23/2010)
December 21, 2010 Filing 145 Letter from Plaintiffs to Judge Walker. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Shaver, Anne) (Filed on 12/21/2010)
September 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 144 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: CLASS CERTIFICATION MOTION DEADLINES AND HEARING DATE, re doc #143 . Plaintiffs' Opening Brief in support of the Motion for Class Certification shall be served and filed no later than FEBRUARY 3, 2011. Defendants' Opposition Brief shall be served and filed no later than MARCH 10, 2011. Plaintiffs' Reply Brief due no later than MARCH 31, 2011. The hearing currently set for December 16, 2010 is rescheduled for APRIL 14, 2011 at 10:00 AM. Signed by Judge Vaughn R Walker on 9/24/2010. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2010)
September 24, 2010 Set/Reset Hearings: Motion Hearing Re-set for 4/14/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2010)
September 22, 2010 Filing 143 STIPULATION and Proposed Order re Class Certification Motion Deadlines by Gopi Vedachalam. (Tindall, Steven) (Filed on 9/22/2010)
September 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 142 ORDER re #139 Letter filed by Tata Consultancy Services, Ltd, Tata America International Corporation, Tata Sons, Ltd, #138 Letter filed by Kangana Beri, Gopi Vedachalam. Defendants are DIRECTED to prepare and produce a privilege log by not later than September 24, 2010. The parties shall inform the court in writing of any remaining disputes associated with RFP no 9 not later than October 1, 2010. (vrwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2010)
August 30, 2010 Filing 141 FIRST AMENDED ANSWER to Amended Complaint (CLASS ACTION) byTata America International Corporation, Tata Consultancy Services, Ltd, Tata Sons, Ltd. (LaMar, Michelle) (Filed on 8/30/2010)
August 30, 2010 Filing 140 STIPULATION RE: CONSENT TO DEFENDANTS' FILING AN AMENDED ANSWER by Tata America International Corporation, Tata Consultancy Services, Ltd, Tata Sons, Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (First Amended Answer))(LaMar, Michelle) (Filed on 8/30/2010)
August 27, 2010 Filing 139 Letter from Kevin J. Smith. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-F)(LaMar, Michelle) (Filed on 8/27/2010)
August 25, 2010 Filing 138 Letter from Anne B. Shaver. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhs. (A - M) to 8-25 Walker Letter)(Shaver, Anne) (Filed on 8/25/2010)
July 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 137 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE CLASS CERTIFICATION MOTION DEADLINES, re #136 filed by Gopi Vedachalam. Based on the parties stipulation, the class certification briefing shall proceed and the hearing shall be set as follows: Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification currently set for hearing on 10/7/2010 is re-set for hearing on 12/16/2010 at 10:00 AM. Plaintiffs' shall file and serve the Motion for Class Certification by no later than 10/7/2010. Defendants' Opposition shall be due no later than 11/15/2010. Reply Brief shall be due no later than 12/2/2010. Signed by Judge Vaughn R Walker on 7/20/2010. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2010)
July 20, 2010 ***Deadlines terminated as to 10/7/2010 hearing. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2010)
July 14, 2010 Filing 136 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order re: Class Certification Motion Deadlines by Gopi Vedachalam. (Tindall, Steven) (Filed on 7/14/2010)
April 1, 2010 Filing 135 Minute Entry: Case Management Conference held on 4/1/2010 before Judge Vaughn R Walker. Hearing to certify class set for 10/7/2010 at 10:00 AM. (Court Reporter Not reported.) (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/1/2010)
April 1, 2010 Set/Reset Hearings: Motion Hearing to certify class set for 10/7/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2010)
March 25, 2010 Filing 134 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Kangana Beri, Gopi Vedachalam. (Perone, Angela) (Filed on 3/25/2010)
March 4, 2010 Filing 133 *** FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE DISREGARD. *** Transcript of Proceedings held on 2/4/10, before Judge Vaughn R. Walker. Court Reporter/Transcriber Sahar McVickar, CSR, RPR, Telephone number (415) 626-6060/sahar_mcvickar@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/2/2010. (McVickar, Sahar) (Filed on 3/4/2010) Modified on 3/4/2010 (feriab, COURT STAFF).
