Smith et al v. Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
Plaintiff: Danton Ballard, Plaintiffs Smith, Lyons, Ballard and Wiggins, Barry Smith and Michael Wiggins
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
Other: Nicole Clemente, Budi Widjaja, Ricardo Beltran, Joseph D Wilkins and Lolita Wells
Case Number: 4:2006cv02069
Filed: March 20, 2006
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
Presiding Judge: Saundra Brown Armstrong
Referring Judge: Bernard Zimmerman
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 16, 2011. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 16, 2011 Filing 456 MANDATE of USCA: That the parties' joint motion to voluntarily dismiss the appeal pursuant to FRAP Rule 42(b) is GRANTED, and the appeal is dismissed. Each party shall bear its own costs. USCA No. 08-16258 (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2011)
January 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 455 ORDER ACCEPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE re #453 Order. Awarding $526,372.59 in costs to Plaintiffs. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 1/31/11. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2011) Modified on 2/1/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
January 19, 2011 Filing 454 Letter to Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong re Notification to the Court that Plaintiffs and Defendant Do Not Object to the Recommendation by the Magistrate Judge Regarding Plaintiffs' Costs, from Louis M. Marlin, dated 01/18/11. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Regarding Plaintiffs' Motion for Costs)(Marlin, Louis) (Filed on 1/19/2011) Modified on 1/21/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
January 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 453 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #442 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge for Report and Recommendation, #452 Response in Support, filed by Plaintiffs Smith, Lyons, Ballard and Wiggins. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 1/18/2011. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/18/2011)
January 6, 2011 Filing 452 Supplemental Response re #450 Second Order re Costs filed by Plaintiffs Smith, Lyons, Ballard and Wiggins. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Details of deposition and transcript costs, #2 Exhibit Details of March through May 2007 Travel,Lodging and Meeting Expenses, #3 Affidavit Supplemental Declaration of Martin Shapiro, Ph.D,., #4 Affidavit Supplemental Declaration of Peter M. Hart, #5 Affidavit Supplemental Declaration of Louis M. Marlin, #6 Affidavit Supplemental Declaration of J. Dana Pinney)(Marlin, Louis) (Filed on 1/6/2011) Modified on 1/7/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
January 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 451 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART #405 Motion for Attorney Fees. The named Plaintiffs: Danton Ballard, Nathan Lyons, Barry Smith, and Michael Wiggins each awarded $5,000 as incentive payments. Class Counsel awarded $23,220,000 in attorneys' fees. Signed by Judge Armstrong, on 01/03/11. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2011) Modified on 1/6/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
December 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 450 SECOND ORDER RE COSTS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 12/16/2010. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2010)
December 13, 2010 Filing 449 Letter to The Honorable Saundra B. Armstrong re Response to Class Counsel Submission of 12/10/10, from Brian L. Duffy, dated 12/13/10. (Beer, Naomi) (Filed on 12/13/2010) Modified on 12/14/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
December 10, 2010 Filing 448 Letter to Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong re Supplemental Argument from Louis M. Marlin, dated 12/10/10 (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration by the Hon. Layn Phillips (Ret.), #2 Affidavit Declaration by the Hon. Thomas Brett (Ret.))(Marlin, Louis) (Filed on 12/10/2010) Modified on 12/13/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
December 8, 2010 Filing 447 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 12/8/2010 before JUDGE ARMSTRONG (Date Filed: 12/8/2010) re #405 Corrected MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs, and for Incentive Awards to Plaintiffs filed by Plaintiffs Smith, Lyons, Ballard and Wiggins. (Court Reporter RAYNEE MERCADO.) (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/8/2010)
December 3, 2010 Filing 446 Letter to Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman re Costs, from Louis M. Marlin and Brian Duffy, dated 12/03/10 . (Marlin, Louis) (Filed on 12/3/2010) Modified on 12/6/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
December 2, 2010 Filing 445 NOTICE of Change of Address, filed by Danton Ballard (Hart, Peter) (Filed on 12/2/2010) Modified on 12/3/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
December 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 444 ORDER RE COSTS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 12/1/2010. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2010)
November 30, 2010 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman for Report and Recommendation (fritze, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2010)
November 29, 2010 Filing 443 CLERKS NOTICE Vacating Motion Hearing on January 20, 2011 at 11:00 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2010)
November 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 442 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge ZIMMERMAN for Report and Recommendation. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 11/29/10. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2010)
November 19, 2010 Filing 441 Letter to Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong re Parties' Joint Request for Matter of Class Counsel's Request for Reimbursement of Costs be Re-Assigned to Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman, from Louis M. Marlin and Brian Duffy, dated 11/19/10. (Marlin, Louis) (Filed on 11/19/2010) Modified on 11/22/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
November 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 440 ORDER VACATING ORDER RE COSTS AND CORRECTING REFERENCE.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 11/18/2010. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2010)
November 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 439 ORDER RE COSTS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 11/18/2010. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2010)
November 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 438 ORDER AND FINAL JUDGMENT APPROVING SETTLEMENT: Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 11/09/10. ***Civil Case Terminated. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2010) Modified on 11/19/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
November 16, 2010 Filing 437 AMENDED CLERKS NOTICE setting Motion Hearing for 1/20/2011 at 11:00 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler, courtroom 4, 3rd Floor, 1301 Clay Street, Oakland, CA. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2010)
November 16, 2010 Filing 436 CLERKS NOTICE- Motion Hearing set for 1/20/2011 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler, in Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor, Oakland. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2010)
November 16, 2010 Filing 435 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #432 Order (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2010)
November 15, 2010 Filing 434 Declaration of Budi Widjaja re Failure to Serve Notice of Settlement and False Representations of Clams Administrator, filed byBudi Widjaja. (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2010)
November 15, 2010 Filing 433 NOTICE of Filing of Exhibit 1 re #431 Order filed by Plaintiffs Smith, Lyons, Ballard and Wiggins. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Supplemental 9th Circuit Fee Information, #2 Exhibit Documents from Benitez v. Wilbut, #3 Exhibit Documents from Chavez v. Petrissans, #4 Exhibit Documents from Willis vs. Cal Western Transport, #5 Exhibit Documents from Ingalls vs. Hallmark Mktg. Corp., #6 Exhibit Exhibits from Birch vs. Office Depot, Inc., #7 Exhibit Documents from Rippee v. Boston Mkt. Corp.)(Marlin, Louis) (Filed on 11/15/2010) Modified on 11/16/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 11/18/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
November 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 432 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong OVERRULING #423 Objection. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 11/12/10. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2010) Modified on 11/16/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
November 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 431 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong GRANTING #429 Ex Parte Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Information from Class Counsel re Ninth Circuit fee Decision. Plaintiffs shall file Exhibit 1 to the Motion by no later than 11/16/10. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 11/12/10 (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2010) Modified on 11/16/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
November 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 430 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge for Report and Recommendation. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 11/9/10. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2010)
November 10, 2010 Filing 429 Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Information from Class Counsel re Ninth Circuit Fee Decision, filed by Plaintiffs Smith, Lyons, Ballard and Wiggins. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Supplemental Information Re: 9th Circuit Fee Awards, #2 Proposed Order)(Marlin, Louis) (Filed on 11/10/2010) Modified on 11/12/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
November 9, 2010 Filing 428 Minute Entry: Motion for Attorneys' Fees Hearing held on 11/9/2010; Motion for Costs not held. before Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong (Date Filed: 11/9/2010). (Court Reporter: Leo Mankiewicz.) (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/9/2010) Modified on 11/12/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
November 9, 2010 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge for Report and Recommendation (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2010)
November 8, 2010 Filing 427 NOTICE of Filing Prior Fee Award Orders, filed by Plaintiffs Smith, Lyons, Ballard and Wiggins. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit)(Marlin, Louis) (Filed on 11/8/2010) Modified on 11/9/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
November 6, 2010 Filing 426 NOTICE of Withdrawal re #408 , #409 Objections filed by Joseph D Wilkins, Nicole Clemente, Lolita Wells (Palmer, Joseph) (Filed on 11/6/2010) Modified on 11/8/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 11/8/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
November 5, 2010 Filing 425 Response re #423 Objection to Class Action Settlement and Notice to Opt Out filed by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Beer, Naomi) (Filed on 11/5/2010) Modified on 11/8/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
November 5, 2010 Filing 424 STATUS REPORT re Objections and Request To Set Deposition Dates and Hearing Date, filed by Plaintiffs Smith, Lyons, Ballard and Wiggins. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Proposed Order Revised Proposed Order)(Marlin, Louis) (Filed on 11/5/2010) Modified on 11/8/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
October 22, 2010 Filing 423 OBJECTIONS to Class Action Settlement and Notice to Opt Out, filed by Budi Widjaja. (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2010)
September 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 422 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong GRANTING #411 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages to Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Reply to Objections to Settlement. Plaintiffs are permitted to file points and authorities not to exceed 18 pages. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2010) Modified on 9/28/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
September 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 421 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong GRANTING #419 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Christopher A. Bandas. (kc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2010)
September 20, 2010 Filing 420 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Objections to Settlement by Ricardo Beltran re #407 Objection. (Muhic, Peter) (Filed on 9/20/2010) Modified on 9/21/2010 (kc, COURT STAFF).
September 17, 2010 Filing 419 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Christopher A. Bandas ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 44611005724.), filed by Nicole Clemente, Lolita Wells. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2010)
September 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 418 ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion #411 Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages, #405 Corrected MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs, and for Incentive Awards to Plaintiffs, #412 MOTION for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement : Motion Hearing set for 11/9/2010 01:00 PM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland.. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 9/17/10. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2010)
September 15, 2010 Filing 417 NOTICE OF ERRATA re #412 Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement filed by Plaintiffs Smith, Lyons, Ballard and Wiggins. (Marlin, Louis) (Filed on 9/15/2010) Modified on 9/16/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
September 14, 2010 Filing 416 Response re #409 Objection, #408 Objection to Class Action Settlement and Request for Brief Extension to Respond to Beltran Objection filed by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Beer, Naomi) (Filed on 9/14/2010) Modified on 9/15/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
September 14, 2010 Filing 415 NOTICE OF ERRATA re #413 Reply Memorandum filed by Plaintiffs Smith, Lyons, Ballard and Wiggins. (Marlin, Louis) (Filed on 9/14/2010) Modified on 9/15/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
September 14, 2010 Filing 414 Statement of Non-Opposition re #411 Ex Parte Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages filed by Nicole Clemente, Lolita Wells, Joseph D Wilkins. (Palmer, Joseph) (Filed on 9/14/2010) Modified on 9/15/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
September 14, 2010 Filing 413 Reply Memorandum re #408 Objections filed by Plaintiffs Smith, Lyons, Ballard and Wiggins. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 8, #9 Affidavit Supplemental declaration of Louis M. Marlin, #10 Affidavit Declaration of Rachel Braun, #11 Proposed Order Proposed Order overruling objections)(Marlin, Louis) (Filed on 9/14/2010) Modified on 9/15/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 9/15/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
September 14, 2010 Filing 412 MOTION for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement, filed by Plaintiffs Smith, Lyons, Ballard and Wiggins. Motion Hearing set for 9/28/2010 01:00 PM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Rachel Braun in support of motion for final approval, #2 Proposed Order Proposed order and judgment of final approval of class action settlement)(Marlin, Louis) (Filed on 9/14/2010) Modified on 9/15/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
September 14, 2010 Filing 411 Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages filed by Plaintiffs Smith, Lyons, Ballard and Wiggins. Motion Hearing set for 9/28/2010 01:00 PM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order permitting Plaintiffs up to 18 pages for reply memorandum)(Marlin, Louis) (Filed on 9/14/2010)
September 13, 2010 Filing 410 NOTICE of Change of Address by Jose Ruben Mata (Mata, Jose) (Filed on 9/13/2010)
September 7, 2010 Filing 409 OBJECTIONS to #405 Corrected Motion for Attorney Fees and Costs, and for Incentive Awards to Plaintiffs and to Settlement Agreement, filed by Joseph D Wilkins. (Palmer, Joseph) (Filed on 9/7/2010) Modified on 9/8/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
September 7, 2010 Filing 408 NOTICE of Appearance; OBJECTIONS to #405 Corrected Motion for Attorney Fees and Costs, and for Incentive Awards to Plaintiffs filed by Nicole Clemente, Lolita Wells. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Palmer, Joseph) (Filed on 9/7/2010) Modified on 9/8/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
September 7, 2010 Filing 407 OBJECTIONS to Class Member's Objections to Terms of Settlement by Ricardo Beltran. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Muhic, Peter) (Filed on 9/7/2010)
August 25, 2010 Filing 406 NOTICE OF ERRATA as to electronic title of corrected motion for award of incentives to plaintiffs, and award of attorneys' fees and costs filed by Plaintiffs Smith, Lyons, Ballard and Wiggins. (Marlin, Louis) (Filed on 8/25/2010) Modified on 8/25/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
August 25, 2010 Filing 405 Corrected MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs, and for Incentive Awards to Plaintiffs, filed by Plaintiffs Smith, Lyons, Ballard and Wiggins. Motion Hearing set for 9/28/2010 01:00 PM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - Part 1, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - Part 2, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - Part 3, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - Part 4, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #8 Affidavit Marlin declaration, #9 Affidavit Bradley declaration, #10 Affidavit Hart declaration, #11 Affidavit Pinney declaration, #12 Affidavit Ballard declaration, #13 Affidavit Lyons declaration, #14 Affidavit Smith declaration, #15 Affidavit Wiggins declaration, #16 Proposed Order Proposed order for incentive awards and attorneys' fees and costs)(Marlin, Louis) (Filed on 8/25/2010) Modified on 8/26/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
