Collier v. Hennessy et al

Case Number: 4:2006cv01143
Filed: February 16, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
Presiding Judge: Claudia Wilken
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 9, 2011 200 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken DENYING DEFENDANTS 193 MOTION TO AMEND JUDGMENT. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2011)
April 7, 2011 181 Opinion or Order of the Court VERDICT FORM (FINAL). (cwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2011)
March 31, 2011 171 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 170 Administrative Request for order Allowing Equipment Through Security. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 3/31/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2011)
March 30, 2011 169 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER/CORRECTED ORDER Denying 161 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/30/2011. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2011)
March 17, 2011 160 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON 137 , 145 MOTIONS IN LIMINE. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 3/17/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2011)
March 1, 2011 136 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 135 Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 3/1/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2011)
November 15, 2010 118 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE OF REFERENCE AND ORDER RE DISCOVERY PROCEDURES. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 11/15/10. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2010)
October 12, 2010 114 Opinion or Order of the Court WRIT of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum issued. Signed by Judge Vadas on October 12, 2010. (cmw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2010)
September 14, 2010 112 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 111 Granting Stipulated Protective Order. Signed by Judge Clauidia Wilken on 9/14/2010. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2010)
August 9, 2010 110 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER setting further settlement conference at Solano State Prison November 18, 2010 at 11:00 a.m.. Signed by Judge Nandor J. Vadas on 8/9/10. (glm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2010)
June 30, 2010 105 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 104 Appointing Counsel and Setting Case Management Conference Date. Case Management Conference set for 7/27/2010 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 6/30/2010. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2010)
June 10, 2010 102 Opinion or Order of the Court WRIT of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum issued. Signed by Judge Vadas on June 10, 2010. (cmw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2010)
May 13, 2010 91 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO STRIKE PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION; DENYING THEIR MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; AND REFERRING CASE PRO SE PRISONER SETTLEMENT PROGRAM. Motions terminated: 80 MOTION to Strike 77 Memorandum in Opposition fi led by H. Castro, E. Staehely, S. Neu, J. Aragon, Jackson, 60 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Defendants CASTRO, STAEHLY, NEU, JACKSON AND ARAGON filed by H. Castro, E. Staehely, S. Neu, J. Aragon, Jackson.. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 5/13/2010. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2010)
September 23, 2008 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken denying 16 MOTION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT; DIRECTING SERVED DEFENDANTS TO FILE ANSWER OR TO SHOW CAUSE WHY DEFAULT JUDGMENT SHOULD NOT BE ENTERED AGAINST THEM; AND SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Collier v. Hennessy et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?