February 22, 2010 Filing 132 CLERKS NOTICE : Further case management conference has been scheduled in this case for April 1, 2010 at 3:30 PM. A joint case management conference statement is due one week before the conference. Parties requesting a continuation of the hearing date shall file a stipulation with a proposed order. If parties are unable to get a stipulation, the requesting party shall file an exparte application with a proposed order. The 2/25/2010 date is vacated. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2010)
February 22, 2010 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Case Management Statement due by 3/25/2010. Further Case Management Conference set for 4/1/2010 03:30 PM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2010)
February 19, 2010 Filing 131 Transcript of Proceedings held on 2/4/10, before Judge Vaughn R. Walker. Court Reporter/Transcriber Sahar McVickar, CSR, RPR, Telephone number (415) 626-6060/sahar_mcvickar@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/20/2010. (McVickar, Sahar) (Filed on 2/19/2010)
February 18, 2010 Filing 130 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand byTata Consultancy Services, Ltd. (LaMar, Michelle) (Filed on 2/18/2010)
February 18, 2010 Filing 129 NOTICE by Tata Consultancy Services, Ltd re #128 Answer to Amended Complaint of Withdrawal of Docket No. 128 (LaMar, Michelle) (Filed on 2/18/2010)
February 18, 2010 Filing 128 First Amended ANSWER to Amended Complaint Class Action byTata Consultancy Services, Ltd. (LaMar, Michelle) (Filed on 2/18/2010)
February 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #114 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part #117 Motion to Dismiss (vrwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2010)
February 4, 2010 Filing 126 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 2/4/2010 before Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker re doc #114 MOTION to Dismiss (Partial Dismissal of the First Amended Complaint), doc #117 MOTION to Dismiss ; the court submitted the matter, the court to issue written order. (Court Reporter Sahar McVickar.) (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/4/2010)
February 4, 2010 Filing 125 NOTICE of Appearance by Jahan C. Sagafi (Sagafi, Jahan) (Filed on 2/4/2010)
January 27, 2010 Filing 124 STIPULATION [PROPOSED] STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER by Kangana Beri, Tata America International Corporation, Tata Consultancy Services, Ltd, Tata Sons, Ltd, Gopi Vedachalam. (Dermody, Kelly) (Filed on 1/27/2010)
January 22, 2010 Filing 123 STIPULATION Stipulated Request for Change of Hearing Date by Kangana Beri, Tata America International Corporation, Tata Consultancy Services, Ltd, Tata Sons, Ltd, Gopi Vedachalam. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service By Electronic Filing)(Dermody, Kelly) (Filed on 1/22/2010)
December 18, 2009 Filing 122 Declaration of Thomas V. Simon in Support of #121 Reply Memorandum, for Partial Dismissal of the First Amended Complaint under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(B)(6) filed byTata America International Corporation, Tata Consultancy Services, Ltd, Tata Sons, Ltd. (Related document(s) #121 ) (LaMar, Michelle) (Filed on 12/18/2009)
December 18, 2009 Filing 121 Reply Memorandum re #114 MOTION to Dismiss (Partial Dismissal of the First Amended Complaint) MOTION to Dismiss (Partial Dismissal of the First Amended Complaint) filed byTata America International Corporation, Tata Consultancy Services, Ltd, Tata Sons, Ltd. (LaMar, Michelle) (Filed on 12/18/2009)
December 14, 2009 Appeal Record Returned (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2009)
December 10, 2009 Filing 120 OBJECTIONS to re #115 Declaration in Support,, Plaintiffs' Evidentiary Objections to Evidence Submitted in Support of Defendants' Motion for Partial Dismissal by Kangana Beri, Gopi Vedachalam. (Dermody, Kelly) (Filed on 12/10/2009)
December 10, 2009 Filing 119 Declaration in Support of #118 Memorandum in Opposition filed byKangana Beri, Gopi Vedachalam. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Denying Defendants' Motion for Partial Dismissal of First Amended Complaint)(Related document(s) #118 ) (Dermody, Kelly) (Filed on 12/10/2009)
December 10, 2009 Filing 118 Memorandum in Opposition re #117 MOTION to Dismiss [Docket No. 115] MOTION to Dismiss [Docket No. 115] filed byKangana Beri, Gopi Vedachalam. (Dermody, Kelly) (Filed on 12/10/2009)
November 19, 2009 Filing 117 MOTION to Dismiss [Docket No. 115] filed by Tata America International Corporation, Tata Consultancy Services, Ltd, Tata Sons, Ltd. Motion Hearing set for 2/4/2009 10:00 AM. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(LaMar, Michelle) (Filed on 11/19/2009)
November 19, 2009 Filing 116 NOTICE by Tata America International Corporation, Tata Consultancy Services, Ltd, Tata Sons, Ltd re #114 MOTION to Dismiss (Partial Dismissal of the First Amended Complaint) MOTION to Dismiss (Partial Dismissal of the First Amended Complaint) NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DOCKET NO. 114 (LaMar, Michelle) (Filed on 11/19/2009)
November 19, 2009 Filing 115 Declaration of Robert I. Steiner in Support of #114 MOTION to Dismiss (Partial Dismissal of the First Amended Complaint) MOTION to Dismiss (Partial Dismissal of the First Amended Complaint) filed byTata America International Corporation, Tata Consultancy Services, Ltd, Tata Sons, Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I)(Related document(s) #114 ) (LaMar, Michelle) (Filed on 11/19/2009)
November 19, 2009 Filing 114 MOTION to Dismiss (Partial Dismissal of the First Amended Complaint) filed by Tata America International Corporation, Tata Consultancy Services, Ltd, Tata Sons, Ltd. Motion Hearing set for 2/4/2009 10:00 AM. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(LaMar, Michelle) (Filed on 11/19/2009)
November 5, 2009 Filing 113 Minute Entry: Case Management Conference held on 11/5/2009 before Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker. Dispositive Motions Hearing set for February 4, 2010 at 10:00 AM. Further Case Management Conference (if necessary) scheduled for February 25, 2010 at 3:30 PM. (Court Reporter not reported.) (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/5/2009)
November 4, 2009 Filing 112 NOTICE of Appearance by Anne Brackett Shaver (Shaver, Anne) (Filed on 11/4/2009)
November 3, 2009 Filing 111 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Kangana Beri, Tata America International Corporation, Tata Consultancy Services, Ltd, Tata Sons, Ltd, Gopi Vedachalam. (Hutchinson, Daniel) (Filed on 11/3/2009)
October 22, 2009 Filing 110 CLERKS NOTICE ; Case Management Conference set for 11/5/2009 03:30 PM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2009)