August 24, 2010 Filing 404 ***ERRONEOUS ENTRY, PLEASE REFER TO DOCUMENT #405 *** MOTION for Attorney Fees costs, and incentive awards filed by Plaintiffs Smith, Lyons, Ballard and Wiggins. Motion Hearing set for 9/28/2010 01:00 PM in Courtroom 3, 3rd Floor, Oakland. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #5 Affidavit Marlin declaration, #6 Affidavit Bradley declaration, #7 Affidavit Hart declaration, #8 Affidavit Pinney declaration, #9 Affidavit Ballard declaration, #10 Affidavit Lyons declaration, #11 Affidavit Smith declaration, #12 Affidavit Wiggins declaration, #13 Proposed Order for incentive award and fees and costs)(Marlin, Louis) (Filed on 8/24/2010) Modified on 8/25/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
August 24, 2010 Filing 403 ***ERRONEOUS ENTRY, PLEASE REFER TO DOCUMENT #405 *** MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs and Incentive Award to Plaintiffs, filed by Plaintiffs Smith, Lyons, Ballard and Wiggins. Motion Hearing set for 9/28/2010 01:00 PM in Courtroom 3, 3rd Floor, Oakland. (Marlin, Louis) (Filed on 8/24/2010) Modified on 8/25/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 8/25/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
August 20, 2010 Filing 402 NOTICE of Intention to File (1) Motion for Attorneys' Fees, and (2) Motion for Approval of Incentive Awards, filed by Plaintiffs Smith, Lyons, Ballard and Wiggins (Saltzman, Stanley) (Filed on 8/20/2010) Modified on 8/23/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
July 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 401 ORDER: That the #397 Order of 7/21/10 is MODIFIED such that the last date for filing and receipt by counsel of an objection by class member shall be 09/07/10. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 7/22/10. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2010) Modified on 7/26/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 7/26/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
July 22, 2010 Filing 400 STIPULATION to Modify Date for Objectors to File Objections to Settlement, filed by Plaintiffs Smith, Lyons, Ballard and Wiggins, Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Marlin, Louis) (Filed on 7/22/2010) Modified on 7/23/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
July 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 399 AMENDED SETTLEMENT CERTIFICATION ORDER. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 07/21/10. (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2010)
July 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 398 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong GRANTING #386 Motion for Approval of the Establishment of the Ballard Smith Qualified Settlement Fund. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 07/21/10. (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2010)
July 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 397 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong GRANTING #384 Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement, signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 07/21/10. (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2010)
July 21, 2010 Filing 396 Proposed Order re #384 Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement. (Marlin, Louis) (Filed on 7/21/2010) Modified on 7/22/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
June 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 395 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong GRANTING #392 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Brian L. Duffy (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2010)
June 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 394 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong GRANTING #391 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Naomi G. Beer (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2010)
June 2, 2010 Filing 393 Letter to Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong re Status of Preliminary Approval, from Louis Marlin, dated 06/02/10. (Marlin, Louis) (Filed on 6/2/2010) Modified on 6/3/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
May 20, 2010 Filing 392 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Brian L. Duffy ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 44611005193.) filed by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2010)
May 20, 2010 Filing 391 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Naomi G. Beer ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 44611005193.) filed by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2010)
May 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 390 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong GRANTING #383 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Plaintiffs are permitted to file points and authorities in support of their Motion for Preliminary Approval that do not exceed 30 pages in length. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2010) Modified on 5/20/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
May 18, 2010 Filing 389 Letter to Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong re Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Injunction, from Louis M. Marlin, dated 05/17/10 (Marlin, Louis) (Filed on 5/18/2010) Modified on 5/19/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
May 11, 2010 Filing 388 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. re #386 Motion for Approval of the Establishment of the Ballard Smith Qualified Settlement Fund, #387 Proposed Order (Poon, Julian) (Filed on 5/11/2010) Modified on 5/12/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
May 11, 2010 Filing 387 Proposed Order re #386 Motion for Approval of the Establishment of the Ballard Smith Qualified Settlement Fund by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Poon, Julian) (Filed on 5/11/2010) Modified on 5/12/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
May 11, 2010 Filing 386 MOTION for Approval of the Establishment of the Ballard Smith Qualified Settlement Fund, filed by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Poon, Julian) (Filed on 5/11/2010) Modified on 5/12/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
May 11, 2010 Filing 385 Brief: Memorandum in Support re #384 Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement filed by Plaintiffs Smith, Lyons, Ballard and Wiggins. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A in Support of Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Settlement, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Settlement Agreement, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2 to Settlement Agreement, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 3 to Settlement Agreement, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 4 to Settlement Agreement, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 5 to Settlement Agreement, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 6 to Settlement Agreement, #8 Exhibit Exhibit B in Support of Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Settlement, #9 Affidavit Marlin declaration re: preliminary approval, #10 Affidavit Hart declaration re: preliminary approval, #11 Affidavit Pinney declaration re: preliminary approval, #12 Affidavit Bland declaration re: preliminary approval, #13 Proposed Order Amended Settlement Certification Order)(Marlin, Louis) (Filed on 5/11/2010) Modified on 5/12/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
May 11, 2010 Filing 384 MOTION for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement, filed by Plaintiffs Smith, Lyons, Ballard and Wiggins. (Marlin, Louis) (Filed on 5/11/2010) Modified on 5/12/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
May 11, 2010 Filing 383 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages to Memorandum in Support, filed by Plaintiffs Smith, Lyons, Ballard and Wiggins. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Order Granting Administrative Motion for Leave to File Memorandum of Points & Authorities That Exceeds Page Limitation)(Marlin, Louis) (Filed on 5/11/2010) Modified on 5/12/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
March 11, 2010 Filing 382 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion re #381 Motion for Leave to File Documents Under Seal filed by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Perry, Mark) (Filed on 3/11/2010) Modified on 3/12/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
March 8, 2010 Filing 381 Joint MOTION for Leave to File Documents Under Seal filed by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Mark Perry In Support Of Joint Administrative Motion, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order Sealing Documents)(Perry, Mark) (Filed on 3/8/2010)
October 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 380 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong VACATING Case Management Conference. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 9/30/09. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2009) Modified on 10/5/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
September 30, 2009 Filing 379 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #375 Clerk's Notice filed by Danton Ballard. (O'Dell, Stephen) (Filed on 9/30/2009) Modified on 10/1/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
September 29, 2009 Filing 378 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. re #376 Joint Motion to Vacate Scheduled Case Management Conference and Notice Re Oral Argument in Smith/Ballard Appeal , #377 Stipulation in Support (Poon, Julian) (Filed on 9/29/2009) Modified on 9/30/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
September 29, 2009 Filing 377 STIPULATION in Support re #376 Joint Motion to Vacate Scheduled Case Management Conference and Notice Re Oral Argument in Smith/Ballard Appeal, filed by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., Plaintiffs Smith, Lyons, Ballard and Wiggins. (Poon, Julian) (Filed on 9/29/2009) Modified on 9/30/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
September 29, 2009 Filing 376 Joint MOTION to Vacate Scheduled Case Management Conference and Notice Re Oral Argument in Smith/Ballard Appeal, filed by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., Plaintiffs Smith, Lyons, Ballard and Wiggins. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Poon, Julian) (Filed on 9/29/2009) Modified on 9/30/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
September 28, 2009 Filing 375 CLERKS NOTICE Case Management Conference set for 10/28/2009 at 02:30 PM., via telephone. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2009) Modified on 9/29/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 9/29/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
June 17, 2009 Filing 374 NOTICE of Unavailability of Counsel Jose R. Mata, filed by Barry Smith (Mata, Jose) (Filed on 6/17/2009) Modified on 6/18/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
April 29, 2009 Filing 373 NOTICE of Closure of Ventura Office of Bailey Pinney PC and Withdrawal of Attorney, filed by Barry Smith, Michael Wiggins (Seemiller, Susan) (Filed on 4/29/2009) Modified on 4/30/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
April 16, 2009 Filing 372 NOTICE of Unavailability of Counsel (Jose R. Mata), filed by Plaintiffs Smith, Lyons, Ballard and Wiggins (Mata, Jose) (Filed on 4/16/2009) Modified on 4/17/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
February 5, 2009 Filing 371 CLERKS NOTICE REGARDING RELATED CASE MOTION (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2009)
February 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 370 ORDER: That the hearing on Motion re Motion to Dismiss, Motion to Strike Under Rule 12(f), Motion to Dismiss, or in the alternative, Motion to Stay Action Under First-to-File Rule, or Stay Proceedings Pending Decisions by Appellate Courts on Controlling Issues of Law is CONTINUED to 2/24/2009 at 01:00 PM. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 2/4/09. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2009) Modified on 2/6/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 2/6/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 2/6/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
January 16, 2009 Filing 369 Reply Memorandum re #363 Motion to Relate Cases filed by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Nierlich, George) (Filed on 1/16/2009) Modified on 1/20/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
January 14, 2009 Filing 368 AMENDED CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Plaintiffs Smith, Lyons, Ballard and Wiggins. #365 Opposition to Administrative Motion to Relate Case, #366 Declaration of Louis M. Marlin in Support of Opposition (Marlin, Louis) (Filed on 1/14/2009) Modified on 1/15/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
January 14, 2009 Filing 367 Proposed Order re #363 Deny Motion to Relate Case by Plaintiffs Smith, Lyons, Ballard and Wiggins. (Marlin, Louis) (Filed on 1/14/2009) Modified on 1/15/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
January 14, 2009 Filing 366 DECLARATION of Louis M. Marlin in Support re #365 Opposition to Administrative Motion to Relate Cases filed by Plaintiffs Smith, Lyons, Ballard and Wiggins. (Marlin, Louis) (Filed on 1/14/2009) Modified on 1/15/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
January 14, 2009 Filing 365 Memorandum in Opposition re #363 Motion to Relate Cases filed by Plaintiffs Smith, Lyons, Ballard and Wiggins. (Marlin, Louis) (Filed on 1/14/2009) Modified on 1/15/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
January 12, 2009 Filing 364 Declaration of G. Charles Nierlich in Support of #363 Motion to Relate Cases filed by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B - 1 of 2, #3 Exhibit B - 2 of 2, #4 Exhibit C)(Related document(s) #363 ) (Nierlich, George) (Filed on 1/12/2009) Modified on 1/13/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
January 12, 2009 Filing 363 MOTION to Relate Cases, filed by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Nierlich, George) (Filed on 1/12/2009) Modified on 1/13/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
November 7, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 362 ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG granting #358 Motion to Relate Case (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2008)
October 31, 2008 Filing 361 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. re #359 Declaration in Support, #358 MOTION to Relate Case (Poon, Julian) (Filed on 10/31/2008)
October 30, 2008 Filing 360 ***ERRONEOUS ENTRY, PLEASE REFER TO DOCUMENT #361 *** CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. re #359 Declaration in Support, #358 MOTION to Relate Case (Poon, Julian) (Filed on 10/30/2008) Modified on 10/31/2008 (jlm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 11/3/2008 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
October 30, 2008 Filing 359 Declaration of Julian W. Poon in Support of #358 MOTION to Relate Case filed byWal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Rubin Complaint, #2 Exhibit B -- Smith/Ballard Complaint, #3 Exhibit C -- Scolnick E-mail, #4 Exhibit D -- Poon Letter)(Related document(s) #358 ) (Poon, Julian) (Filed on 10/30/2008)
October 30, 2008 Filing 358 MOTION to Relate Case filed by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Poon, Julian) (Filed on 10/30/2008)
October 21, 2008 Filing 357 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #355 Notice of Related Cases filed by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. (Poon, Julian) (Filed on 10/21/2008) Modified on 10/22/2008 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
October 21, 2008 Filing 356 CLERKS NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re #355 (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2008)
October 20, 2008 Filing 355 NOTICE of Related Cases, filed by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Rubin Complaint)(Poon, Julian) (Filed on 10/20/2008) Modified on 10/21/2008 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
June 27, 2008 Filing 354 Amended Certificate of Record Mailed to USCA: USCA Nos. 08-80027; 08-16258 (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2008)
June 27, 2008 Filing 353 Certificate of Record Mailed to USCA: USCA Nos. 08-80027; 08-16258 (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2008)
June 26, 2008 Filing 352 Transcript of Proceedings held on April 15, 2008, before Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong. Court Reporter Raynee H. Mercado, Telephone number 510-451-7530. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 7/14/2008. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/24/2008. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/22/2008. (rhm, ) (Filed on 6/26/2008)
June 26, 2008 Filing 351 Corrected entry. Transcript of telephone discovery conference proceedings held on August 9, 2007, before Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman. Transcriber Raynee H. Mercado, Telephone number 510-451-7530. Tape Number: TC29-07. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 7/14/2008. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/24/2008. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/22/2008. (rhm, ) (Filed on 6/26/2008)
June 26, 2008 Filing 350 Corrected entry. Transcript of telephone conference call proceedings held on July 27, 2007, before Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman. Court Reporter/Transcriber Raynee H. Mercado, Telephone number 510-451-7530. Tape Number: TC 25-07. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 7/14/2008. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/24/2008. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/22/2008. (rhm, ) (Filed on 6/26/2008)