October 16, 2009 Filing 109 NOTICE of Appearance by Angela Katherine Perone (Perone, Angela) (Filed on 10/16/2009)
October 14, 2009 Filing 108 MOTION for Hearing Plaintiffs' Request for Rule 16 Conference filed by Kangana Beri, Gopi Vedachalam. Motion Hearing set for 11/19/2009 03:30 PM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Dermody, Kelly) (Filed on 10/14/2009)
August 24, 2009 Filing 362 MANDATE of USCA as to #66 Notice of Appeal, filed by Tata Consultancy Services, Ltd, Tata America International Corporation, Tata Sons, Ltd, #96 Notice of Appeal, filed by Tata Consultancy Services, Ltd, Tata America International Corporation, Tata Sons, Ltd. Costs awarded to Appellees in the amount of $405.60. (kc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2009)
August 5, 2009 Filing 107 USCA Memorandum as to #66 Notice of Appeal filed by Tata Consultancy Services, Ltd, Tata America International Corporation, Tata Sons, Ltd. AFFIRMED. (gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2009)
February 25, 2009 Filing 106 Receipt for Appeal Record re appeal #66 Notice of Appeal : (gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2009)
February 6, 2009 Filing 105 Record on Appeal Certified and Transmitted to US Court of Appeals re #66 Notice of Appeal. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2009)
March 24, 2008 Filing 104 Mail sent to Robert I. Steiner returned as undeliverable re #96 Notice of Appeal,. (gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2008)
March 24, 2008 Filing 103 Mail sent to William A. Escobar returned as undeliverable re #96 Notice of Appeal,. (gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2008)
March 20, 2008 Filing 102 TRANSCRIPT DESIGNATION and Ordering Form by Tata America International Corporation, Tata Consultancy Services, Ltd, Tata Sons, Ltd for proceedings held on 06/21/2007 before Judge Hon. Vaughn R. Walker.. (LaMar, Michelle) (Filed on 3/20/2008)
March 13, 2008 Filing 101 USCA Scheduling Order as to #96 Notice of Appeal, filed by Tata Consultancy Services, Ltd, Tata America International Corporation, Tata Sons, Ltd. (sv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2008)
March 13, 2008 Filing 100 USCA Case Number 08-15521 US Court of Appeal for the Ninth Circuit for #96 Notice of Appeal, filed by Tata Consultancy Services, Ltd, Tata America International Corporation, Tata Sons, Ltd. (sv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2008)
March 7, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 99 STIPULATION AND ORDER re #95 DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO STAY PROCEEDINGS PENDING THE RESOLUTION OF APPEAL filed by Tata Consultancy Services, Ltd, Tata America International Corporation, Tata Sons, Ltd. All proceedings in this action before this Court are hereby STAYED pending the outcome of the Consolidated Appeal. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S White for Judge Walker on 3/7/2008. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2008)
March 7, 2008 Case Stayed. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2008)
March 6, 2008 Filing 98 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re #96 Notice of Appeal, (sv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2008) (sv, COURT STAFF).
March 6, 2008 Filing 97 Copy of Notice of Appeal and Docket sheet mailed to all counsel(sv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2008)
March 5, 2008 ***PLEASE DISREGARD AND SEE CORRECT DOC. NO. 96 WITH RECEIPT INFO*** Filing fee for Notice of Appeal received: $ 455.00, receipt number 34611016620. (sv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2008) Modified on 3/6/2008 (sv, COURT STAFF).
March 5, 2008 Filing 95 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order re: Defendants' Motion to Stay Proceedings Pending the Resolution of Appeal by Tata America International Corporation, Tata Consultancy Services, Ltd, Tata Sons, Ltd. (LaMar, Michelle) (Filed on 3/5/2008)
February 29, 2008 Filing 96 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #92 Order on Ex Parte Application, Order on Motion to Compel by Tata America International Corporation, Tata Consultancy Services, Ltd, Tata Sons, Ltd. Filing fee $ 455, receipt number 34611016620. (sv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/29/2008)
February 29, 2008 Filing 94 NOTICE by Tata America International Corporation, Tata Consultancy Services, Ltd, Tata Sons, Ltd re #93 Notice (Other) United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit Civil Appeals Docketing Statement (LaMar, Michelle) (Filed on 2/29/2008)
February 29, 2008 Filing 93 ***PLEASE DIREGARD AND SEE CORRECT NOTICE OF APPEAL DOC. NO. 96**** NOTICE by Tata America International Corporation, Tata Consultancy Services, Ltd, Tata Sons, Ltd of Appeal to the United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit; Notice of Related Cases (LaMar, Michelle) (Filed on 2/29/2008) Modified on 3/6/2008 (sv, COURT STAFF).
February 14, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER by Judge VRW denying #74 Motion to Compel; finding as moot #63 Ex Parte Application (vrwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2008)
January 11, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER of USCA as to #66 Notice of Appeal filed by Tata Consultancy Services, Ltd, Tata America International Corporation, Tata Sons, Ltd. The appellants' motion to further stay appellate proceedings is granted. This appeal is stayed until April 4, 2008. At or prior to the expiration of the stay, the appellants shall file the opening brief or a motion for appropriate relief. If the opening brief is filed, the answering brief shall be due May 5, 2008. The optional reply brief is due 14 days from service of the answering brief. The filing of the opening brief or the failure to file a further motion will terminate the stay. (gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2008) (cp, COURT STAFF).
October 22, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER of USCA as to #66 Notice of Appeal filed by Tata Consultancy Services, Ltd, Tata America International Corporation, Tata Sons, Ltd. The appellants' motion to further stay appellate proceedings is granted. This appeal is stayed until February 4, 2008. At or prior to the expiration of the stay, the appellants shall file the opening brief or a motion for appropriate relief. If the opening brief is filed, the answering brief shall be due March 6, 2008. The optional reply brief is due 14 days from service of the answering brief. The filing of the opening brief or the failure to file a further motion will terminate the stay. (gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2007) (cp, COURT STAFF).
August 22, 2007 Filing 89 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 6/21/2007 before Judge Vaughn R. Walker. Court Reporter: Katherine Wyatt.. (gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2007) (kc, COURT STAFF).
June 22, 2007 Filing 87 Certificate of Record Mailed to USCA re appeal #66 Notice of Appeal : (gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2007)
June 21, 2007 Filing 88 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 6/21/2007 before Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker re #74 MOTION to Compel Arbitration of Plaintiff Kangana Beri's Claims filed by Tata Consultancy Services, Ltd, Tata America International Corporation, Tata Sons, Ltd, the court submitted the matter, court to issue written ruling. (Court Reporter Kathy Wyatt.) (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/21/2007)
June 19, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER of USCA as to #66 Notice of Appeal filed by Tata Consultancy Services, Ltd, Tata America International Corporation, Tata Sons, Ltd. the appellants' motion for an extension of time in which to file the opening brief is construed as a motion to stay appellate proceedings and is gratned. This appeal is stayed until 9/7/2007. At or prior to the expiration of the stay, the appellants shall file the opening brief or a motion for appropriate relief. If the opening brief is filed, the answering brief shall be due 10/9/2007. The optional reply brief is due 14 days from service of the answering brief. The filing of the opening brief or the failure to file a further motion will terminate the stay. Court records do not currentlly reflect that the district court has issued the certificate of record. The appellants shall monitor the issuance of the certificate. (gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2007) (cp, COURT STAFF).
June 7, 2007 Filing 85 Reply Memorandum re #74 MOTION to Compel Arbitration of Plaintiff Kangana Beri's Claims filed byTata America International Corporation, Tata Consultancy Services, Ltd, Tata Sons, Ltd. (LaMar, Michelle) (Filed on 6/7/2007)
May 18, 2007 Filing 84 Memorandum in Opposition Opposition To Defendants' Motion To Compel Arbitration Of Plaintiff Kangana Beri's Claims filed byKangana Beri. (Hutchinson, Daniel) (Filed on 5/18/2007)
May 1, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 83 STIPULATION AND ORDER re #82 . Defendants' motion to compel arbitration is set for hearing on 6/21/2007 at 2:00 PM. Plaintiffs' opposition due 5/18/2007. Defendants' reply due 6/7/2007. Signed by Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker on 5/1/2007. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2007)
April 24, 2007 Filing 82 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Re: Defendants' Motions to (1) Stay Proceedings Pending the Resolution of Appeal; (2) Compel Arbitration of Plaintiff Kangana Beri's Claims; and (3) Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint by Kangana Beri, Gopi Vedachalam, Tata America International Corporation, Tata Consultancy Services, Ltd, Tata Sons, Ltd. (Hutchinson, Daniel) (Filed on 4/24/2007)
April 19, 2007 Filing 81 CLERK'S NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing : YOU ARE NOTIFIED THAT per Counsel's request, Defendants' Motion to Compel Arbitration currently set for hearing on June 14, 2007 is re-set for hearing on June 21, 2007 at 2:00 p.m. Defendants' Motion to Stay currently set for hearing on May 10, 2007 shall be vacated. Motion Hearing set for 6/21/2007 02:00 PM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2007)
April 13, 2007 Filing 80 STIPULATION and Proposed Order re: Motions to Compel Arbitration, Stay, and Dismiss by Kangana Beri. (Tindall, Steven) (Filed on 4/13/2007)
April 4, 2007 USCA Case Number 7-15504 for #66 Notice of Appeal filed by Tata America International Corporation,, Tata Consultancy Services, Ltd,, Tata Sons, Ltd,. (gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2007)
April 3, 2007 Filing 79 Minute Entry: Case Management Conference held on 4/3/2007 before Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker. Defendant's Motion to Stay Proceedings Pending Interlocutory Appeal set for hearing on May 10, 2007 at 2:00 p.m. Defendant's Motion to Dismiss the Amended Complaint and Motion to Compel Arbitration of Plaintiff Kangana Beri's claims set for hearing on June 14, 2007 at 2:00 p.m. (not reported). (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/3/2007)
April 3, 2007 Set/Reset Hearings: Motion Hearing set for 5/10/2007 02:00 PM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2007)
April 2, 2007 Filing 78 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to William A. Escobar re #66 NOTICE OF APPEAL . (gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2007) Modified on 4/21/2011 (cp, COURT STAFF). (cp, COURT STAFF).
April 2, 2007 Filing 77 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Tata America International Corporation, Tata Consultancy Services, Ltd, Tata Sons, Ltd for proceedings held on 11/30/2006 before Judge Vaughn R. Walker, re #66 Notice of Appeal (gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2007) (cp, COURT STAFF).