June 26, 2008 Filing 349 Corrected entry. Transcript of Proceedings held on June 14, 2007, before Judge Bernard Zimmerman. Court Reporter/Transcriber Raynee H. Mercado, Telephone number 510-451-7530. Tape Number: TC 18-07. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 7/14/2008. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/24/2008. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/22/2008. (rhm, ) (Filed on 6/26/2008)
June 4, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 345 ORDER STAYING CASE. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 6/3/08. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2008)
June 4, 2008 ***Set/Clear Flags (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2008)
May 29, 2008 Filing 344 USCA Case Number 08-16258 (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2008)
May 28, 2008 Filing 343 USCA Case Number 08-16258 (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2008)
May 22, 2008 Filing 342 Transcript Designation and Ordering Form for proceedings held on 6/14/07, 7/27/07, 8/9/07, 4/15/08 before Judge Zimmerman & Armstrong, re Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA, USCA Appeal Fees Transcript due by 6/12/2008. (Poon, Julian) (Filed on 5/22/2008)
May 21, 2008 Filing 461 Appeal Transmission and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals. Counsel notified. (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2008) (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
May 21, 2008 Filing 460 USCA Appeal Fees received $ 455 receipt number 44611002204 (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2008) (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
May 20, 2008 Filing 341 STIPULATION to Stay this Case in Its Entirety Pending Appeal, filed by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., Danton Ballard, Barry Smith, Michael Wiggins. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Poon, Julian) (Filed on 5/20/2008) Modified on 5/21/2008 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
May 19, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 339 ORDER re #336 Stipulation filed by Danton Ballard, Barry Smith, Michael Wiggins, Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 5/19/08. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2008)
May 16, 2008 Filing 338 STATUS REPORT: Final Report on Status of Court-Ordered Document Production. (Taylor, William) (Filed on 5/16/2008) Modified on 5/19/2008 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
May 15, 2008 Filing 340 USCA ORDER: That the petition for permission to appeal the U.S. District Court's 02/13/08 Order granting class certification is granted as to #250 Order on Motion to Certify Class. Within 10 days of this Order, petitioner shall perfect the appeal in accordance with FRAP 5(d). USCA No. 08-80027 (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2008) Modified on 5/19/2008 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
May 15, 2008 Filing 337 Proposed Order re #336 Stipulation Further Modifying the "Amended Order for Pretrial Preparation" Dated 6/26/07, filed by Barry Smith, Wal-mart Stores, Inc., Michael Wiggins, Danton Ballard. (Brown, George) (Filed on 5/15/2008) Modified on 5/16/2008 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
May 15, 2008 Filing 336 STIPULATION to Further Modify the Amended Order for Pretrial Preparation Dated 6/26/07 Barry Smith, Wal-mart Stores, Inc., Michael Wiggins, Danton Ballard. (Brown, George) (Filed on 5/15/2008) Modified on 5/16/2008 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
May 14, 2008 Filing 335 Transcript of Proceedings held on 04/15/08, before Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong. Court Reporter/Transcriber Raynee H. Mercado, Telephone number 510-451-8404. (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2008) Modified on 5/15/2008 (jlm, COURT STAFF). (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
May 8, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 334 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong GRANTING #324 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Karl G. Nelson (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2008)
May 8, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 333 ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion #269 MOTION for Summary Judgment and/or Summary Adjudication on Behalf of Defendant Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., #267 MOTION for Summary Judgment and/or Summary Adjudication as to Plaintiffs Barry Smith, Michael Wiggins and Danton Ballard :, Motions terminated: #316 MOTION to Shorten Time Defendant Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.'s Administrative Motion to Shorten Time for Consideration of Motion to Continue Trial Date filed by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., #318 MOTION to Continue Defendant Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.'s Notice of Motion & Motion to Continue Trial Date filed by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., #332 Ex Parte MOTION to Strike Defendant's reply to opposition to Administrative Motion filed by Plaintiffs Smith, Lyons, Ballard and Wiggins. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/10/2008 02:45 PM. Motion Hearing set for 6/24/2008 01:00 PM.. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 5/7/08. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2008)
May 8, 2008 Filing 332 MOTION to Strike Defendant's Reply to Opposition to Administrative Motion, filed by Plaintiffs Smith, Lyons, Ballard and Wiggins. (Marlin, Louis) (Filed on 5/8/2008) Modified on 5/9/2008 (jlm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 5/9/2008 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
May 8, 2008 Filing 331 CLERK'S NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re #329 (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2008)
May 7, 2008 Filing 330 Proposed Order re #329 Motion to Strike filed by Plaintiffs Smith, Lyons, Ballard and Wiggins. (Marlin, Louis) (Filed on 5/7/2008) Modified on 5/8/2008 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
May 7, 2008 Filing 329 MOTION to Strike re #328 Reply Memorandum by Plaintiffs Smith, Lyons, Ballard and Wiggins. (Marlin, Louis) (Filed on 5/7/2008) Modified on 5/8/2008 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
May 7, 2008 Filing 328 Reply Memorandum re #316 Administrative Motion to Shorten Time for Consideration of Motion to Continue Trial Date filed by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Poon, Julian) (Filed on 5/7/2008) Modified on 5/8/2008 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
May 6, 2008 Filing 327 Declaration of Louis M. Marlin in Support re #327 Memorandum in Opposition filed by Plaintiffs Smith, Lyons, Ballard and Wiggins. (Marlin, Louis) (Filed on 5/6/2008) Modified on 5/7/2008 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
May 6, 2008 Filing 326 Memorandum in Opposition re #316 Motion to Shorten Time filed byPlaintiffs Smith, Lyons, Ballard and Wiggins. (Marlin, Louis) (Filed on 5/6/2008) Modified on 5/7/2008 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
May 5, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 325 ORDER. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 5/2/08. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2008)
May 5, 2008 Filing 324 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Karl G. Nelson ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 44611002147.) filed by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2008)
May 5, 2008 Filing 323 ***DUPLICATE ENTRY, PLEASE SEE DOCUMENT #324 *** MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Application & [Proposed] Order of Karl G. Nelson for Admission Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 44611002147.) filed by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Byrnes, Jaime) (Filed on 5/5/2008) Modified on 5/5/2008 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
May 5, 2008 Filing 322 NOTICE OF ERRATA ***CORRECTION OF DOCKET #321 *** by Plaintiffs Smith, Lyons, Ballard and Wiggins. (Marlin, Louis) (Filed on 5/5/2008) Modified on 5/5/2008 (cjl, COURT STAFF). Modified on 5/5/2008 (jlm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 5/5/2008 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
May 3, 2008 Filing 321 *** FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE SEE DOCKET #322 . *** NOTICE of Filing Approved Form of Class Notice, filed by Plaintiffs Smith, Lyons, Ballard and Wiggins (Marlin, Louis) (Filed on 5/3/2008) Modified on 5/5/2008 (jlm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 5/6/2008 (ewn, COURT STAFF).
May 1, 2008 Filing 320 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. re #318 MOTION to Continue Defendant Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.'s Notice of Motion & Motion to Continue Trial Date, #317 Declaration in Support, #319 Declaration in Support, #316 MOTION to Shorten Time Defendant Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.'s Administrative Motion to Shorten Time for Consideration of Motion to Continue Trial Date (Poon, Julian) (Filed on 5/1/2008)
May 1, 2008 Filing 319 Declaration of Julian W. Poon in Support of #318 MOTION to Continue Defendant Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.'s Notice of Motion & Motion to Continue Trial Date filed byWal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Part 1 of 2, #2 Exhibit 2 - Part 2 of 2, #3 Exhibit 2)(Related document(s) #318 ) (Poon, Julian) (Filed on 5/1/2008)
May 1, 2008 Filing 318 MOTION to Continue Defendant Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.'s Notice of Motion & Motion to Continue Trial Date filed by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 6/10/2008 01:00 PM in Courtroom 3, 3rd Floor, Oakland. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Poon, Julian) (Filed on 5/1/2008)
May 1, 2008 Filing 317 Declaration of Julian W. Poon in Support of #316 MOTION to Shorten Time Defendant Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.'s Administrative Motion to Shorten Time for Consideration of Motion to Continue Trial Date filed byWal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Related document(s) #316 ) (Poon, Julian) (Filed on 5/1/2008)
May 1, 2008 Filing 316 MOTION to Shorten Time Defendant Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.'s Administrative Motion to Shorten Time for Consideration of Motion to Continue Trial Date filed by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 5/13/2008 01:00 PM in Courtroom 3, 3rd Floor, Oakland. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Poon, Julian) (Filed on 5/1/2008)
April 28, 2008 Filing 315 NOTICE of Association of Counsel by George Charles Nierlich, III, filed by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. (Nierlich, George) (Filed on 4/28/2008) Modified on 4/29/2008 (jlm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 4/29/2008 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
April 25, 2008 Filing 314 Reply Memorandum re Class Notice filed by Plaintiffs Smith, Lyons, Ballard and Wiggins. (Marlin, Louis) (Filed on 4/25/2008) Modified on 4/28/2008 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
April 24, 2008 Filing 313 RESPONSE to ARGUMENT BY PLAINTIFF CLASS REGARDING CLASS NOTICE by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Eisen, Rebecca) (Filed on 4/24/2008)
April 24, 2008 Filing 312 Reply Memorandum by plaintiffs re: form of class notice filed byPlaintiffs Smith, Lyons, Ballard and Wiggins. (Marlin, Louis) (Filed on 4/24/2008)
April 23, 2008 Filing 311 Brief: Memorandum in Support of Defendant's Form of Class Notice re #308 Order Setting Hearing on Motion, filed by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Related document(s) #308 ) (Eisen, Rebecca) (Filed on 4/23/2008) Modified on 4/24/2008 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
April 23, 2008 Filing 310 Brief Plaintiffs' Argument Re: Form of Class Notice filed byPlaintiffs Smith, Lyons, Ballard and Wiggins. (Marlin, Louis) (Filed on 4/23/2008)
April 23, 2008 Filing 309 STATUS REPORT Thirty-Third Report on Status of Court-Ordered Document Production by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Taylor, William) (Filed on 4/23/2008)
April 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 308 ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion #269 Motion for Summary Judgment and/or Summary Adjudication on Behalf of Defendant Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. , #267 Motion for Summary Judgment and/or Summary Adjudication as to Plaintiffs Barry Smith, Michael Wiggins and Danton Ballard Motion Hearing set for 5/27/2008 at 01:00 PM. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 4/21/08. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2008) Modified on 4/23/2008 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
April 21, 2008 Filing 307 Joint MOTION to Continue Hearing and Ruling on Defendant's Summary Judgment and/or Summary Adjudication Motions Prior to Class Notice and Opt-Out Period, filed by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., Danton Ballard, Barry Smith, Michael Wiggins. (Eisen, Rebecca) (Filed on 4/21/2008) Modified on 4/22/2008 (jlm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 4/24/2008 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
April 15, 2008 Filing 306 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing: Defendant's Motion to Stay Proceedings pending Appellate Resolution of Wal-Mart's Petition for Permission to Appeal from Order Granting Class Certification held and submitted on 4/15/2008 before Saundra Brown Armstrong (Date Filed: 4/15/2008). (Court Reporter Raynee Mercado.) (fs, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/15/2008)
April 15, 2008 Filing 305 STATUS REPORT Thirty-Second Report on Status of Court-Ordered Document Production by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Taylor, William) (Filed on 4/15/2008)
April 14, 2008 Filing 304 Proposed Order re #255 Denying Motion to Stay by Plaintiffs Smith, Lyons, Ballard and Wiggins. (Marlin, Louis) (Filed on 4/14/2008) Modified on 4/15/2008 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
April 9, 2008 Filing 303 STATUS REPORT Thirty-First Report on Status of Court-Ordered Document Production by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Taylor, William) (Filed on 4/9/2008)
April 9, 2008 Filing 302 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. By Mail for Attorneys A.E. Bud Bailey, Peter M. Hart, & Marcus J. Bradley (Eisen, Rebecca) (Filed on 4/9/2008)
April 8, 2008 Filing 301 OBJECTIONS to Evidence Submitted by Plaintiffs in Connection with Their Oppositions to Defendant's Motions for Summary Judgment and/or Summary Adjudication by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Eisen, Rebecca) (Filed on 4/8/2008)
April 8, 2008 Filing 300 Declaration of Masoud Razavi in Support of #267 Motion for Summary Judgment as to Plaintiffs Ballard, Wiggins and Smith filed by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Related document(s) #267 ) (Eisen, Rebecca) (Filed on 4/8/2008) Modified on 4/9/2008 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
April 8, 2008 Filing 299 Declaration of Shawn Hibdon in Support of #267 Motion for Summary Judgment and/or Summary Adjudication as to Plaintiffs Barry Smith, Michael Wiggins and Danton Ballard, #269 Motion for Summary Judgment and/or Summary Adjudication on Behalf of Defendant Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., filed by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) #267 , #269 ) (Eisen, Rebecca) (Filed on 4/8/2008) Modified on 4/9/2008 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
April 8, 2008 Filing 298 Supplemental Declaration of Rebecca Eisen in Support of #295 Reply Memorandum, #296 Reply Memorandum In Support of Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Related document(s) #295 , #296 ) (Eisen, Rebecca) (Filed on 4/8/2008) Modified on 4/9/2008 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
April 8, 2008 Filing 297 Declaration of Denise Neumann Martin in Support of #295 Reply Memorandum, #296 Reply Memorandum In Support of Motions for Summary Judgment and/or Summary Adjudication filed byWal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6)(Related document(s) #295 , #296 ) (Eisen, Rebecca) (Filed on 4/8/2008)
April 8, 2008 Filing 296 Reply Memorandum re #267 MOTION for Summary Judgment and/or Summary Adjudication as to Plaintiffs Barry Smith, Michael Wiggins and Danton Ballard filed byWal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Eisen, Rebecca) (Filed on 4/8/2008)
April 8, 2008 Filing 295 Reply Memorandum re #269 MOTION for Summary Judgment and/or Summary Adjudication on Behalf of Defendant Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. filed byWal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Eisen, Rebecca) (Filed on 4/8/2008)
April 2, 2008 Filing 294 ERRATA re #291 Declaration of Martin M. Shapiro, Ph.D, by Plaintiffs Smith, Lyons, Ballard and Wiggins. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Martin Shapiro, Ph.D. in support of plaintiffs' opposition to defendant's motions for summary judgment/adjudication)(Marlin, Louis) (Filed on 4/2/2008) Modified on 4/3/2008 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
April 1, 2008 Filing 293 Proposed Order re #290 Memorandum in Opposition by Plaintiffs Smith, Lyons, Ballard and Wiggins. (Marlin, Louis) (Filed on 4/1/2008) Modified on 4/2/2008 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
April 1, 2008 Filing 292 Declaration of Marcus J. Bradley in Support of #290 Memorandum in Opposition filed by Plaintiffs Smith, Lyons, Ballard and Wiggins. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Bradley Declaration, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B to Bradley declaration, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C to Bradley declaration, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D to Bradley declaration)(Marlin, Louis) (Filed on 4/1/2008) Modified on 4/2/2008 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
April 1, 2008 Filing 291 Declaration of Martin M. Shapiro, Ph.D. in Support of #290 Memorandum in Opposition filed by Plaintiffs Smith, Lyons, Ballard and Wiggins. (Marlin, Louis) (Filed on 4/1/2008) Modified on 4/2/2008 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