April 2, 2007 Filing 76 Proposed Order re #74 MOTION to Compel Arbitration of Plaintiff Kangana Beri's Claims by Tata America International Corporation, Tata Consultancy Services, Ltd, Tata Sons, Ltd. (LaMar, Michelle) (Filed on 4/2/2007)
April 2, 2007 Filing 75 Declaration of Kevin J Smith in Support of #74 MOTION to Compel Arbitration of Plaintiff Kangana Beri's Claims filed byTata America International Corporation, Tata Consultancy Services, Ltd, Tata Sons, Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A#2 Exhibit Exhibit B#3 Exhibit Exhibit C#4 Exhibit Exhibit D#5 Exhibit Exhibit E#6 Exhibit Exhibit F)(Related document(s) #74 ) (LaMar, Michelle) (Filed on 4/2/2007)
April 2, 2007 Filing 74 MOTION to Compel Arbitration of Plaintiff Kangana Beri's Claims filed by Tata America International Corporation, Tata Consultancy Services, Ltd, Tata Sons, Ltd. Motion Hearing set for 5/17/2007 02:00 PM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (LaMar, Michelle) (Filed on 4/2/2007)
March 27, 2007 Filing 73 Proposed Order re #71 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint by Tata America International Corporation, Tata Consultancy Services, Ltd, Tata Sons, Ltd. (LaMar, Michelle) (Filed on 3/27/2007)
March 27, 2007 Filing 72 Declaration of Robert Steiner in Support of #71 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint filed byTata America International Corporation, Tata Consultancy Services, Ltd, Tata Sons, Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A#2 Exhibit Exhibit B#3 Exhibit Exhibit C#4 Exhibit Exhibit D#5 Exhibit Exhibit E#6 Exhibit Exhibit F#7 Exhibit Exhibit G#8 Exhibit Exhibit H#9 Exhibit Exhibit I)(Related document(s) #71 ) (LaMar, Michelle) (Filed on 3/27/2007)
March 27, 2007 Filing 71 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint filed by Tata America International Corporation, Tata Consultancy Services, Ltd, Tata Sons, Ltd. Motion Hearing set for 5/17/2007 02:00 PM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (LaMar, Michelle) (Filed on 3/27/2007)
March 27, 2007 Filing 70 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Gopi Vedachalam. (Tindall, Steven) (Filed on 3/27/2007)
March 26, 2007 Filing 69 Reply Memorandum re #63 Ex Parte Application for a Continuance of All Deadlines or Alternatively to Expedite Hearing on Defendants' Motion to Stay filed byTata America International Corporation, Tata Consultancy Services, Ltd, Tata Sons, Ltd. (LaMar, Michelle) (Filed on 3/26/2007)
March 23, 2007 Filing 68 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Denying Defendants' Ex Parte Application for a Continuance of All Deadlines or Alternatively to Expedite Hearing on Defendants' Motion to Stay by Kangana Beri, Gopi Vedachalam. (Hutchinson, Daniel) (Filed on 3/23/2007)
March 23, 2007 Filing 67 Memorandum in Opposition Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Ex Parte Application for a Continuance of All Deadlines or Alternatively to Expedite Hearing on Defendants' Motion to Stay filed byKangana Beri, Gopi Vedachalam. (Hutchinson, Daniel) (Filed on 3/23/2007)
March 23, 2007 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals (gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2007)
March 22, 2007 Filing 66 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #55 Order on Motion to Compel by Tata America International Corporation, Tata Consultancy Services, Ltd, Tata Sons, Ltd. Filing fee $ 455, receipt number 3461100443. (gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2007) (cp, COURT STAFF).
March 22, 2007 Copy of Notice of Appeal and Docket sheet mailed to all counsel (gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2007)
March 22, 2007 Filing 65 Proposed Order re #64 Declaration in Support,, #63 Ex Parte Application for a Continuance of All Deadlines or Alternatively to Expedite Hearing on Defendants' Motion to Stay by Tata America International Corporation, Tata Consultancy Services, Ltd, Tata Sons, Ltd. (LaMar, Michelle) (Filed on 3/22/2007)
March 22, 2007 Filing 64 Declaration of Kevin J Smith in Support of #63 Ex Parte Application for a Continuance of All Deadlines or Alternatively to Expedite Hearing on Defendants' Motion to Stay filed byTata America International Corporation, Tata Consultancy Services, Ltd, Tata Sons, Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A#2 Exhibit Exhibit B#3 Exhibit Exhibit C)(Related document(s) #63 ) (LaMar, Michelle) (Filed on 3/22/2007)
March 22, 2007 Filing 63 Ex Parte Application for a Continuance of All Deadlines or Alternatively to Expedite Hearing on Defendants' Motion to Stay filed by Tata America International Corporation, Tata Consultancy Services, Ltd, Tata Sons, Ltd. (LaMar, Michelle) (Filed on 3/22/2007)
March 22, 2007 Filing 62 Proposed Order re #61 Declaration in Support,, #60 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Interlocutory Appeal by Tata America International Corporation, Tata Consultancy Services, Ltd, Tata Sons, Ltd. (LaMar, Michelle) (Filed on 3/22/2007)
March 22, 2007 Filing 61 Declaration of Kevin J. Smith in Support of #60 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Interlocutory Appeal filed byTata America International Corporation, Tata Consultancy Services, Ltd, Tata Sons, Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A#2 Exhibit Exhibit B#3 Exhibit Exhibit C)(Related document(s) #60 ) (LaMar, Michelle) (Filed on 3/22/2007)
March 22, 2007 Filing 60 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Interlocutory Appeal filed by Tata America International Corporation, Tata Consultancy Services, Ltd, Tata Sons, Ltd. Motion Hearing set for 5/10/2007 02:00 PM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (LaMar, Michelle) (Filed on 3/22/2007)
March 19, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 59 STIPULATION AND ORDER continuing the case management conference from 3/27/2007 to 4/3/2007 at 9:00 AM. Signed by Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker on 3/19/2007. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2007)
March 19, 2007 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Case Management Statement due by 3/27/2007. Case Management Conference set for 4/3/2007 09:00 AM. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2007)
March 16, 2007 Filing 58 Declaration of Michelle M. La Mar in Support of #57 Stipulation, request for continuance of case management conference filed byTata America International Corporation, Tata Consultancy Services, Ltd, Tata Sons, Ltd. (Related document(s) #57 ) (LaMar, Michelle) (Filed on 3/16/2007)
March 16, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 57 STIPULATION and Order For Continuance of Initial Case Management Conference and Filing of Joint Case Management Statement by Tata America International Corporation, Tata Consultancy Services, Ltd, Tata Sons, Ltd. (LaMar, Michelle) (Filed on 3/16/2007)
March 14, 2007 Filing 56 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven M. Tindall on behalf of Plaintiffs (Tindall, Steven) (Filed on 3/14/2007)
March 13, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER by Judge VRW denying #10 Motion to Compel Arbitration(vrwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2007)
March 13, 2007 Filing 54 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Hutchinson (Hutchinson, Daniel) (Filed on 3/13/2007)
March 13, 2007 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Case Management Statement due by 3/20/2007. Case Management Conference set for 3/27/2007 09:00 AM. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2007)
February 15, 2007 Filing 53 NOTICE by Gopi Vedachalam of Withdrawal of Counsel (Finberg, James) (Filed on 2/15/2007)
January 18, 2007 Filing 52 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 11/30/2006 before Judge Vaughn R. Walker. Court Reporter: Belle Ball.. (gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/18/2007) (kc, COURT STAFF).