April 1, 2008 Filing 290 Memorandum in Opposition re #267 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiffs Smith, Lyons, Ballard and Wiggins. (Marlin, Louis) (Filed on 4/1/2008) Modified on 4/2/2008 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
April 1, 2008 Filing 289 Proposed Order re #286 Memorandum in Opposition by Plaintiffs Smith, Lyons, Ballard and Wiggins. (Marlin, Louis) (Filed on 4/1/2008) Modified on 4/2/2008 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
April 1, 2008 Filing 288 Declaration of Stanley D. Saltzman in Support of #286 Memorandum in Opposition filed by Plaintiffs Smith, Lyons, Ballard and Wiggins. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Saltzman declaration, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B to Saltzman declaration, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C to Saltzman declaration, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D to Saltzman declaration, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E to Saltzman declaration, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F to Saltzman declaration, #7 Exhibit Exhibit G to Saltzman declaration, #8 Exhibit Exhibit H to Saltzman declaration, #9 Exhibit Exhibit I to Saltzman declaration, #10 Exhibit Exhibit J to Saltzman declaration, #11 Exhibit Exhibit K to Saltzman declaration, #12 Exhibit Exhibit L to Saltzman Declaration, #13 Errata Exhibit M to Saltzman declaration, #14 Exhibit Exhibit N to Saltzman declaration, #15 Exhibit Exhibit O to Saltzman declaration, #16 Exhibit Exhibit P to Saltzman declaration, #17 Exhibit Exhibit Q to Saltzman declaration, #18 Exhibit Exhibit R to Saltzman declaration, #19 Exhibit Exhibit S to Saltzman declaration, #20 Exhibit Exhibit T to Saltzman declaration, #21 Exhibit Exhibit U to Saltzman declaration, #22 Exhibit Exhibit V to Saltzman declaration)(Marlin, Louis) (Filed on 4/1/2008) Modified on 4/2/2008 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
April 1, 2008 Filing 287 Declaration of Martin Shapiro, Ph.D. in Support of #286 Memorandum in Opposition filed by Plaintiffs Smith, Lyons, Ballard and Wiggins. (Marlin, Louis) (Filed on 4/1/2008) Modified on 4/2/2008 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
April 1, 2008 Filing 286 Memorandum in Opposition re #269 MOTION for Summary Judgment and/or Summary Adjudication on Behalf of Defendant Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. Plaintiffs Memorandum in Opposition to Summary Judgment/Adjudication Motion Directed to Plaintiff Class filed byPlaintiffs Smith, Lyons, Ballard and Wiggins. (Marlin, Louis) (Filed on 4/1/2008)
April 1, 2008 Filing 285 STATUS REPORT Thirtieth Report on Status of Court-Ordered Document Production by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Eisen, Rebecca) (Filed on 4/1/2008)
April 1, 2008 Filing 284 Reply to Opposition re #255 Motion to Stay filed by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Eisen, Rebecca) (Filed on 4/1/2008) Modified on 4/2/2008 (jlm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 4/2/2008 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
March 31, 2008 Set/Reset Hearings: re #283 Settlement Conference set for 5/27/2008 10:00 AM. (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2008)
March 31, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 283 ORDER RESCHEDULING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE: The Settlement Conference is CONTINUED to 5/27/2008 at 10:00 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge James Larson on 3/31/08. (jlsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2008) Modified on 4/2/2008 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
March 31, 2008 Filing 282 Letter to Chief Magistrate Judge James Larson re Request to Continue Settlement Conference to 05/27/08 at 10:00 AM., from Rebecca Eisen, dated 03/31/08 (Eisen, Rebecca) (Filed on 3/31/2008) Modified on 4/1/2008 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
March 28, 2008 Filing 281 NOTICE of Filing of Proposed Class Notice, filed by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to the Notice of Filing of Proposed Class Notice by Defendant Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., #2 Exhibit B to Notice of Filing of Proposed Class Notice by Defendant Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.)(Taylor, William) (Filed on 3/28/2008) Modified on 3/31/2008 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
March 27, 2008 Filing 280 STIPULATION and Proposed Order Regarding Filings and Submissions With Respect to Proposed Class Notice by Plaintiffs Smith, Lyons, Ballard and Wiggins, Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Marlin, Louis) (Filed on 3/27/2008) Modified on 3/28/2008 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
March 27, 2008 Filing 279 NOTICE of Filing Plaintiffs' Form of Class Notice, filed by Plaintiffs Smith, Lyons, Ballard and Wiggins (Marlin, Louis) (Filed on 3/27/2008) Modified on 3/28/2008 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
March 26, 2008 Filing 278 STATUS REPORT Twenty-Ninth Report on Status of Court-Ordered Document Production by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Taylor, William) (Filed on 3/26/2008) Modified on 3/27/2008 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
March 24, 2008 Filing 277 Declaration of Marlin M. Lewis in Support re #276 Memorandum in Opposition filed by Plaintiffs Smith, Lyons, Ballard and Wiggins. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Marlin, Louis) (Filed on 3/24/2008) Modified on 3/25/2008 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
March 24, 2008 Filing 276 Memorandum in Opposition re #255 Motion to Stay Proceedings Pending Appellate Resolution of Wal-Mart's Petition for Permission to Appeal from Order Granting Class Certification and If the Petition filed by Plaintiffs Smith, Lyons, Ballard and Wiggins. (Marlin, Louis) (Filed on 3/24/2008) Modified on 3/25/2008 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
March 18, 2008 Filing 275 STATUS REPORT Twenty-Eighth Report on Status of Court-Ordered Document Production by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Taylor, William) (Filed on 3/18/2008)
March 14, 2008 Filing 274 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. re #267 , #268 , #269 , #270 , #271 , #272 , #273 Notice of Motion & MSJ to Smith, Wiggins & Ballard & MP&A ISO; Proposed Order Granting Wal-Mart's MSJ to Smith, Wiggins & Ballard; MSJ ISO Decl. of Roxanna Wigger to Smith, Wiggins & Ballard; Notice & MSJ for Def. Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. & MP&A Proposed Order Granting Def. Wal-Mart's MSJ; Decl. of Denise Martin ISO Def. Wal-Mart's MSJ; Decl. of Rebecca Eisen ISO of Def. Wal-Mart Store's, Inc.'s MSJ; Req. for Judicial Notice; Decl. of Rebecca Eisen ISO Req. for Judicial Notice (Taylor, William) (Filed on 3/14/2008) Modified on 3/17/2008 (jlm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 3/17/2008 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
March 13, 2008 Filing 273 Request for Judicial Notice; Declaration of Rebecca Eisen in Support of Request for Judicial Notice, filed by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit S)(Eisen, Rebecca) (Filed on 3/13/2008) Modified on 3/14/2008 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
March 13, 2008 Filing 272 Declaration of Rebecca Eisen in Support of #267 Motion for Summary Judgment and/or Summary Adjudication as to Plaintiffs Barry Smith, Michael Wiggins and Danton Ballard , #269 Motion for Summary Judgment and/or Summary Adjudication on Behalf of Defendant Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. filed by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Related document(s) #267 , #269 ) (Eisen, Rebecca) (Filed on 3/13/2008) Modified on 3/14/2008 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
March 13, 2008 Filing 271 Declaration of Denise Neumann Martin in Support of #267 Motion for Summary Judgment and/or Summary Adjudication as to Plaintiffs Barry Smith, Michael Wiggins and Danton Ballard , #269 Motion for Summary Judgment and/or Summary Adjudication on Behalf of Defendant Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. filed by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 8)(Related document(s) #267 , #269 ) (Eisen, Rebecca) (Filed on 3/13/2008) Modified on 3/14/2008 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
March 13, 2008 Filing 270 Declaration of Roxanna Wigger in Support of #269 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment as to Plaintiffs Barry Smith, Michael Wiggins, and Danton Ballard filed by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Eisen, Rebecca) (Filed on 3/13/2008) Modified on 3/14/2008 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
March 13, 2008 Filing 269 MOTION for Summary Judgment and/or Summary Adjudication on Behalf of Defendant Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., filed by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 4/22/2008 01:00 PM in Courtroom 3, 3rd Floor, Oakland. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Wal-Mart's Motion for Summary Judgment and/or Summary Adjudication)(Eisen, Rebecca) (Filed on 3/13/2008) Modified on 3/14/2008 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
March 13, 2008 Filing 268 Proposed Order re #267 Granting Defendant Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment and/or Summary Adjudication as to Plaintiffs Barry Smith, Michael Wiggins and Danton Ballard by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Eisen, Rebecca) (Filed on 3/13/2008) Modified on 3/14/2008 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
March 13, 2008 Filing 267 MOTION for Summary Judgment and/or Summary Adjudication as to Plaintiffs Barry Smith, Michael Wiggins and Danton Ballard, filed by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 4/22/2008 01:00 PM in Courtroom 3, 3rd Floor, Oakland. (Eisen, Rebecca) (Filed on 3/13/2008) Modified on 3/14/2008 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
March 12, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 266 ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG denying #260 Ex Parte Application (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2008)
March 11, 2008 Set Deadlines/Hearings: re #265 Settlement Conference set for 5/13/2008 10:00 AM. (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2008)
March 11, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 265 NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE AND SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER. Signed by Judge James Larson on 3/11/08. (jlsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2008) Modified on 3/12/2008 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
March 11, 2008 Filing 264 Memorandum in Opposition re #260 Ex Parte Motion to Shorten Time on Motion to Stay Proceedings and for Abatement filed by Plaintiffs Smith, Lyons, Ballard and Wiggins. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 In Support of Opposition To Administrative Motion, #2 Affidavit Declaration of Louis M Marlin In Opposition to Administrative Motion, #3 Proposed Order Proposed Order Denying Defendant's Administrative Motion)(Marlin, Louis) (Filed on 3/11/2008) Modified on 3/12/2008 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
March 11, 2008 Filing 263 STATUS REPORT Twenty-Seventh Report on Status of Court-Ordered Document Production by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Taylor, William) (Filed on 3/11/2008)
March 11, 2008 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Magistrate Judge James Larson for Settlement (wh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2008)
March 6, 2008 Filing 262 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. re #261 Proposed Order , #260 Ex Parte Motion to Shorten Time on Motion to Stay Proceedings and for Abatement; Memorandum of Points and Authorities and Declaration of William J. Taylor (Taylor, William) (Filed on 3/6/2008) Modified on 3/7/2008 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
March 6, 2008 Filing 261 Proposed Order re #260 Ex Parte Motion to Shorten Time on Motion to Stay Proceedings and for Abatement; Memorandum of Points and Authorities and Declaration of William J. Taylor filed by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Taylor, William) (Filed on 3/6/2008) Modified on 3/7/2008 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
March 6, 2008 Filing 260 Ex Parte MOTION to Shorten Time on Motion to Stay Proceedings and for Abatement; Memorandum of Points and Authorities and Declaration of William J. Taylor, filed by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, Part 1 to Defendant's Ex Parte Administrative Motion, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, Part 2 to Defendant's Ex Parte Administrative Motion, #3 Exhibit Exhibit A, Part 3 to Defendant's Ex Parte Administrative Motion)(Taylor, William) (Filed on 3/6/2008) Modified on 3/7/2008 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
March 6, 2008 Filing 259 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #255 Motion to Stay , #256 Brief , #257 Declaration of William J. Taylor , #258 Proposed Order, filed by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. (Taylor, William) (Filed on 3/6/2008) Modified on 3/7/2008 (jlm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 3/7/2008 (jlm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 3/7/2008 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
March 6, 2008 Filing 258 Proposed Order re #255 Motion to Stay Proceedings Pending Appellate Resolution of Wal-Mart's Petition for Permission to Appeal from Order Granting Class Certification and If the Petition by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Taylor, William) (Filed on 3/6/2008) Modified on 3/7/2008 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
March 6, 2008 Filing 257 Declaration of William J. Taylor in Support of #255 Motion to Stay Proceedings Pending Appellate Resolution of Wal-Mart's Petition for Permission to Appeal from Order Granting Class Certification and if the Petition, filed by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Declaration of William J. Taylor in Support of Defendant Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.'s Motion to Stay, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B to Declaration of William J. Taylor in Support of Defendant Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.'s Motion to Stay)(Related document(s) #255 ) (Taylor, William) (Filed on 3/6/2008) Modified on 3/7/2008 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
March 6, 2008 Filing 256 Brief: Memorandum in Support re #255 Motion to Stay Proceedings Pending Appellate Resolution of Wal-Mart's Petition for Permission to Appeal from Order Granting Class Certification and if the Petition, filed by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Related document(s) #255 ) (Taylor, William) (Filed on 3/6/2008) Modified on 3/7/2008 (jlm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 3/7/2008 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
March 6, 2008 Filing 255 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Appellate Resolution of Wal-Mart's Petition for Permission to Appeal from Order Granting Class Certification and If the Petition Is Granted, Its Appeal and For Abatement, filed by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 4/15/2008 01:00 PM in Courtroom 3, 3rd Floor, Oakland. (Taylor, William) (Filed on 3/6/2008) Modified on 3/7/2008 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
March 5, 2008 Filing 254 STATUS REPORT Twenty-Sixth Report on Status of Court-Ordered Document Production by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Taylor, William) (Filed on 3/5/2008)
February 26, 2008 Filing 253 STATUS REPORT Twenty-Fifth Report on Status of Court-Ordered Document Production by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Taylor, William) (Filed on 2/26/2008)
February 19, 2008 Filing 252 STATUS REPORT Twenty-Fourth Report on Status of Court-Ordered Document Production by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Taylor, William) (Filed on 2/19/2008)
February 14, 2008 Filing 251 STATUS REPORT Twenty-Third Report on Status of Court-Ordered Document Production by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Taylor, William) (Filed on 2/14/2008)
February 13, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 250 ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG granting in part and denying in part (149) Motion to Certify Class in case 4:06-cv-02069-SBA (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2008)
February 5, 2008 Filing 249 NOTICE of Errata re #247 Notice of Change of Information by Barry Smith, Michael Wiggins (Mac Farlane, Bonnie) (Filed on 2/5/2008) Modified on 2/6/2008 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
February 4, 2008 Filing 248 STATUS REPORT Twenty-Second Report of Status of Court-Ordered Document Production by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Taylor, William) (Filed on 2/4/2008) Modified on 2/5/2008 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
February 4, 2008 Filing 247 NOTICE of Change of Address, filed by Barry Smith, Michael Wiggins (Mac Farlane, Bonnie) (Filed on 2/4/2008) Modified on 2/5/2008 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
January 29, 2008 Filing 246 STATUS REPORT Twenty-First Report on Status of Court-Ordered Document Production by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Taylor, William) (Filed on 1/29/2008) Modified on 1/30/2008 (jlm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 1/30/2008 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
January 22, 2008 Filing 245 STATUS REPORT Twentieth Report on Status of Court-Ordered Document Production by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Taylor, William) (Filed on 1/22/2008)
January 22, 2008 Filing 244 STIPULATION Extending FRCP 30(A)(2) Limitation on Number of Depositions by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., Plaintiffs Smith, Lyons, Ballard and Wiggins. (Taylor, William) (Filed on 1/22/2008) Modified on 1/23/2008 (jlm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 1/23/2008 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
January 15, 2008 Filing 243 STATUS REPORT Nineteenth Report on Status of Court-Ordered Document Production by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Taylor, William) (Filed on 1/15/2008) Modified on 1/30/2008 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
January 10, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 242 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 5/7/2008.. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 1/10/08. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2008)
January 8, 2008 Filing 241 STATUS REPORT Eighteenth Report on Status of Court-Ordered Document Production by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Taylor, William) (Filed on 1/8/2008)
January 7, 2008 Filing 240 Proposed Order Modifying the Court's "Amended Order for Pretrial Preparation" Dated 06/26/07 by Plaintiffs Smith, Lyons, Ballard and Wiggins. (Marlin, Louis) (Filed on 1/7/2008)
January 7, 2008 Filing 239 STIPULATION to Modify the "Amended Order for Pretrial Preparation" dated June 26, 2007 by Plaintiffs Smith, Lyons, Ballard and Wiggins, Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Marlin, Louis) (Filed on 1/7/2008) Modified on 1/8/2008 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
December 31, 2007 Filing 238 STATUS REPORT Seventeenth Report on Status of Court-Ordered Document Production by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Taylor, William) (Filed on 12/31/2007)
December 26, 2007 Filing 237 STATUS REPORT Sixteenth Report on Status of Court-Ordered Document Production by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Taylor, William) (Filed on 12/26/2007)
December 21, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 236 STIPULATION AND ORDER. Signed by Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 12/21/2007. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2007)
December 20, 2007 Filing 235 STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER RE: PERSONNEL FILE PRODUCTION WIND DOWN AND COMPLETION by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., Danton Ballard, Barry Smith, Michael Wiggins . (Crookshank, Candice) (Filed on 12/20/2007) Modified on 12/21/2007 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
December 17, 2007 Filing 234 STATUS REPORT Fifteenth Report on Status of Court-Ordered Document Production by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Taylor, William) (Filed on 12/17/2007)
December 13, 2007 Filing 233 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Attorney James D. Pinney as Pro Hac Vice Counsel, filed by Barry Smith, Michael Wiggins (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Mata, Jose) (Filed on 12/13/2007) Modified on 12/14/2007 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
December 13, 2007 Filing 232 Memorandum in Opposition re #230 Statement of Recent Decision Filed In Violation of Civ. L.R. 7-3(d) filed by Plaintiffs Smith, Lyons, Ballard and Wiggins. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Striking the Improper Filing of a Statement of Recent Decision (Docket No. 230))(Marlin, Louis) (Filed on 12/13/2007) Modified on 12/14/2007 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
December 13, 2007 Filing 231 EXHIBITS re #230 Statement of Recent Decision Exhibit A-Ninth Circuit's Decision in Dukes v. Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. Case No. 04-16720 filed byWal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Related document(s) #230 ) (Taylor, William) (Filed on 12/13/2007)
December 13, 2007 Filing 230 STATEMENT OF RECENT DECISION pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-3.d filed byWal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Taylor, William) (Filed on 12/13/2007)
December 13, 2007 Filing 229 STATEMENT OF RECENT DECISION pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-3.d re: Dukes vs. Wal-Mart filed byPlaintiffs Smith, Lyons, Ballard and Wiggins. (Marlin, Louis) (Filed on 12/13/2007)
December 13, 2007 Filing 228 Memorandum in Opposition re #224 Objection to and Motion to Strike and Motion to File Sur-reply filed by Plaintiffs Smith, Lyons, Ballard and Wiggins. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Exhibit 1 - Marlin declaration in opposition to motion to strike, etc., #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order Denying Defendant's Motion to Strike and Motion to File Sur-Reply)(Marlin, Louis) (Filed on 12/13/2007) Modified on 12/14/2007 (jlm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 12/14/2007 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
December 12, 2007 Filing 227 NOTICE by Barry Smith, Michael Wiggins WITHDRAWAL OF PRO HAC VICE OF ATTORNEY A.E. BUD BAILEY (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Mata, Jose) (Filed on 12/12/2007)
December 12, 2007 Filing 226 NOTICE of Appearance by Jose Ruben Mata (Mata, Jose) (Filed on 12/12/2007)
December 12, 2007 Filing 225 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. re #224 Objection, Proof of Service Via U.S. Mail of Defendant Wal-Mart Stroes, Inc.'s Objections to and Motion to Strike Supplemental Declaration of Dr. Shapiro and Request for Leave to File Surreply (L.R. 7-3(D)) (Taylor, William) (Filed on 12/12/2007)
December 12, 2007 Filing 224 OBJECTIONS to and Motion to Strike Supplemental Declaration of Dr. Shapiro and Request for Leave to File Surreply (L.R. 7-3(D)) by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Proposed Surreply, #2 Exhibit B - Supplemental Declaration of Denise Neumann Martin in Support of Surreply, #3 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion to Strike Supplemental Decl.)(Taylor, William) (Filed on 12/12/2007)
December 12, 2007 Filing 223 NOTICE of Appearance by Susan Seemiller (Seemiller, Susan) (Filed on 12/12/2007)
December 11, 2007 Filing 222 STATUS REPORT Fourteenth Report on Status of Court-Ordered Document Production by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Taylor, William) (Filed on 12/11/2007)
December 6, 2007 Filing 221 STATUS REPORT Twelfth Report on Status of Court-Ordered Document Production by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Taylor, William) (Filed on 12/6/2007)
December 4, 2007 Filing 220 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Plaintiffs Smith, Lyons, Ballard and Wiggins Proof of Service of Reply to Opposition to Motion for Class Certification (Marlin, Louis) (Filed on 12/4/2007)
December 4, 2007 Filing 219 Reply to Objection to Declaration of Martin Shapiro filed by Plaintiffs Smith, Lyons, Ballard and Wiggins. (Marlin, Louis) (Filed on 12/4/2007) Modified on 12/5/2007 (jlm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 12/5/2007 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
December 4, 2007 Filing 218 Reply to Response to Proposed Trial Plan filed by Plaintiffs Smith, Lyons, Ballard and Wiggins. (Marlin, Louis) (Filed on 12/4/2007) Modified on 12/5/2007 (jlm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 12/5/2007 (jlm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 12/5/2007 (jlm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 12/5/2007 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
December 4, 2007 Filing 217 Reply Memorandum re #149 Motion for Class Certification filed by Plaintiffs Smith, Lyons, Ballard and Wiggins. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiffs Exhibit 9, #2 Exhibit Plaintiffs' Exhibit 10, #3 Exhibit Plaintiffs' Exhibit 11, #4 Exhibit Plaintiffs' Exhibit 12, #5 Exhibit Plaintiffs' Exhibit 13, #6 Affidavit Shapiro Supplemental declaration, #7 Affidavit Marlin Supplemental declaration, #8 Affidavit Bradley Supplemental declaration, #9 Proposed Order Revised [Proposed] Order Granting Class Certification)(Marlin, Louis) (Filed on 12/4/2007) Modified on 12/5/2007 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
December 4, 2007 Filing 216 STATEMENT OF RECENT DECISION pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-3.d filed byWal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Eisen, Rebecca) (Filed on 12/4/2007)
December 3, 2007 Filing 215 STATUS REPORT 13th Report on Status of Court-Ordered Document Production by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Taylor, William) (Filed on 12/3/2007)
November 28, 2007 Filing 214 ERRATA re #168 Declaration of Michael Annatone in Support , #174 Declaration of Kathryn Albright in Support by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Declaration of Annatone#2 Exhibit B-Albright)(Eisen, Rebecca) (Filed on 11/28/2007) Modified on 11/29/2007 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
November 27, 2007 Filing 213 ERRATA and Corrected Declaration of Roxanna Wigger re #172 Declaration of Roxanna Wigger in Support of Defendant's Opposition to Class Certification by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Signature Page (Declarations/Stipulations) Declaration signature page#2 Exhibit Exhibits 1-13 to Wigger Declaration)(Eisen, Rebecca) (Filed on 11/27/2007) Modified on 11/28/2007 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
November 26, 2007 Filing 212 Declaration of Rebecca Eisen in Support of #163 Memorandum in Opposition, to Motion for Class Certification filed byWal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Exhibit B#3 Exhibit C#4 Exhibit D#5 Exhibit E#6 Exhibit F)(Related document(s) #163 ) (Eisen, Rebecca) (Filed on 11/26/2007)
November 23, 2007 Filing 211 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Opposition to #149 Motion for Class Certification, filed by Barry Smith, Danton Ballard, Michael Wiggins, Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiffs Addition Time To File Reply)(Marlin, Louis) (Filed on 11/23/2007) Modified on 11/26/2007 (jlm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 11/26/2007 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
November 20, 2007 Filing 210 Declaration of Barbara Symonds in Support of #163 Defendant's Opposition to Motion for Class Certification filed by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Eisen, Rebecca) (Filed on 11/20/2007) Modified on 11/21/2007 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
November 20, 2007 Filing 209 Declaration of Shellie Sovulewski in Support of #163 Defendant's Opposition to Motion for Class Certification filed by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Eisen, Rebecca) (Filed on 11/20/2007) Modified on 11/21/2007 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
November 20, 2007 Filing 208 Declaration of Naomi Rogers in Support of #163 Defendant's Opposition to Motion for Class Certification filed by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Eisen, Rebecca) (Filed on 11/20/2007) Modified on 11/21/2007 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
November 20, 2007 Filing 207 Declaration of Deanna Ribera in Support of #163 Defendant's Opposition to Motion for Class Certification filed by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Eisen, Rebecca) (Filed on 11/20/2007) Modified on 11/21/2007 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
November 20, 2007 Filing 206 Declaration of Kristi Rader in Support of #163 Defendant's Opposition to Motion for Class Certification filed by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Eisen, Rebecca) (Filed on 11/20/2007) Modified on 11/21/2007 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
November 20, 2007 Filing 205 Declaration of Adele Phillips in Support of #163 Defendant's Opposition to Motion for Class Certification filed by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Eisen, Rebecca) (Filed on 11/20/2007) Modified on 11/21/2007 (jlm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 11/21/2007 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
November 20, 2007 Filing 204 Declaration of Michelle Nason in Support #163 Defendant's Opposition to Motion for Class Certification filed by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Eisen, Rebecca) (Filed on 11/20/2007) Modified on 11/21/2007 (jlm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 11/21/2007 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
November 20, 2007 Filing 203 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. Proof of Service for filing, 11/20/07 (Eisen, Rebecca) (Filed on 11/20/2007)
November 20, 2007 Filing 202 Declaration of Patricia Wright in Support of #163 Defendant's Opposition to Motion for Class Certification filed by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Signature Page (Declarations/Stipulations) Signature Page)(Eisen, Rebecca) (Filed on 11/20/2007) Modified on 11/21/2007 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
November 20, 2007 Filing 201 Declaration of Susan Truax in Support of #163 Defendant's Opposition to Motion for Class Certification filed by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Signature Page (Declarations/Stipulations) Signature Page)(Eisen, Rebecca) (Filed on 11/20/2007) Modified on 11/21/2007 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
November 20, 2007 Filing 200 Declaration of Barbara Symonds in Support of #163 Defendant's Opposition to Motion for Class Certification filed by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Eisen, Rebecca) (Filed on 11/20/2007) Modified on 11/21/2007 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
November 20, 2007 Filing 199 Declaration of Shellie Sovulewski in Support of #163 Defendant's Opposition to Motion for Class Certification filed by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Eisen, Rebecca) (Filed on 11/20/2007) Modified on 11/21/2007 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
November 20, 2007 Filing 198 Declaration of Rita Silva in Support of #163 Defendant's Opposition to Motion for Class Certification filed by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Signature Page (Declarations/Stipulations) Signature Page)(Eisen, Rebecca) (Filed on 11/20/2007) Modified on 11/21/2007 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
November 20, 2007 Filing 197 Declaration of Naomi Rogers in Support of #163 Defendant's Opposition to Motion for Class Certification filed by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Eisen, Rebecca) (Filed on 11/20/2007) Modified on 11/21/2007 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
November 20, 2007 Filing 196 Declaration of Deanna Ribera in Support of #163 Defendant's Opposition to Motion for Class Certification filed by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Eisen, Rebecca) (Filed on 11/20/2007) Modified on 11/21/2007 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
November 20, 2007 Filing 195 Declaration of Debra Regis in Support of #163 Defendant's Opposition to Motion for Class Certification filed by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Signature Page (Declarations/Stipulations) Signature Page)(Eisen, Rebecca) (Filed on 11/20/2007) Modified on 11/21/2007 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
November 20, 2007 Filing 194 Declaration of Ramona Recinos in Support of #163 Defendant's Opposition to Motion for Class Certification filed by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Signature Page (Declarations/Stipulations) Signature Page)(Eisen, Rebecca) (Filed on 11/20/2007) Modified on 11/21/2007 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
November 20, 2007 Filing 193 Declaration of Kristi Rader in Support of #163 Defendant's Opposition to Motion for Class Certification filed by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Eisen, Rebecca) (Filed on 11/20/2007) Modified on 11/21/2007 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
November 20, 2007 Filing 192 Declaration of Carol Pulice in Support of #163 Defendant's Opposition to Motion for Class Certification filed by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Signature Page (Declarations/Stipulations) Signature Page)(Eisen, Rebecca) (Filed on 11/20/2007) Modified on 11/21/2007 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
November 20, 2007 Filing 191 Declaration of Judith Pritchett in Support of #163 Defendant's Opposition to Motion for Class Certification filed by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Signature Page (Declarations/Stipulations) Signature Page)(Eisen, Rebecca) (Filed on 11/20/2007) Modified on 11/21/2007 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
November 20, 2007 Filing 190 Declaration of Adele Phillips in Support of #163 Defendant's Opposition to Motion for Class Certification filed by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Eisen, Rebecca) (Filed on 11/20/2007) Modified on 11/21/2007 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
November 20, 2007 Filing 189 Declaration of Tamra Neuenburg in Support of #163 Defendant's Opposition to Motion for Class Certification filed by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Signature Page (Declarations/Stipulations) Signature Page)(Eisen, Rebecca) (Filed on 11/20/2007) Modified on 11/21/2007 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
November 20, 2007 Filing 188 Declaration of Michelle Nason in Support of #163 Defendant's Opposition to Motion for Class Certification filed by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Eisen, Rebecca) (Filed on 11/20/2007) Modified on 11/21/2007 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
November 20, 2007 Filing 187 Declaration of Christie Mills Declaration of Christie Mills in Support of Defendant's Opposition to Motion for Class Certification filed byWal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Signature Page (Declarations/Stipulations) Signature Page)(Eisen, Rebecca) (Filed on 11/20/2007)
November 20, 2007 Filing 186 Declaration of Joann Kleine in Support of #163 Defendant's Opposition to Motion for Class Certification filed by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Signature Page (Declarations/Stipulations) Signature Page)(Eisen, Rebecca) (Filed on 11/20/2007) Modified on 11/21/2007 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
November 20, 2007 Filing 185 Declaration of Ella Kelly in Support of #163 Defendant's Opposition to Motion for Class Certification filed by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Signature Page (Declarations/Stipulations) Signature Page)(Eisen, Rebecca) (Filed on 11/20/2007) Modified on 11/21/2007 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