December 19, 2006 Filing 51 NOTICE of Appearance by Kelly M. Dermody (Dermody, Kelly) (Filed on 12/19/2006)
December 11, 2006 Filing 50 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Kevin J. Smith re #43 . (gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2006) Modified on 4/21/2011 (cp, COURT STAFF). (cp, COURT STAFF).
December 11, 2006 Filing 49 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Robert I. Steiner re #43 . (gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2006) Modified on 4/21/2011 (cp, COURT STAFF). (cp, COURT STAFF).
December 8, 2006 Filing 48 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to William A. Escobar re #43 . (gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2006) Modified on 4/21/2011 (cp, COURT STAFF). (cp, COURT STAFF).
November 30, 2006 Filing 47 Minute Entry: Defs' Motion to Compel Arbitration Motion Hearing held on 11/30/2006 before Judge Vaughn R. Walker (Date Filed: 11/30/2006). (Court Reporter Belle Ball.) (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/30/2006)
November 29, 2006 Filing 46 NOTICE by Kangana Beri, Gopi Vedachalam PLAINTIFFS SUPPLEMENTAL CITATIONS IN RESPONSE TO THE COURTS NOVEMBER 22, 2006 ORDER (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1#2 Exhibit 2#3 Exhibit 3)(Tindall, Steven) (Filed on 11/29/2006)
November 29, 2006 Filing 45 NOTICE by Tata America International Corporation, Tata Consultancy Services, Ltd, Tata Sons, Ltd Notice of Lodgment (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Exhibit B#3 Exhibit C#4 Exhibit D#5 Exhibit E#6 Exhibit F)(LaMar, Michelle) (Filed on 11/29/2006)
November 29, 2006 Filing 44 NOTICE by Tata America International Corporation, Tata Consultancy Services, Ltd, Tata Sons, Ltd Supplemental Citations in Response to the Court's November 22, 2006 Order (LaMar, Michelle) (Filed on 11/29/2006)
November 22, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER SETTING FORTH QUESTIONS FOR HEARING. Signed by Judge VRW on 11/22/06. (vrwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2006)
November 2, 2006 Calendar Entry : Hearing on Defendant's Motion to Compel Arbitration re-calendared for oral argument on 11/30/2006 02:00 PM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (cgd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2006)
August 14, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER by Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker granting #39 exparte motion to vacate the initial case management conference currently set for 8/22/2006. (cgd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2006)
August 14, 2006 Filing 41 Reply Memorandum re #39 Ex Parte MOTION to Continue Case Management Conference filed byKangana Beri, Gopi Vedachalam. (Leckman, Peter) (Filed on 8/14/2006)
August 11, 2006 Filing 40 Proposed Order re #39 Ex Parte MOTION to Continue Case Management Conference by Tata America International Corporation, Tata Consultancy Services, Ltd, Tata Sons, Ltd. (La Mar, Michelle) (Filed on 8/11/2006)
August 11, 2006 Filing 39 Ex Parte MOTION to Continue Case Management Conference filed by Tata America International Corporation, Tata Consultancy Services, Ltd, Tata Sons, Ltd. (La Mar, Michelle) (Filed on 8/11/2006)
July 24, 2006 Filing 38 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Kevin J. Smith re #37 . (gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2006) (cp, COURT STAFF). Modified on 3/16/2011 (cp, COURT STAFF).
July 13, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 37 STIPULATION AND ORDER re: #36 to extend time to respond to First Amended Complaint. Defendants' time to respond extended from 7/14/06 until 10 day after Court issues decision with respect to motion to compel arbitration. Signed by Chief Judge Vaughn R. Walker on 7/13/06. (epb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2006) Additional attachment(s) added on 7/13/2006 (epb, COURT STAFF).