November 20, 2007 Filing 184 Declaration of Elizabeth Hori in Support of #163 Defendant's Opposition to Motion for Class Certification filed byWal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Signature Page (Declarations/Stipulations) Signature Page)(Eisen, Rebecca) (Filed on 11/20/2007) Modified on 11/21/2007 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
November 20, 2007 Filing 183 Declaration of Maribel Hildreth in Support of #163 Defendant's Opposition to Motion for Class Certification filed by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Signature Page (Declarations/Stipulations) Signature Page)(Eisen, Rebecca) (Filed on 11/20/2007) Modified on 11/21/2007 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
November 20, 2007 Filing 182 Declaration of Rosa Delgado in Support of #163 Defendant's Opposition to Motion for Class Certification filed by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Signature Page (Declarations/Stipulations) Signature Page)(Eisen, Rebecca) (Filed on 11/20/2007) Modified on 11/21/2007 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
November 20, 2007 Filing 181 Declaration of Veronica Curiel in Support of #163 Defendant's Opposition to Motion for Class Certification filed by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Signature Page (Declarations/Stipulations) Signature Page)(Eisen, Rebecca) (Filed on 11/20/2007) Modified on 11/21/2007 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
November 20, 2007 Filing 180 Declaration of Sonia Coucino in Support of #163 Defendant's Opposition to Motion for Class Certification filed by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Signature Page (Declarations/Stipulations) Signature Page)(Eisen, Rebecca) (Filed on 11/20/2007) Modified on 11/21/2007 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
November 20, 2007 Filing 179 Declaration of Kathleen Billiet in Support of #163 Defendant's Opposition to Motion for Class Certification filed by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Signature Page (Declarations/Stipulations) Signature Page)(Eisen, Rebecca) (Filed on 11/20/2007) Modified on 11/21/2007 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
November 20, 2007 Filing 178 Declaration of Janette Bettencourt in Support of #163 Defendant's Opposition to Motion for Class Certification filed by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Signature Page (Declarations/Stipulations) Signature Page)(Eisen, Rebecca) (Filed on 11/20/2007) Modified on 11/21/2007 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
November 20, 2007 Filing 177 Declaration of Corene Becker in Support of #163 Defendant's Opposition to Motion for Class Certification filed by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Signature Page (Declarations/Stipulations) Signature Page)(Eisen, Rebecca) (Filed on 11/20/2007) Modified on 11/21/2007 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
November 20, 2007 Filing 176 Declaration of Laurel Ashe in Support of #163 Defendant's Opposition to Motion for Class Certification filed by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Signature Page (Declarations/Stipulations) Signature Page)(Eisen, Rebecca) (Filed on 11/20/2007) Modified on 11/21/2007 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
November 20, 2007 Filing 175 Declaration of Anmarie Alvarez in Support of #163 Defendant's Opposition to Motion for Class Certification filed by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Signature Page (Declarations/Stipulations) Signature Page)(Eisen, Rebecca) (Filed on 11/20/2007) Modified on 11/21/2007 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
November 20, 2007 Filing 174 Declaration of Kathryn Albright in Support of #163 Defendant's Opposition to Motion for Class Certification filed by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Eisen, Rebecca) (Filed on 11/20/2007) Modified on 11/21/2007 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
November 20, 2007 Filing 173 Declaration of Brad McConnell in Support of #163 Defendant's Opposition to Motion for Class Certification filed by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Eisen, Rebecca) (Filed on 11/20/2007) Modified on 11/21/2007 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
November 20, 2007 Filing 172 Declaration of Roxana Wigger in Support of #163 Defendant's Opposition to Motion for Class Certification filed by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Signature Page (Declarations/Stipulations) Signature Page#2 Exhibit 1-13)(Eisen, Rebecca) (Filed on 11/20/2007) Modified on 11/21/2007 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
November 20, 2007 Filing 171 Declaration of Juliette Nam in Support of #163 Defendant's Opposition to Motion for Class Certification filed by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Signature Page (Declarations/Stipulations) Signature Page)(Eisen, Rebecca) (Filed on 11/20/2007) Modified on 11/21/2007 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
November 20, 2007 Filing 170 Declaration of Diana McChristian in Support re #163 Defendant's Opposition to Motion for Class Certification filed by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Signature Page (Declarations/Stipulations) Signature Page)(Eisen, Rebecca) (Filed on 11/20/2007) Modified on 11/21/2007 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
November 20, 2007 Filing 169 Declaration of Denise Neumann Martin in Support re #163 (1) Defendant's Opposition to Motion for Class Certification and (2) #167 Objections to Evidence to the Declaration of Martin M. Shapiro filed by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-14)(Eisen, Rebecca) (Filed on 11/20/2007) Modified on 11/21/2007 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
November 20, 2007 Filing 168 Declaration of Michael Annatone in Support re #163 (1) Defendant's Opposition to Motion for Class Certification and (2) #167 Objections to Evidence to the Declaration of Martin M. Shapiro filed by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-13)(Eisen, Rebecca) (Filed on 11/20/2007) Modified on 11/21/2007 (jlm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 11/21/2007 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
November 20, 2007 Filing 167 OBJECTIONS to Declaration of Martin M. Shapiro, Ph.D. Filed in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Eisen, Rebecca) (Filed on 11/20/2007) Modified on 11/21/2007 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
November 20, 2007 Filing 166 Request for Judicial Notice and Declaration of Rebecca Eisen in Support Thereof, filed by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-E#2 Exhibit F#3 Exhibit G#4 Exhibit M#5 Exhibit N#6 Exhibit H-L)(Eisen, Rebecca) (Filed on 11/20/2007) Modified on 11/21/2007 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
November 20, 2007 Filing 165 Proposed Order re #163 Memorandum in Opposition to the Motion for Class Certification by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Eisen, Rebecca) (Filed on 11/20/2007) Modified on 11/21/2007 (jlm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 11/21/2007 (jlm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 11/21/2007 (jlm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 11/21/2007 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
November 20, 2007 Filing 164 RESPONSE to Proposed Trial Plan in Support of Motion for Class Certification filed by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Eisen, Rebecca) (Filed on 11/20/2007) Modified on 11/21/2007 (jlm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 12/5/2007 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
November 20, 2007 Filing 163 Memorandum in Opposition re #149 Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification filed by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A#2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Eisen, Rebecca) (Filed on 11/20/2007) Modified on 11/21/2007 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
November 20, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 162 STIPULATION AND ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 11/20/2007. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2007)
November 19, 2007 Filing 161 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Re: Personnel File Production During the Thanksgiving Holidays by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Lawson, Renee) (Filed on 11/19/2007)
November 19, 2007 Filing 160 STATUS REPORT Eleventh Report on Status of Court-Ordered Document Production by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Lawson, Renee) (Filed on 11/19/2007)
November 19, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 159 ORDER, Attorney Lynne C. Hermle; Jessica Perry; Michael A. Aparicio and Amira Biko Day terminated.. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 11/16/07. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2007)
November 13, 2007 Filing 158 STATUS REPORT Tenth Report on Staus of Court-Ordered Document Production by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Lawson, Renee) (Filed on 11/13/2007)
November 7, 2007 Filing 157 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric Meckley (Meckley, Eric) (Filed on 11/7/2007)
November 5, 2007 Filing 156 STATUS REPORT Ninth Report on Status of Court-Ordered Document Production by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Lawson, Renee) (Filed on 11/5/2007)
November 2, 2007 Filing 155 Notice of Withdrawal as Attorneys of Record and Proposed Order by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. (Aparicio, Michael) (Filed on 11/2/2007) Modified on 11/5/2007 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
October 29, 2007 Filing 154 STATUS REPORT Eighth Report on Status of Court-Ordered Document Production by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Lawson, Renee) (Filed on 10/29/2007)
October 22, 2007 Filing 153 STATUS REPORT Seventh Report on Status of Court-Ordered Document Production by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Lawson, Renee) (Filed on 10/22/2007)
October 18, 2007 Filing 152 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kent Michael Roger (Roger, Kent) (Filed on 10/18/2007) Modified on 10/19/2007 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
October 15, 2007 Filing 151 SIXTH STATUS REPORT of Court-Ordered Document Production by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Lawson, Renee) (Filed on 10/15/2007) Modified on 10/16/2007 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
October 11, 2007 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #149 MOTION to Certify Class. Motion Hearing set for 12/18/2007 01:00 PM in Courtroom 3, 3rd Floor, Oakland. (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2007)
October 11, 2007 Filing 150 Renotice of Motion re #149 Motion to Certify Class Motion Hearing set for 12/18/2007 01:00 PM in Courtroom 3, 3rd Floor, Oakland. filed by Plaintiffs Smith, Lyons, Ballard and Wiggins. Motion Hearing set for 12/18/2007 01:00 PM in Courtroom 3, 3rd Floor, Oakland. (Marlin, Louis) (Filed on 10/11/2007) Modified on 10/12/2007 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
October 10, 2007 Filing 149 MOTION to Certify Class filed by Plaintiffs Smith, Lyons, Ballard and Wiggins. Motion Hearing set for 12/11/2007 01:00 PM in Courtroom 3, 3rd Floor, Oakland. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1#2 Exhibit Exhibit 2#3 Exhibit Exhibit 3#4 Exhibit Exhibit 4#5 Exhibit Exhibit 5#6 Exhibit Exhibit 6#7 Exhibit Exhibit 7#8 Exhibit Exhibit 8#9 Affidavit Shapiro Declaration#10 Affidavit Marlin Declaration#11 Affidavit Bradley Declaration#12 Affidavit Hart Declaration#13 Affidavit Pinney Declaration#14 Supplement Plaintiffs' Proposed Trial Plan#15 Proposed Order Plaintiffs' Proposed Order)(Marlin, Louis) (Filed on 10/10/2007)
October 9, 2007 Filing 148 STATUS REPORT Fifth Report on Status of Court-Ordered Document Production by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Lawson, Renee) (Filed on 10/9/2007)
October 4, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 147 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE CONTINUANCE OF DEADLINE FOR FILING MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 10/2/07. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2007)
October 1, 2007 Filing 146 FOURTH STATUS REPORT by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Taylor, William) (Filed on 10/1/2007) Modified on 10/2/2007 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
October 1, 2007 Filing 145 STIPULATION to Extend Date to File Certification Motion & Proposed Order by Danton Ballard. (Marlin, Louis) (Filed on 10/1/2007)
September 25, 2007 Filing 144 THIRD STATUS REPORT by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Taylor, William) (Filed on 9/25/2007) Modified on 9/26/2007 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
September 17, 2007 Filing 143 SECOND STATUS REPORT by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Taylor, William) (Filed on 9/17/2007) Modified on 9/26/2007 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
September 10, 2007 Filing 142 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. re #140 Notice of Appearance, #141 Status Report PROOF OF SERVICE (Taylor, William) (Filed on 9/10/2007)
September 10, 2007 Filing 141 STATUS REPORT by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Taylor, William) (Filed on 9/10/2007) Modified on 9/11/2007 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
September 10, 2007 Filing 140 NOTICE of Appearance by William James Taylor NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF CO-COUNSEL (Taylor, William) (Filed on 9/10/2007)
August 29, 2007 Filing 139 Declaration of Michael A. Aparicio in Support of #137 Objection filed by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) #137 ) (Hermle, Lynne) (Filed on 8/29/2007) Modified on 8/30/2007 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
August 29, 2007 Filing 138 Declaration of Lynne C. Hermle in Support of #137 Objection filed by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) #137 ) (Hermle, Lynne) (Filed on 8/29/2007) Modified on 8/30/2007 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
August 29, 2007 Filing 137 OBJECTIONS to #126 & #129 Fifth and Sixth Discovery Orders on Plaintiff's Motion to Compel by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Hermle, Lynne) (Filed on 8/29/2007) Modified on 8/30/2007 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
August 28, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG denying #131 Motion to Stay (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2007)
August 27, 2007 Filing 135 DECLARATION of Louis M. Marlin in Opposition re #131 Emergency Motion For Stay filed by Barry Smith, Danton Ballard. (Marlin, Louis) (Filed on 8/27/2007) Modified on 8/28/2007 (jlm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 8/28/2007 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
August 27, 2007 Filing 134 Memorandum in Opposition re #131 Emergency Motion for Stay filed by Barry Smith, Danton Ballard. (Marlin, Louis) (Filed on 8/27/2007) Modified on 8/28/2007 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
August 23, 2007 Filing 133 Proposed Order re #131 MOTION to Stay Defendant Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.'s Emergency Motion for Stay of Fifth Discovery Order and Sixth Discovery Order by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Hermle, Lynne) (Filed on 8/23/2007)
August 23, 2007 Filing 132 Declaration of Lynne C. Hermle in Support of #131 MOTION to Stay Defendant Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.'s Emergency Motion for Stay of Fifth Discovery Order and Sixth Discovery Order filed byWal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Related document(s) #131 ) (Hermle, Lynne) (Filed on 8/23/2007)
August 23, 2007 Filing 131 MOTION to Stay Defendant Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.'s Emergency Motion for Stay of Fifth Discovery Order and Sixth Discovery Order filed by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Hermle, Lynne) (Filed on 8/23/2007)
August 20, 2007 Filing 130 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting Telephonic Meet and Confer. (Marlin, Louis) (Filed on 8/20/2007)
August 20, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 129 SIXTH DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 8/20/2007. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2007)
August 20, 2007 Filing 128 Letter from Marcus J. Bradley, Esq.. (Marlin, Louis) (Filed on 8/20/2007)
August 17, 2007 Filing 127 Letter from Lynne C. Hermle to Judge Zimmerman. (Aparicio, Michael) (Filed on 8/17/2007)
August 16, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman granting in part and denying in part #109 Motion to Compel; granting in part and denying in part #111 Motion for Protective Order (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2007)
August 15, 2007 Filing 125 DECLARATION of Michael A. Aparicio in Opposition to #124 Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel filed byWal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Exhibit B#3 Exhibit C#4 Exhibit D)(Related document(s) #124 ) (Aparicio, Michael) (Filed on 8/15/2007)
August 15, 2007 Filing 124 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #109 Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel (Production of Documents, Electronic Data and Things) filed by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Aparicio, Michael) (Filed on 8/15/2007) Modified on 8/16/2007 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
August 15, 2007 Filing 123 Declaration of Louis M. Marlin re #122 Memorandum in Opposition to motion for protective order filed by Danton Ballard. (Marlin, Louis) (Filed on 8/15/2007) Modified on 8/16/2007 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
August 15, 2007 Filing 122 Memorandum in Opposition re #111 motion by defendant for protective order filed by Danton Ballard. (Marlin, Louis) (Filed on 8/15/2007) Modified on 8/16/2007 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
August 10, 2007 Filing 121 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 8/9/2007 before Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman (Date Filed: 8/9/2007). (Tape #tc 29-07.) (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/9/2007) Modified on 8/13/2007 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
August 10, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 120 FOURTH DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 8/10/2007. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2007)
August 8, 2007 Filing 119 CLERKS NOTICE REQUIRING PRODUCTION OF MEET AND CONFER RECORDING OR TRANSCRIPT. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2007)
August 7, 2007 Filing 118 Letter from Michael A. Aparicio to Judge Zimmerman Re Interrogatories. (Aparicio, Michael) (Filed on 8/7/2007)
August 7, 2007 Filing 117 Letter from Michael A. Aparicio to Judge Zimmerman. (Aparicio, Michael) (Filed on 8/7/2007)
August 3, 2007 Filing 116 AMENDED ANSWER to #79 First Amended Consolidated Complaint by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Aparicio, Michael) (Filed on 8/3/2007) Modified on 8/6/2007 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
August 3, 2007 Filing 115 ANSWER to #79 Amended Complaint by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Aparicio, Michael) (Filed on 8/3/2007) Modified on 8/6/2007 (jlm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 8/6/2007 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
August 2, 2007 Set Deadlines/Hearings: re #113 Telephonic Conference set for 8/9/2007 03:00 PM. (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2007)
August 2, 2007 Filing 114 Letter from Louis M. Marlin Re Defendant's Request for Extension. (Marlin, Louis) (Filed on 8/2/2007)
August 2, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 113 THIRD DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 8/2/2007. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2007)
August 1, 2007 Filing 112 Declaration of Michael A. Aparicio in Support of #111 MOTION for Protective Order Re Timing of Document Production filed byWal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Declaration of Michael A. Aparicio In Support of Motion For Protective Order#2 Exhibit Exhibit B to Declaration of Michael A. Aparicio In Support of Motion For Protective Order)(Related document(s) #111 ) (Aparicio, Michael) (Filed on 8/1/2007)
August 1, 2007 Filing 111 MOTION for Protective Order Re Timing of Document Production filed by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 9/5/2007 10:00 AM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (Aparicio, Michael) (Filed on 8/1/2007)
August 1, 2007 Filing 110 ***ERRONEOUS ENTRY, PLEASE IGNORE*** ERRATA re #109 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents Signed Notice of Motion by Danton Ballard. (Marlin, Louis) (Filed on 8/1/2007) Modified on 8/2/2007 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
August 1, 2007 Filing 109 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents filed by Danton Ballard. Motion Hearing set for 9/5/2007 10:00 AM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Exhibit B#3 Exhibit C#4 Exhibit D#5 Certificate/Declaration in Support of Motion To Compel#6 Proposed Order #7 Proof of Service)(Marlin, Louis) (Filed on 8/1/2007)
July 31, 2007 Filing 108 Letter from Louis M. Marlin to Magistrate Judge Zimmerman (second letter of this date). (Marlin, Louis) (Filed on 7/31/2007)
July 31, 2007 Filing 107 Letter from Louis M. Marlin To Magistrate Judge Zimmerman. (Marlin, Louis) (Filed on 7/31/2007)
July 30, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 106 STIPULATION AND ORDER. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 7/30/07. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2007)
July 27, 2007 Set Deadlines/Hearings: re #105 Discovery Hearing set for 9/5/2007 10:00 AM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2007)
July 27, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 105 SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 7/27/2007. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2007)
July 27, 2007 Filing 104 Minute Entry: Discovery Hearing held on 7/27/2007 before Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman (Date Filed: 7/27/2007). (Tape #TC 25-07 Side A.) (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 7/27/2007) Modified on 7/30/2007 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
July 25, 2007 Set Deadlines/Hearings: re #103 Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 7/27/2007 at 11:00 AM. (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2007)
July 25, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER SCHEDULING TELEPHONIC CONFERENCE RE DISCOVERY DISPUTE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 7/27/2007. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2007)
July 24, 2007 Filing 102 Letter to Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman re Motion for Protective Order, from Lynne Hermle, dated 07/24/07. (Hermle, Lynne) (Filed on 7/24/2007) Modified on 7/25/2007 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
July 20, 2007 Filing 101 Letter to Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman re Discovery Dispute, from Louis M. Marlin, dated 07/20/07 (Marlin, Louis) (Filed on 7/20/2007) Modified on 7/23/2007 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
July 20, 2007 Filing 100 STIPULATION to Extend Deadline to File Answer to Complaint, filed by Barry Smith, Michael Wiggins, Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Aparicio, Michael) (Filed on 7/20/2007) Modified on 7/23/2007 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
July 10, 2007 Filing 99 STIPULATION RE EXTENSION OF DEFENDANT'S DEADLINE TO FILE ANSWER TO FIRST AMENDED CLASS COMPLAINT by Barry Smith, Michael Wiggins, Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Aparicio, Michael) (Filed on 7/10/2007)
July 3, 2007 Filing 98 STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER DISMISSING THIRD CLAIM FOR RELIEF AND STRIKING RELATED ALLEGATIONS by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Aparicio, Michael) (Filed on 7/3/2007)
July 3, 2007 Filing 97 STIPULATION Re Extension of Defendant's Deadline to File Answer to First Amended Class Complaint by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Aparicio, Michael) (Filed on 7/3/2007)
June 27, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 96 AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 3/7/2008. Jury Trial set for 6/30/2008 08:30 AM. Motions due by 4/29/2008. Pretrial Conference set for 6/17/2008 01:00 PM.. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 6/26/07. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2007)
June 27, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 95 STIPULATION AND ORDER. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 6/26/07. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2007)
June 26, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 94 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 6/26/2007. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2007)
June 22, 2007 Filing 93 STIPULATION to Continue Trial Schedule and Proposed Order Barry Smith, Michael Wiggins, Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Aparicio, Michael) (Filed on 6/22/2007) Modified on 6/25/2007 (jlm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 6/25/2007 (kk, COURT STAFF).
June 22, 2007 Filing 92 STIPULATION and Proposed Protective Order by Barry Smith, Michael Wiggins, Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Aparicio, Michael) (Filed on 6/22/2007) Modified on 6/25/2007 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
June 15, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 91 SECOND DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 6/14/2007. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2007)
June 14, 2007 Filing 90 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 6/14/2007 before Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman (Date Filed: 6/14/2007). (Tape #TC 18-07.) (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/14/2007) Modified on 6/18/2007 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
June 11, 2007 Set Deadlines/Hearings: re #89 Discovery Hearing set for 6/14/2007 04:00 PM. (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2007)
June 11, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 89 SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 6/11/2007. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2007)
June 8, 2007 Filing 88 Letter from Micheal Aparicio to Hon. Bernard Zimmerman in response to Plaintiffs' letter seeking telephonic conference. (Aparicio, Michael) (Filed on 6/8/2007)
June 6, 2007 Filing 87 Letter to Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman re Discovery Dispute from Louis M. Marlin, dated 06/05/07. (Marlin, Louis) (Filed on 6/6/2007) Modified on 6/7/2007 (jlm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 6/7/2007 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
May 29, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG granting in part and denying in part #80 Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiffs are GRANTED LEAVE to file an amended complaint no later than (20) twenty-days from the date of this Order. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2007) Modified on 5/30/2007 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
May 8, 2007 Filing 85 Reply Memorandum In Support of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss filed byWal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Hermle, Lynne) (Filed on 5/8/2007)
May 8, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong GRANTING #82 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Rudy A. Englund (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2007) Additional attachment(s) added on 5/8/2007 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
May 1, 2007 Filing 83 Memorandum in Opposition re Motion to Dismiss, Motion to Strike filed by Barry Smith. (Marlin, Louis) (Filed on 5/1/2007) Modified on 5/2/2007 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
April 26, 2007 Filing 82 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Rudy A. Englund ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 44611000661.) filed by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2007) Additional attachment(s) added on 4/27/2007 (jlm, COURT STAFF). Additional attachment(s) added on 4/27/2007 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
April 26, 2007 Received Order re #82 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 4461100066.) by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2007)
April 16, 2007 Filing 81 Proposed Order re #80 Motion to Dismiss and Motion to Strike by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Hermle, Lynne) (Filed on 4/16/2007) Modified on 4/17/2007 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
April 16, 2007 Filing 80 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Consolidated Complaint , and MOTION to Strike filed by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 5/22/2007 01:00 PM in Courtroom 3, 3rd Floor, Oakland. (Hermle, Lynne) (Filed on 4/16/2007) Modified on 4/17/2007 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
March 27, 2007 Filing 79 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. Filed byBarry Smith. (Marlin, Louis) (Filed on 3/27/2007) Modified on 3/28/2007 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
March 19, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 78 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: FILING OF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 3/19/07. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2007)
March 7, 2007 Filing 77 STIPULATION and Proposed Order by Barry Smith. (Attachments: #1)(Marlin, Louis) (Filed on 3/7/2007) Modified on 3/8/2007 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
March 7, 2007 Filing 76 AMENDED COMPLAINT [Proposed] First Amended against Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. Filed byBarry Smith. (Marlin, Louis) (Filed on 3/7/2007)
February 12, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 75 INITIAL DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 2/12/2007. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2007)
February 9, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 74 STIPULATION AND ORDER: Substituting Attorney Lynne C. Hermle for Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., Michael A. Aparicio for Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., Jessica Perry for Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., Amira Biko Day for Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. added. Attorney Susan T. Kumagai terminated. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2007) Modified on 2/12/2007 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
February 8, 2007 Filing 73 Proposed Order re #72 MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Consolidated Class Action Complaint and Motion to Strike; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Hermle, Lynne) (Filed on 2/8/2007)
February 8, 2007 Filing 72 MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Consolidated Class Action Complaint and Motion to Strike; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 3/27/2007 01:00 PM in Courtroom 3, 3rd Floor, Oakland. (Hermle, Lynne) (Filed on 2/8/2007)
February 8, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge for Discovery purposes. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 2/8/07. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2007)
February 8, 2007 Filing 70 STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Aparicio, Michael) (Filed on 2/8/2007)
February 8, 2007 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman for Discovery (wh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2007)
February 5, 2007 Filing 69 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. [for Non-Efilers] (Kumagai, Susan) (Filed on 2/5/2007)
February 5, 2007 Filing 68 STIPULATION [Stipulated Protective Order] by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Kumagai, Susan) (Filed on 2/5/2007)
January 9, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 67 STIPULATION AND ORDER APPROVING CONSOLIDATING CLASS ACTIONS AND PERMITTING FILING OF CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT (With Case No. C-06-5411-SBA) Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 1/9/07. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2007) Modified on 1/10/2007 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
December 5, 2006 Filing 66 STIPULATION To Consolidate - Exhibit E by Barry Smith, Michael Wiggins, Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit E)(Marlin, Louis) (Filed on 12/5/2006)
December 5, 2006 Filing 65 Proposed Order Granting Consolidation by Barry Smith, Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Marlin, Louis) (Filed on 12/5/2006)
December 5, 2006 Filing 64 STIPULATION To Consolidate Actions by Barry Smith, Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Exhibit B#3 Exhibit C#4 Exhibit D)(Marlin, Louis) (Filed on 12/5/2006)
December 4, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 63 STIPULATION AND ORDER REFERRING CASE to Private ADR. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 12/4/06. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2006)
November 30, 2006 Filing 62 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. (Kumagai, Susan) (Filed on 11/30/2006)
November 29, 2006 Filing 459 Received Document, Proposed Consolidated Class Action Complaint, by Barry Smith, Michael Wiggins. (kc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2006) (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
November 29, 2006 Filing 458 Received Document, Stipulation and Proposed Order to Consolidate class actions and file proposed consolidated class action complaint by Barry Smith, Michael Wiggins. (kc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2006) (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
November 29, 2006 Filing 61 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER TO REMOVE RELATED CASES FROM COURT-SPONSORED MEDIATION PROGRAM AND REFER TO PRIVATE MEDIATION by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Kumagai, Susan) (Filed on 11/29/2006) Modified on 12/1/2006 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
October 13, 2006 Filing 60 ADR Clerk's Notice Appointing Arthur R. Siegel as Mediator. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2006)
October 2, 2006 Filing 59 AMENDED ANSWER to PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT byWal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Kumagai, Susan) (Filed on 10/2/2006)
September 28, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER RELATING CASE.. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 9/28/06. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2006)
September 20, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #13 Motion to Strike #12 Answer to Amended Complaint (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2006)
September 18, 2006 Filing 55 RESPONSE in Support re #48 MOTION to Related Case Administrative Motion To Relate Cases CORRECTION OF DOCKET #52 filed byBarry Smith, Michael Wiggins. (Mac Farlane, Bonnie) (Filed on 9/18/2006)
September 15, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 54 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 9/14/2007. Jury Trial set for 2/4/2008 08:30 AM. Motions due by 12/4/2007. Pretrial Conference set for 1/22/2008 01:00 PM.. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 9/15/06. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2006)
September 14, 2006 Filing 58 AMENDED Minute Entry: Initial Case Management Conference held on 9/14/2006 before JUDGE ARMSTRONG (Date Filed: 9/14/2006). () (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/14/2006)
September 14, 2006 CASE REFERRED to Mediation., CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge for Settlement (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2006)
September 14, 2006 Filing 53 Minute Entry: Initial Case Management Conference held on 9/14/2006 before JUDGE ARMSTRONG (Date Filed: 9/14/2006). () (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/14/2006)
September 14, 2006 Filing 52 *** FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE SEE DOCKET #55 . *** RESPONSE in Support re #48 MOTION to Related Case Administrative Motion To Relate Cases filed byBarry Smith, Michael Wiggins. (Mac Farlane, Bonnie) (Filed on 9/14/2006) Modified on 9/18/2006 (ewn, COURT STAFF).