July 12, 2006 Filing 36 STIPULATION Extending Time To Respond to First Amended Complaint by Tata America International Corporation, Tata Consultancy Services, Ltd, Tata Sons, Ltd. (La Mar, Michelle) (Filed on 7/12/2006)
July 7, 2006 Filing 35 CLERK'S NOTICE : YOU ARE NOTIFIED THAT the Court determines that the Motion to Compel Arbitration, or in the alternative, Motion to Stay scheduled for hearing on July 13, 2006 at 2:00 p.m. in the above case is appropriate for submission without oral argument pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-1(b), and accordingly VACATES the hearing. (cgd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2006)
June 29, 2006 Filing 34 Declaration of Kevin J. Smith in Support of #33 Reply Memorandum re Motion to Compel Arbitration filed byTata America International Corporation, Tata Consultancy Services, Ltd, Tata Sons, Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A#2 Exhibit Exhibit B#3 Exhibit Exhibit C)(Related document(s) #33 ) (La Mar, Michelle) (Filed on 6/29/2006)
June 29, 2006 Filing 33 Reply Memorandum re #10 MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed byTata America International Corporation, Tata Consultancy Services, Ltd, Tata Sons, Ltd. (La Mar, Michelle) (Filed on 6/29/2006)
June 22, 2006 Filing 32 Proposed Order re #31 Memorandum in Opposition by Gopi Vedachalam. (Leckman, Peter) (Filed on 6/22/2006)
June 22, 2006 Filing 31 Memorandum in Opposition re #10 MOTION to Compel Arbitration CORRECTION OF DOCKET #30 filed byGopi Vedachalam. (Leckman, Peter) (Filed on 6/22/2006) Modified on 6/22/2006 (ewn, COURT STAFF).
June 22, 2006 Filing 30 *** FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE SEE DOCKET #31 . *** Memorandum in Opposition re #10 MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed byGopi Vedachalam. (Leckman, Peter) (Filed on 6/22/2006) Modified on 6/22/2006 (ewn, COURT STAFF).
June 12, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 29 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING DEFENDANTS' TIME TO RESPOND TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT until 7/14/2006. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants' motion to dismiss the original complaint in this matter is withdrawn without prejudice and is taken off calendar. However, Defendants' motion to compel arbitration, or alternatively, to stay the action shall remain on calendar which is set for hearing on 7/13/2006 at 2:00 PM. Motion to dismiss is withdrawn. Signed by Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker on 6/9/2006. (cgd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2006)
June 12, 2006 Filing 28 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5b) of discussion of ADR options by Defendants (La Mar, Michelle) (Filed on 6/12/2006)
June 9, 2006 Filing 27 STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER by Tata America International Corporation, Tata Consultancy Services, Ltd, Tata Sons, Ltd. (La Mar, Michelle) (Filed on 6/9/2006)
June 8, 2006 Filing 26 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5b) of discussion of ADR options by Plaintiffs Vedachalam and Beri (Leckman, Peter) (Filed on 6/8/2006)
June 6, 2006 Filing 25 NOTICE of need for ADR Phone Conference (ADR L.R. 3-5 d) (La Mar, Michelle) (Filed on 6/6/2006)
June 5, 2006 Filing 24 AMENDED COMPLAINT FIRST against all defendants. Filed byGopi Vedachalam. (Leckman, Peter) (Filed on 6/5/2006)
June 1, 2006 Filing 23 ADR Clerks Notice re: Non-Compliance with Court Order. (tjs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2006)
May 24, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER by Judge Vaughn R. Walker granting #5 Motion for Pro Hac Vice - Robert I. Steiner (gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2006) Additional attachment(s) added on 6/14/2006 (gsa, COURT STAFF). (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/5/2015: #1 Signed Order) (kc, COURT STAFF).
May 24, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER by Judge Vaughn R. Walker granting #4 Motion for Pro Hac Vice - Kevin J. Smith (gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2006) Additional attachment(s) added on 6/14/2006 (gsa, COURT STAFF). (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/5/2015: #1 Signed Order) (kc, COURT STAFF).
May 24, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER by Judge Vaughn R. Walker granting #3 Motion for Pro Hac Vice - William A. Escobar (gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2006) Additional attachment(s) added on 6/14/2006 (gsa, COURT STAFF). (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/5/2015: #1 Signed Order) (kc, COURT STAFF).
May 24, 2006 Filing 19 CLERK'S NOTICE: Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/22/2006 09:00 AM. Case Management Statement due by 8/15/2006. (Attachments: #1 #2) (cgd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2006)
May 8, 2006 Filing 18 Certificate of Interested Entities or persons (La Mar, Michelle) (Filed on 5/8/2006)
May 5, 2006 Filing 17 Proposed Order re #14 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint by Tata America International Corporation, Tata Consultancy Services, Ltd, Tata Sons, Ltd. (La Mar, Michelle) (Filed on 5/5/2006)
May 5, 2006 Filing 16 Request for Judicial Notice re #14 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint filed byTata America International Corporation, Tata Consultancy Services, Ltd, Tata Sons, Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) #14 ) (La Mar, Michelle) (Filed on 5/5/2006)
May 5, 2006 Filing 15 Declaration of Robert Steiner in Support of #14 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint filed byTata America International Corporation, Tata Consultancy Services, Ltd, Tata Sons, Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Exhibit B#3 Exhibit C#4 Exhibit D#5 Exhibit E#6 Exhibit F)(Related document(s) #14 ) (La Mar, Michelle) (Filed on 5/5/2006)
May 5, 2006 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint filed by Tata America International Corporation, Tata Consultancy Services, Ltd, Tata Sons, Ltd. Motion Hearing set for 7/13/2006 02:00 PM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (La Mar, Michelle) (Filed on 5/5/2006)
May 5, 2006 Filing 13 Proposed Order re #10 MOTION to Compel Arbitration by Tata America International Corporation, Tata Consultancy Services, Ltd, Tata Sons, Ltd. (La Mar, Michelle) (Filed on 5/5/2006)
May 5, 2006 Filing 12 Request for Judicial Notice re #10 MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed byTata America International Corporation, Tata Consultancy Services, Ltd, Tata Sons, Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) #10 ) (La Mar, Michelle) (Filed on 5/5/2006)
May 5, 2006 Filing 11 Declaration of Kevin Smith in Support of #10 MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed byTata America International Corporation, Tata Consultancy Services, Ltd, Tata Sons, Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Exhibit B#3 Exhibit C#4 Exhibit D#5 Exhibit E#6 Exhibit F#7 Exhibit G#8 Exhibit H#9 Exhibit I#10 Exhibit J#11 Exhibit K)(Related document(s) #10 ) (La Mar, Michelle) (Filed on 5/5/2006)
May 5, 2006 Filing 10 MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by Tata America International Corporation, Tata Consultancy Services, Ltd, Tata Sons, Ltd. Motion Hearing set for 7/13/2006 02:00 PM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (La Mar, Michelle) (Filed on 5/5/2006)
May 4, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Vaughn R. Walker for all further proceedings. Judge Maria-Elena James no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 5/4/06. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2006)
May 3, 2006 Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (bjt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2006)
May 1, 2006 Filing 7 Declination to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge by Tata America International Corporation, Tata Consultancy Services, Ltd, Tata Sons, Ltd. (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2006) (cp, COURT STAFF).
April 5, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER DIRECTING PARTIES TO FILE CONSENT/DECLINATION FORM BY MAY 4, 2006 re #3 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice filed by Tata America International Corporation,, Tata Consultancy Services, Ltd,, Tata Sons, Ltd,, #4 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice filed by Tata America International Corporation,, Tata Consultancy Services, Ltd,, Tata Sons, Ltd,, #5 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice filed by Tata America International Corporation,, Tata Consultancy Services, Ltd,, Tata Sons, Ltd,. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 4/5/2006. (mejlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2006)
April 4, 2006 Filing 5 MOTION for attorney Robert I. Steiner leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice (Fee Paid # 3383952) filed by Tata America International Corporation, Tata Consultancy Services, Ltd, Tata Sons, Ltd. (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2006) Additional attachment(s) added on 6/14/2006 (gsa, COURT STAFF). (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/5/2015: #1 Application) (kc, COURT STAFF).
April 4, 2006 Filing 4 MOTION for attorney Kevin J. Smith leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice (Fee Paid #3383952) filed by Tata America International Corporation, Tata Consultancy Services, Ltd, Tata Sons, Ltd. (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2006) Additional attachment(s) added on 6/14/2006 (gsa, COURT STAFF).
April 4, 2006 Filing 3 MOTION for attorney William A. Escobar leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice (Fee Paid #3383952) filed by Tata America International Corporation, Tata Consultancy Services, Ltd, Tata Sons, Ltd. (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2006) Additional attachment(s) added on 6/14/2006 (gsa, COURT STAFF).
February 14, 2006 Filing 2 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 6/8/2006. Case Management Conference set for 6/15/2006 10:00 AM. (gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2006) Additional attachment(s) added on 2/16/2006 (ga, COURT STAFF).
February 14, 2006 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Tata America International Corporation, Tata Consultancy Services, Ltd, Tata Sons, Ltd. Demand for Jury Trial( Filing fee $ 250, receipt number 3381648.). Filed byGopi Vedachalam. (gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2006) Additional attachment(s) added on 2/16/2006 (ga, COURT STAFF).
February 14, 2006 Summons Issued as to Tata Consultancy Services, Ltd. (gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2006)
February 14, 2006 CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2006)
February 14, 2006 Summons Issued as to Tata America International Corporation. (gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2006)
February 14, 2006 Summons Issued as to Tata Sons, Ltd. (gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2006)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vedachalam v. Tata America International Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gopi Vedachalam
Represented By: Kelly M. Dermody
Represented By: Steven M. Tindall
Represented By: Angela Katherine Perone
Represented By: Anne Brackett Shaver
Represented By: Daniel M. Hutchinson
Represented By: Jahan C. Sagafi
Represented By: Katherine M Lehe
Represented By: Peter Edwin Leckman
Represented By: Rosha Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kangana Beri
Represented By: Peter Edwin Leckman
Represented By: Angela Katherine Perone
Represented By: Kelly M. Dermody
Represented By: Anne Brackett Shaver
Represented By: Daniel M. Hutchinson
Represented By: Jahan C. Sagafi
Represented By: Katherine M Lehe
Represented By: Rosha Jones
Represented By: Steven M. Tindall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tata America International Corporation
Represented By: Michelle M. LaMar
Represented By: Robert I Steiner
Represented By: Anjna R. Kapoor
Represented By: Colleen Karoll
Represented By: Kevin J. Smith
Represented By: Seulgey Suh
Represented By: William A. Escobar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tata Consultancy Services, Ltd
Represented By: Michelle M. LaMar
Represented By: Robert I Steiner
Represented By: Anjna R. Kapoor
Represented By: Antonia F. Giuliana
Represented By: Colleen Karoll
Represented By: Kevin J. Smith
Represented By: Seulgey Suh
Represented By: William A. Escobar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tata Sons, Ltd
Represented By: Michelle M. LaMar
Represented By: Robert I Steiner
Represented By: Anjna R. Kapoor
Represented By: Antonia F. Giuliana
Represented By: Colleen Karoll
Represented By: Kevin J. Smith
Represented By: Seulgey Suh
Represented By: William A. Escobar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?