September 11, 2006 Filing 51 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. Proof Of Service (Kumagai, Susan) (Filed on 9/11/2006)
September 11, 2006 Filing 50 Proposed Order (Proposed Order Granting Defendant Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.'s Administrative Motion To Relate Cases by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Kumagai, Susan) (Filed on 9/11/2006)
September 11, 2006 Filing 49 Declaration of Susan T. Kumagai Declaration Of Susan T. Kumagai In Support Of Defendant Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.'s Administrative Motion To Relate Cases filed byWal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Kumagai, Susan) (Filed on 9/11/2006)
September 11, 2006 Filing 48 MOTION to Related Case Administrative Motion To Relate Cases filed by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Kumagai, Susan) (Filed on 9/11/2006)
September 11, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 9/11/06. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2006)
September 11, 2006 Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/14/2006 03:00 PM. VIA TELEPHONE. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 9/11/06. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2006)
September 8, 2006 Filing 46 Proposed Order Denying Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Defendant's Affirmative Defenses by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Kumagai, Susan) (Filed on 9/8/2006)
September 7, 2006 ADR Remark: ADR Phone Conference conducted on 9/7/06 by DB. (tjs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/7/2006)
September 5, 2006 Filing 45 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. [for Docket Nos. 43 & 44] (Kumagai, Susan) (Filed on 9/5/2006)
September 5, 2006 Filing 44 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting [Defendant's Discovery Plan]. (Kumagai, Susan) (Filed on 9/5/2006)
September 5, 2006 Filing 43 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Kumagai, Susan) (Filed on 9/5/2006)
August 31, 2006 Filing 42 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Mac Farlane, Bonnie) (Filed on 8/31/2006)
August 29, 2006 Filing 41 Declaration of Bonnie R. Mac Farlane in Support of #40 Reply Memorandum of Point and Authorities in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike Defendant's Affirmative Defenses filed byBarry Smith, Michael Wiggins. (Related document(s) #40 ) (Mac Farlane, Bonnie) (Filed on 8/29/2006)
August 29, 2006 Filing 40 Reply Memorandum re #13 MOTION to Strike Defendant's Affirmative Defenses; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support. F.R.C.P. 12(f) filed byBarry Smith, Michael Wiggins. (Mac Farlane, Bonnie) (Filed on 8/29/2006)
August 28, 2006 Filing 39 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #38 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, upon J. Dana Pinney and A.E. Bud Bailey via mail (kk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2006)
August 28, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong denying #21 Motion for Administrative Relief from Case Management Schedule (kk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2006)
August 25, 2006 Filing 37 MOTION for Leave to File Defendant Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.'s Request for Leave to File Response to Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Administrative Relief from Case Management Schedule] [Documents Re-Filed Per Court Clerk Request - See Docket No. 36] filed by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Response to Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Administrative Relief from Case Management Schedule)(Velez, G.) (Filed on 8/25/2006)
August 24, 2006 ADR Remark: The ADR Phone Conference has been rescheduled to 9/7/06 at 10:30 a.m. (tjs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2006)
August 23, 2006 Filing 36 ***ERRONEOUS ENTRY, PLEASE SEE DOCUMENT #37 FOR CORRECT ENTRY*** MOTION for Leave to File Response re Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant's Motion For Administrative Relief From Case Management Schedule filed by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Velez, G.) (Filed on 8/23/2006) Modified on 8/25/2006 (jlm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 8/28/2006 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
August 23, 2006 Filing 35 CLERK'S NOTICE Case Management Conference set for 9/12/2006 01:00 PM. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2006)
August 22, 2006 Filing 34 Declaration of Susan T. Kumagai in Support re #32 Defendant's Opposition To Plaintiff's Motion To Strike Affirmative Defenses filed by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Velez, G.) (Filed on 8/22/2006) Modified on 8/23/2006 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
August 22, 2006 Filing 33 Declaration of G. Martin Velez in Support re #32 Defendant's Response In Opposition To Plaintiff's Motion To Strike filed byWal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Velez, G.) (Filed on 8/22/2006) Modified on 8/23/2006 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
August 22, 2006 Filing 32 Response in Opposition re Plaintiff's Motion To Strike Affirmative Defenses filed byWal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Velez, G.) (Filed on 8/22/2006) Modified on 8/23/2006 (jlm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 8/24/2006 (kk, COURT STAFF).
August 21, 2006 Filing 31 ADR Clerks Notice Setting ADR Phone Conference on 8/29/06 at 2:00 p.m. Please take note that plaintiff's counsel initiates the call to all parties. (tjs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2006)
August 18, 2006 Filing 30 Proposed Order re #28 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion for Adminstrative Relief from Case Management Schedule by Barry Smith, Michael Wiggins. (Mac Farlane, Bonnie) (Filed on 8/18/2006)
August 18, 2006 Filing 29 Declaration of Bud Bailey in Support of #28 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion for Administrative Relief from Case Management Schedule filed byBarry Smith, Michael Wiggins. (Related document(s) #28 ) (Mac Farlane, Bonnie) (Filed on 8/18/2006)
August 18, 2006 Filing 28 Memorandum in Opposition re #21 MOTION [Administrative Relief from Case Management Schedule] filed byBarry Smith, Michael Wiggins. (Mac Farlane, Bonnie) (Filed on 8/18/2006)
August 17, 2006 Filing 27 STIPULATION re ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5b) of discussion of ADR options (Mac Farlane, Bonnie) (Filed on 8/17/2006) Modified on 8/18/2006 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
August 17, 2006 Filing 26 NOTICE of need for ADR Phone Conference (ADR L.R. 3-5 d) (Velez, G.) (Filed on 8/17/2006)
August 15, 2006 Filing 25 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. re #21 MOTION [Administrative Relief from Case Management Schedule] Decl. of G. Martin Velez In Support of Motion, (Proposed) Order, and Defendant's Proposed Revised Case Management Schedule (Velez, G.) (Filed on 8/15/2006)
August 15, 2006 Filing 24 MOTION [Proposed Revised Case Management Schedule] re #21 MOTION [Administrative Relief from Case Management Schedule] filed by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Velez, G.) (Filed on 8/15/2006)
August 15, 2006 Filing 23 Proposed Order re #21 MOTION [Administrative Relief from Case Management Schedule] by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Velez, G.) (Filed on 8/15/2006)
August 15, 2006 Filing 22 Declaration of G. Martin Velez in Support of #21 MOTION [Administrative Relief from Case Management Schedule] filed byWal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Exhibit B#3 Exhibit C - I)(Related document(s) #21 ) (Velez, G.) (Filed on 8/15/2006)
August 15, 2006 Filing 21 MOTION [Administrative Relief from Case Management Schedule] filed by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Velez, G.) (Filed on 8/15/2006)
August 1, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER re #16 Stipulation filed by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.,. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 7/31/06. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2006)
June 23, 2006 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #13 MOTION to Strike Defendant's Affirmative Defenses; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support. F.R.C.P. 12(f). Motion Hearing set for 9/12/2006 01:00 PM in Courtroom 3, 3rd Floor, Oakland. (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2006)
June 23, 2006 Filing 19 Renotice of Motion re #13 Motion to Strike by Barry Smith, Michael Wiggins (Mac Farlane, Bonnie) (Filed on 6/23/2006) Modified on 6/26/2006 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
June 22, 2006 Filing 18 Proposed Order re #16 Stipulation Continuing Dates for the Parties to Meet and Confer and Complete Initial Disclosures Pursuant to FRCP 26(f) by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Velez, G.) (Filed on 6/22/2006)
June 22, 2006 Filing 17 Declaration of G. Martin Velez in Support of #16 Stipulation to Continue Dates to Meet and Confer and Complete Initial Disclosures Under FRCP 26(f) filed byWal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Related document(s) #16 ) (Velez, G.) (Filed on 6/22/2006)
June 22, 2006 Filing 16 STIPULATION TO CONTINUE DATES TO MEET AND CONFER AND COMPLETE INITIAL DISCLOSURES UNDER FRCP 26(F) by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Velez, G.) (Filed on 6/22/2006)
May 31, 2006 Filing 15 Proposed Order re #13 MOTION to Strike Defendant's Affirmative Defenses; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support. F.R.C.P. 12(f) by Barry Smith, Michael Wiggins. (Mac Farlane, Bonnie) (Filed on 5/31/2006)
May 31, 2006 Filing 14 Declaration of Bonnie Mac Farlane in Support of #13 MOTION to Strike Defendant's Affirmative Defenses; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support. F.R.C.P. 12(f) filed byBarry Smith, Michael Wiggins. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) #13 ) (Mac Farlane, Bonnie) (Filed on 5/31/2006)
May 31, 2006 Filing 13 MOTION to Strike Defendant's Affirmative Defenses; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support. F.R.C.P. 12(f) filed by Barry Smith, Michael Wiggins. Motion Hearing set for 7/18/2006 01:00 PM in Courtroom 3, 3rd Floor, Oakland. (Mac Farlane, Bonnie) (Filed on 5/31/2006)
May 11, 2006 Filing 12 Answer to Amended Complaint #9 Amended Complaint byWal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Kumagai, Susan) (Filed on 5/11/2006)
May 1, 2006 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Barry Smith, Michael Wiggins re Summons Issued,, #1 Complaint (Mac Farlane, Bonnie) (Filed on 5/1/2006)
April 20, 2006 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Barry Smith, Michael Wiggins re #1 Complaint, Summons Issued, (Mac Farlane, Bonnie) (Filed on 4/20/2006)
April 17, 2006 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT With Jury Demand against Defendant. Filed by Barry Smith, Michael Wiggins. (Mac Farlane, Bonnie) (Filed on 4/17/2006) Modified on 4/18/2006 (jlm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 4/20/2006 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
April 10, 2006 Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE re: Plaintiff's Failure to E-File Complaint re #1 (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2006)
April 7, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong GRANTING #5 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (J. Dana Pinney) (kc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2006) Additional attachment(s) added on 4/12/2006 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
April 7, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong GRANTING #4 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (A.E. Bud Bailey) (kc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2006) Additional attachment(s) added on 4/12/2006 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
April 6, 2006 Filing 5 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Dana Pinney filed by Barry Smith, Michael Wiggins. Fee paid, receipt no. 4412575. (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2006) Additional attachment(s) added on 4/10/2006 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
April 6, 2006 Filing 4 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Bud Bailey filed by Barry Smith, Michael Wiggins. Fee paid, receipt no. 4412574. (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2006) Additional attachment(s) added on 4/10/2006 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
April 6, 2006 Received Order re #4 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice by Barry Smith, Michael Wiggins. (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2006)
April 6, 2006 Received Order re #5 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice by Barry Smith, Michael Wiggins. (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2006)
March 22, 2006 Filing 3 CLERK'S NOTICE Case Management Conference set for 9/7/2006 03:00 PM.via telephone. Case Management Statement due by 8/28/2006. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2006)
March 20, 2006 Filing 457 Summons Issued as to Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2006) (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
March 20, 2006 Filing 2 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 7/13/2006. Case Management Conference set for 7/20/2006 03:00 PM. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order - SBA)(jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2006)
March 20, 2006 Filing 1 COMPLAINT; With Jury Demand against Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 250, receipt number 4412498.). Filed byBarry Smith, Michael Wiggins. (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2006) Additional attachment(s) added on 4/10/2006 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
March 20, 2006 CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2006)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith et al v. Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Other: Nicole Clemente
Represented By: Joseph Darrell Palmer
Represented By: Janine Renee Menhennet
Represented By: Christopher Andress Bandas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Other: Budi Widjaja
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Other: Ricardo Beltran
Represented By: Michelle Adrienne Coccagna
Represented By: Peter A. Muhic
Represented By: James Arthur Maro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Other: Joseph D Wilkins
Represented By: Joseph Darrell Palmer
Represented By: Janine Renee Menhennet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Other: Lolita Wells
Represented By: Joseph Darrell Palmer
Represented By: Janine Renee Menhennet
Represented By: Christopher Andress Bandas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danton Ballard
Represented By: Peter Mark Hart
Represented By: Arnold William Schwartz
Represented By: Stanley Donald Saltzman
Represented By: Marcus Joseph Bradley
Represented By: Jose Ruben Mata
Represented By: Louis Michael Marlin
Represented By: Stephen Patrick O'Dell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Plaintiffs Smith, Lyons, Ballard and Wiggins
Represented By: Peter Mark Hart
Represented By: Arnold William Schwartz
Represented By: Stanley Donald Saltzman
Represented By: Marcus Joseph Bradley
Represented By: Jose Ruben Mata
Represented By: Louis Michael Marlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barry Smith
Represented By: Peter Mark Hart
Represented By: J. Dana Pinney
Represented By: Arnold William Schwartz
Represented By: Stanley Donald Saltzman
Represented By: Marcus Joseph Bradley
Represented By: Susan Simmons Seemiller
Represented By: Bonnie Rae Mac Farlane
Represented By: Jose Ruben Mata
Represented By: A.E. Bud Bailey
Represented By: Louis Michael Marlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Wiggins
Represented By: Peter Mark Hart
Represented By: J. Dana Pinney
Represented By: Arnold William Schwartz
Represented By: Stanley Donald Saltzman
Represented By: Marcus Joseph Bradley
Represented By: Susan Simmons Seemiller
Represented By: Bonnie Rae Mac Farlane
Represented By: Jose Ruben Mata
Represented By: A.E. Bud Bailey
Represented By: Louis Michael Marlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
Represented By: Amira Biko Day
Represented By: Karl G. Nelson
Represented By: William James Taylor
Represented By: Kent Michael Roger
Represented By: Rebecca Dianne Eisen
Represented By: Susan Tayeko Kumagai
Represented By: Jaime Dodge Byrnes
Represented By: Julian Wing-Kai Poon
Represented By: Rudy A. Englund
Represented By: Joan M. Haratani
Represented By: Brian Lee Duffy
Represented By: Candice S. Petty
Represented By: Mark A. Perry
Represented By: Jessica Perry
Represented By: George Charles Nierlich, III
Represented By: Michael A. Aparicio
Represented By: Lynne C. Hermle
Represented By: Naomi Beer
Represented By: George Martin Velez
Represented By: Eric Meckley
Represented By: Renee T. Lawson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?